Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 01-00181
District Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Marshall DePhillips +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 kdephillips@pszyjw.com
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com
Space Christopher James Lhulier +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl N. Kunz, III +1 302 888 6811 +1 302 571 1750 ckunz@morrisjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard K. Kudo
Space Scotta Edelen McFarland +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 smcfarland@pszyj.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosalie L. Spelman +1 302 472 9039 +1 302 397 2828 rspelman@potteranderson.com
  Entries (198) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2119 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
Final Claims Register 1 through 14481.. Filed by The Trumbull Group, LLC. (JAF, ) Modified text on 6/15/2009 (JRK). (Entered: 10/25/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2118 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
    Notice of Address Change . Filed by Bureau of Employer Tax Operations(BETO). (JAF, ) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2117 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
      Notice of Removal from Mailing Matrix Filed by RGIS Inventory Specialists. (Ahern, Joseph) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2116 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None
        Certificate of Service of the Trumbull Group, LLC Regarding the Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) Filed by The Trumbull Group, LLC. (related document(s) 2102 ). (Fallon, Craig) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2115 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
          Certificate of Service of the Trumbull Group, LLC Regarding the Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Non-Substantive) Filed by The Trumbull Group, LLC. (related document(s) 2113 ). (Fallon, Craig) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2114 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
            Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s) 2102 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2113 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
              Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Non-Substantive) (related document(s) 2103 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2112 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting the Relief Sought in Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Claim No. 14424 Filed by The New York Department of Taxation and Finance (related document(s) 2100 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2111 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Approving Stipulation Between the Liquidating Debtors and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue Regarding Claims Numbered 14473, 14474, 14478 and 14479 (related document(s) 2106 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2110 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting Final Application of FTI Consulting, Inc., Successor to PricewaterhouseCoopers Business Recovery Services that Served as Accounting and Financial Advisors to the Debtors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period January 16, 2001 Through March 31, 2002 (related document(s) 2105 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2109 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting Verified Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers Securities LLC for Allowance of Administrative Claim for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Related to the Services Provided Under the Order (related document(s) 2104 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2108 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting Final Decree Closing Case of Liquidating Debtors, Discharging Trumbull Group LLC and Approving Destruction of Documents (related document(s) 2107 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                          Order Granting Final Decree Closing Case of Liquidating Debtors, Discharging Trumbull Group LLC and Approving Destruction of Documents. (Related Doc # 2081 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2106 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                            Order Approving Stipulation Between the Liquidating Debtors and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue Regarding Claims Numbered 14473, 14474, 14478 and 14479. (related document(s) 2076 , 2077 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2105 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                              Order Granting Final Application of FTI Consulting, Inc., Successor to PricewaterhouseCoopers Business Recovery Services That Served as Accounting and Financial Advisors to the Debtors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period January 16, 2001 Through March 31, 2002. (Related Doc # 2080 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2104 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                Order Granting Verified Application of PricewaterhouseCoopers Securities LLC for Allowance of Administrative Claim for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Related to the Services Provided Under the Order. (related document(s) 646 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2103 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                  Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Non-Substantive). (related document(s) 2076 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                    Order Granting the Relief Sought in Liquidating Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive). (related document(s) 2077 ) Order Signed on 12/15/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, D through F) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2101 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                      Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 2096 , 2097 ) (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2100 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                        Order Granting the Relief Sought in Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Claim No. 14424 Filed by The New York Department of Taxation and Finance. (related document(s) 2075 ) Order Signed on 12/14/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2099 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                          Stipulation Between the Liquidating Debtors and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Depart of Revenue, Regarding Claims Numbered 14473, 14474, 14478 and 14479 By Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al (related document(s) 2077 , 2076 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2098 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                            Post-Confirmation Report Post-Confirmation Quarterly Summary Report for the Period of October 1, 2006 through December 15, 2006 Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                              Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon (related document(s) 2096 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2096 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2095 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Service for Notice of Errata Regarding Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Debtors' Objection to Claim of New Jersey, Division of Taxation (Corrected Claim No. 14471) (related document(s) 2094 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2094 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Debtors' Objection to Claim of New Jersey, Division of Taxation (Claim No. 1447) (related document(s) 2077 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2093 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Granting the Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Certain Claim of New York State Department of Taxation & Finance (Claim No. 14424) (related document(s) 2075 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2092 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                        Response to Debtor's Omnibus Objection to Claims Tenth (Substantive. (related document(s) 2077 ) Filed by South Carolina Department of Revenue (JAF, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2091 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Non-Substantive) with Respect to Claim of Wake County Revenue Dept. (Claim No. 13795) (related document(s) 2076 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2090 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Service of Answer (Objection) in Response to the Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to the Commonwealth's Claim Nos. 14473, 14474, 14478 and 14479 (related document(s) 2089 ) Filed by PA DEPT OF REVENUE. (Barnabei, Arnold) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2089 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                              Objection to the Liquidating Debtors' Ninth Omnibus Objection to the Commonwealth's Claim Nos. 14473, 14474, 14478 and 14479 (related document(s) 2078 , 2076 ) Filed by PA DEPT OF REVENUE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Barnabei, Arnold) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2088 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service re: December 1, 2006 service Notice of Submission of Proofs of Claim in Connection with the Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Certain Claim of New York State Department of Taxation & Finance (related document(s) 2086 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2087 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service re: December 1, 2006 service of Notice of Submission of Proofs of Claim in Connection with the Liquidating Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s) 2085 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2086 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim in Connection with the Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Certain Claim of New York State Department of Taxation & Finance (related document(s) 2075 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim in Connection with the Liquidating Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Substantive) (related document(s) 2077 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2084 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        Response to Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Certain Claim of New York State Department of Taxation & Finance. (related document(s) 1477 ) Filed by New York Department of Taxation and Finance (JAF, ) Modified Text on 1/31/2007 (JAF, ). (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Final Report in Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Address Change of Mitchell B. Weitzman, Esq. on behalf of U.S. Retail Partners, LLC. Filed by US Retail Partners, LLC, Successor In Interest To Long Gate LLC. (JAF, ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion for Final Decree (i) a Final Decree Closing Cases of the Liquidating Debtors; (ii) an Order Discharging Trumbull Group LLC as Agent for the Clerk; and (iii) an Order Authorizing Destruction of Documents Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/8/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2080 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period January 16, 2001 through March 31, 2002 Filed by FTI Consulting, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/8/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Proposed Form of Order # 12 Certificate of Service and Service List# 13 Certificate of Service and Service List for Notice Only) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2079 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Notice of Errata Regarding Notice of Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims [Correct Deadline for Responses is December 8, 2006] (related document(s) 2077 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Notice of Errata Regarding Notice of Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims [Correct Response Deadline is December 8, 2006] (related document(s) 2076 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2077 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      Omnibus Objection to Claims Tenth (Substantive) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        Omnibus Objection to Claims Ninth (Non0Substantive) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) Modified Text on 12/6/2006 (JAF, ). Modified Text on 12/13/2006 (JAF, ). (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2075 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Re-Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims as it Relates to Certain Claim of New York State Department of Taxation & Finance Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment # 2 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (related document 1477 )Modified Text on 1/31/2007 (JAF, ). (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2074 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            Post-Confirmation Report for the Period of August 29, 2006 Through September 30, 2006 [Quarterly] Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2073 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Removal from the Service List Filed by SAP America, Inc.. (Deviney, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2072 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order (OMNIBUS) Approving Final Fee Applications. (related document(s) 2057 , 2059 , 2060 , 2053 , 2061 , 2055 ) Order Signed on 10/25/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (LCN, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order Approving Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P.'s Motion for Entry of an Order Granting Leave to File Interim Fee Application for the Period June 1, 2004 Through August 29, 2006 and Final Fee Application of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P. for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Corporate Counsel to the Debtors for the Period From January 16, 2001 Through August 29, 2006 Late. (Related Doc # 2061 ) Order Signed on 10/25/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2070 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon (related document(s) 2067 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2069 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Interim Fee Application of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Corporate Counsel to the Debtors for the Period January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 (related document(s) 2060 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service for service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2006, at 10:00 A.M. Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon at the United States Bankruptcy Court, 824 North Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #1, Wilmington, DE 19801 (related document(s) 2067 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for HearingBefore the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP's Motion for Entry of an Order Granting Leave to File Interim Fee Application for the Period June 1, 2004 through August 29, 2006 and Final Fee Application of Parkder Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbusement of Expenses as Special Corporate Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 Late (related document(s) 2061 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Fourteenth and Final Application of Kirkland & Ellis LLP for Allowance of Administrative Claim for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Final Fee Period January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 (related document(s) 2059 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Final Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 (related document(s) 2053 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2063 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service of the Trumbull Group, LLC Regarding (i) Third Amended Disclosure Statement, as Modified, for the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Liquidating Plan of Reorganization, as Modified, Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United State Bankruptcy Code, and (ii) Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization as Modified Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United State Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Trumbull Group, LLC. (related document(s) 2046 , 2006 ). (Fallon, Craig) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 1, 2006 through August 31, 2006 Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to File Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for 2006Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P. as Special Corporate Counsel to the Debtors for the Interim Period of June 1, 2004 through August 29, 2006 and Final Fee Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 Late Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al (related document(s) 2060 ). Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/18/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2060 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Interim Period of June 1, 2004 through August 29, 2006 and Final Fee Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 Filed by Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein L.L.P. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/23/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service (Notice Only) and Service List# 5 Certificate of Service (for Entire Fee App) and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2059 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Allowance of Administrative Claim for the Final Fee Period January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 and The Final Interim Fee Period August 1, 2005 through August 29, 2006 Filed by KIRKLAND & ELLIS Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/19/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Proposed Form of Order # 6 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Service Notice of Filing of Application of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. as Lead Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al., for Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 330 and 331 (related document(s) 2057 ) Filed by Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Carignan, James) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation Application of Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. as Lead Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al., for Final Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 330 and 331 Filed by Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/18/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Certificate of Service) (Carignan, James) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Service Notice of Filing of Eighth and Final Application of Pepper Hamilton LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2004 Through August 29, 2006 (related document(s) 2055 ) Filed by Pepper Hamilton LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Stratton, David) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation Eighth and Final Application of Pepper Hamilton LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period August 1, 2004 Through August 29, 2006 Filed by Pepper Hamilton LLP Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/18/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Notice# 6 Certificate of Service) (Stratton, David) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2054 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Notice of Final Fee Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses, As Counsel to the Debtors, for the Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 (related document(s) 2053 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2053 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Final Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses, As Counsel to the Debtors, for the Period from January 16, 2001 through August 29, 2006 Filed by Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young, Jones & Weintraub LLP Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2006 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/16/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Affidavit of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2052 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service of the Trumbull Group Regarding Third Amended Disclosure Statement, as Modified, for the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Liquidating Plan of Reorganization, as Modified, Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Filed by The Trumbull Group, LLC.. (Fallon, Craig) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2051 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Twenty-Second Quarterly Period from April 1, 2006 through June 30, 2006 Filed by Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young, Jones & Weintraub LLP Objections due by 10/3/2006.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service and Service for Notice Only# 5 Certificate of Service and Service List for Fee App) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2050 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of The Trumbull Group, LLC Regarding the Notice of (1) Entry of Confirmation Order, (2) Effective Date of Plan, and (3) Appointment of Plan Administrator (related document(s) 2049 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B pt 1 of 3# 3 Exhibit B pt 2 of 3# 4 Exhibit B pt 3 of 3) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2049 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Effective Date /Notice of (1) Entry of Confirmation Order, (2) Effective Date of the Plan, and (3) Appointment of Plan Administrator Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2048 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Bar Date Notice of Final Administrative Bar Date [Filing Deadline: September 29, 2006] Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2047 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Bar Date Notice of Deadline for Filing Final Fee Applications [Deadline for Filing: September 29, 2006, Hearing on the Final Fee Applications: October 25, 2006] Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2046 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization as Modified. (related document(s) 2003 ) Order Signed on 8/28/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2045 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization as Modified Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2003 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2044 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtors And Discover Financial Services, LLC Providing For Relief From The Automatic Stay For Setoff and Other Related Relief. (Related Doc # 2016 ) Signed on 8/22/2006. (JMP, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2043 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Transfer of Claim (Administrative Claim No. 811 in the amount of $95,997.30) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: A & B HONGDA GROUP (POC # 811 for $95,997.30) To Argo Partners Filed by Argo Partners, Inc. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2042 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the honorable Brendan L. Shannon (related document(s) 2036 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2041 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing / Filing Proposed Order Confirming Debtors' Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization as Modified Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2005 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Affidavit of Service) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2040 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law in Support of Confirmation of Debtors' Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization, as Modified Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Verification# 2 Affidavit of Service with Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2039 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion For Entry of an Order Approving Stipulation Between Debtors And Discover Financial Services, LLC Providing for Relief From the Automatic Stay for Setoff And Other Related Relief (Docket No. 2016) (related document(s) 2016 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2038 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware (related document(s) 2036 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2037 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 1, 2006 through July 31, 2006 Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2036 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2006 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2035 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Transfer of administrative claim from Muzak LLC in the amount of $18,867.25(claim #12402) to ASM Capital, L.P. Filed by ASM Capital, L.P. (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2034 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit /Declaration of William R. Gruber, Jr., Certifying Voting On and Tabulation of Ballots Accepting And Rejecting The Third Amended Joint Consolidated Liquidating Plan of Reorganization, As Modified (related document(s) 2003 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Affidavit with service list) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2033 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Transfer of Claim (Administrative Claim No. 11017 in the amount of $31,000.00)) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Hampton Forge To Argo Partners Filed by Argo Partners, Inc. (related document(s) 2032 ) (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2032 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Transfer of Administrative Claim No. 11017 from Hamton Forge to Argo Partners in the amount of $34,215.00 Filed by Argo Partners, Inc. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2031 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Assignment of Administrative Claim No. 13077 from VUI INC to Argo Partners in the amount of $9,432.00 Filed by Argo Partners, Inc. (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2030 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Of [Signed] Order Granting Twenty-First Quarterly Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses, as Counsel to Debtors, for the Period From January 1, 2006 Through March 31, 2006 (related document(s) 2027 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2029 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Certification of No Objection Regarding Fee Application (related document(s) 2020 ) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Stratton, David) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2028 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Transferof administrative claim from Conxit Donna Watkins-Poplin Sec/Treasurer in the amount of $7,952.60(claim #13671) to ASM Capital, L.P. Filed by ASM Capital, L.P. (Moskowitz, Adam) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Twenty-First Quarterly Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses, as Counsel to Debtors, for the Period From January 1, 2006 Through March 31, 2006. (Related Doc # 1946 ) Order Signed on 7/26/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Twentieth Quarterly Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period From October 1, 2005 Through December 31, 2005. (Related Doc # 1939 ) Order Signed on 7/26/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2025 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twenty-First Quarterly Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP ("PSZYJW") for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from January 1, 2006 through March 31, 2006 (related document(s) 1946 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2024 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twentieth Quarterly Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young Jones & Weintraub LLP ("PSZYJW") for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from October 1, 2005 through December 31, 2005 (related document(s) 1939 ) Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Authorizing Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Costs to Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, P.C. Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Related Doc # 1993 ) Order Signed on 7/24/2006. (LCN, ) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2022 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 1, 2006 through June 30, 2006 Filed by Waccamaw's Homeplace, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service & Service List) (McFarland, Scotta) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNSEL'S Letter Requesting Telephonic Hearing on 2/12/01 [Filed by J Little, Atty/ MISSISSIPPI STATE TAX COMM] Re: Item # 54, [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #125 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION To Proposed Final Order Approving Post-Petition Financing and Granting Liens and Modifying Automatic Stay [Filed by J Little, Atty/ MISSISSIPPI STATE TAX COMMISSION] Re: Item # 32, [BAC] & Re: Item # 31, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #124 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by M Berkoff, Atty/ WEST ASHLEY SHOPPES ASSOCIATES [WASA] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #123 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Allowance of Pre-Petition Proof of Claim [Filed by J Hammond, Atty/ SALTON INC] , [BAC] NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/21/01] on 02/28/01 at 03:00 P.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #1, Wilmington, 19801, [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #122 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by P Bennison, Atty/ HERITAGE PROPERTY INVESTMENT LTD PARTNERSHIP ET AL] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #121 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by W Hazeltine, Atty/ MALL PROPERTIES] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #120 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by W Hazeltine, Atty/ KIMCO REALTY CORP] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #119 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by C Penner, Atty/ HOMEDICS INC] , [BAC] PROOF of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #118 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION For Order Authorizing Employment and Retention [OTTERBOURG STEINDLER HOUSTON & ROSEN] Jan 25, 2001 [Disposed], [BAC] NOTICE of Application [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/19/01] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #117 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by K Bifferato, Atty/ BLACK CHERRY LIMITED LIABILITY CO] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #116 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by M Minuti, Atty/ BENDERSON-WAINBERG ASSOC] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #115 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by C Ball, Atty/ ATLANTIC COMMONWEALTH PROPERTIES INC] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #114 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by R Kobert, Atty/ ZOM GATEWAY LTD] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #113 (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Signed and Located in Original Document [Limit Notice] Re: Item # 44, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #102 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Gray, Atty/ ZAMBAITI USA INC] [# 01-184] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #87 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Gray, Atty/ ZAMBAITI USA INC] [# 01-183] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #86 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Gray, Atty/ ZAMBAITI USA INC] [# 01-182] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #85 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Seann Gray, Atty/ ZAMBAITI USA INC] [#01-181] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #84 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Larsen, Atty/ PHD INC] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #81 (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for an Order Appointing Trumbull Services Company as Agent [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] [Disposed], [BAC] NOTICE of Application [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/13/01] , [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #80 (Entered: 01/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER Regarding Assignment ofJudge for Continuation of First Day Motions for 1/12/01 Re: Item # 77, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #79 (Entered: 01/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNSEL'S Agenda with Matters Scheduled on 01/31/01 at 09:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #2, Wilmington, 19801, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #78 (Entered: 01/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Finalized Exhibit [Filed by L Jones, Atty/ DEBTORS] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #77 (Entered: 01/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Assigning Case No. 01-181 to P J Walsh, Chief Judge, USBC , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #76 (Entered: 01/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by N Siegel, Atty/ MODEL IMPERIAL INC] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #75 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service [Supplemental] Re: Item # 71, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #74 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by M Menkowitz, Atty/ WACHOVIA MERCHANT SERVICES] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #73 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Carroll, Atty/ BLACK CHERRY LTD LIABILITY CO] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #72 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service [Supplemental] Re: Item # 24, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #71 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on 01/31/01 at 09:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #2, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 33, [BAC] NOTICE Of 1 Hearing to Approving Liquidation of Substantially All Assets of Debtor at Certain of its Retail Store Locations; 2 Invitation for Submission of Higher and Better Offers; 3 Bid Procedures and Deadlines for Submission of Competitive Bids; 4 Sch eduling of Auction; and 5 Establishing a Deadline for Filing and Service of Objections to Proposed Store Closing Sales , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #70 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by W Novotny, Atty/ MESA PAVILIONS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #69 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by C Niklas, Atty/ THE CAFARO COMPANY] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #68 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Deviney, Atty/ SAP AMERICA INC] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #67 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Of Hearing Held 1/17/01 , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #66 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 65, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #65 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by C Davis, Atty/ SELDIN COMPANY] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #64 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by W Novotny, Atty/ P G DEVELOPMENT II] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #63 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by B Bressler, Atty/ OXFORD VALLEY ROAD ASSOCIATES] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #62 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by S Larsen, Atty/ PHD, INC] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #61 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by M Beal, Atty/ COMMERCIAL NET LEASE REALTY INC] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #60 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 31, [BAC] & Re: Item # 32, [BAC] & Re: Item # 46, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #59 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service [Supplemental] Re: Item # 33, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #58A (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 33, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #58 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service [Supplemental] Re: Notice of Entry of Interim Order Re: Item # 24, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #57 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 17, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #56 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by R Mersky, Atty/ CBL ASSOCIATES PROPERTIES] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #55 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/2/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 23, [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 23, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #54 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 16 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 16, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #53 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 15 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTOR] Re: Item # 15, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #52 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 13 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTOR] Re: Item # 13, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #51 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 11 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 11, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #50 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 27 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 27, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #49 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion and Hearing on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 29, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #48 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] , [BAC] & Re: Item # 30, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #47 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Interim Hearing on Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Orders, etc [Filed by L Jones, Atty/ DEBTORS] Re: Item # 31, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #46 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion and Hearing [Hearing only if objections filed by 2/5/01] on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] , [BAC] & Re: Item # 22, [BAC] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #45 (Entered: 01/27/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion and Hearing on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801 [Disposed], [BAC] MOTION to Limit Notice & Approve Form & Manner of Notice [Filed by M Caloway, Atty/ DEBTORS] , [BAC] & Re: Item # 31, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #44 (Entered: 01/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of 341 meeting on 03/02/01 at 03:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, Room 2313, Wilmington, 19801, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #43 (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          U.S. TRUSTEE'S Notification of Scheduled 341 Creditor's Meeting [AMENDED] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #42 (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            U.S. TRUSTEE'S Notification of Scheduled 341 Creditor's Meeting , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #41 (Entered: 01/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Mailing to Agencies Re: Item # 1 [5 copies], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #40 (Entered: 01/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURT Reporter's Tape from Hearing on 1/17/00 , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #39 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Hearing Held 1/17/01 , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #38 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Ronald M Tucker Esq] [Filed by H Heiman, Atty/ SIMON PROPERTY GROUP ET AL], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #37 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by R Tucker, Atty/ SIMON PROPERTY GROUP ET AL] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #36 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CALENDAR Notice - Hearing on 02/12/01 at 05:00 P.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #6B, Wilmington, 19801, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #35 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by D Pollack, Atty/ NEW PLAN EXCEL REALTY TRUST INC ET AL] , [BAC] CERTIFICATE of Service , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #34 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order [EXPEDITED] [A] Authorizing Debtors to Conduct Store Closing Sales [B] Approving Termination Fee and Terms and Conditions of Auction [C] Authorizing Debtors to Enter Into Agency Agreement for Liquidation of Merchandise at Certain Stores, and [D] Fixing Ma nner and Extend of Notice [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 33, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #33 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INTERIM Order 1 Approving Post-Petition Financing and Granting Liens and Providing Administrative Expense Priority , 2 Granting Adequate Protection 3 Modifying Automatic Stay and 4 Setting Final Hearing Re: Item # 31, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #32 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EMERGENCY Motion for Interim and Final Orders 1 Approving Postpetition Financing, Granting Liens and Providing Administrative Expense Priority 2 Granting Adequate Protection, 3 Modifying Automatic Stay, and 4 Setting Final Hearing , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DO CKET ENTRY #31 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order [A] Authorizing but not Requiring, Debtors to [i] Pay Certain Accrued Pre-Petition Wages, Bonuses, and Commissions, [ii] Permit Employees to Use Accrued Pre-Petition vacation Time, [iii] Pay Employees' Pre-Petition Reimbursable Business Expenses, [iv] Mak e Accrued Pre-Petition Contributions to Employee Benefit Plans, etc , [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 30, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #30 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Implement a Postpetition Retention and Severance Program , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Under Letter of Credit Facility [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 28, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #28 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #27 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM Of Law in Support of Debtors' Motions for Orders Authorizing Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims Re: Item # 25, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #26 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Authorizing, But Not Requiring, Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of [A] Critical Vendors and [B] Certain Lessors , [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 25, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #25 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INTERIM Order [A] Establishing Procedure for Treatment of Valid Reclamation Claims and [B] Prohibiting Third Parties from Interfering with Delivery of Debtors' Goods, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #24 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order [A] Establishing Procedure for Treatment of Valid Reclamation Claims and [B] Prohibiting Third Parties from Interfering with Delivery of Debtors' Goods , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #23 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Kirkland & Ellis as Attorneys for Debtors [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #22 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order Authorizing [i] Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, [ii] Continued Use of Existing Business Forms and [iii] Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 21, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION For Authority to Pay in the Ordinary Course of Business Prepetition Claims Related to Shipping Charges [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 20, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations to Consumers and to Otherwise Continue in the Ordinary Course of Business Consumer Programs and Practices [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 19, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #19 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order Authorizing Payment of Sales and Use Taxes [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 18, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #18 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order 1 Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing, Altering or Refusing Service, and 2 Establishing a Procedure for Determining Adequate Assurances , [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 17, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Employ and Compensate Certain Professionals Utilized in Ordinary Course of Debtors' Business [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for an Order Authorizing Retention of Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein As Special Corporate Counsel to Debtors [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order [ADMINISTRATIVE] Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals and Committee Members [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 14, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Pricewaterhousecoopers as Accounting and Financial Advisors for Debtors [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST Motion for Order Admitting Certain Attorneys for Debtors , [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 12, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Pachulski Stang Ziehl Young & Jones as Co-Counsel for Debtors [Disposed], [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Authority to Debtors to Mail Initial Notices and to File a List of Creditors [Without Claim Amounts] In Lieu of a Matrix [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 10, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Extending Time to File Schedules, Lists and Statements of Financial Affairs [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 9, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT Motion for Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases [# 01-181 through # 01-184] [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court An Order has been entered directing joint administration of HomePlace of America, Inc, et al [Case Nos 01-181 through 01-184]; The Docket in Case No. 010181 should be consulted for all matters affecting the above-listed cases. Re: Item # 8, [BAC], ORIGINA L NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #8 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Kevin J Simard, Esq] [Disposed], [BAC] ORDER Signed In Court Re: Item # 7, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LIST OF EQUITY HOLDERS w/ Declaration of D A Frost/ DEBTORS] , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LIST OF CREDITORS W/ Declaration of David A Frost/ DEBTORS, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of DAVID A FROST, Senior Vice Pres of Finance and Corporate Sec of Each of Debtors in Support of First Day Motions , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGENDA & INDEX of First Day Motions & Orders , [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING Held 1/17/01 FOLLOWING FIRST DAY ORDERS & RELATED PLEADINGS WERE PRESENTED IN OPEN COURT by Laura Davis Jones, Esquire: Re: Item # 1, [BAC], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #2 (Entered: 01/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            VOLUNTARY Petition Under Chapter 11 , [LL], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1 (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 246 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?