MAY v. COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-01366
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo WANDA MAY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Duboff +1 301 495 3131 +1 301 587 1872 dubofflaw@hotmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
No Logo COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Terrell +1 202 659 6800 +1 202 331 0573 ATerrell@wtplaw.com
Citation Viol. of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 20 agreed motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/24/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC.. (Gartner, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 18 plaintiff's consent motion for protective order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/20/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None
        Consent MOTION for Protective Order by WANDA MAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2)(Duboff, Joel) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, granting 15 Motion for Leave to File. Discovery schedule in this mater for purpose of conducting depositions shall be enlarged for a period of sixty days from the siging of this order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/05/03. (tb) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 15 filed by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC.. (Gartner, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File to File Wrtiten Discovery Out of Time and Consent MOTION to Enlarge Discovery Schedule by WANDA MAY. (NO PENDING EXHIBIT) (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                NOTICE by WANDA MAY Amended 26(a)(1) (Rucker, Donna) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by WANDA MAY Rule 26(a)(1) (Rucker, Donna) (Entered: 05/08/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
                    ENTERED IN ERROR..... First MOTION for Disclosure 26(a)(1) by WANDA MAY. (Rucker, Donna) Modified on 4/21/2003 (mpt, ). (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Gartner, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 9/30/2003 09:15 AM before John D. Bates. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/19/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/19/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None
                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Rucker, Donna) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Complaint by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC..(Gartner, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER for Initial Conference at 3/17/2003 09:00 AM before John D. Bates. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/20/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/20/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/20/03. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 to dismiss filed by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC.. (aet, ) (Entered: 09/13/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: None
                                      Memorandum in opposition to motion re 2 dismissal of case filed by WANDA MAY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed order)(jeb, ) (Entered: 08/26/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss complaint by COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1)(aet, ) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $150 ). Filed by WANDA MAY. (Attachments: # 1)(aet, ) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?