KVECH v. HOLDER
Federal Court Proceeding District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 2:26 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOAN M. KVECH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Edward Byrnes +1 202 419 4247 +1 202 419 3454 kbyrnes@glklawyers.com
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Space David Cotter Rybicki +1 202 353 4024 david.rybicki@usdoj.gov
Space Mary Elizabeth Stratton +1 202 252 2575 +1 202 514 8780 mary.elizabeth.stratton@usdoj.gov
No Logo MONTGOMERY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, Interested Party
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 108 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/21/2014. (tcb) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER re 108 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Plaintiff's 76 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, Defendant's 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's 78 Redacted Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; On February 12, 2014, the Court issued a Memorandum Opinion and Order (the Memorandum Opinion) under seal. The Memorandum Opinion contains materials covered by the Revised Stipulated Privacy Protection Order (Dkt. No. 35) and materials filed pursuant to the parties motions for leave to file documents under seal (Dkt. Nos. 67, 74, 91). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that by no later than February 19, 2014, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed redacted Memorandum Opinion under seal for review by the Court. If approved, the Court shall file the redacted version on the public docket. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/12/2014. (tcb) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Plaintiff's 76 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, Defendant's 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's 78 Redacted Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 2/12/2014.(ztcb) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Compiled Statements by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to File Compiled Statements)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Statement of Undisputed Facts; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, that the Parties shall have until and including December 12, 2013, to file their combined statement of undisputed facts. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 12/11/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Statement of Undisputed Facts by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time Unitl December 12, 2013 to File Combined Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
              REPLY to opposition to motion re 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (public redacted version) (public redacted version) filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Opposition to Motion in Limine)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by JOAN M. KVECH re 76 SEALED MOTION filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Objection to Motion in Limine, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Motion in Limine, # 3 Appendix Documents, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Summary Judgment)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 101 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Statements of undisputed Facts, MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing now scheduled for December 5, 2013, to another date; and it isFURTHER ORDERED, that the Parties shall have until and includingDecember 9, 2013, to file their combined statements of undisputed facts; andit is FURTHER ORDERED, that the motions hearing in this case, nowscheduled for 11:00 a.m. on December 5, 2013, shall be continued untilJanuary 15, 2014, at 9:30a.m. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 11/15/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Statements of undisputed Facts, MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing now scheduled for December 5, 2013, to another date. by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time Until December 9, 2013, to file combined statements of undisputed facts and continue motions hearing)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Opposition to Summary Judgment on Privacy Act;It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have until November 25, 2013 to file herReply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 11/13/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Opposition to Summary Judgement on Privacy Act by JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                          LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. re 92 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Amended Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Motion in Limine, # 3 Supplemental Appendix Part 1, # 4 Supplemental Appendix - Part 2, # 5 Supplemental Appendix - Part 3, # 6 Supplemental Appendix - Part 4, # 7 Supplemental Appendix - Part 5, # 8 Supplemental Appendix Part 6, # 9 Additional Undisputed Facts, # 10 Supplemental Declaration of Robert L. VanRoe)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                            LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. re 92 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Reply to Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Motion in Limine, # 3 Supplemental Appendix Part 1, # 4 Supplemental Appendix Part 2, # 5 Supplemental Appendix Part 3, # 6 Supplemental Appendix Part 4, # 7 Supplemental Appendix Part 5, # 8 Supplemental Appendix Part 6, # 9 Supplemental Declaration of Robert L. VanRoe, # 10 Declaration of Rosalind Harrison, # 11 Declaration of Granette Trent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/2/2013, Entered: None
                              REDACTED DOCUMENT- Redacted Documents to 77 Memorandum in Opposition, by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Declaration)(Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/2/2013, Entered: None
                                REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion in Limine by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/2/2013, Entered: None
                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT- Redacted Documents to 76 SEALED MOTION filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (public redacted version) by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Declaration)(Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/02/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re summary judgment pleadings. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Filing Pleadings Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Under Seal by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re 91 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Pleadings Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Under Seal (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Pleadings Regarding Summary Judgment Motions Under Seal by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                          SEALED Amended Statement of Facts filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                            SEALED Amended Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Amended Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                REDACTED DOCUMENT- Amended Statement of Facts to 78 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (public redacted version) by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 83 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Statements of Undisputed Facts; The parties shall file their amended statements of undisputed material facts on or before October 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/24/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. Attorney Mercedeh Momeni terminated. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 SEALED MOTION; The dispositive motions in this case shall proceed in accordance with the following revised schedule: DefendantsReply in support of its Motion and Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion due by 11/1/2013. Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Cross-Motion due by 11/18/2013. Combined Statement of Facts due by 11/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/22/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Statements of Undisputed Facts by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Order by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 SEALED MOTION filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 SEALED MOTION filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Consent MOTION to Stay by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (public redacted version) by JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (public redacted version) filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Byrnes, Kevin) Modified on 9/12/2013 to correct the link (tcb). (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        SEALED OPPOSITION filed by JOAN M. KVECH re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File to file sealed documents by JOAN M. KVECH (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Exhibits to Summary Judgment by JOAN M. KVECH (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S 68 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(public redacted version) by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Granette Trent (redacted version), # 2 Declaration of Kimberly N. Dabney (redacted version), # 3 Declaration of Amy Jo Lyons, # 4 Declaration of Robert L. VanRoe, # 5 Declaration of Candice M. Will, # 6 Exhibit A (redacted version), # 7 Statement of Facts (redacted version))(Stratton, Mary) Modified on 8/29/2013 (ztcb). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Public Redacted Documents by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED Memorandum re 68 filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Robert VanRoe, # 3 Declaration of Candice Will, # 4 Declaration of Amy Jo Lyons, # 5 Declaration of Granette Trent, # 6 Declaration of Kimberly Dabney, # 7 Exhibit A)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Pleadings in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on June 19, 2013; Page Numbers: 1 - 29. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Court Reporter Email Address : cathryjns1@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that dispositive motions in this case shall proceed in accordance with the following deadlines and procedures: Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment due by: 8/5/2013, Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion and Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment as to Privacy Act claim due by: 9/9/2013, Defendants Reply in Support of its Motion and Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion due by: 10/18/2013, Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Cross-Motion due by: 11/4/2013 and Hearing on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment And Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment: 9:30 AM on November 20, 2013. Given the age of this case, the parties are advised that requests to extend the above-listed deadlines will be viewed by the Court with disfavor and will not be granted absent compelling circumstances. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the procedures set forth in the attached APPENDIX A. Any party who fails to comply with these instructions risks having their filing(s) stricken, without notice. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/2/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on February 14, 2013; Page Numbers: 1 - 26. Date of Issuance:March 13, 2013. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2013.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR Substituting for attorney Oliver W. McDaniel (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 59 Status Report by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Ex. A (Email and Deft's Responsive Letter, 5:50), # 3 Ex. B (Email and Draft Joint Status Report, 6:02), # 4 Ex. C (Email, 6:16), # 5 Ex. D (Email, 6:22), # 6 Ex. E (Email and Draft Joint Status Report, 6:29), # 7 Ex. F (Email, 6:30), # 8 Ex. G (Email, 6:43 - 6:59), # 9 Ex. H (Deft's Original Draft Joint Status Report))(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Documents Pursuant to Protective Order by JOAN M. KVECH re 58 Status Report (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Supplemental of Plaintiff by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email Communication from Feb. 11, 2013)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (JOINT) REGARDING DISCOVERY by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, JOAN M. KVECH. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2013: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2 (SEALED), # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 (SEALED)) (jf, ). (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER re: Discovery Status Reports. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 01/22/2013. (lcrlw3) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to Defendant's 54 Status Report of January 18, 2013 filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) Modified on 1/23/2013 to add linkage(rdj). (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Robert L. Wilkins held on January 11, 2013; Page Numbers: 1 - 30. Date of Issuance:January 22, 2012. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2013.(Stonestreet, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT (JOINT, DEFENDANT'S PORTION, REGARDING DISCOVERY) by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Motion for an Extension of the Discovery Period, # 2 Exhibit Letters to Defendant's regarding Discovery deficiencies)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER re: 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery;the Court hereby GRANTS the Defendants Motion and will authorize a limited extension of the discovery period in this case, as set forth herein.ORDERED that the parties shall continue to meet and confer regarding any outstanding disputes concerning written discovery, including interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admission. By no later than Friday, January 18, 2013, the parties shall file a joint status report identifying any remaining disagreements as to whether a supplemental response to a particular written discovery request is require;it is,FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall mutually exchange any further supplemental discovery responses and/or supplemental document productions by no later than January 25, 2013, with the exception of certain comparator information specifically discussed with the Court, which shall be produced by Defendant by no later than February 1, 2013; it is,FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than February 11, 2013, the parties shall file a further status report apprising the Court of their continued discovery efforts; it is, FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Status Conference on February 14, 2013, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 27A; it is,FURTHER ORDERED that all fact and expert discovery in this matter, including depositions, shall be completed by no later than April 12, 2013; it is,FURTHER ORDERED that the Pre-Motion Conference scheduled for February 25, 2013, at 3:00 PM, is hereby rescheduled for May 13, 2013, at 4:00 PM, in Courtroom 27A. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/11/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ON DISCOVERY PROGRESS by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DOCUMENT [46-1] SUBJECT TO PRIVACY PROTECTION ORDER filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DOCUMENT [46-1] SUBJECT TO PRIVACY PROTECTION ORDER by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 46 Reply to Document (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Defendant's Status Report filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT REGARDING DISCOVERY by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT and Request for Discovery Conference by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Stratton on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Stratton, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and all other dates ninety days;and it is further ORDERED that Discovery shall close on October 29, 2012 and all other dates shall also be extended 90 days from their original due date. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/18/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and all other dates ninety days by JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend all Other Dates Ninety Days by JOAN M. KVECH (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/29/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH JUNE 7, 2012 DISCLOSURE ORDER by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR re 31 Order on Motion to Compel,, (Attachments: # 1 Revised Stipulated Protective Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File An Agreed Protection Order; ORDERED that the requested extension of time until Thursday, June 28, 2012, for the Parties to file an agreed protective order is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/22/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File An Agreed Protection Order by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 25 Consent Motion to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena. Within ten days of this order, both the parties and Third-Party MCPD shall submit a proposed protective order with regard to disclosure of the documents sought by the parties, and upon execution of that order, MCPD shall forthwith produce the requested documents. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order by mail and email to counsel for MCPD at the following address: Sarah Daken, Associate County Attorney, Department of Police, 800 South Frederick Ave., Suite 201,Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877: sarah.daken@montgomerycountymd.gov. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 6/7/12. (lcrlw1) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Consent MOTION to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Consent MOTION to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena filed by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 25 Consent MOTION to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena filed by MONTGOMERY COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(tcb) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Montgomery County Police Department (MCPD) file a response to the Consent Motion to Compel Compliance with a Third Party Subpoena [DKT #25] by no later than Friday, May 11, 2012. Any replies shall be filled by no later than Wednesday, May 16, 2012. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order by mail and email to counsel for MCPD at the following address: Sarah Daken,Department of Police, Internal Affairs Division, 800 S. Frederick Ave., Suite 201,Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877,sarah.daken@montgomerycountymd.gov. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 5/4/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re 25 Consent MOTION to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Compel Compliance With A Third Party Subpoena by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (MCPD Subpoena), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Letter from MCPD), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Subpoena Service Certification), # 6 Exhibit 4 (McDaniel Declaration))(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, And, Joint MOTION to Modify the Post-Discovery Schedule; Discovery is hereby extended until 7/31/2012. The Pre-Motion Hearing previously set for 6/5/2012 is hereby rescheduled for 10:00 a.m.on September 10, 2012 in courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins.. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 4/18/2012. (tcb ) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , And, Joint MOTION to Modify the Post-Discovery Schedule by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR, JOAN M. KVECH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/13/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION -- Privacy Protection Order by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, JOAN M. KVECH. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the following: Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 3/1/2012. Defendants Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 4/2/2012. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures due by 4/12/2012. End of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 4/30/2012. Pre-Motion Conference set for 6/5/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins.(SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/31/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of the Current Pre-Discovery Schedule; and it is further ORDERED that the following revised pre-discovery schedule shall be established:Answer due by 10/21/2011, 26(f) Meet & Confer Statement due by 10/28/2011. Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Robert L. Wilkins. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 10/5/2011. (tcb) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of the Current Pre-Discovery Schedule by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR Substituting for attorney David C. Rybicki (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The following claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice: Count II (Privacy Act-inaccuracy), Count III (Privacy Act-First Amendment), Count IV (First & Fourteenth Amendment claims), Count VII (Privacy Act-access), and Count VIII (Rehabilitation Act). Count VI (discrimination based on marital status)is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. The motion is denied with respect to: Count I (Privacy Act-disclosure) and Count V (Title VII- gender discrimination). Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 9/19/11. (lcrlw1, ) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.,. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 9/19/11. (lcrlw1, ) . (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin E. Byrnes (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dispositive Motion by JOAN M. KVECH (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise to Respond to the Complaint by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise to respond to the complaint by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rybicki, David) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. served on 4/6/2010, answer due 6/7/2010 (Byrnes, Kevin) Modified on 4/20/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 04/06/10. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Cotter Rybicki on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Rybicki, David) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616028760) filed by JOAN M. KVECH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 776 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?