U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. PATRIOT EQUITIES, L.P. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00642
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Roy Goldberg +1 202 216 4204
v.
No Logo ALAN WERTHER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
No Logo ERIK KOLAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
No Logo GEOFFREY GARDNER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
No Logo MICHAEL KOLAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
No Logo PATRIOT EQUITIES, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
No Logo TIMOTHY MCKENNA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KASS, MITEK & KASS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benny L. Kass +1 202 659 6500 +1 202 293 2608 blkass@kmklawyers.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by GEOFFREY GARDNER, ERIK KOLAR, MICHAEL KOLAR, TIMOTHY MCKENNA, PATRIOT EQUITIES, L.P., ALAN WERTHER.(Kass, Benny) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIK KOLAR served on 5/14/2010, answer due 6/4/2010 (Goldberg, M.) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GEOFFREY GARDNER served on 5/5/2010, answer due 5/26/2010 (Goldberg, M.) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL KOLAR served on 5/5/2010, answer due 5/26/2010 (Goldberg, M.) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TIMOTHY MCKENNA served on 5/5/2010, answer due 5/26/2010 (Goldberg, M.) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALAN WERTHER served on 5/5/2010, answer due 5/26/2010 (Goldberg, M.) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PATRIOT EQUITIES, L.P. served on 5/5/2010, answer due 5/26/2010 (Loveland, Christopher) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying Corporate Parent U.S. BANCORP for U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (NYSE: USB). (jf, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT against GEOFFREY GARDNER, ERIK KOLAR, MICHAEL KOLAR, TIMOTHY MCKENNA, PATRIOT EQUITIES, L.P., ALAN WERTHER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616029241) filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) . (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 412 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?