STATE OF GEORGIA v. HOLDER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01062

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F. Heffernan +1 202 514 4738
No Logo ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

No Logo CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo EDWARD O. DUBOSE, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Georgia Association of Black Elected Officials, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by MALDEF

No Logo GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo GEORGIA STATE NAACP, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HELEN BUTLER, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JANICE MATHIS, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo MARVIN LIM, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

No Logo MICHAEL B. WRIGHT, SR., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo ORGANIZATION OF CHINESE AMERICANS, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

No Logo SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo TYRONE BROOKS, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 2, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TYRONE BROOKS, HELEN BUTLER, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell-Platts, Meredith) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
      REPLY re 49 Response to Document, 46 Motion to Dismiss Reply to Intervenors' Response to Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Heffernan, Brian) Modified to add link on 10/12/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
        REPLY re 49 Response to Document, 46 MOTION to Dismiss in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Lewis, Anne) Modified to add link on 10/12/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
          RESPONSE re 46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA, TYRONE BROOKS, HELEN BUTLER, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP, MARVIN LIM, ORGANIZATION OF CHINESE AMERICANS. (Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
            RESPONSE re 46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA, JANICE MATHIS, SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION, MICHAEL B. WRIGHT, SR. (Clarke, Kristen) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/21/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE by CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, JANICE MATHIS, SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION, MICHAEL B. WRIGHT, SR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant-Intervenors' Notice)(Perales, Nina) (Entered: 08/21/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Dismiss by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, STATE OF GEORGIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Preclearance Letter, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2. - Past Orders, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                  RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Perales, Nina) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Defendant Attorney General of the United States by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR re 38 Amended Complaint (Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. Related document: 38 Amended Complaint filed by STATE OF GEORGIA.(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                          RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                            RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Bell-Platts, Meredith) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                              RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 (Revised))(znmw, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER of USCA filed 6/29/10 designating Circuit Judge Thomas B. Griffith, U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, and Judge Henry H. Kennedy,Jr., U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia to serve with Judge Ellen S. Huvelle as members of the court to hear and determine this case; Judge Griffith will preside. (jeb, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sangyoon Nathan Park, :Firm- Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, :Address- 1850 K St. NW, Suite 1100, Washington, District of Columbia 20006. Phone No. - 202-835-7500. by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth Kimerling, :Firm- Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, :Address- 99 Hudson Street, 12th Floor, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212-966-5932. by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn D. Magpantay, :Firm- Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, :Address- 99 Hudson Street, 12th Floor, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212-966-5932. by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION identifying Other Affiliate PUSH EXCEL, Other Affiliate CITIZENSHIP EDUCATION FUND, Other Affiliate PEACHTREE STREET PROJECT for SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                            LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA, JANICE MATHIS, SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION, MICHAEL B. WRIGHT, SR.(jf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion to Intervene permissively as defendants by Concerned Black Clergy of Metropolitan Atlanta, the Southern Regional Office of the Rainbow Push Coalition, Michael B. Wright, Sr., and Janice Mathis. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Thomas B. Griffith; Judge Henry H. Kennedy; Judge Ellen S. Huvelle) on August 3, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                  LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA (Nolan, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by CONCERNED BLACK CLERGY OF METROPOLITAN ATLANTA, SOUTHERN REGIONAL OFFICE OF THE RAINBOW PUSH COALITION, MICHAEL B. WRIGHT, SR, JANICE MATHIS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 4 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Certificate - CBC, # 5 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Certificate - Push)(znmw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA, MARVIN LIM, ORGANIZATION OF CHINESE AMERICANS.(jf, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS.(jf, ) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Intervene permissively as defendants by Marvin Lim, the Organization of Chinese Americans Georgia Chapter, and the Asian American Legal Advocacy Center of Georgia. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Thomas B. Griffith; Judge Henry H. Kennedy; Judge Ellen S. Huvelle) (AG) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion to Intervene permissively as defendant by the Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Thomas B. Griffith; Judge Henry H. Kennedy; Judge Ellen S. Huvelle) on July 28, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                              RESPONSE re 22 MOTION to Intervene filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished orders)(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Intervene by ORGANIZATION OF CHINESE AMERICANS, ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL ADVOCACY CENTER OF GEORGIA, MARVIN LIM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(rdj) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Amended MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS. (jf, ) Modified on 7/20/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of TYRONE BROOKS, HELEN BUTLER, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith E.B. Bell-Platts on behalf of TYRONE BROOKS, HELEN BUTLER, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP (Bell-Platts, Meredith) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS (Perales, Nina) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Intervene by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment A_Amended GALEO Motion to Intervene, # 3 Attachment B_Exh A GALEO Int Answer to Complaint, # 4 Attachment C_Amended GALEO Proposed Oder)(Perales, Nina) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ERIC H. HOLDER, JR served on 6/29/2010, answer due 8/30/2010 (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE re 13 MOTION to Intervene of GALEO filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished orders)(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer, # 2 Rule 7.1 Certficate, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Tyson on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER setting discovery and briefing schedule. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 12, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP (jf, ) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by TYRONE BROOKS, HELEN BUTLER, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA, GEORGIA STATE NAACP.(Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 5 Unopposed Motion to Intervene Permissively by Tyrone Brooks, Edward O. DuBose, Helen Butler, Georgia Association of Black Elected Officials, Georgia State Conference NAACP, and Georgia Coalition for the Peoples Agenda. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Thomas B. Griffith; Judge Henry H. Kennedy; Judge Ellen S. Huvelle) on July 7, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by TYRONE BROOKS, EDWARD O. DUBOSE, HELEN BUTLER, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF BLACK ELECTED OFFICIALS, GEORGIA STATE NAACP, GEORGIA COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES' AGENDA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 plaintiff's Motion for designation of a three-judge court. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 24, 2010. (AG) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STATE OF GEORGIA identifying Corporate Parent NONE for STATE OF GEORGIA. (rdj) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MOTION for Three Judge Court by STATE OF GEORGIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616030697) filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?