RASUL v. BUSH
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00299
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 12:00 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Asif Iqbal, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com
No Logo DAVID HICKS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Mori +5412 541 541 2850
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/10/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A. Goldman +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 mgoldman@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew William Vail +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 840 8788 avail@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hillary A. Victor +1 312 840 8673 +1 312 840 8773
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Walters +1 312 923 4516 +1 312 840 7516

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joshua L. Dratel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Lewis Dratel +1 212 732 0707 +1 212 571 6341 jdratel@joshuadratel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Leon Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Friedman +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 861 9015 flashlf@aol.com
No Logo MOHAMMED IQBAL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com
No Logo SHAFIQ RASUL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com
No Logo SKINA BIBI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com
No Logo TERRY HICKS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon W. Norris +1 202 371 0300 jonnorrislaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com
No Logo BRICE A. GYURISKO, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo GORDON R. ENGLAND, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAY HOOD, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Okun +1 202 514 7280

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Okun +1 202 514 7280

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MICHAEL LEHNERT, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Okun +1 202 514 7280

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo TERRY CARRICO, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D. Okun +1 202 514 7280

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo BRUCE ACKERMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo CENTER FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS OF NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo DAVID C. VLADECK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo DAVID D. COLE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo DAVID SCHEFFER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo DAVID SLOSS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo DEREK JINKS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo FRITS KALSHOVEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo GUY S. GOODWIN-GILL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo JUDITH RESNIK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo KEVIN R. JOHNSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo LOUISE DOSWALD-BECK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo MARCO SASSOLI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo OONA HATHAWAY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo RYAN GOODMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo SARAH H. CLEVELAND, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo VAUGHAN LOWE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Richard Berz +1 202 682 7000 +1 202 857 0940 gregory.bailey@weil.com
No Logo WILLIAM S. DODGE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charney Vladeck +1 202 662 9535
No Logo CHARLES B. GITTINGS, JR., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark C. Perry, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Gittings, Jr. +1 707 888 3561 cbgittings@yahoo.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (237) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to (100 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (84 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (123 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (103 in 1:04-cv-01137-RMC) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (165 in 1:02-cv-00299-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE A. GYURISKO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., (78 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, (136 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (108 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (105 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, (106 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by DONALD RUNSFELD, RICK BACCUS, WILLIAM L. CLINE granting motion for leave to file; discharging order to dismiss case as moot in 05-5118,05-5119,05-5122; dismissing cases 05-5118, 05-5119, and 05-5122 as moot in light of the district court's orders dismissing the habeas cases underlying these appeals; the district court's order filed January 31, 2005, granting petitioners' motion for access to unredacted factual returns in Civil Action Nos. 02-2199, 02-1130, and 04-1137, be vacated; the consolidation of Nos. 05-5118, 05-5119, and 05-5122, with Nos. 05-5117, et al. be terminated.(jeb, ) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of SHAFIQ RASUL, SKINA BIBI, ASIF IQBAL, MOHAMMED IQBAL, DAVID HICKS, TERRY HICKS Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
          ORDER of USCA filed 7/26/07 recalling mandate as to (183 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 101 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 124 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK, 180 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW, 215 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 120 in 1:04-cv-01137-RMC, 200 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR, 117 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH, 173 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 227 in 1:02-cv-00299-CKK) USCA Mandate (324 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK) (jeb, ) Modified on 6/25/2008 (jeb, ). (jeb, ). (Entered: 06/25/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
            ENTERED IN ERROR.....MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) vacating the judgments of the District Court and dismissing cases for lack of jurisdiction as to 165 Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE A. GYURISKO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., USCA Case Number, USCA Case Number, 168 Notice of Appeal filed by BRICE A. GYURISKO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., TERRY CARRICO. USCA #'s 05-5118; 05-5097; and 05-5098. (cp, ) Modified on 2/22/2008 (cp, ). (Entered: 02/22/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
              N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER. On August 30, 2007, in response to the Court's Minute Order of August 23, 2007, Petitioners Rasul and Iqbal filed a Notice with the Court indicating that they are no longer being detained at Guantanamo Bay and that, as a result, they do not object to dismissal of this action. Accordingly, the instant case is DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 30, 2007. (lcckk2) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by SHAFIQ RASUL re Order,,, (Margulies, Joseph) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER. On July 5, 2007, Petitioner David M. Hicks filed a 226 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss His Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). According to that Motion, on March 26, 2007, Military Commission proceedings began against Petitioner Hicks and, pursuant to a pre-trial agreement, Petitioner Hicks pled guilty to the charge of providing material support to terrorism under the Military Commissions Act, and agreed to withdraw his petition for a writ of habeas corpus in this Court. Petitioner Hicks has since been sentenced and has returned to Australia, where he will serve the remainder of his sentence. Accordingly, 226 Petitioner Hicks' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss His Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED as to Petitioner Hicks. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 23, 2007. (lcckk2) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (137 in 1:04-cv-01144-RWR) Notice of Appeal filed by KATHLEEN MUBANGA, MARTIN MUBANGA, JAHIDA SAYYADI, SABAH SUNNRQROUT, JAMIL EL-BANNA, BISHER AL-RAWI, (106 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB) Notice of Appeal filed by FATMAH ELSAMNAH, OMAR KHADR, (109 in 1:02-cv-01130-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by MAMDOUH HABIB, MAHA HABIB, (151 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (125 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR., JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (97 in 1:04-cv-01135-ESH) Notice of Appeal filed by NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, (108 in 1:04-cv-01227-RBW) Notice of Appeal, filed by SALAH ABDUL RASOOL AL BLOUSHI, ABDULLAH KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, MOHAMAD ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ISA ALI ABDULLA ALMURBATI, ABDUL RASOOL ALI AL BLOUSHI, ADEL KAMEL ABDULLA HAJEE, USCA Case Number, (169 in 1:02-cv-00299-CKK) Notice of Appeal filed by TERRY HICKS, MOHAMMED IQBAL, ASIF IQBAL, SKINA BIBI, SHAFIQ RASUL, DAVID HICKS, (107 in 1:04-cv-01137-RMC) Notice of Appeal filed by SALLY BEGG, FEROZ ALI ABBASI, MOAZZAM BEGG, ZUMRATI ZAITUN JUMA, (82 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW) Notice of Appeal filed by FALEN GHEREBI Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb, ) (MANDATE RECALLED PURSUANT TO USCA ORDER dated 7/26/07) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                          NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# 2 Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# 3 Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# 4 Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# 5 Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# 6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# 7 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ). (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 23, 2007. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, 218 Petitioner's Motion to Enjoin Military Commission Proceedings shall be DENIED; and 217 Petitioner's Motion to Expedite shall be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 23, 2007. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 218 MOTION To Enjoin Military Commission Proceedings (Previously Filed With CSO And Cleared For Public Filing) filed by DAVID HICKS. (Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to Petitioner David M. Hicks's Motion to Expedite filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 218 MOTION To Enjoin Military Commission Proceedings (Previously Filed With CSO And Cleared For Public Filing) filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION To Enjoin Military Commission Proceedings (Previously Filed With CSO And Cleared For Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Expedite (Previously Filed With CSO And Cleared For Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                            ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .MOTION to Stay Military Commission Proceedings (Previously Filed With CSO And Cleared For Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 3/12/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Filing Petitioner David M. Hicks's Motion To Enjoin Military Commission Proceedings (Pleading Filed March 9, 2007 Under Seal With The Court Security Officer) by DAVID HICKS (Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents. (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Preeya M. Noronha terminated. (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Military Commision Act of 2006) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting MOTION of respondents for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 9/20/06. (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE to Order of Court 206 directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel filed by Respondents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Chart regarding seized materials and privileged communications) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM correcting July 7, 2006 MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and response to supplemental memoranda of certain petitioners filed by Respondents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C-Supplemental Declaration of Kisthardt)Associated Cases: (jeb, ) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING 201 the Government's MOTION to Expedite, for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials, and for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials to Judge Robertson for disposition. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 8, 2006. (lcckk2) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH. Attorney Lisa Ann Olson terminated. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER directing counsel for petitioners to file a notice by 8/15/06 identifying any petitioner as to whom counsel lacks a good-faith belief that any attorney-client communications occurred prior to 6/18/06; directing respondents to file a notice by 8/15/06 that identifies any petitioner who respondents believe in good faith had not communicated with any counsel (either through written correspondence or in-person conversation) prior to 6/18/06. (See order for full details) Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/4/06. (jeb) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 201 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 201 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials filed by DAVID HICKS. (Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Petitioner David M. Hick's Response To Respondents' Motion for Procedures Related To Review of Certain Detainee Materials (pleading filed under seal on July 21, 2006 with the Court Security Officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS re 201 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials (Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE regarding steps taken in the wake of the Supreme Court's recent decision in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld by Respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (jeb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for procedures related to review of certain detainee materials and Motion for expedited briefing by Respondents, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Harry B. Harris# 2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Carol Kishardt# 3 Text of Proposed Order for Briefing# 4 Text of Proposed Order regarding review of detainee materials)Associated Cases: (jeb) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by respondents GEORGE WALKER BUSH, and DONALD RUMSFELD, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jeb, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 14, 2005. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 194 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 14, 2005. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 194 IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PETITIONER, DAVID M. HICKS'S MOTION TO STAY MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS filed by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 194 Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to "Stay" Military Commission Proceedings filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      ERRATA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Stay MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER referring all motions pertaining to interpretation or construction of any protective order which has been entered in any of these cases to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay; referring to Magistrate Judge Kay all disputes pertaining to logistical issues, such as communications with or visits to clients and counsel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler, Chair of Calendar and Case Management Committee, on 11/2/05. (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE to Petitioner's "Notice of Additional Supplemental Authority" (dkt. no. 191) filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Shavers Declaration)# 2 Exhibit B (Boomer Declaration))Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS REGARDING THE APPOINTING AUTHORITY'S BIAS (Previously Filed with CSO and Cleared for Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS REGARDING THE APPOINTING AUTHORITY'S BIAS (Motion filed October 7, 2005 under seal with the Court Security Officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Petitioner's "Notice of Supplemental Authority" filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Docketing of First Session)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS REGARDING RESPONDENTS LIFTING OF THE STAY IN MILITARY COMMISSION PROCEEDINGS (Previously Filed with CSO and Cleared for Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS REGARDING RESPONDENTS AMENDMENTS TO MILITARY COMMISSION ORDER No. 1 (Previously Filed with CSO and Cleared for Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Supplemental Authority of Petitioner David M. Hicks Regarding Respondents Lifting of the Stay in Military Commission Proceedings (Pleading filed September 20, 2005 Under Seal with the Court Security Officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Supplemental Authority (Previously Filed with CSO and Cleared for Public Filing) by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 9/20/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Letter of Supplemental Authority (letter filed on September 19, 2005 with court security officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/19/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 174 RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Previously Filed with CSO and Cleared for Public Filing) filed by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 9/8/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to REVISED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Redacted Version for Public Filing Cleared by CSO) filed by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13 - Redacted# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Statement of Facts)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Petitioner's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Petitioner's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Revised Brief in Support of Petitioner's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (brief filed on August 31, 2005 with court security officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF REVISED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (brief filed on August 17, 2005 with court security officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REVISED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Brief filed August 17, 2005 Under Seal with the Court Security Officer (Christine Gunning)) filed by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 8/19/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE Statement of Facts in Support of Respondents' Renewed Response and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Petitioner's Challenges to the Military Commission (this document supports docket numbers 174 and 175) filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE Respondents' Renewed Response and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Petitioner's Challenges to the Military Commission Process (same as docket number 174) filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Respondents' Renewed Response and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Petitioner's Challenges to the Military Commission Process by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Summary Judgment REVISED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER DAVID M. HICKS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Brief filed August 17, 2005 under seal with the Court Security Officer (Christine Gunning)) by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 8/18/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to the Court's Order of July 25, 2005 filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Lift Stay by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER staying 88 Motion to Dismiss, staying 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, noting that 151 Motion for Discovery was stayed by Judge Green's February 3, 2005 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 21, 2005. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 157 Order, by SHAFIQ RASUL, SKINA BIBI, ASIF IQBAL, MOHAMMED IQBAL, DAVID HICKS, TERRY HICKS. Filing fee $ 0.00. (lc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 157 Order, by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. Filing fee $ 0.00. (lc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 165 Notice of Appeal filed by GORDON R. ENGLAND,, DONALD RUMSFELD,, GEORGE WALKER BUSH,, JAY HOOD,, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., BRICE A. GYURISKO; Ordered that the petition and cross-petition for interlocutory appeal be granted; and that the motion to expedite be granted, setting briefing schedule; and that the District Court is directed to file two copies of the Order as separate notices of appeal. (lc, ) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing: Amended Unclassified Version of Memorandum Opinion Denying In Part And Granting In Part Respondents' Motion To Dismiss by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages 1-17# 2 Exhibit Pages 18-38# 3 Exhibit Pages 39-56# 4 Exhibit Pages 57-75)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 155 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 156 Order on Motion to Dismiss by BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD. Filing fee $ 0.00. (cp, ) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 02-08-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM to 157 . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Regarding How Cases Should Proceed)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF JANUARY 31, 2005 ORDERS AND FOR STAY . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 02-03-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM to 160 from Attachment to Petitioners' Notice of Filing Petitioners' Joint Submission Regarding How These Cases Should Proceed. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM to 157 from Petitioners' Joint Submission Regarding How These Cases Should Proceed. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay (and for Certification of Orders for Interlocutory Appeal -- see separate docket entry) by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Certification of Orders for Interlocutory Appeal (and for Stay -- see separate docket entry) by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL LEHNERT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND REQUESTING BRIEFING ON THE FUTURE PROCEEDINGS IN THESE CASES. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 01-31-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 01-31-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING November 8, 2004 Motion to Designate "Protected Information" and GRANTING November 18, 2004 Motion for Access to Unredacted Factual Returns . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 01-31-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 151 Leave to Take Discovery and For Preservation Order (submitted to [see docket entry 153] and approved by the CSO for public filing) filed by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing by DAVID HICKS (Attachments: # 1 Description of Reply Filed Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 151 petitioners' motion for discovery and preservation order filed by TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, GORDON R. ENGLAND, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex. B# 3 Exhibit Ex. C# 4 Exhibit Ex. D)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Katerberg, Robert) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery (submitted to CSO for clearance as per docket entry #150, approved by CSO for public filing) by SHAFIQ RASUL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY AND FOR PRESERVATION ORDER by SHAFIQ RASUL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Description of Motion Filed Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Koslowe, Neil) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Clarifying December 8, 2004 Order Granting Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 01-03-05. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 140 REPLY TO RESPONDENTS' OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT BY AMICUS CHARLES GITTINGS IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS filed by CHARLES B. GITTINGS, JR. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Gittings, Charles) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's December 8, 2004 Order by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD (for scanned image, see doc. 144 ). Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(cp, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR. on behalf of CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(GITTINGS, CHARLES) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 140 Brief of Amicus Curiae Charles B. Gittings, Jr. and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment in Support of Petitioners filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 88 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss or For Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Challenges to the Military Commission Process . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-15-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Recent Issuances by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D.C. Circuit Oral Argument Date in Hamdan v. Rumsfeld# 2 Exhibit Appointing Authority Directive)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Supplementing and Amending Filing Procedures Contained in November 8, 2004 Amended Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-13-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment in support of petitioners by CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR. (for scanned image, see doc 139 ). Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(cp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF by CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(cp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for Specific Disclosures Relating to Respondents' Motion to Designate as "Protected Information" Unclassified Information and Petitioners' Motion for Access to Unredacted Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-08-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 95 Motion for CM/ECF Password and Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-08-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 101 Motion for Filing of Affidavit Under Seal as Moot and Directing the Filing of the Affidavit on the Public Record. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 12-08-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT of Motion to dismiss held on 12/1/04 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(rje, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT on the Submission of Five Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D (Part 1)# 2 Exhibit D (Part 2))Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause Regarding Respondents' Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Challenges to the Military Commission Process filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Petitioners' Motion to Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice and DENYING 81 Individual Respondents' Motion to Dismiss as Moot . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-23-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to 121 Petitioner's Motion for Filing of Affidavit Under Seal filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) Modified on 11/24/2004 (cp, ). (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Petitioners' Motion for Access to Unredacted Factual Returns and to Compel Compliance With Order on Protected Infromation Procedures filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of 102 Petitioner David M. Hick's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD (for scanned image, see doc. 120 ). Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(cp, ) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and opposition to motion to dismiss, Set/Reset Hearings, 122 Reply to opposition to Motion, by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Requiring Response to Petitioners' Motion for Access to Unredacted Factual Returns and to Compel Respondents to Comply with Order on Protected Information Procedures. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-19-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to Show Cause Regarding Respondents' Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law with Respect to Challenges to the Military Commission Process. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-18-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 82 to dismiss or for judgment as a matter of law filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner's Motion for Filing Affidavit Under Seal by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Petitioner's Brief in Opposition to Respondents Motion to Dismiss and in Support of Petitioner David M Hicks Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Petitioner's Statement of Material Facts)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 118 Respondents Leave to Submit Consolidated Reply Brief Exceeding Page Limit . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-15-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as single consolidated reply memorandum by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Scheduling Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-15-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Addressing Designation Procedures for "Protected Information." Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-10-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER transfering this cases to Judge Green for ruling on two of the pending motions to dismiss 81 , 82 filed by the United States, and any motions related thereto. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 10, 2004. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Designate as "Protected Information" Unclassified Information in Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus That Is Not Filed on the Public Record by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-08-04.(Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking 110 Court's Order of November 5, 2004 due to a computer error in the conversion of WordPerfect file to PDF, portions of certain names were inadvertently modified to inaccurate names and words; directing deputy clerk to delete said order.. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on November 8, 2004. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Burgess, Joe) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....PROTECTIVE ORDER and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-05-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Document deleted pursuant to order of 11/8/04 by Judge Joyce Hens Green) Modified on 4/12/2007 (jf, ). (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of In Camera Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under Seal by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Court's November 1, 2004 Order Regarding Submissions on Proposed Counsel Access Procedures filed by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Procedures# 2 Exhibit Letter# 3 Exhibit Transcript# 4 Affidavit Jay Hood)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Call held on October 20, 2004 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(jf, ) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amici Curiae by BRUCE ACKERMAN, ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, SARAH H. CLEVELAND, DAVID D. COLE, WILLIAM S. DODGE, MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, RYAN GOODMAN, OONA HATHAWAY, DEREK JINKS, KEVIN R. JOHNSON, JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, JUDITH RESNIK, DAVID SCHEFFER, ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, DAVID SLOSS, CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, DAVID C. VLADECK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief# 2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(nmw, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Vladeck on behalf of DAVID C. VLADECK, CARLOS M. VAZQUEZ, DAVID SLOSS, ANNE-MARIE SLAUGHTER, DAVID SCHEFFER, JUDITH RESNIK, JENNIFER S. MARTINEZ, KEVIN R. JOHNSON, DEREK JINKS, OONA HATHAWAY, RYAN GOODMAN, MARTIN S. FLAHERTY, WILLIAM S. DODGE, DAVID D. COLE, SARAH H. CLEVELAND, ROSA EHRENREICH BROOKS, BRUCE ACKERMAN Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(nmw, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File brief as amici curiae in support of David M. Hicks's petition for writ of mandamus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1361, or, in the alternative, writ of habeas corpus by CENTER FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS OF NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, MARCO SASSOLI, VAUGHAN LOWE, FRITS KALSHOVEN, GUY S. GOODWIN-GILL, LOUISE DOSWALD-BECK. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(jf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2004 (nmw, ). (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 88 Dismiss filed by DAVID HICKS. (Please see Document No. 102 for scanned image).Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(nmw, ) Modified on 11/19/2004 (cp, ). (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and opposition to motion to dismiss by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cassesse# 2 Affidavit Schmitt Affidavit# 3 Exhibit statement of undisputed facts)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Deadline for Submissions in Response to Motion for an Order Requiring Parties to Abide by Proposed Procedures for Counsel Access. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 11-01-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Requiring Submission of Classified Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Final Deadline for Submission of Factual Returns. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-29-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Addressing the Sealing of Material . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-27-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Circumstances by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Patterson, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File as amicus brief, MOTION for a cm/ecf password by CHARLES B. GITTINGS JR.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Amicus Brief# 2 Exhibit A- to Amicus Brief)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(jf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT on the Submission of Factual Returns to Petitions for Writ of Habeas Corpus by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 91 Petitioner's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Respondents' Response. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-20-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 88 MOTION to Dismiss and for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response with Respect to Challenges to the Military Commission Process by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 10/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Scheduling October 20, 2004 Hearing on Protective Order Issues. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-18-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 13, 2004 before Judge Joyce Hens Green. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(jf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss and for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response with Respect to Challenges to the Military Commission Process by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Replies to Motions. Petitioners Shall Have Until November 5, 2004 to File Their Replies. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING 85 Joint Request to Postpone Status Conference and GRANTING 84 Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 10-12-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Postpone Status Conference by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submissions Regarding the Proposed Protective Order by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner David M. Hicks by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response Pursuant to the Court's Sept. 20, 2004 Order by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Ex. B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss of Individual Respondents by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Directing Counsel in All Cases to Be As Concise As Possible in All Their Filings; Responsive Filings May Be Up to 75 Pages . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 9/29/04. (MD) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Certain Claims Raised in Second Amended Petition by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Responsive Filing Under Court's Sept. 20, 2004 Order by JOHN D. ALTENBURG JR., GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, GORDON R. ENGLAND, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint filed by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(nmw, ) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to File . Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on 09-27-04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(MD) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 9/3/04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ, filed pursuant to Order filed 9/20/04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(lc, ) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting status conference, briefing schedule for protective order and for notification of released detainees. Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on September 20, 2004. (gt, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ # 1 Supplement Letter dated 8-31-04 from Thomas Lee, Esq., USDOJ# 2 Supplement Letter dated 9-1-03 from Thomas Lee, Esq, USDOJ# 3 Supplement Letter dated 9-2-04 from Thomas Wilner, Esq.# 4 Supplement Letter dated 8-25-04 from Erwin Chemerinsky, Esq.# 5 Supplement Letter dated 9-17-04 from KELLER AND HECKMAN) Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(lc, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting filing schedule and directing the filing of correspondence previously submitted to the Court Signed by Judge Joyce Hens Green on September 20, 2004. (gt, ) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER transferring case to Judge Joyce Hens Green for management and coordination. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 17, 2004. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(lcckk1) (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 Leave to File Second Amended Habeas Petition and Complaint filed by DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Petition filed by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael D. Mori on behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joshua L. Dratel on behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew A. Jacobson on behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Hillary A. Victor on behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David E. Walterson behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Andrew W. Vail on behalf of DAVID HICKS. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leon Friedman on behalf of David Hicks. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(td, ) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....APPLICATION for Writ of Amended Habeas Petition and Complaint by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) Modified on 9/1/2004 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amended Habeas Petition and Complaint by DAVID HICKS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Goldman on behalf of DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Goldman, Marc) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Beaton Verrilli on behalf of DAVID HICKS Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Verrilli, Donald) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 the Government's Motion for Entry of Coordination Order. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/17/04. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(CS, ) (Entered: 08/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 44 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID HICKS, SHAFIQ RASUL, SKINA BIBI, ASIF IQBAL, MOHAMMED IQBAL, TERRY HICKS. It is hereby ordered that the courts judgment filed March 11, 2003 in the above captioned consolidated cases be vacated;that the judgment of the district court appealed from in these causes be reversed and these case remanded for further proceedings;USCA#02-5251 (jsc) Modified on 8/12/2004 (jsc, ). (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT -- Joint Status Report by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Joint Case Management Conference, Entry of Coordination Order, and Request for Expedition by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy)reversing and remanding case to district court as to 44 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID HICKS, SHAFIQ RASUL, SKINA BIBI, ASIF IQBAL, MOHAMMED IQBAL, TERRY HICKS; USCA # 02-5251 (adc) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA (certified copy)that the court's mandate issued 6/23/03 be recalled; USCA # 02-5251 (adc) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2004 (jsc, ). (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER requiring joint status report by August 5, 2004. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 26, 2004. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 26, 2004. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying without prejudice 46 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 26, 2004. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD of Filing of Motion to Consolidate in Rasul v. Bush, No. 02-CV-0299 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK,1:02-cv-00828-CKK(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFIED COPY of judgment filed in USCA dated 3/11/03, on appeal [44-1] , affirming the judgment of USDC . USCA # 02-5288 (cp) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by petitioners SHAFIQ RASUL in 1:02-cv-00299, SKINA BIBI, ASIF IQBAL , MOHAMMED IQBAL, DAVID HICKS , TERRY HICKS from order [43-1], order [41-1] , entered on: 7/30/02. Fees paid. Copies sent. (aet) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to dismiss first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus [25-1] [26-1] by TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH in 1:02-cv-00299. Granting motion to dismiss plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [9-1] and complaint [1-1]. [15-1] by federal defendants in 1:02-cv-00828. RASUL v BUSH, 02cv299, and ODAH v. UNITED STATES, 02cv828, are dismissed with prejudice. (N) (dot) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly (N) (dot) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to consolidate cases for pretrial proceedings to case 02-299 [3-1] by FAWZI KHALID AL ODAH in 1:02-cv-00828. The Court consolidates ODAH v. UNITED STATES, Civil Action No. 02cv828, with RASUL v. BUSH, Civil Action No. 02cv299, for the limited purpose of addressing the Court's jurisdiction to hear these matters. (N) (dot) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING by petitioners of certification of familiarity with local rules. (aet) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by petitioners for Beth Stephens to appear pro hac vice ( 666 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012, 212-614-6464) (aet) (Entered: 06/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting Beth Stephen's motion for admission pro hac vice. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : that respondents will speak first and are allotted 20 minutes for prepared comments that addrss the merits of their motions to dismiss in this case and in the case of ODAH v. UNITED STATES, Civ. No. 02-828. Petitioners will speak second and are allotted fifteen minutes for prepared comments. Petitioners should consult plaintiffs' counsel in ODAH, who will speak third, to ensure that petitioners' comments are not duplicative of those made by plaintiffs' counsel in ODAH. Respondents will be given an appropriate opportunity to respond to the arguments made by petitioners in this matter and plaintiffs in ODAH. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : motion hearing set for 2:00 6/26/02 on respondents' motion to dismiss. The parties' arguments shall be solely focused upon the issue of whether the Court has jurisdiction to entertain petitioners habeas filing. Petitioners and respondents shall each be allotted one half-hour for oral argument. (N) (dot) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by respondents to response in opposition to motion to dismiss first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus [25-1] [26-1] by TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH (bcs) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by respondent to extend time to 4/29/02 to file a reply to petitioners memorandum in opposition to respondents motion to dismiss (bcs) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting respondent's unopposed motion to file reply to petitioner's memorandum in opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss. Respondents shall filed their reply to petitioners' memorandum in opposition to respondents's motion to dismiss not later than 4/29/02. (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by petitioner in opposition to motion to dismiss first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus [25-1] [26-1] by TERRY CARRICO, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH; exhibit (1) (bcs) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion to continue briefing schedule to 4/15/02 [30-1] by SHAFIQ RASUL; reply to motion due 4/15/02. (N) (dot) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by petitioner SHAFIQ RASUL to continue briefing schedule to 4/15/02 (bcs) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by respondents in opposition to motion for order to provide the detained clients with notice of the pending litigation [27-1] by petitioners; motion for access to counsel [28-1] by petitioners (cdw) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by petitioners for access to counsel (cdw) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by petitioners for order to provide the detained clients with notice of the pending litigation (cdw) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by respondents to dismiss first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus [25-1] ; exhibits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED PETITION filed by petitioners for writ of habeas corpus ; attachments (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of telephone conference filed for date(s) of 2/25/02. Reporter: Edward N. Hawkins, RMR (cdw) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for leave to file an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus [22-1] by petitioners. The Petitioners first amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus is accepted for filing in place of the petition previously filed on 2/19/02. (N) (dot) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION filed by petitioners for leave to file an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus ; EXHIBIT (AMENDED PETITION) (cdw) (Entered: 03/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jon W. Norris representing petitioners. New address: THE LAW OFFICES OF JON W. NORR 641 Indiana Avenue, NW Second Floor Washington DC 20004 (202) 842-2695. (cdw) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by petitioner SHAFIQ RASUL cover letters dated 2/19/02 addressed to defendants and non-parties US Attorney, US Attorney General (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by petitioner ASIF IQBAL, petitioner MOHAMMED IQBAL to proceed in forma pauperis ; affidavits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by petitioner SHAFIQ RASUL, petitioner SKINA BIBI to proceed in forma pauperis ; affidavits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION filed by petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS to proceed in forma pauperis ; affidavits (1) (cdw) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of petition for writ of habeas corpus executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 2/19/02 (cdw) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of petition for writ of habeas corpus executed upon U.S. Attorney on 2/19/02 (cdw) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of petition for writ of habeas corpus executed on 2/19/02 upon respondent GEORGE WALKER BUSH, respondent DONALD RUMSFELD, respondent MICHAEL LEHNERT, respondent TERRY CARRICO (cdw) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for Joseph Margulies to appear pro hac vice ( MARGULIES & RICHMAN PLC 2520 Park Avenue, South, Minneapolis, MN 55404, (612) 872-4900) [4-1] by TERRY HICKS, DAVID HICKS. Contingent on certification that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for William Goodman to appear pro hac vice ( CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6427) [5-1] by TERRY HICKS, DAVID HICKS Contingent on certification that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for Michael Ratner to appear pro hac vice ( CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway. 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6427) [3-1] by TERRY HICKS, DAVID HICKS Contingent on certification that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court.(N) (dot) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for Clive A. Stafford Smith to appear pro hac vice ( P.O. Box 50753, New Orleans, LA 70150-0753, (504) 338-9867) [6-1] by MOHAMMED IQBAL, ASIF IQBAL, SKINA BIBI, SHAFIQ RASUL,contingent on certification that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : granting motion for Anthony Dicaprio to appear pro hac vice ( THE CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6456) [2-1] by TERRY HICKS, DAVID HICKS, contingent on certification that he is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : that TERRY HICKS' motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied. DAVID HICKS' motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied without prejudice. MOHAMMED IQBAL's motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied. ASIF IQBAL's motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied without prejudice. SKINA BIBI's motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied. SHAFIQ RASUL's motion for leave to proceed in forma paupris is denied without prejudice. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly : that pursuant to 28 USC 2243, respondents, by counsel, shall file with the Court and serve on petitioners' attorneys, a return certifying the true cause of the petitioners' detention on 3/18/02. This return shall show cause why a writ of habeas corpus and the relief sought by petitioners should not be granted. Petitioners, by counsel, shall file with the Court and serve on petitioners' attorneys a reply brief not later than 4/8/02. Any motion relating to providing notice of this matter to petitioners and providing access of counsel to petitioners should be filed with the Court and served on respondents' attorneys, by petitoners, through counsel, not later than 3/4/02. An opposition to any motion relating to providing notice of this matter to petitioners and providing access of counsel to petitioners shall be filed with the Court and served on petitioners'attorneys, by respondents, through counsel, not later than 3/18/02. Respondents' return to petitioners' writ of habeas corpus may serve as the appropriate brief to file such opposition. A reply relating to providing notice of this matter to petitioners and providing access of counsel to petitioners should be filed with the COurt and served on respondents' attorneys, by petitioners, through cousel, not later than 4/8/02. A copy of the petition shall be served upon respondents through the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia by hand delivery to Roscoe C. Howard, Jr. at the Office of the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, 555 Fourth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001, by the close of business on Wednesday, February 27, 2002. All filings in this case shall be served on counsel by hand delivery. Petitioners shall hand deliver filings to Roscoe C. Howard, Jr., at the Office of the United States Attorney for District of Columbia, 555 Fourth Street, NW, Washington, DC 20001. Respondents shall hand deliver filings to L. Barrett Boss, Asbill, Junkin, Moffitt & Boss, Chartered, Suite 200, 1615 New Hampshire Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20009. The Court shall promptly be provided with a courtesy copy, in Chambers, of all filings in the above-captioned matter. (N) (dot) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION filed by petitioner SHAFIQ RASUL, petitioner SKINA BIBI, petitioner ASIF IQBAL, petitioner MOHAMMED IQBAL for Clive A. Stafford Smith to appear pro hac vice ( P.O. Box 50753, New Orleans, LA 70150-0753, (504) 338-9867) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION filed by petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS for William Goodman to appear pro hac vice ( CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6427) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS for Joseph Margulies to appear pro hac vice ( MARGULIES & RICHMAN PLC 2520 Park Avenue, South, Minneapolis, MN 55404, (612) 872-4900) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS for Michael Ratner to appear pro hac vice ( CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway. 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6427) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS for Anthony Dicaprio to appear pro hac vice ( THE CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS 666 Broadway, New York, NY 10012, (212) 614-6456) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION filed by petitioner SHAFIQ RASUL, petitioner SKINA BIBI, petitioner ASIF IQBAL, petitioner MOHAMMED IQBAL, petitioner DAVID HICKS, petitioner TERRY HICKS for writ of habeas corpus ; affidavits (6), exhibits (6) (cdw) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 289 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?