KEEPSEAGLE, et al v. VENEMAN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-03119
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2018 at 3:36 PM DT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADAM T. MANDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ADELINA DEFENDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ADELLA J. KILLS PRETTY ENEMY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ADRIAN FOOT, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ALBERT R. TWO BEARS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ALECIA HANSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ALFRED DRIVER, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
TERMINATED: 04/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzette Marie Malveaux +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria S. Nugent +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 vnugent@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Romer-Friedman +1 202 408 3645 promerfriedman@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conlon, Frantz, Phelan & Knapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Joseph Frantz +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 331 9306 dfrantz@conlonfrantz.com
TERMINATED: 03/03/2004 Greg Kirschner +1 202 331 7050

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy D. Wills +1 312 840 7603 awills@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anurag Varma +1 202 457 6490 +1 202 457 6315 AVarma@PattonBoggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/08/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Myart, Jr. +1 210 533 9461 +1 210 533 4815 jwmyartlaw@satx.rr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/02/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Tenny +1 202 514 1838 daniel.tenny@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALLEN DUCHENEAUX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ALVA ROSE HALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ANTHONY B. FOX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ARBY LITTLE SOLDIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ARNOLD WALKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BARB H. BAKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BARBARA LANDE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BASIL ALKIRE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BEVIN CIRCLE EAGLE, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BILLY J. FREDERICKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo BRENT LONG CHASE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CAROL T. BALLEW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CASEY ED HALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CATHERINE HALVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CELINA Y.B. MOSSETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CHANNON D. BIGHORN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CHARLES CLAMPITT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CHARLES WILKINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CHARLIE BEAR, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CLARICE BENDER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CLARYCA MANDAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com
No Logo CLAY CHARLES CLAYMORE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CLAYTON DANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CLIFF WALKING ELK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo COBY LITTLE SOLDIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CURTIS DANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo CYNTHIA F. DANKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DAISY LECOMPTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DALE LITTLE SOLDIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DANILE HENRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DARREL H. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DARREN C. DUCHENEAUX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DAVID D. HARRISON, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DAVID HAWLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DAVID J. HANLEY, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DAVID J. HAWLEY, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DEIDRE L. IRON CLOUD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DELLA NO HEART, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DELPHINE BAKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DENNIS HUBER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DENNIS SNOW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DONALD MCGHEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DONNA RAE PETERSEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DORA HELGESON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DOUG STANGEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DUANE A. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo DWAYNE J. EAGLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ED DUCHENEAUX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDGAR CROWS HEART, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDGAR HEART, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDITH P. KNIGHT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDWARD C. FOX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDWARD J. FILESTEEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDWARD S. DANKS, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seale, Marsal & Seale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net
No Logo EDWARD S. DANKS, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo EDWARD S. IRON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ELMER FREDERICKS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ERNEST C. BIGHORN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ERNEST LIZOTTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ERNEST LYLE DUCHENEAUX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ESTHER M. HALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo ETHAN HALL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FAITH IRON CLOUD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FARRELL SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FAY A. MOBERG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FLORENCE MATTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FRANK D. THOMPSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FRANK DUCHENEAUX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FRANK HENRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FRANK WHITE CALFE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo FRANK WHITECALFE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo G. PATTY VALANDRA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GABE E. BLACK MOON, SR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GENE CADOTTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GENE HELGESON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GEORGE B. BELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GEORGE B. KEEPSEAGLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conlon, Frantz, Phelan & Knapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Joseph Frantz +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 331 9306 dfrantz@conlonfrantz.com
TERMINATED: 03/03/2004 Greg Kirschner +1 202 331 7050

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GEORGE BELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GEORGE DUANE CHARGING, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GEORGIE H. PARENTEAU, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GERALD DRIVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GLASCO R. SPRIGGS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GLEN CHARLES FOX, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GLEN CUDMORE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo GLORIA FISCHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo HARRY BENALLY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo HENRY G. HARRISON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo HOWARD B. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo IVAN JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo James Anderson, L.l.c., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "JAMES ANDERSON"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES BIRDTAIL, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES D. PICOTTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES E. HARRISON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES G. JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James N. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Francis +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT E. GOODMAN, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Goodman, Jr. +1 214 368 1765

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES J. GARRETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES JOHNSON, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jennifer L. Scoliard, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Howell +1 817 377 4331 yona.2@netzero.net

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JAMES L. BAKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JEANNE R. LANDE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JEFFERSON B. BAKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2010 Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Marc Sellers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jsellers@cmht.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Christine Elizabeth Webber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 cwebber@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Ring Amunson +1 202 639 6023 +1 202 639 6066 jamunson@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
Space Katherine A. Fallow +1 202 639 6000 +Pleas eus eavalid kfallow@jenner.com
TERMINATED: 02/18/2009 Sam Hirsch +1 202 637 6397 +1 202 661 4900 shirsch@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF PHILLIP L. FRAAS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip Lawrence Fraas +1 202 223 1499 +1 202 223 1699 pfraas@phillipfraaslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo JEROME K. ALKIRE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail