AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES v. LEW et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00642

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Federation of Government Employees, Plaintiff
American Federation Of Government Employees: Umbrella Organization - American Federation Of Government Employees 80 F Street, NW Washington, DC 20001,
National Women's Political Caucus - Ca: Affiliated - National Women's Political Caucus - Ca 3053 Cafeto Drive Walnut Creek, CA 94598,

Toggle Switch Represented by American Federation of Government Employees

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Myles Grajales +1 202 639 6426 +1 202 639 6441 grajaa@afge.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leisha A. Self +1 202 639 6424
v.
No Logo Jacob J Lew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES. (Grajales, Andres) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JACOB J. LEW served on 4/5/2011 (Grajales, Andres) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/5/2011, answer due 6/4/2011. (Grajales, Andres) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2011. (Grajales, Andres) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 5, 2011. (Grajales, Andres) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE JOINT STATEMENT by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES, JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint by JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Owen Littleton on behalf of JACOB J. LEW, U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Littleton, Judson) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/1/11. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Complaint
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 12 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?