LOVE et al v. VENEMAN
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02502
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2018 at 12:33 PM EDT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo EDITH L. SCRUGGS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo GAIL LENNON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca S. Behravesh +1 202 857 6281 +1 202 857 6395 behravesh.rebecca@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo JAMES MURNION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
No Logo JOANN NEUZIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com
No Logo JOYCE A. KING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo JOYCE L. ACOMB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca S. Behravesh +1 202 857 6281 +1 202 857 6395 behravesh.rebecca@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo MARGARET ODOM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca S. Behravesh +1 202 857 6281 +1 202 857 6395 behravesh.rebecca@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo MARY L. BROWN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo MARYLAND B. WYNNE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
No Logo ROSEMARY LOVE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/28/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca S. Behravesh +1 202 857 6281 +1 202 857 6395 behravesh.rebecca@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Jane Dunne +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 dunne.kristine@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Fleischaker +1 202 857 6053 +1 202 715 8483 fleischm@arentfox.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Susan Wahl +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 wahl.barbara@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E. Huhta +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 sue_huhta@washlaw.org
v.
No Logo ANN VENEMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/28/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas William Millet +1 202 514 3313 +1 202 616 8202 thomas.millet@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/10/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/12/2006 Joshua Z. Rabinovitz +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8202 joshua.rabinovitz@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter T. Wechsler +1 202 514 2705 peter.wechsler@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/25/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlotta Poter Wells +1 202 514 4522 +1 202 616 8470 carlotta.wells@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAN GLICKMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/10/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/25/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlotta Poter Wells +1 202 514 4522 +1 202 616 8470 carlotta.wells@usdoj.gov
No Logo TOM VILSACK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Sitcov +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 michael.sitcov@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter T. Wechsler +1 202 514 2705 peter.wechsler@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALL MOVANTS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo ANNETTE C. BRAYBOY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo ANNIE MAE BRADLEY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BARBARA ANN BONNER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BARBARA E, ADAMS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BARBARA WILLIAMS CARTER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BETTY BROWN BOSIER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BONITA ANTOINETTE CONWELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo BONITA CONWELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo CHERYL LASHAUNTA CARSTARPHEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo CHRISTINE BRAYBOY ANDERSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo CLAUDIA JEAN BLANDING, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo CLEMENTINE VIRGINIA CARR-NEWKIRK, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo DICY DELORIS BLOUNT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo DOROTHY L. BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo DOROTHY MAE BARR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo ELIZABETH BLANDING, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo EMMA BELL BOWMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo FLORA M. BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo GENEVA C. BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo GLADYS SCOTT ANDERSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JANET LEE BRYANT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JEANETTE BARR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JOAN M. BURGESS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JOYCE MARIE WADE COLE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JUDY BARR, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo JULIA FAYE BLANDING, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo LEAR H. BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo LINDA COE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo LIZZIE CARROLL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MAE BELL CAUSLEY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MAGGIE EVE COOPER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MARSHA LINDA BROWN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MARY LEE CAMERON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MARY LEE CARTER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MARY M. CONYERS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo MELISSA ANN BURGESS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo NINA F. BEAUCHAMP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo OLA B. CALDWELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo QUINCESS MARGARET COLLINS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo ROSA BOLLING BONNER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo RUTH ANN BELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo SANDRA A. CHRISTIAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo SANDRA A. MAYFIELD CHRISTIAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo SARAH NADINE BELL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo SHIRLEY BARNETT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo SHIRLEY L. BARNETT, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo ULA DEAN BURGESS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo WENDY LATISA BURGESS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
No Logo WILLA DEAN BURGESS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 457 6015 +1 202 457 6315 bchew@pattonboggs.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (264) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 198 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal for Lennon with prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ERRATA stipulation for Love of dismissal with prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK 208 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wynne with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal for Scruggs with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal for Robertson with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal for Odom with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal for Love with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal for King With Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal for Bara-Weaver with Prejudice by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 198 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Scheduling Order by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 200 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) (Exhibits 2-C and 2-G) by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE 198 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by JOYCE A. KING, MARY L. BROWN, GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, ROSEMARY LOVE, EDITH L. SCRUGGS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Proceedings by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order to File Document Under Seal by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 2-A, # 6 Exhibit 2-B, # 7 Exhibit 2-C, # 8 Exhibit 2-D, # 9 Exhibit 2-E, # 10 Exhibit 2-F, # 11 Exhibit 2-G, # 12 Exhibit 2-H, # 13 Exhibit 3, # 14 Exhibit 3-A, # 15 Exhibit 4, # 16 Exhibit 4-A, # 17 Exhibit 5, # 18 Exhibit 5-A, # 19 Exhibit 5-B, # 20 Exhibit 5-C, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 192 MOTION for Order to end the tolling of statute of limitations filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Venue by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on October 26, 2010; Page Numbers: 1 - 5. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Court Reporter Email Address : cathryjns1@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2013.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on September 24, 2010; Page Numbers: 1 - 2. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Court Reporter Email Address : cathryjns1@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2013.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 192 MOTION for Order to end the tolling of statute of limitations filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to end the tolling of statute of limitations by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK re 190 MOTION for Order to End Tolling of Statute of Limitations (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 191 . . . . .MOTION for Order to End Tolling of Statute of Limitations by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) Modified on 8/8/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File any Motion to Transfer Venue by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File any motion to transfer venue for a named plaintiff by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Litigation Election by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 181 MOTION to Intervene filed by BLACK FARMERS AND AGRICULTURALISTS ASSOCIATION, INC. (rdj) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by BLACK FARMERS AND AGRICULTURALISTS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Supplement, # 4 Supplement, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Christal) Modified on 5/3/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 181 MOTION to Intervene filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 181 MOTION to Intervene filed by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola. Status Conference held on 8/24/2012; Page Numbers: 1-47. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bowles Reporting Service, Court Reporter Email Address : brs-ct@sbcglobal.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2013.(znmw, ) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene by BLACK FARMERS AND AGRICULTURALISTS ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint)(rdj) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to , MOTION to Amend/Correct by THOMAS JAMES VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              WITHDRAWAL of Motion by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE re 178 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,,,,,, Scheduling Order filed by JOYCE A. KING, MARY L. BROWN, GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, ROSEMARY LOVE, EDITH L. SCRUGGS . (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 179 . . . . . MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,,,,,, Scheduling Order by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunne, Kristine) Modified on 4/3/2013 (td, ). (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Schedule by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12-11-12. (lcrbw3)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 166 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 168 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued this same date, it is ORDERED that the USDA's motion to dismiss Counts III through VI of the fourth amended complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts III through VI of the Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended and Supplemental Complaint is DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule on or before December 18, 2012, governing the filing of any further pre-discovery motions they wish to file, such as motions to transfer and motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12-11-12. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 170 Motion to Stay; denying 170 Motion to Strike. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, it is ORDERED that the defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule applicable to the plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is STAYED pending resolution of the defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11-28-12. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 170 MOTION to Stay or Strike (Rule 56(d)) MOTION to Strike filed by TOM J. VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by TOM J. VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 170 MOTION to Stay or Strike (Rule 56(d)) filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay or Strike (Rule 56(d)) by TOM J. VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wechsler, Peter). Added MOTION to Strike on 11/14/2012 (td, ). (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Emily Brittain Read on behalf of All Plaintiffs Substituting for attorney Roderic V.O. Boggs (Read, Emily) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counts III Through VI by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Declarations of Plaintiffs, # 5 Exhibit 2 - USDA Press Release, # 6 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Benny Bunting, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Eugene P. Ericksen, # 8 Exhibit 5 - Framework)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 166 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state a claim filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declarations of Plaintiffs, # 3 Exhibit 2 - USDA Press Release, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Benny Bunting, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Expert Report of Eugene P. Ericksen, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Framework)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: 10/18/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. The Motion to Intervene filed by approximately 286 individuals on March 23, 2011, is held in abeyance until further order of the Court. Furthermore, this case shall remain stayed until further order of the Court. Finally, the parties, as well as the movants, shall appear before the Court at 9:15 a.m. on June 23, 2011, for a further status conference and hearing on the merits of the Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/15/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY re 129 Memorandum in Opposition, 131 Response to Document, filed by ALL MOVANTS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chew, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. The parties, as well as the movants, shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the merits of the Motion to Intervene at 11:00 a.m. on April 15, 2011. This motions hearing will coincide with the status conference already scheduled for the same date and time. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/13/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re 124 MOTION to Intervene filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance of Alison Lima Andersen by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Wahl, Barbara) Modified on 4/12/2011 (td, ). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 124 MOTION to Intervene filed by TOM VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Service by ALL MOVANTS re 125 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Chew, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 124 , 126 Errata filed by ALL MOVANTS by ALL MOVANTS. (Chew, Benjamin) Modified to add additional linkage on 4/4/2011 (td, ). (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA REGARDING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by ALL MOVANTS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chew, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of receipt of service by TOM VILSACK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit notice of electronic filing)(Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs by BARBARA E, ADAMS, CHRISTINE BRAYBOY ANDERSON, GLADYS SCOTT ANDERSON, SHIRLEY L. BARNETT, DOROTHY MAE BARR, JEANETTE BARR, JUDY BARR, NINA F. BEAUCHAMP, RUTH ANN BELL, SARAH NADINE BELL, CLAUDIA JEAN BLANDING, ELIZABETH BLANDING, JULIA FAYE BLANDING, DICY DELORIS BLOUNT, BARBARA ANN BONNER, ROSA BOLLING BONNER, BETTY BROWN BOSIER, EMMA BELL BOWMAN, ANNIE MAE BRADLEY, ANNETTE C. BRAYBOY, DOROTHY L. BROWN, FLORA M. BROWN, GENEVA C. BROWN, LEAR H. BROWN, MARSHA LINDA BROWN, MARSHA LINDA BROWN, JANET LEE BRYANT, JOAN M. BURGESS, MELISSA ANN BURGESS, ULA DEAN BURGESS, WENDY LATISA BURGESS, WILLA DEAN BURGESS, OLA B. CALDWELL, MARY LEE CAMERON, CLEMENTINE VIRGINIA CARR-NEWKIRK, LIZZIE CARROLL, CHERYL LASHAUNTA CARSTARPHEN, BARBARA WILLIAMS CARTER, MARY LEE CARTER, MAE BELL CAUSLEY, SANDRA A. MAYFIELD CHRISTIAN, SANDRA A. CHRISTIAN, LINDA COE, JOYCE MARIE WADE COLE, QUINCESS MARGARET COLLINS, BONITA ANTOINETTE CONWELL, MARY M. CONYERS, MAGGIE EVE COOPER, ALL MOVANTS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Notice of Motion, # 6 Certificate of Service)(znmw, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by TOM VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on December 3, 2010; Page Numbers: 1 - 10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Court Reporter Email Address : cjjones10@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2011.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The parties shall appear before the Court for a further status conference at 11:00 a.m. on April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/14/2011 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 116 Motion for Court Review and Supervision of Financial Distribution to Women Farmers, and for Appointment of Lead Counsel. The plaintiffs' Motion for Court Review and Supervision of Financial Distribution to Women Farmers, and for Appointment of Lead Counsel is denied. Furthermore, the parties shall appear before the Court for a further status conference at 2:00 p.m. on January 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/3/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 116 MOTION Motion for Court Review and Supervision of Financial Distribution to Women Farmers MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE. (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 116 MOTION Motion for Court Review and Supervision of Financial Distribution to Women Farmers MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by TOM VILSACK. (Sitcov, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Court Review and Supervision of Financial Distribution to Women Farmers, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JOYCE L. ACOMB, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARY L. BROWN, JOYCE A. KING, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The parties shall appear before the Court for a further status conference at 10:30 a.m. on December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/26/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Second by TOM VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 9:00 a.m. on October 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/24/2010 (lcrbw1). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by TOM VILSACK. (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. For the reasons set forth in this order, the stay in this case shall remain in place and this case shall be administratively closed pending the completion of the settlement negotiations. However, if no stipulation of settlement has been filed with the Court by September 24, 2010, the parties shall appear before this Court for a status conference on September 24, 2010, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 16 of the E. Barrett Prettyman United States Courthouse, 333 Constitution Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20001. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 07/19/10. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge James Robertson no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Status Conference by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Wechsler on behalf of ANN VENEMAN (Wechsler, Peter) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Continue the Status Conference by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to (104 in 1:00-cv-02502-JR) Notice of Appeal, filed by JOYCE A. KING, MARY L. BROWN, GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, MARGARET ODOM, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, ROSEMARY LOVE, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, (170 in 1:00-cv-02445-JR) Notice of Appeal filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS ; ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Affirming the judgments of the District court and REMANDING the cases. USCA Case Number 08-5110;08-5135. (tr) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip L. Fraas (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616011961. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (tg, ) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2008 before Judge James Robertson. Court Reporter: Rebecca Stonestreet. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (Transcript lodged with 00-2445). (lc, ) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to certify for interlocutory appeal 99 . All District Court proceedings in this case are stayed while plaintiffs' appeal is pending. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 16, 2008. (MT) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 99 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and to Amend November 30, 2007 Order filed by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, JOANN NEUZIL, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 99 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and to Amend November 30, 2007 Order filed by DAN GLICKMAN. (Wells, Carlotta) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal and to Amend November 30, 2007 Order by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's motion for reconsideration 97 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 7, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re 96 Order on Motion to Stay (Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Court's 12/4/07 Order Granting Indefinite Stay) by ANN VENEMAN (Wells, Carlotta) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting motion to continue the existing stay 95 . The stay will continue until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 4, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, JOANN NEUZIL, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 12/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that plaintiffs' claims under the Administrative Procedure Act are dismissed. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 30, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 30, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re 80 by GAIL LENNON, JAMES MURNION, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, JOANN NEUZIL, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Wahl, Barbara) Modified on 9/19/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re 80 to Support Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for APA Review filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Wells, Carlotta) Modified on 9/19/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 18, 2007 to submit supplemental briefs and Order by ROSEMARY LOVE (Wahl, Barbara) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 28, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 80 Plaintiffs' Claim Arising Under the Administrative Procedure Act filed by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Wahl, Barbara) Modified on 5/4/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 19, 2007 before Judge James Robertson. Court Reporter: Santa Theresa Zizzo. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (lc, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Status Conference by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS BASED ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM 80 Memorandum, filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JOYCE L. ACOMB,, MARY L. BROWN,, EDITH L. SCRUGGS,, MARYLAND B. WYNNE,, JOYCE A. KING,, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON,. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Claims Based on the Administrative Procedure Act)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY re 80 Memorandum, Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Claims Based on the Administrative Procedure Act filed by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 11, 2006 Status Conference before Judge James Robertston. Court Reporter: Rebecca Stonestreet. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 80 Plaintiffs brief in support of claims based on APA filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Wells, Carlotta) Modified on 8/10/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip L. Fraas (Fraas, Phillip) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO FILE AND SERVE BRIEF AND STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge James Robertson on 5/19/2006. (alr, ) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANN VENEMAN filed by GAIL LENNON, JOYCE L. ACOMB, EDITH L. SCRUGGS, MARYLAND B. WYNNE, JOYCE A. KING, PHYLLIS L. ROBERTSON, MARY L. BROWN, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM.(lc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE (Proposed Order) by GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Carlotta Poter Wells on behalf of ANN VENEMAN (Wells, Carlotta) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 73 Notice of Appeal filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JAMES MURNION,, JOANN NEUZIL; It is hereby ordered and adjudged and the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby affirmed in part and remanded in part, in accordance with the opinion of the court filed herein this date; USCA#04-5449 (jsc) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number 00-2502 for 73 Notice of Appeal filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JAMES MURNION,, JOANN NEUZIL,. (lc, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 68 Order by GAIL LENNON, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. Filing fee $ 0.00. (lc, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Appeal Fees received $ 255 receipt number 132402 re 69 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JAMES MURNION,, JOANN NEUZIL, (lc, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 69 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JAMES MURNION,, JOANN NEUZIL; It is hereby ordered that the petition for permission to take an interlocutory appeal be granted; USCA#04-8011 (jsc) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 69 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by ROSEMARY LOVE,, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER,, MARGARET ODOM,, GAIL LENNON,, JAMES MURNION,, JOANN NEUZIL; It is hereby ordered that the petition for permission to take an interlocutory appeal be granted; USCA#04-8010 (jsc) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 28 Memorandum & Opinion, 29 Order on Motion to Dismiss by GAIL LENNON, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 130537. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed by Judge James Robertson on 12/3/2004. (dam, ) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion to certify class 4 . Further proceedings in this case are stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 29, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Z. Rabinovitz on behalf of ANN VENEMAN (Rabinovitz, Joshua) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying motion to strike expert testimony 60 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 21, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 60 Defendant'sMotion to Strike filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 54 class certification filed by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit)(Silberbogen, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 60 striking the expert report of Lou Ann Kling filed by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Silberbogen, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Lou Ann Kling by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Millet, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 54 class certification filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)(Millet, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William Millet on behalf of ANN VENEMAN (Millet, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHDRAWAL of Motion by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM Praecipe. (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Order by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Establish a Briefing Schedule by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Certify Class by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit # 27 Exhibit # 28 Exhibit # 29 Exhibit # 30 Exhibit # 31 Exhibit # 32 Exhibit # 33 Exhibit # 34 Exhibit # 35 Exhibit # 36 Exhibit # 37 Exhibit # 38 Exhibit # 39 Exhibit # 40 Exhibit # 41 Exhibit # 42 Exhibit # 43 Exhibit # 44 Exhibit # 45 Exhibit # 46 Exhibit # 47 Exhibit # 48 Exhibit # 49 Exhibit # 50 Exhibit # 51 Exhibit # 52 Exhibit # 53 Exhibit # 54 Exhibit # 55 Exhibit # 56 Exhibit # 57 Exhibit # 58 Exhibit # 59 Exhibit # 60 Exhibit # 61 Exhibit # 62 Exhibit # 63 Exhibit # 64 Exhibit # 65 Exhibit # 66 Exhibit # 67 Exhibit # 68 Exhibit # 69 Exhibit # 70 Exhibit # 71 Exhibit # 72 Exhibit # 73 Exhibit # 74 Exhibit # 75 Exhibit # 76 Exhibit # 77 Exhibit # 78 Exhibit # 79 Exhibit # 80 Exhibit # 81 Exhibit # 82 Notice Regarding Exhibit 2 Attachment# 83 Exhibit)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for status hearing dates 7/28/03. (bcs, ) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 50 leave to file a Third Amended Complaint filed by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 50 filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Complaint by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint)(Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Thomas Quinlivan (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Privacy Act Protective Order by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Privacy Act by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) Modified on 11/13/2002 (bcs, ). (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Phillip L. Fraas (nmr, ) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Avis E. Buchanan by ROSEMARY LOVE. (Huhta, Susan) (Entered: 06/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting schedule for discovery and motions as to class certification. A date for oral argument of class certification motion will be set after supplemental submissions have been filed. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 24, 2002. (MT) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for dates 3/20/02 ; Court Reporter: Dennis A. Dinkel. (nmr, ) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of exhibit attachments by ANN VENEMAN (aet, ) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance of Kristine J. Dunne by all plaintiffs (Dunne, Kristine) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of Motion re 36 for Class Certification filed by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One - Declaration of Michelle A. Pilgrim# 2 Exhibit Two - Declaration of Annie L. Brown# 3 Exhibit Three - Declaration of Melvina Douglas# 4 Exhibit Four - Declaration of Laner Maloy# 5 Exhibit Five - Declaration of Tonya E. Gilchrist# 6 Exhibit Six - Declaration of Regina G. Ramey)(Fleischaker, Marc) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Barbara S. Wahl by all plaintiffs (Silberbogen, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re 36 filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander John Pires Jr. (Pires, Alexander) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 CRAT Report pp 1-46# 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 CRAT Report pp 47-77# 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 CRAT Report pp 78-e# 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 Declaration of R Anderson# 5 Exhibit Ex. 3 Declaration of G Anthony# 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 Declaration of F Bell# 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 Declaration of B Bunting# 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 Declaration of B Goins# 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 Declaration of V Howell# 10 Exhibit Ex. 8 Declaration of R Jackson# 11 Exhibit Ex. 9 Declaration of D James# 12 Exhibit Ex. 10 Declaration of S Johnson# 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 Declaration of T Journey# 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 Declaration of G Lennon-1# 15 Exhibit Ex. 13 Declaration of G Lennon-2# 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 Declaration of R Love# 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 Declaration of C Mank# 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 Declaration of O McDonald# 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 Declaration of B Puckett# 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 Declaration of Y Sprawling# 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 Keepseagle# 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 Declaration of L Holloway# 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 Declaration of R King# 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 Declaration of M Wade# 25 Exhibit Ex. 23 Declaration of S McDonald# 26 Exhibit Ex. 24 Declaration of J Halim# 27 Exhibit Ex. 25 Declaration of M Odom# 28 Exhibit Ex. 26 Declaration of Y Mizell# 29 Exhibit Ex. 27 Declaration of D Walker# 30 Exhibit Ex. 28 Declaration of L Bara Weaver# 31 Exhibit Ex. 29 Declaration of S Sherrod# 32 Exhibit Ex. 30 Declaration of D Graham# 33 Exhibit Ex. 31 Declaration of C Gray# 34 Exhibit Ex. 32 Declaration of I Slachetka# 35 Exhibit Ex. 33 Declaration of R Paulk# 36 Exhibit Ex. 34 Declaration of D Farrell)(Silberbogen, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance for Rebecca E. Silberbogen by all plaintiffs (Silberbogen, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Marc L. Fleischaker by all plaintiffs (Fleischaker, Marc) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint 14 by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) Modified on 1/22/2002 (pao). (Entered: 01/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Avis E. Buchanan and Susan E. Huhta by all plaintiffs (Huhta, Susan) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to January 21, 2002 to file an answer 30 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 4, 2002.(MT) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 by ANN VENEMAN. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 12/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion to dismiss 8 AND setting status conference for January 10, 2002 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 13, 2001. (MT) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re defendant's motion to dismiss 8 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 13, 2001. (MT) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing of Transcript for dates 2/6/01 of status conference. (adc, ) Modified on 5/14/2001 to change event from Transcript to Notice. (pao, ). (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing for Status Conference by ROSEMARY LOVE. (Pires, Alexander) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER establishing procedures for electronic filing. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 2, 2001. (MT, ) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 to dismiss and to strike class action allegations filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amended class action complaint filed by ANN VENEMAN. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File a reply in support of defendant's motion to dismiss and to strike class action allegations by ANN VENEMAN. Replies due by 3/9/2001. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting defendants' motion to extend time to reply to defendant's motion to dismiss; reply due 3/9/01 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 3/7/01. (adc, ) Modified on 4/6/2001 (adc, ). (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction 16 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 3/2/01. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed by ANN VENEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 to defendant's motion to dismiss and to strike class action allegations filed by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1)(adc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Certify Class by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (Attachments: # 1memorandum of points and authorities # 2 Exhibits (A-D)(adc) Modified on 4/6/2001 (adc). (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File second amended class action complaint by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM; EXHIBIT (SECOND CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT-HELD BY DOCKET CLERK). (adc) Modified on 4/6/2001 (adc). (Entered: 04/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 11 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 6, 2001. (adc) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Motion for Leave to File 7 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on February 6,2001. (adc) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re 8 to defendants' motion to dismiss and to strike class action allegations by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (adc, ) Modified on 4/2/2001 (adc, ). (Entered: 04/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File motion for class certification 9 ; motion due 2/20/01 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on 1/25/01. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File plaintiff's motion for class certification by LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, JOANN NEUZIL, MARGARET ODOM. (adc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss and, MOTION to Strike class action allegations by DAN GLICKMAN. (adc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a memorandum of law in excess of forty-five pages; exhibits (4) and Exhibit (memorandum of points and authorities in support of defendant's motion to dismiss and to strike class action allegations by DAN GLICKMAN. (adc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiffs ROSEMARY LOVE, LIND MARIE BARA-WEAVER, MARGARET ODOM, GAIL LENNON and JAMES MURNION adding plaintiffs JOANN NEUZIL, LORRAINE DONNA BOERS, ELLA MAE GARNER, JOYCE L. ACOMB, MARGARET STRAUSER, SHERIDAN SYLVESTER, SANDRA BENNETT amending complaint. Filed by JOANN NEUZIL. (adc, ) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for status conference by GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, MARGARET ODOM. (adc, ) Modified on 3/22/2001 (adc, ). (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 3 ; defendant shall file a responsive pleading to plaintiffs' complaint on or before 12/29/00 .Signed by Judge James Robertson on 12/18/00. (adc) Modified on 3/20/2001 (adc, ). (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 to plaintiff's complaint by DAN GLICKMAN. (adc, ) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of related case: Case related to Case No(s): 00-2445 by GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, MARGARET ODOM. (adc, ) (Entered: 03/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against DAN GLICKMAN ( Filing fee $150 ). Filed by GAIL LENNON, ROSEMARY LOVE, JAMES MURNION, MARGARET ODOM; exhibits (A-G)not scanned; can be found in the Clerk's Office. (adc) Modified on 3/5/2001 (adc, ). (Entered: 03/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 476 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?