SMITH v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00290

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STANLEY PAUL SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by STANLEY PAUL SMITH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STANLEY PAUL SMITH +1 573 592 2179
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo CHRISTOPHER BOND, Defendant
No Logo CLAIRE MCCASKILL, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."
No Logo HARRY REID, Defendant
No Logo JAY NIXON, Defendant
No Logo JOHN/JANE DOES, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "NANCY PELOSI"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo ROY BLUNT, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 8 Notice of Appeal filed by STANLEY PAUL SMITH ; USCA Case Number 10-5085. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the district court's order filed February 24, 2010, be affirmed. (smm) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [Dkt. No. 12] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/26/2010. (kb) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
      MOTION for Reconsideration Under F.R.C.P. 60(e) by STANLEY PAUL SMITH. (kb) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
        Supplemental Record on Appeal (Amended Notice of Appeal captioned as Certificate of Appealability on Memorandum Opinion) transmitted to US Court of Appeals (ls, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
          Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL by STANLEY PAUL SMITH. (ls, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
            Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee was not paid because it was filed In Forma Pauperis re 8 Notice of Appeal. (mmh, ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 5 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case by STANLEY PAUL SMITH. Fee Status: $0.00. Parties have been notified. (mmh, ) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER denying 6 Motion to reinstate case, as are his motions for recusal and for return of all documents filed in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/12/2010. (kb) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Reinstate Case by STANLEY PAUL SMITH. (kb) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/1/2010. (ls, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/1/2010. (ls, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Request the Following Parties be immediately Arrested by the US Marshalls and held Indefinately for Contempt of Court, Badgering a Witness, Denial Access to the Courts, Unabridged Retaliation a Hate Crimes by STANLEY PAUL SMITH (ls, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STANLEY PAUL SMITH (ls, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against ROY BLUNT, CHRISTOPHER BOND, JOHN/JANE DOES, ROBERT GATES, ERIC HOLDER, CLAIRE MCCASKILL, JAY NIXON, BARACK OBAMA, NANCY PELOSI, HARRY REID (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by STANLEY PAUL SMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ls, ) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 26 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?