SAI v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00899
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 6:02 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID KEANU SAI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 47-605 Puapo'o Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID KEANU SAI +1 808 383 6100
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo LINDA LINGLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel-Honolulu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marie Manuele Gavigan mgavigan@honolulu.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT F. WILLARD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT MICHAEL GATES"
Brinker International, Inc. Officer/Director, Brinker International, Inc.
Nacco Industries, Inc. Officer/Director, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Drilling Co /de/
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Spinney, Alfred Napahuelua

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY +1 808 333 6947
No Logo JAMES KIMO KEKA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES KIMO KEKA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES KIMO KEKA +1 702 358 0576
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1391
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 6/3/11 re 42 Notice of Appeal. (td, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 38 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by DAVID KEANU SAI. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616039376. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER. Since the Court's last order denying Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, Plaintiff has filed his reply brief in support of his motion to reconsider, and would-be intervenor Alfred Napahuelua Spinney filed a motion to join Plaintiff's motion to reconsider. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's reply brief and determined that it does not present any further basis for reconsidering the Court's order of dismissal. The Court has also reviewed Alfred Napahuelua Spinney's motion and determined that it does not present any basis for reconsidering the Court's prior orders. Therefore, the Court reaffirms its dismissal of this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 20, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, 35 Memorandum & Opinion filed by DAVID KEANU SAI; ("Leave to file is Granted" by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (td, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MOTION to join plaintiff's motion to reconsider order granting defendants' motion to dismiss and denying plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental complaint by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY; ("Leave to file is Granted" by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (td, ) (Main Document 39 replaced on 4/20/2011) (dr) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Reconsider Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 6, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
              Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, 35 Memorandum & Opinion filed by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, LINDA LINGLE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, 35 Memorandum & Opinion by DAVID KEANU SAI (td, ) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER. For the reasons expressed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint is DENIED; Alfred Napahuelua Spinney's 17 Application to Intervene is DENIED; and James Kimo Keka's 30 Motion to Intervene is DENIED. This case is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 9, 2011. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by JAMES KIMO KEKA. (Exhibit F's first document, a carbon copy from the District Court of the Third Circuit Civil Court, is slightly illegible and the original documents have been forwarded to chambers) (td, ) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to federal defendants' opposition as to 30 MOTION to Intervene by JAMES KIMO KEKA; ("Let this be filed" by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly) (td, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION to Intervene filed by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Intervene by JAMES KIMO KEKA. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY. (td, ) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Spanish Embassy's reply to plaintiff's letter apprising the Spanish Ambassador of plaintiff's motion to supplement the amended complaint by DAVID KEANU SAI (td, ) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. Alfred Napahuelua Spinney's 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply is GRANTED. Alfred Napahuelua Spinney shall have until December 15, 2010, to file a reply in support of his motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 30, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Leave to File filed by DAVID KEANU SAI. (dr) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY. (See Docket Entry 22 to view Document) (dr) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 MOTION to Intervene. "Leave to file Granted" by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 22, 2010 by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY (rdj) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Certificates of Service by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY re 17 MOTION to Intervene (td, ) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to file supplemental complaint by DAVID KEANU SAI (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Complaint)(td, ) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                SURREPLY to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID KEANU SAI. (td, ) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION to Intervene filed by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Service by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, LINDA LINGLE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD re 16 Reply to opposition to Motion (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MOTION to Intervene by ALFRED NAPAHUELUA SPINNEY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)"Let this be filed", by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 12, 2010(rdj) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID KEANU SAI. (rdj) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as the Defendant LINDA LINGLE. (dr) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed on July 9, 2010 filed by LINDA LINGLE. (Gavigan, Marie) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER. On September 13, 2010, Federal Defendants filed a 10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is representing himself, pro se. In accordance, this Court wishes to advise Plaintiff that he must respond to Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by no later than October 8, 2010. If Plaintiff does not respond, the Court will treat the motion as conceded and dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Furthermore, the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the following address: 47-605 Puapo'o Place, Kaneohe, HI 96744. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 16, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed on July 9, 2010 filed by DAVID KEANU SAI. (td, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, ROBERT F. WILLARD (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER. The Court wishes to advise the Plaintiff that he must respond to Defendant Linda Lingle's 8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by no later than September 20, 2010. If Plaintiff does not respond, the Court will treat the motion as conceded and dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Furthermore, the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the following address: 47-605 Puapoo Place, Kaneohe, HI 96744. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 26, 2010. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Filed on July 9, 2010 by LINDA LINGLE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Marie Manuele Gavigan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Gavigan, Marie) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Repond to the Amended Complaint by HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, LINDA LINGLE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of service by DAVID KEANU SAI re 5 Amended Complaint (td, ) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, LINDA LINGLE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD filed by DAVID KEANU SAI.(jf, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT MICHAEL GATES served on 6/21/2010, answer due 8/20/2010; BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA served on 6/24/2010, answer due 8/23/2010. (td, ) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ROBERT MICHAEL GATES served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010; HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010; BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/14/10. (td, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2010: # 1 Return of Service for US Attorney, # 2 Return of Service for Attorney General) (td, ). (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to LINDA LINGLE served on 6/9/2010, answer due 8/9/2010; ROBERT F. WILLARD served on 6/16/2010, answer due 8/16/2010. (td, ) Modified dates on 6/28/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against HILLARY DIANE RODHAM CLINTON, ROBERT MICHAEL GATES, LINDA LINGLE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, ROBERT F. WILLARD ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030109) filed by DAVID KEANU SAI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F(1), # 7 Exhibit F(2), # 8 Exhibit F(3), # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Errata N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?