BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY et al v. U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00703
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

BB&T Corporation BB&T Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinney & Lange, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Glaser +1 703 525 4000 +1 703 527 2207 cglaser@beankinney.com
No Logo Gregory N. Britto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinney & Lange, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Glaser +1 703 525 4000 +1 703 527 2207 cglaser@beankinney.com
No Logo John S. Burson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kinney & Lange, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Glaser +1 703 525 4000 +1 703 527 2207 cglaser@beankinney.com
v.
No Logo DARRYL STACEY MILAM, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yonatan Gelblum +1 202 305 3136 +1 202 514 6866 yonatan.gelblum@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Yonatan Gelblum on behalf of U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
        ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 6/10/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/09/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DARRYL STACEY MILAM (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
              MILITARY AFFIDAVIT re 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY. (Glaser, Christopher) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION for Entry of Default by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, GREGORY N. BRITTO, JOHN S. BURSON (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glaser, Christopher) Modified on 5/25/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DARRYL STACEY MILAM served on 4/21/2011, answer due 5/12/2011 (Glaser, Christopher) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 4/13/2011 (Glaser, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/12/2011. (Glaser, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 13, 2011. (Glaser, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BB&T CORP. for BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against DARRYL STACEY MILAM, U.S. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616037877) filed by GREGORY N. BRITTO, BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY, JOHN S. BURSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 145 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?