SIERRA CLUB v. JACKSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-01537
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 3:19 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sierra Club, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Pew +1 202 667 4500 +1 202 667 2356 jpew@earthjustice.org
v.
No Logo CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/25/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
No Logo LISA P. JACKSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eileen T. McDonough

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Eileen T. McDonough

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/25/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eileen T. McDonough
No Logo Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers, Inc., Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "ALLIANCE OF AUTOMOBILE MANUFACTURERS"
Alliance Of Automobile Manufacturers: Connected - Alliance Of Automobile Manufacturers 1401 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 900 Washington, DC 20005,

Toggle Switch Represented by Van Ness Feldman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Penna +1 202 298 1800 +3382 338 338 2416
No Logo American Chemistry Council, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele Ball Morhenn +1 202 454 7407 +1 202 663 8007 michele.morhenn@shawpittman.com
No Logo ASSOCIATION OF METROPOLITAN SEWERAGE AGENCIES, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION PF CLEAN WATER AGENCIES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra Dapolito Dunn +1 202 833 2672 +1 202 833 4657 adunn@nacwa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Knight +1 202 663 9152 +1 202 663 8007 jeffrey.knight@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo COALITION FOR CLEAN AIR IMPLEMENTATION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William F. Pedersen , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. Pedersen, Jr. +1 202 296 8884 +1 202 887 8044 bill.pedersen@billpedersen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Mining Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold Patrick Quinn, Jr. +1 202 463 2652 +1 202 463 2609 hquinn@nma.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Knight +1 202 663 9152 +1 202 663 8007 jeffrey.knight@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele Ball Morhenn +1 202 454 7407 +1 202 663 8007 michele.morhenn@shawpittman.com
No Logo HALOGENATED SOLVENTS INDUSTRY ALLIANCE INC, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Caffey Norman +1 202 457 5270 +1 202 457 6315 cnorman@pattonboggs.com
No Logo National Paint and Coatings Association, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Government Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Ann Keane +1 202 462 6272 +1 202 462 8549 akeane@paint.org
No Logo State of Nevada, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J Frey +1 775 684 1229 +1 775 684 1103 bfrey@ag.nv.gov
No Logo THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FOURTH BERTHOLD RESERVATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hans Walker, Jr. +1 202 822 8282 +1 202 296 8836
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7604
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 176 EPA's motion to close these consolidated cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 19, 2016. (MA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Surreply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 158 Sierra Club's motion to enforce. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 25, 2014.(MA)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: 1/9/2012 Order on Motion to Enforce
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011 Memorandum
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 154 MOTION to Enforce Order of January 20, 2011 filed by LISA P. JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments to Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Enforce Order of January 20, 2011 by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Pew, James) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 153 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE Regarding Costs of Litigation by SIERRA CLUB (Pew, James) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs and Attorneys' Fees by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pew, James) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs and Attorneys' Fees by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pew, James) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      OPINION granting in part and denying in part defendant EPA's motion to amend the Court's March 31, 2006. An order consistent with this opinion shall issue this same day. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 20, 2011. (MA) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 defendant's Motion to Amend the Court's March 31, 2006 orer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 20, 2011. (MA) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                          SURREPLY in opposition to EPA's re 136 MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, filed by SIERRA CLUB. (td, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER that the January 16, 2011 deadlines in paragraphs 1(i) and 3 of the court's March 31, 2006 order is extended to January 21, 2011 or until further court order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 12, 2011. (MA) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to EPA's Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006 by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Surreply in Opposition)(Pew, James) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to re 141 response by intervenor to EPA's motion to amend order of March 31, 2006 filed by SIERRA CLUB. (td, ) Modified filed date on 1/5/2011 (td, ). (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 136 MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, filed by LISA P. JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response by Intervenor by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Reply to Response)(Pew, James) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 140 Memorandum in Opposition, Certificate of Service by SIERRA CLUB. (Pew, James) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE to 136 EPA Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006 filed by COALITION FOR CLEAN AIR IMPLEMENTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Hunt Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Griffin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Feldman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Dempsey Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Gardner-Andrews Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Sweeney Declaration)(Knight, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/28/2010 to correct docket text (jf, ). (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 136 MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Pew, James) (Entered: 12/24/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Subsequent Event by LISA P. JACKSON (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Memorandum)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of EPA's Motion to Amend Order of March 2006 by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order (Alternative))(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 134 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/19/2010. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: Upon consideration of the 132 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006, as amended on September 9, 2009, it is ordered that the motion is granted. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 4/13/2010. (zmm, ) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, to Extend Deadline of April 15, 2010 by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 2006 by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Stipulation Modifying Consent Decree Deadline by LISA P. JACKSON (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION re 45 Miscellaneous Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Modifying Consent Decree entered on May 22, 2003 by LISA P. JACKSON. (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 127 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006 As Amended on June 30, 2009. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/9/2009. (mm) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Order of March 31, 2006 (as amended) by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 125 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/29/2009. (mm) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Amend Order by LISA P. JACKSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 112 the State of Nevada's motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 24, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY TO OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION TO INTERVENE 112 filed by STATE OF NEVADA. (Frey, William) Modified on 3/17/2009 adding linkage (td, ). (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Oppositions to its' Motion to Intervene by STATE OF NEVADA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Frey, William) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 112 MOTION to Intervene by State of Nevada filed by LISA P. JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 112 MOTION to Intervene filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Pew, James) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF OFFICIAL DEFENDANT by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 112 MOTION to Intervene For Both Plaintiff and Defendant by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 114 EPA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Intervene by State of Nevada. The EPA shall file its response on 2/19/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/23/2009. (mm) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 112 MOTION to Intervene by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the State of Nevada's Motion to Intervene by SIERRA CLUB (Pew, James) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene by STATE OF NEVADA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Elges, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Appeal); # 4 Exhibit 1-7) (jeb, ). Modified on 1/14/2009 to add Exhibits 1-7 which were inadvertently not included when filed by court staff (jeb). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 108 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. Paragraph 1(e) of the Order is amended to require EPA to promulgate standards pursuant to section 112(c)(3) and (k)(3)(B) of the Clean Air Act ("CCA"), 42 U.S.C. Section 7412(c)(3), (k)(3)(B), as follows: (e) EPA shall promulgate standards for one additional area source category by December 15, 2008, and for nine additional area source categories by May 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/12/2008. (mm) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 106 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. Paragraph 3 of the Order shall be amended as follows: 3. No later than August 15, 2009, EPA shall promulgate emission standards assuring that source categories accounting for not less than ninety percent of the aggregate emissions of each of the hazardous air pollutants enumerated in Section 112(c)(6) are subject to emission standards under Section 112(d)(2) or (d)(4). This deadline shall be extended until July 15, 2010, if (a) no later than July 15, 2009, the Agency signs notices of proposed rulemaking proposing emission standards for industrial, commercial and institutional boilers and process heaters and for CISWI units, and (b) no later than August 15, 2009, the Agency signs a notice of proposed rulemaking proposing emission standards for gold mining production processes. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/12/2008. (mm) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 107 Unopposed Motion to Expedite EPA's Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. The Court will rule expeditiously on EPA's motion. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/12/2008. (mm) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, (Amend Para. 1(e)) by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Amend 2006 Order (Para. 1(e)) by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 104 Unopposed Motion to Amend Order of March 31, 2006. Paragraph 3 of the Order is amended to require EPA to complete its obligations under CAA section 112(c)(6), 42 U.S.C. section 7412(c)(6) by November 20, 2008.Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/19/2008. (mm) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Alter Judgment as to 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Stipulation Modifying Consent Decree by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Modifying Consent Decree)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Alter Judgment Order of March 31, 2006 by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to AMend Judgment by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION to Alter Judgment To Partly Extend Deadline of September 30, 2007 by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs and Attorneys Fees by SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pew, James) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to In Which to Request Costs and Attorney's Fees by SIERRA CLUB (Pew, James) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to In Which To Request Costs and Attorney's Fees by SIERRA CLUB (Pew, James) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs & Attorneys' Fees by SIERRA CLUB. (Pew, James) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 85 Defendant's Motion to Modify Consent Decree. Paragraph 2(f)(ii) of the Consent Decree, which provides: (ii) For Gasoline Distribution Facilities (Stage I), the Administrator shall propose a rule on or before October 31, 2006, and promulgate a final rule by December 20, 2007, is hereby deleted from the Decree. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/17/2006. (mm) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 45 Miscellaneous Document Consent Decree filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (McDonough, Eileen). (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 82 Notice of Appeal filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON,; It is hereby ordered that the motion to dismiss appeal be granted and this case is hereby dismissed; USCA#06-5224 (jsc ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to EPA Motion To Modify The Consent Decree filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2# 3 Exhibit Ex. 3# 4 Certificate of Service)(Pew, James) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs And Attorneys Fees by SIERRA CLUB. (Pew, James) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Expedite Consideration of EPA's Motion to Modify Conssent Decree and Establish Briefing Schedule by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct 45 Miscellaneous Document,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Consent Decree by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Affidavit # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION denying defendant's motion for summary judgment and granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 2, 2006. (MA) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs & Attorneys' Fees by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pew, James) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 80 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. No Filing Fee. (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Request Costs and Attorneys' Fees by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part 63 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, denying 67 defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment, denying 70 plaintiff's motion to strike the declaration of Steve Page. Signed by Judge Paul L. on March 31, 2006. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(MA) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Additional Authority by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Notice of Additional Authority# 3 Exhibit One# 4 Exhibit Two)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Subsequent Final Rule by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON re 75 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Pt. 1# 2 Attachment; Pt. 2# 3 Attachment; Pt. 3# 4 Attachment; Pt. 4)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Revision of CAA Section 183(e) List by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON re 75 Reply to opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Federal Register Notice)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 11/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Association Name Change by ASSOCIATION OF METROPOLITAN SEWERAGE AGENCIES Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Dunn, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 63 Summary Judgment filed by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 70 strike filed by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 67 summary judgment on remedy filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re 70 to strike declaration filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 67 filed by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One# 2 Exhibit Two# 3 Exhibit Three# 4 Statement of Facts # 5 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 67 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Remedy Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Steve Page by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 07/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time the Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute in Support of Cross-motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EPA's Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute# 2 Exhibit EPA's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute# 3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 63 reference to memorandum and exhibits filed in support of EPA's cross-motion for summary judgment (Docket 67) filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Remedy by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Crossmotion on Remedy and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit Revised Partial Consent Decree# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Steve Page# 4 Exhibit Conference Report# 5 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .ENTERED TWICE. . . .Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Remedy by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Crossmotion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Exhibit Revised Partial Consent Decree# 3 Exhibit Declaration of Steve Page# 4 Exhibit Conference Report# 5 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) Modified on 6/14/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF COUNSEL'S FIRM NAME CHANGE by COALITION FOR CLEAN AIR IMPLEMENTATION, AMERICAN CHEMISTRY COUNCIL Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Knight, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits# 2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION for Summary Judgment Proposed Order by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) Modified on 5/12/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION for Summary Judgment Exhibits and Declarations by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) Modified on 5/12/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION for Summary Judgment by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) Modified on 5/12/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(McDonough, Eileen) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to meet June 14, 2005 Consent Decree Deadline by Three Months and for Expedited Consideration by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Berlow)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Jordan, Scott) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Oral Argument by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(nmw, ) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing a Certificate of Service for the Joint Status Report and Motion for Briefing Schedule & Oral Argument by SIERRA CLUB re 53 Status Report, Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) Modified on 3/22/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Motion for Briefing Schedule & Oral Argument by SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule & Oral Argument)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER . Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan for Judge Paul L. Friedman on 3/3/04. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(hs,) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT and Motion for Further Case Management Order by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT AND JOINT MOTION FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (CORRECTED VERSION) by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Jordan, Scott) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .NEW DOCUMENT NO. IS 50. . . .STATUS REPORT AND JOINT MOTION FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Jordan, Scott) Modified on 1/31/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Order Entering Case Management Order by MICHAEL O. LEAVITT. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF-JMF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Jordan, Scott) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2408 by SIERRA CLUB. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-01537-PLF-JMF,1:01-cv-01548-PLF,1:01-cv-01558-PLF,1:01-cv-01569-PLF,1:01-cv-01578-PLF, 1:01-cv-01582-PLF,1:01-cv-01597-PLF(Pew, James) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537, federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537 to enter revised partial consent decree. (td) (Entered: 05/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REVISED PARTIAL CONSENT DECREE by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537, plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01548, plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01558, plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01569, plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01578, plaintiff SIERRA and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01582, plaintiff SIERRA CLUB and federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01597 (bm) Modified on 6/9/2004 (rje, ). (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537 of lodging of proposed partial consent decree pending solicitation of public comment by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (bm) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting joint motion for further stay [42-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA in 1:01-cv-01537; granting joint motion and referral to Magistrate to conduct mediation [42-2] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537; referring settlement discussions to Magistrate Judge Facciola ; at the conclusions of those settlement discussions, the parties shall provide the Court with a report on the status of the case, and if the cse is not settled, a proposed case management order to govern further proceedings. (N) (bm) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/9/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537, federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537 for further stay , and and referral to Magistrate to conduct mediation (cdw) (Entered: 12/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537, federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537 for further stay to complete consent decree and prepare proposed case management schedule. (td) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman: granting joint motion for further stay; staying consolidated cases until 12/6/02 (N) (bm) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting joint motion for further stay of consolidated cases until 10/30/02 [38-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537 (N) (bm) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01537, federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-01537 for further stay to complete consent decree and prepare proposed case management schedule. (td) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by intervenor-defendant NATL PAINT/COATINGS (td) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by intervenor-defendant NATL PAINT/COATINGS . (td) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by intervenor-defendant HALOGENATED SOLVENTS (td) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by intervenor-defendant HALOGENATED SOLVENTS . (td) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman: granting joint motion staying case until 9/30/02 (N) (bm) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting motion to consolidate cases 01-1537 [23-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01578, granting motion to consolidate cases with 01-1537 [21-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01578, granting joint motion to consolidate case with 01cv1537 [11-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01582, granting joint motion to consolidate cases [12-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01582, granting joint motion to consolidate case with 01cv1537 [17-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01597, granting joint motion to stay proceedings in this case pending the courts decision [17-2] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN, SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-01597; consolidating CA 01-1548, 01-1558, 01-1569, 01-1578, 01-1582, and 01-1597 with 01-1537; staying the consolidated for sixty days, until 7/29/02. (N) (bm) Modified on 06/24/2002 (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB, federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN to consolidate cases , and to stay to prepare consent decree and case management schedule. (td) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman: granting motion to consolidate and motion for stay; staying this case pending the Court's decision on the consolidation motion (N) (bm) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by movant HALOGENATED SOLVENTS to intervene as a defendant ; EXHIBIT (Rule 109) (td) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : denyiny without prejudice motion for HALOGENATED SOLVENTS to intervene as a defendant pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2) of the FRCP [27-1]; if movant complies with the applicable FRCP, it may refile its motion for intervention under Rule 24(a)(2) and (b)(2) of the FRCP (N) (bm) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION filed for HALOGENATED SOLVENTS to intervene as a defendant ; EXHIBITS (answer and 109 certificate) (td) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for movant COALITION CLEAN AIR by Jeffrey A. Knight, Harold Patrick Quinn Jr., William F. Pedersen Jr. (jf) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge William B. Bryant : granting motion to extend time to 5/31/02 to answer complaint [1-1] to provide time for settlement discussions [24-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN; Answer extended to 5/31/02 for CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN (N) (bm) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN to extend time to May 31, 2002 to answer complaint [1-1] to provide time for settlement discussions (jf) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/20/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman: directing the Clerk's Office not accept for filing Hal Quinn's entry of appearance; the Court will consider an appropriate motion in conformance with the Rules of this Court if and when one is filed. (N) (bm) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting motion by defendant extending time to 3/29/02 to answer complaint [1-1]; Answer extended to for CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN . (N) (bm) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by intervenor-defendant ASSOC OF METRO SEWER (td) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by intervenor-defendant ASSOC OF METRO SEWER . (td) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by intervenor-defendant ALLIANCE AUTO MAN (td) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by intervenor-defendant ALLIANCE AUTO MAN . (td) (Entered: 01/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting motion for ASSOCIATION OF METROPOLITAN SEWERAGE AGENCIES to intervene [6-1] pursuant to Rule 24(b)(2) of the FRCP (N) (bm) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting in part, denying in part motion for ALLIANCE OF AUTOMOBILE MANUFACTURES to intervene [8-1]; denying pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2) of the FRCP and granting pursuant to Rule 24(b)(2) of the FRCP (N) (bm) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting motion to extend time to 01/31/02 to answer complaint [1-1] [7-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN; Answer extended to 1/31/02 for CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN (N) (bm) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by movant COALITION CLEAN AIR, movant AMERICAN CHEMISTRY for Coalition Clean for Clean Air Implementation and American Chemistry Council to intervene ; EXHIBITS (Answer and Rule 26.1 certificate) (td) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting in part, denying in part motion to intervene as party defendant [10-1], NATIONAL PAINT AND COATINGS ASSN; denying pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2) of FRCP and granting pursuant to Rule 24(b)(2) of FRCP; granting in part, denying in part motion for COALITION CLEAN AIR, AMERICAN CHEMISTRY to intervene as defendants [9-1] denying pursuant to Rule 24(a)(2) of FRCP and granting pursuant to Rule 24(b)(2) of FRCP (N) (bm) (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by intervenor-defendant ASSOC OF METRO SEWER (nmr) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [1-1] by intervenor-defendant ASSOC OF METRO SEWER. (nmr) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by movant NATL PAINT/COATINGS to intervene as party defendant ; EXHIBIT (ANSWER and RULE 26.1) (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION filed for COALITION CLEAN AIR, AMERICAN CHEMISTRY to intervene as defendants ; Attachment (1); EXHIBITS (ANSWER & RULE 26.1) (nmr) (Entered: 12/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION filed for ALLIANCE AUTO MAN to intervene ; declarations (1); EXHIBIT (ANSWER, R109certificate) (cdw) (Entered: 11/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN to extend time to 01/31/02 to answer complaint [1-1] (dam) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed for ASSOC OF METRO SEWER to intervene ; EXHIBIT (ANSWER, RULE 26.1 STATEMENT) (cdw) (Entered: 10/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul L. Friedman : granting motion to extend time to 11/16/01 to answer complaint [1-1] [4-1] by CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN ; Answer extended to 11/16/01 for CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN (N) (dam) (Entered: 09/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION (CONSENT) filed by federal defendant CHRISTINE T. WHITMAN to extend time to 11/16/01 to answer complaint [1-1] (cdw) (Entered: 09/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB (bm) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTIFICATION OF RELATED CASE: Case related to Case No(s): CA 93-125; CA 95-627 and CA 98-1610 (bm) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff SIERRA CLUB; attachment (1) (bm) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?