JOHN DOE I, et al v. EXXON MOBIL CORP, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01357-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 12, 2021 at 3:39 PM DT (3.2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Plaintiff
No Logo JANE DOE I, Plaintiff
No Logo JANE DOE II, Plaintiff
No Logo Jane Doe III, Plaintiff
No Logo Jane Doe IV, Plaintiff
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beins Axelrod PC (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward M. Gleason, Jr. +1 202 328 7222 +1 202 328 7030 egleason@beinsaxelrod.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com
Space Brent W. Landau +1 215 985 3273 +1 215 985 3271 blandau@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allyson B. Baker +1 202 408 4600 abaker@cmht.com
Space Agnieszka Maria Fryszman +1 202 408 4699 +1 202 408 4699 afryszman@cmht.com
Space Kathleen M. Konopka +1 202 408 4692 +1 202 408 4699 kkonopka@cohenmilstein.com
Space Marka Ann Peterson +1 202 408 4600 mpeterson@cmht.com
Space Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conrad and Scherer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry Collingsworth +1 202 543 4001 +1 202 594 4001 tc@iradvocates.org
Space William Robert Scherer, Jr. +1 954 462 5500 +4639 463 463 9244 wscherer@conradscherer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Elin McOwen +1 212 735 2702 +1 917 777 3702 molly.mcowen@cfpb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Ogletree, Jr. +1 617 496 2054 +1 617 496 3936 cogletree@ecbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek J. Baxter +1 202 693 9328 derekjbaxter@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 105

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tarek Farouk Maassarani +1 202 374 0369 maassive@gmail.com
No Logo JOHN DOE IV, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN DOE V, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN DOE VI, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN DOE VII, Plaintiff
v.
ExxonMobil Corporation ExxonMobil Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, MOBIL CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by ExxonMobil Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Conlon +1 713 656 5074 patrick.j.conlon@exxonmobil.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 310 553 6700 +1 202 383 5414 wdellinger@omm.com
Space Srikanth Srinivasan +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Aaron Benson +1 202 223 7300 +1 202 223 7420 cbenson@paulweiss.com
Space Alex Young K. Oh +1 202 223 7334 aoh@paulweiss.com
Space Whitney D. Russell +1 202 223 7300 +1 202 223 7420 wrussell@paulweiss.com
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Collier Maxwell +1 202 303 1000 gmaxwell@willkie.com
Space Nikhil Singhvi +1 202 303 1000 nsinghvi@willkie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Meyer +1 202 303 1281 rjmeyer@willkie.com
Space Martin J. Weinstein +1 202 303 1281 mweinstein@willkie.com
Exxonmobil Oil Indonesia Inc. Exxonmobil Oil Indonesia Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mobil Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mobil Oil Corporation, Defendant
No Logo PT ARUN LNG CO., Defendant
No Logo Lawyers Committee For Human Rights, Movant
United States of America United States of America, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 654 6274 +1 202 654 9968 jhenault@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov
Space Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Space Stratton Christopher Strand +1 202 514 7094 +1 202 514 8780 stratton.strand@usdoj.gov
  Entries (757) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 799 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Sealed Memorandum Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None sealed reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 3/14/2021, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 777 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Sealed Memorandum Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Sealed Memorandum Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None ORDER allowing Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Memorandum Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/18/2015.(hs) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION (hs) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/18/2015.(hs) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/18/2015.(hs) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION (hs) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 541 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION to Modify the Protective Order and to Vacate the Ex Parte Pseudonym Orders filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Young K. Oh with Exhibits 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-19, # 3 Exhibit 20-31, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by JANE DOE, VII, JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE, VIII, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE VIII re (519 in 1:01-cv-01357-RCL) SEALED MOTION filed by JANE DOE, VII, JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE, VIII, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE VII. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized, (92 in 1:07-cv-01022-RCL) SEALED MOTION filed by JOHN DOE IX, JOHN DOE VIII, JOHN DOE X, JOHN DOE XI. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zrdj) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Answer and Affirmative and Separate Defenses to the Second Amended Complaint for Equitable Relief and Damages filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 490 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/16/15. (mpt, ) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 482 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 479 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/27/15.(zmpt, ) Modified on 4/1/2015 (zmpt, ). (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 478 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Aceves, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 477 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 475 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/25/15. (mpt, ) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED OPPOSITION Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (See Docket entry 466 to view document)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 465 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Second Amended Complaint filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/23/14. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 446 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Dismiss filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 445 MOTION for Reconsideration re 424 Scheduling Order Permitting Discovery on the NON-ATS Claims MOTION to Stay / For a Temporary Stay of All Discovery filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 448 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 446 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 445 MOTION for Reconsideration re 424 Scheduling Order Permitting Discovery on the NON-ATS Claims MOTION to Stay / For a Temporary Stay of All Discovery filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY re: 434 by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII (Attachments: # 1 Prosecutor v. Sainovic)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) Modified to add linkage per counsel on 2/20/2014 (td, ). (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII 446 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Dismiss filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A & B)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Dismiss by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 424 Scheduling Order Permitting Discovery on the NON-ATS Claims, MOTION to Stay / For a Temporary Stay of All Discovery by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Young K. Oh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 426 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Young K. Oh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Declaration of Frans Hendra Winarta, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF by WILLIAM R CASTRO, MARTIN S FLAHERTY, NASSER HUSSAIN, STANLEY N KATZ, JENNY S MARTINEZ. (rdj) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 436 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/19/13. (mpt, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 438 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 426 MOTION to Dismiss ; Granting 438 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Dismiss has a limit of 35 pages and shall be filed on or before 1/17/2014. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/19/13. (mpt) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 428 MOTION to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order, or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Young K. Oh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Alan B. Morrison on behalf of WILLIAM R CASTRO, MARTIN S FLAHERTY, NASSER HUSSAIN, STANLEY N KATZ, JENNY S MARTINEZ (td, ) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 426 MOTION to Dismiss , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear FOR MOVANTS ALAN B. MORRISON by WILLIAM R CASTRO, MARTIN S FLAHERTY, NASSER HUSSAIN, STANLEY N KATZ, JENNY S MARTINEZ (Morrison, Alan) Modified on 12/20/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE by STANLEY N KATZ, JENNY S MARTINEZ, WILLIAM R CASTRO, MARTIN S FLAHERTY, NASSER HUSSAIN (Attachments: # 1 ORDER, # 2 PROPOSED BRIEF)(Morrison, Alan) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting (433) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in case 1:01-cv-01357-RCL; and granting (68) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in case 1:07-cv-01022-RCL. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/16/2013. (tg, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 426 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary F. Bell, # 2 Exhibit 1-4)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 429 MOTION to Expedite 428 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order or in the alternative Motion for Extension of Time filed by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (Collingsworth, Terry) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 429 MOTION to Expedite 428 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order or in the alternative Motion for Extension of Time filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration AlexYoung K. Oh, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re 428 MOTION to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order, or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, 429 MOTION to Expedite 428 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order or in the alternative Motion for Extension of Time : Declaration of Terrence P. Collingsworth in Support by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Collingsworth, Terry) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite 428 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order or in the alternative Motion for Extension of Time by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Expedite Motion to Modify Scheduling Order)(Collingsworth, Terry) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order, or in the alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Modify the Court's September 18, 2013 Scheduling Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Collingsworth, Terry). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 12/4/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Levesque on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Levesque, Christian) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Of Alex Young K. Oh, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Declaration Of Frans Hendra Winarta, # 14 Exhibit 1, # 15 Exhibit 2, # 16 Exhibit 3, # 17 Exhibit 4, # 18 Exhibit 5, # 19 Exhibit 6, # 20 Exhibit 7, # 21 Exhibit 8, # 22 Exhibit 9, # 23 Exhibit 10, # 24 Exhibit 11, # 25 Exhibit 12, # 26 Exhibit 13, # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 15, # 29 Exhibit 16, # 30 Exhibit 17, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ilana D. Waxman on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Waxman, Ilana) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER in response to the parties' Meet and Confer Statement 423 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 18, 2013. (lcrcl5) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed by Defendants), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed by Plaintiffs))(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that counsel for parties shall meet and confer and shall file a report of this meeting and a proposed scheduling order within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on August 15, 2013. (lcrcl5) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 413 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE ; ORDERED that the judgement filed July 8, 2011, be vacated; FUTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that in light of Kiobel and Perisic, the dismissal of the Alien Tort Statute claims be remanded to the District Court for further consideration; FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED in accordance with this court's opinion issued July 8, 2011, that the judgement of the District Court be affirmed as to the dismissal of appellants' Torture Victim Protection Act clsaims and be reversed as to the dismissal of appellants' non-federal tort claims (Parts IV & VI of the opinion). USCA Case Number 09-7125. (md, ) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. Attorney Whitney Dougherty Russell terminated. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII. Attorney Maureen E. McOwen terminated. (McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. Attorney Nikhil Singhvi terminated. (Singhvi, Nikhil) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Transcript Receipt by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 415 Notice of Cross Appeal,. (rdj) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 415 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 412 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000002004760. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 413 Notice of Appeal,. (rdj) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 104 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 412 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001995756. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Konopka, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting defendants' Motion 389 to Dismiss and denying defendants' Motion 394 for Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/30/2009. (lrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit P, # 10 Exhibit Q, # 11 Exhibit R, # 12 Exhibit S, # 13 Exhibit T)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Statement Pursuant to #217 filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Statement Pursuant to #217 filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1-9, # 3 Exhibit 10-23, # 4 Exhibit 24-36, # 5 Exhibit 37-39)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Confidential Documents by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. McOwen on behalf of all plaintiffs (McOwen, Maureen) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Conlon on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Conlon, Patrick) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 389 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M, # 7 Exhibit N, # 8 Exhibit O, # 9 Exhibit P, # 10 Exhibit Q, # 11 Exhibit R, # 12 Exhibit S, # 13 Exhibit T, # 14 Certificate of Service for Redacted Public Copies, # 15 Certificate of Service for Under Seal Copies)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 389 MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Konopka on behalf of JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Konopka, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michelle Lo on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Oliver W. McDaniel (Lo, Michelle) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 395 Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/26/09. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (tg, ) (See Docket Entry Number 389 to view document) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 387 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/23/09. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 390 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/22/09. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. Attorney Brent W. Landau terminated. (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Whitney Dougherty Russell, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street NW, Fifth Floor, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-223-7300. Fax No. - 202-223-7420 by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Whitney Dougherty Russell, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, For Judgment on the Pleadings, or for Summary Judgment (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 Docket No. 3, # 2 Docket No. 13, # 3 Docket No. 38, # 4 Docket No. 62, # 5 Docket No. 85, # 6 Docket No. 86, # 7 Docket No. 91, # 8 Docket No. 93, # 9 Docket No. 103, # 10 Docket No. 108, # 11 Docket No. 109, # 12 Docket No. 118, # 13 Docket No. 120, # 14 Docket No. 131, # 15 Docket No. 136, # 16 Docket No. 137, # 17 Docket No. 138, # 18 Docket No. 158, # 19 Docket No. 159, # 20 Docket No. 244, # 21 Docket No. 244, Ex. H, # 22 Docket No. 268, # 23 Docket No. 269, # 24 Docket No. 311, # 25 Docket No. 340, # 26 Docket No. 365, # 27 Docket No. 367, # 28 Docket No. 377, # 29 Docket No. 377, Ex. 3, # 30 Docket No. 377, Ex. 4, # 31 Docket No. 377, Ex. 5, # 32 Docket No. 378, # 33 Exhibit A, # 34 Exhibit B, # 35 Exhibit C, # 36 Exhibit D, # 37 Exhibit E, # 38 Exhibit F, # 39 Exhibit G, # 40 Text of Proposed Order, # 41 Certificate of Service for Redacted Public Copies, # 42 Certificate of Service for Unredacted Copies)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Alex Young K. Oh (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph Marc Sellers on behalf of all plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Michael D. Hausfeld (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Tarek Farouk Maassarani on behalf of JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Maassarani, Tarek) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Agnieszka M. Fryszman (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Reassigned by Consent to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 369 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. See order for details. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on September 24, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 371 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Clarification of August 27, 2008 Memorandum and Opinion. See order for details. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on September 24, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Under Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL), # 2 Exhibit 1)(Singhvi, Nikhil) Modified on 9/15/2008 (tr). (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 367 Order, Statement of Plaintiffs Pursuant to the Court's August 28, 2008 Order filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 367 filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Appendix A)(Oh, Alex) Modified on 9/15/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) Modified on 9/15/2008 (tr, ).(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nikhil Singvhi)(Singhvi, Nikhil) Modified on 9/15/2008 (tr). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Oh, Alex) Modified on 9/12/2008 (tr, )(FILED UNDER SEAL). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of the Court's August 27, 2008 Memorandum & Opinion re 366 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) Modified on 9/10/2008 (tr).(UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 9/24/2008 (tr). (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Ogletree, Jr on behalf of all plaintiffs (Ogletree, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. All remaining parties shall, on or before Friday, September 12, 2008, confer and advise the court in writing how this matter should proceed, indicating any points of disagreement. See order for details. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 28, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 269 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is GRANTED for Defendant Mobil Corporation and Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Corporation; summary judgment is DENIED for Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation and Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Indonesia Inc. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 27, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 27, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Brent W. Landau (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER to Clerk to file documents under seal. Redacted versions of the documents have been filed on the public docket. See 348 336 324 345 338 337 333 . Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 22, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION accompanying Order filed August 5, 2008 361 re unsealing of July 18, 2008 Memorandum and Opinion 340 . Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 11, 2008. (AG) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 348 Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal July 18, 2008 340 Memorandum & Opinion; granting in part and denying in part 345 Defendants' Motion to Unseal July 18, 2008 Memorandum & Opinion. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on August 5, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness 319 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 8/4/08. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kk) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to 319 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION. (tr) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 355 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Landau, Brent) Modified on 7/30/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II 343 Reply to opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents,, filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE. (tr)(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Certificate of Counsel for Alex Oh, # 4 Certificate of Counsel for Robert Meyer)(Meyer, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II 343 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 324 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on July 28, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part 324 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. (Court construes motion as objections.) Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on July 28, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Motion Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION re 345 MOTION to Unseal Document 340 Memorandum & Opinion MOTION to Unseal Document 340 Memorandum & Opinion. (See Docket Entry 345 to view document). (nmw, ) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal Document 340 Memorandum & Opinion Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal the Court's July 18, 2008 Memorandum & Opinion by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) Modified on 8/22/2008 (tr, )(UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED ON 08/21/2008). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Motion to Unseal the Court's July 18, 2008 Memorandum & Opinion LODGED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 7/25/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Document 340 Memorandum & Opinion by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Unseal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Counsel Alex Young K. Oh, # 5 Certificate of Counsel Martin J. Weinstein)(Weinstein, Martin)(UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED ON 08/21/2008) Modified on 8/22/2008 (tr, ). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to File Documents Under Seal re 217 Protective Order,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Martin) (Unredacted version of the Motion to Unseal July 18, 2008 Memorandum & Opinion LODGED UNDER SEAL)Modified on 7/25/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 319 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Landau, Brent) (UNREDACTED version of the REPLY to Opposition to Motion to Compel FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 7/24/2008 (tg, ). Modified on 7/29/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 8/5/08.....MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 268 MOTION to Dismiss. (FILED UNDER SEAL). Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on 7/18/08. (cp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2008: # 1 Main Document) (cp, ). Modified on 8/6/2008 to add the image of the document.(cp, ). (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice 268 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on 7/18/08. (cp, ) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 268 MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Weinstein, Martin) (UNREDACTED version of Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 7/17/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 268 MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support -- Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to EMOI's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maureen McOwen, # 2 Exhibit A-T, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Landau, Brent) (UNREDACTED version of the Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to EMOI's Motion to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED ON 08/21/2008) modified on 7/17/2008 (tg, ). Modified on 8/22/2008 (tr, ). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 319 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Declaration of Nikhil Singhvi)(Weinstein, Martin) (UNREDACTED version of the Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 7/17/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 324 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. [REDACTED] filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Oh, Alex) (UNREDACTED version of the Reply FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED ON 08/21/2008) Modified on 7/17/2008 (tg, ). Modified on 8/22/2008 (tr, ). (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II 327 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE. (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II 327 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE II, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE I, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VII, JOHN DOE IV, JANE DOE. (Landau, Brent) Modified on 7/15/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William R. Scherer, :Firm- Conrad & Scherer, LLP, :Address- 633 South Federal Highway, 8th Fl. Phone No. - 954-462-5500. Fax No. - 954-463-9244 by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of William Scherer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice)(Collingsworth, Terry) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 324 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Landau, Brent) (UNREDACTED Memorandum in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 7/11/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting deadlines for (i) supplemental briefs, if any, re 268 ExxonMobil Oil Indonesia's Motion to Dismiss; and (ii) Plaintiffs' opposition, if any, to 324 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on July 10, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Kay's Order of June 20, 2008. by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A with Exhibit A, B and C, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Rule 11 Certification of Theodore V. Wells Esq.)(Oh, Alex) Modified on 8/22/2008 (tr, ).( UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCKET ENTRY#324 FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Documents For in Camera Review by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION For in Camera Review by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Redacted for Alleged Non-Responsiveness by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Landau, Brent) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of 156 Documents Wrongly Withheld by Defendants 256 ; directing Defendants to produce a copy of the non-privileged, non-protected documents to the Plaintiffs within 10 days from the date of this Memorandum Order; denying Defendants' Motion to Compel Return of Documents 263 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 6/20/08. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kk) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents 270 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 6/17/08. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kk) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 315 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Record. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on June 12, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Record and Notice to the Court Regarding Exhibits 123, 147 and 148 (Redacted version) by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Declaration Rule 11, # 5 Declaration Rule 11, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Unredacted version of the Motion FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 5/29/2008 (tg, ). Modified on 6/12/2008 (jeb, ). (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 292 Memorandum in Opposition,, Exhibit 410, Affidavit of Harris L. Devor by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 410)(Landau, Brent) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II re 292 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (Redacted version) to opposition to motion re 269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISSAL , 268 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (nmw, ) (Unredacted version of the Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissal FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 4/21/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts [REDACTED] filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibits)(Oh, Alex) (Unredacted version of the Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 4/21/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 268 MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support [REDACTED] filed by EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Oh, Alex) (Unredacted version of the Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 4/21/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Rule 11 Certifications)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA /Rule 11 Certifications omitted from Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 305 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 299 Motion for Hearing and continuing trial date (see attached). Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on April 1, 2008. (lclfo1, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Order filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Weinstein, Martin) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Pretrial Order by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Weinstein, Martin) Modified on 3/31/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition (Redacted Public Version) to 269 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISSAL BY DEFENDANTS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL CORPORATION, AND EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA, INC. filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (tg, ) (Unredacted Version FILED UNDER SEAL) (Attachments: Exhibits 1-150, 160, 161, and 153-411 FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified to correct text on 3/27/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Collingsworth (Collingsworth, Terry) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 293 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment, 295 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 160, # 2 Exhibit 161)(Landau, Brent) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re Motion to Amend by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II re 293 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment, 295 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Landau, Brent) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE CORRECTED Notice of Filing of Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II re 291 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....STATUS REPORT UNOPPOSED STATUS CONFERENCE REQUEST by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Concerning Pretrial Schedule)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) Modified on 3/25/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Agnieszka Fryszman)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 268 MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Defendant ExxonMobil Oil Indonesia, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II re 290 MOTION leave to file documents under seal unredacted versions of Pltfs' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Pltfs' Memo in Opposition to Def ExxonMobil Oil Indonesia, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Ju (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION leave to file documents under seal unredacted versions of Pltfs' Opposition to Defs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Pltfs' Memo in Opposition to Def ExxonMobil Oil Indonesia, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Pltfs' Response to Defs' Statement of "Undisputed Facts" and Exhibits thereto by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Record [REDACTED] by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Rule 11 Certifications, # 2 Exhibit [REDACTED], # 3 Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Supplement the Record by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 270 MOTION to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Unredacted version of the Reply to Opposition to Motion 270 to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 2/22/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 263 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Meyer, Robert) (Unredacted version of Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Cross-Motion to Compel Return of Documents FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 2/20/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To File Under Seal re 217 Protective Order,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Robert) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 22, 2008 Status Conference before Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer. Court Reporter: Catalina Kerr. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, ) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 270 MOTION to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents /Defendants' [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-G, # 3 Exhibit H-J, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (UNREDACTED version of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel, Docket Entry Number 280 FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 2/13/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 263 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of 156 Documents Wrongly Withheld by Defendants and in Opposition to Defendants' Cross Motion filed by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Reply Memo in Supp of Motion to Compel Production of 156 Docs Wrongly Withheld by Defs and in Opp to Defs' Cross Motion and related exhibits by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM In Support of Defendants' 263 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to 256 MOTION to Compel Production of 156 Documents Wrongly Withheld by Defendants filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION. (tg, ) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 264 Motion to File Documents Under Seal re 217 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on 1/31/08. (cp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 266 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer on 1/31/08. (cp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II re 270 MOTION to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents (Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Security Conference Documents by JANE DOE III, JANE DOE IV, JOHN DOE, JANE DOE(V (Village A)), JANE DOE(VI (Village C)), JOHN DOE IV, JOHN DOE V, JOHN DOE VI, JOHN DOE VII, JANE DOE I, JANE DOE II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fryszman, Agnieszka) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISSAL BY DEFENDANTS EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL CORPORATION, AND EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA, INC. by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING, # 2 PROPOSED ORDER)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss and [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts [Redacted], # 2 Exhibit 1-9, # 3 Exhibit 10-12, # 4 Exhibit 13-41, # 5 Exhibit 42, # 6 Exhibit 43-44, # 7 Exhibit 45-49, # 8 Exhibit 50-52, # 9 Exhibit 53, # 10 Exhibit 54, # 11 Exhibit 55-66, # 12 Exhibit 67-68, # 13 Exhibit 69-75, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Oh, Alex) (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Dismissal, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Statement of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 1/30/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed Order])(Oh, Alex) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal January 28, 2008 Declaration of Singhvi, Exhibit A, Exhibit B, Exhibit C be Maintained Under Seal re 217 Protective Order,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Nikhil Singhvi In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Singhvi, Nikhil) Modified title of event on 1/30/2008 (nmw, ). (Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories FILED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 2/1/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION To File Documents Under Seal re 217 Protective Order,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Counsel)(Singhvi, Nikhil) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Return of Documents by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Compel Return of Documents, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Counsel - Martin J. Weinstein, # 4 Certificate of Counsel - Alex Young K. Oh, # 5 Memorandum of Law, # 6 Certificate of Service, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D)(Weinstein, Martin) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION File Documents Under Seal re 217 Protective Order,, by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Counsel)(Singhvi, Nikhil) (Unredacted version of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Return of Documents LODGED UNDER SEAL) Modified on 1/29/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of Potential Mediators (Attachments: # 1 Deanne Siemer, # 2 Steven Umin, # 3 Daniel Margolis, # 4 Jerry Roscoe, # 5 Harold Himmelman, # 6 Linda Singer, # 7 Michael Lewis, # 8 Nancy Lesser)(tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer. Modified to correct text on 1/24/2008 (tg, ). (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Resolution Expert, Honorable Daniel Weinstein (Ret.) (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer. (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The New York Times Article re Unocal settlement in Myanmar Suit. (tg, ) "Let this be filed" by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer. (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Danny Bickell, Staff Attorney of the Supreme Court of the United States Office of the Clerk, Washington, DC. "Let this be filed" by Judge Louis F. Oberdorfer (dot, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Srikanth Srinivasan, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 1625 Eye Street, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20006-4001. Phone No. - 202-383-5300. Fax No. - 202-383-5414 by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL OIL INDONESIA INC., MOBIL CORPORATION, MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Srikanth Srinivasan, # 2 Certificate of Counsel Singhvi, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Singhvi, Nikhil) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,315 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?