CTC Communications Group, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 02-12873
District Judge Peter J. Walsh, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Brown Rudnick LLP, Creditor Committee
Officially listed as "Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP"

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Minuti +1 302 421 6840 +1 302 421 5873 mminuti@saul.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Baldiga +1 617 856 8586 +1 617 856 8201 wbaldiga@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2009 Tara L. Lattomus +1 302 425 0430 +1 302 425 0432 tlattomus@eckertseamans.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Minuti +1 302 421 6840 +1 302 421 5873 mminuti@saul.com
Space Jeremy W. Ryan +1 302 421 6805 +1 302 421 5861 jryan@saul.com
No Logo CRG Partners Group, LLC, successor to TRG Turnaround Management, as the Litigation Trustee and Class 6 Representative, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Minuti +1 302 421 6840 +1 302 421 5873 mminuti@saul.com
No Logo Ctc Communications Group, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew B. McGuire +1 302 467 4400 +1 302 467 4450 mcguire@lrclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LECG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward J. Kosmowski +1 646 282 2500 ekosmowski@epiqsystems.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Blake Cleary +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253 bankfilings@ycst.com
Space John T. Dorsey +1 302 571 6712 +1 302 576 3321 jdorsey@ycst.com
Space Pauline K. Morgan +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253 bank@ycst.com
TERMINATED: 10/19/2006 Brendan L. Shannon +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (171) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by New York State Public Service Commission. (JML, ) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
    Transcript of Omnibus Hearing on 11/5/02. (JML, ) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
      Application to Employ Application For Order Approving The Retention And Employment Of Deloitte & Touche LLP Nunc Pro Tunc As Consultants And Financial Advisors For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Deloitte & Touche LLP as Consultants and Financial Advisors Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 12/3/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Sheila T. Smith# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
        Application to Employ Application Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Of CTC Communications Group, Inc. et al. For An Order Authorizing Nunc Pro Tunc The Employment And Retention Of Saul Ewing LLP As Co-Counsel Saul Ewing LLP as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 12/3/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
          Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a) and Fed.R.Bank.P 2014(a), 2016 and 5002 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Miller Buckfire Lewis & Co., L.L.C. as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker to Debtors and Debtors In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to October 3, 2002 Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 65 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
            Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Jones Day Reavis & Pogue as Special Counsel for Debtors and Debtors In Possession Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 63 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
              Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Debtors' Application to Employ Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 62 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                Order (Final) Authorizong And Restricting Use Of Cash Collateral And Granting Adequate Protection. Signed on 11/8/2002 (Related Document(s) 17 and 36 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Service (Related to Order Granting Motion and Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice - Anthony L. Gray and William R. Baldiga) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 139 , 140 ). (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                    Order Granting Motion For Frederick D. Hyman To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 102 ) Signed on 11/7/2002. (MEL, ) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order Authorizing and Restricting Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 17 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases, Meeting of Creditors and Fixing of Certain Dates, dated October 31, 2002, Docket No. 134] Filed by Bankruptcy Services LLC (related document(s) 134 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Exhibit part 3# 4 Exhibit A part 4) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                          Order Authorizing Debtors To Employ Professionals Utilized In The Ordinary Course Of Business. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document 66 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                            Order Authorizing Employment & Retention Of Goldberg, Godles, Wiener & Wright As Special Regulatory Counsel For The Debtors. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document 64 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                              Order Approving Stipulation Granting Frederick Memorial Hospital, Inc.'s Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document 68 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 158 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                Order Authorizing Adoption And Impementation of Incentive And Retention Plan For Field Sales And Service Employees. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document 70 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                  Order Authorizing Adoption And Implenentation Of Company-Wide Severance Program And Payment Of Prepetition Severance To Former Employees. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document 54 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                    Order (Final) Authorizing Payment Of Prepetition Claims Of Critical Vendors. Signed on 11/5/2002 (Related Document(s) 10 and 34 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Appearance Notice of Entry of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers of Wilmer C. Bettinger, Esq. of Pepper Hamilton LLP Filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco Systems Capital Corporation. (Bettinger, Wilmer) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Shreiber & Associates, P.C.. (VIB, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice,(Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Revolution Networks, LLC. (VIB, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice,(Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Northeast Competitive Access Providers LLC. (VIB, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                              Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 142 ) . (LJJ, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Michael V. Girello re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to Employ Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 147 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Order (Administrative) Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation & Reimbursement Of Professionals. Signed on 11/4/2002 (Related Document 52 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates. Signed on 11/1/2002 (Related Document 109 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Order Authorizing Debtors to Employ Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 66 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Blacklined Version of Order) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: Docket No. 54; Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Authorizing (i) Adoption and Implementation of a Company-Wide Severance Program and (ii) Payment of Prepetition Severance to Former Employees Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 503(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 54 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Authority to Adopt and Implement Incentive and Retention Plan for Field Sales and Service Employees [Docket No. 70] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 70 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Order Authorizing (i) Adoption and Implementation of a Company-Wide Severance Program and (ii) Payment of Prepetition Severance to Former Employees Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 503(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 54] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 54 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Application for Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Goldberg, Godles, Weiner & Wright as Special Regulatory Counsel [Docket No. 64] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 64 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing AMENDED for November 5, 2002 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 128 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion to Extend Time Debtors' Motion for an Order Granting Debtors an Extension of Time Within Which to File Schedules Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2002 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 11/19/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of William R. Baldiga, Esquire. Signed on 10/31/2002 (Related Document 82 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Anthony L. Gray, Esquire. Signed on 10/31/2002 (Related Document 81 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Philip D. Anker, Esquire. Signed on 10/31/2002 (Related Document 98 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: docket no. 117; Debtors' First Omnibus Motion Authorizing Rejection of Unexpired Leases and Executory Contracts] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 117 ). (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: docket no. 128; Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for November 5, 2002 Hearing at 9:30 a.m. Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 128 ). (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: docket no. 52; Motion of Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Administrative Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 52 ). (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases, Meeting of Creditors and Fixing Certain Dates Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Appearance Notice Of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notices And Documents (Saul Ewing LLP as Local Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    Initial Reporting Requirements Initial Monthly Operating Report Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Joint Motion Of Relational Funding, et al. for Order Transferring Venue Of These Cases To The United States Bankruptcy Court For The District Of Massachusetts Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation (related document(s) 58 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Winter, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        Objection to Joint Motion Of Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, And Marcap Corporation For Order Transferring Venue Of These Cases To The United States Bankruptcy Court For The District Of Massachusetts [Docket No. 58], Filed by Toronto Dominion (Texas), Inc. as Agent for the Pre-Petition Lenders. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Exhibit C through Exhibit L to Exhibit 1 (Re: D.I. 120 ) Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C(1)(b) to Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit C(1)(c) Of Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit C(1)(d) of Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit C(2)(a) of Exhibit 1# 5 Exhibit C(2)(b) of Part 1# 6 Exhibit D to Exhibit 1# 7 Exhibit E to Exhibit 1# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G to Exhibit 1# 10 Exhibit H to Exhibit 1# 11 Exhibit I to Exhibit 1# 12 Exhibit J to Exhibit 1# 13 Exhibit K to Exhibit 1# 14 Exhibit L to Exhibit 1) (Winter, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing for November 5, 2002 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 Re: D.I. 120 Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (part 2) To Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit B (part3) To Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit B (part 4) To Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit B (part 5) To Exhibit 1# 5 Exhibit B (part 6) to Exhibit 1# 6 Exhibit B (part 7) of Exhibit 1# 7 Exhibit B (part 8) of Exhibit 1# 8 Exhibit B (part 9) of Exhibit 1# 9 Exhibit B (part 10) of Exhibit 1# 10 Exhibit B (part 11) of Exhibit 1# 11 Exhibit B (part 12) of Exhibit 1# 12 Exhibit B (part 13) of Exhibit 1# 13 Exhibit B (part 14) to Exhibit 1# 14 Exhibit B (part 15) of Exhibit 1# 15 Exhibit B (part 16) of Exhibit 1# 16 Exhibit B (part 17) of Exhibit 1# 17 Exhibit B (part 18) to Exhibit 1# 18 Exhibit B (part 19) of Exhibit 1# 19 Exhibit B (part 20) To Exhibit 1) (Winter, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                Response to Motion Debtors' Response to Joint Motion for Order Transferring Venue of These Cases to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Massachusetts Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 58 ). (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 52 [Motion of hte Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Administrative Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 52 ). (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Objection to Application Limited Objection of the United States Trustee to the Debtors' Applications for Orders Authorizing the Retentions of (1) Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP, (2) Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue, (3) Goldberg, Godles, Weiner & Wright, (4) Gadsby, Hannah, and (5) Miller Buckfire Lewis & Co., LLC (Re: Docket Nos. 62, 63, 64, 65 and 78) Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice Filed by pro se Key Equipment Finance. (VIB, ) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Order Approving Motion To Shorten Notice. Signed on 10/31/2002 (Related Document(s) 78 and 79 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Exhibit B,part 1 of 20, to Exhibit 1 (Complaint) to D.I. 120 Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation. (Winter, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion for Relief from Stay Motion To Modify The Automatic Stay. Receipt Number 062673 , Fee Amount $75. Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2002 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 11/19/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Notice # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List # 5 Exhibit 1 (Complaint)# 6 Exhibit 1-A) (Winter, Christopher) Modified on 11/1/2002 (CLO, ). (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Complaint by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation against CTC Communications Corporation. Receipt Number (EIE), Fee Amount Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, and MarCap Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Notice# 2 Notice of ADR# 3 Exhibit A) (Winter, Christopher) Modified on 11/1/2002 (CLO, ). (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DISMISSED ON 7/16/03 - SEE DOCKET #858 Motion for Relief from Stay (AUTOMATIC). Receipt Number 062676, Fee Amount $75. Filed by CCA Financial, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2002 at 12:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 11/15/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Certificate of Service) (Daluz, Tobey) Modified on 11/1/2002 (CLO, ). Modified on 7/17/2003 (MDW, ). (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Debtors' First Omnibus Motion Authorizing Rejection of Unexpired Leases and Executory Contracts Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2002 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 11/15/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Application to Employ Application For Authority To Employ And Retain Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP As Counsel For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 11/20/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Objection to Limited Opposition Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors To (1) Application For Order Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of CXO, L.L.C. As Crisis And Turnaround Manager For Debtors And Debtors In Possession; And (2) Application Of Debtors And Debtors In Possession For An Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) And 328(a) And Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a), 2016 And 5002 Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Miller Buckfire Lewis & Co., LLC As Financial Advisor And Investment Banker To The Debtors And Debtors In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc To October 3, 2002 [Docket Ref. Nos. 53 And 65, Respectively] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 65 , 53 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Objection to Motion OF THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS TO JOINT MOTION OF RELATIONAL FUNDING CORPORATION, RFC SUB NO. 5, INC., HELLER EMX, INC., INFORMATION LEASING COMPANY, PRESIDENTIAL BANK FSB, AND MARCAP CORPORATION FOR ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE OF THESE CASES TO THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MASSACHUSETTS [DOCKET REF. NO. 58] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Limited Objection to Motion OF THE DEBTORS AND DEBTORS IN POSSESSION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF PREPETITION CLAIMS OF CRITICAL VENDORS [DOCKET REF. NO. 10] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Objection to Motion (Emergency)EMERGENCY MOTION OF THE DEBTORS PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 105(A), 361, 363, 503(B) AND 507(B) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 4001(B) FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (A) AUTHORIZING USE CASH COLLATERAL (B) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION AND ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE PRIORITY AND (C) SCHEDULING A FINAL HEARING ON THE MOTION [DOCKET REF. NO. 17] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Objection to Limited Objection of the Operating Subsidiaries of Verizon Communications Inc. to the Debtors' Motion for Entry of Final Order (A) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and (B) Granting Adequate Protection and Administative Expense Priority (related documents 17 and 36) Filed by Verizon Communications Inc. (related document(s) 17 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Objection to Objection of the Operating Subsidiaries of Verizon Communications Inc. to the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services (related documents 14, 31, 35 and 38) Filed by Verizon Communications Inc. (related document(s) 35 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Missouri Department Of Revenue. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance And Request For Service, Filed by GATX Technology Services Corporation. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, Filed by pro se IBM Credit Corporation. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Telecom Realty, LLC (related document(s) 101 ). (Sullivan, Brian) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice Respecting Frederick D. Hyman Filed by Toronto Dominion (Texas), Inc. as Agent for the Pre-Petition Lenders. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Response to "RESPONSE OF TELECOM REALTY, LLC IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION OF THE DEBTORS PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 105(a), 361, 503(b), and 507(b) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE AND B.R. 4001(b) FOR ENRTY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS (A) AUTHORIZING THE USE OF CASH COLLATERAL (B) GRANTING ADEQUATE PROTECTION AND ADMINISTRATIVE EXPENSE PRIORITY AND (C) SCHEDULING A FINAL HEARING ON THE MOTION" Filed by Telecom Realty, LLC (related document(s) 43 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sullivan, Brian) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Renotice:Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/22/2002 at 10:00 AM at US District Court, 844 King St., Room 2112, Wilmington, Delaware. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/21/2003. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Emergency Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 361, 363, 503(b) and 507(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 400(b) For Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (B) Granting Adequate Protection and Administrative Expense Priority and (C) Scheduling a Final Hearing on the Motion Filed by The Southern New England Telephone Company (related document(s) 17 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Silverstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Philip D. Anker Filed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      [ENTERED IN ERROR]. Meeting of Creditors (RE-SCHEDULED). 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/26/2002 at 10:00 AM at US District Court, 844 King St., Room 2112, Wilmington, Delaware. (BMG, ) Modified on 10/28/2002 (BMG, ). (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Motion of RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc. to Debtors' Cash Collateral Motion Filed by RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc. (related document(s) 17 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Gwynne, Kurt) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Deposition of CTC Communications Corp. and CTC Communications Group, Inc. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ, P. 30(b)(6), as Incorporated by Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9014 (at the Law Offices of Reed Smith LLP, 1201 Market Street, Suite 1500, Wilmington, DE 19801 on November 4, 2002 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern)) Filed by RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Gwynne, Kurt) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for November 22, 2002 at 10:00 a.m. (PLEASE NOTE THE MEETING WAS RESCHEDULED FROM THE ORIGINAL DATE OF NOVEMBER 7, 2002) Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Motion of RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc. to Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Sections 105 and 366 of the Bankruptcy Code, For Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc. (related document(s) 14 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Gwynne, Kurt) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Motion of the Debtors for Order Determinig Adequate Assurance of Payment for Furure Utility Services and to the Interim Order dated October 4, 2002 Filed by Revolution Networks, LLC (related document(s) 38 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Attachment) (Grey, Joseph) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Motion of the Debtors for an Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services and the Interim Order dated October 4, 2002 Filed by Mid-Maine Telplus (related document(s) 38 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Grey, Joseph) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, For Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment For Future Utility Services Filed by The Southern New England Telephone Company (related document(s) 14 ). (Attachments: # 1 Armstrong World Industries Partial Transcript# 2 Weiner's Stores, Inc. Partial Transcript# 3 Certificate of Service) (Silverstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance re: Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices of RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc. Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 2002 and 9010 and Del.Bankr.LR. 2002-1(d) Filed by RCC Atlantic Long Distance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Gwynne, Kurt) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Motion of Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(B) of the Bankruptcy Code for Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by Genuity Solutions, Inc. (related document(s) 14 ). (Taylor, Gregory) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Verizon Communications Inc.. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice,(Certificate Of Notice)(Attached) Filed by Telcordia Technolgies, Inc.. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Certification Of Counsel Regarding Motion And Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice (William R. Baldiga) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 82 ). (Ryan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Certification Of Counsel Regarding Motion And Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice (Anthony L. Gray) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 81 ). (Ryan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion And Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice (William R. Baldiga for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Ryan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion And Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice (Anthony L. Gray for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Ryan, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: Docket Nos. 78 & 79] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 78 , 79 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Shorten Time Motion to Shorten Notice [Re: Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Gadsby Hannah as Special Labor and Employment Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Docket No. 78] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 78 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Employ Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Gadsby Hannah as Special Labor and Employment Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Gadsby Hannah as Special Labor and Employment Counsel Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/31/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Computer Sales International, Inc. ("CSI"). (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Owings Mills Corporate Center Associates Limited Partnership. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice Filed by pro se IOS Capital, Inc.. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Docket Nos. 70 & 71 Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 70 , 71 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance Filed by De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Huston Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Directing Supplemental Joint Administration Of Related Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 10/18/2002 (Related Document 50 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 10/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Shorten Time Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 70 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/31/2002. (Cleary, M. Blake) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize to Adopt and Implementation Incentive and Retention Plan for Field Sales and Service Employees Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/31/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Cleary, M. Blake) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service and Filing of Suggestion of Bankruptcy Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Cleary, M. Blake) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay or, In the Alternative, Motion for an Order Compelling Assumption or Rejection of Executory Contracts. Receipt Number 62459, Fee Amount $75. Filed by Frederick Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Phillips, John) Modified on 10/22/2002 (LML, ). (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service [REGARDING DOC NOS. 61, 62, 63, 64, 65, 66] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 62 , 63 , 64 , 65 , 66 ). (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Authorize Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 327, 328 and 330 for Order Authorizing Debtors to Employ Professionals Utilized In the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Employ Application of the Debtors and Debtors In Possession for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a), 2016 and 5002 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Miller Buckfure Lewis & Co., LLC as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker to the Debtors and Debtors In Possesion Nunc Pro Tunc to October 3, 2002 Miller Buckfire Lewis & Co., LLC as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker to the Debtors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Notice # 4 Proposed Form of Order) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Employ Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Goldberg, Godles, Weiner & Wright as Special Regulatory Counsel Goldberg, Godles, Weiner & Wright as Special Regulatory Counsel Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Application of Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to Retain and Employ Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue as Special Counsel Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue as Special Counsel to the Debtors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Employ Application to Authorize the Employment and Retention of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit Notice of Filing of Exhibit Re: Docket No. 53 [Debtors' Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CXO, L.L.C. as Crisis and Turnaround Manager for Debtors and Debtors In Possession] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 53 ). (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate of Service)(Attached) Filed by Dominion Telecom, Inc.. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice, (Certificate of Service)(Attached) Filed by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Transfer Venue Joint Motion Of Relational Funding Corporation, RFC Sub No. 5, Inc., Heller EMX, Inc., Information Leasing Company, Presidential Bank FSB, And Marcap Corporation For Order Transferring Venue Of These Cases To The United States Bankruptcy Court For The District Of Massachusetts Filed by Relational Funding Corporation, et al.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/31/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Notice # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Winter, Christopher) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance by William R. Baldiga of Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript Of Hearing Held On 10/4/2002. (MML, ) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appointment of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize (i)Adoption and Implementation of a Company-Wide Severance Program and (ii) Payment of Prepetition Severance to Former Employees Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 503(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Employ Application for Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CXO, L.L.C. as Crisis and Turnaround Manager for Debtors and Debtors In Possession CXO, L.L.C. as Crisis and Turaround Manager for Debtors and Debtors In Possession Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/29/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Administrative Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement ot Expenses of Professionals Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Supplemental Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for an Order Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases [Docket No. 50] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 50 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Motion for Joint Administration Supplemental Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for an Order Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of Related Chaper 11 Cases Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by The Southern New England Telephone Company. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Silverstein, Laurie) (Entered: 10/14/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by Telecom Realty, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sullivan, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request For Notices Filed by CCA Financial, LLC. (Daluz, Tobey) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/7/2002 at 10:00 AM at US District Court, 844 King St., Room 2313, Wilmington, Delaware. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/6/2003. (VIB, ) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service [RE: Nos. 37, 38, 42, 43] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 43 , 37 , 38 , 42 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for November 7, 2002 Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing of Entry of Interim Order and Final Hearing on Motion Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 17 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/29/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment # 2 Attachment) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service Notice of Motions and Entry of Orders [Re: Docket Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12, 13, 15, 18, 22, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30,& 32] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 4 , 15 , 6 , 7 , 12 , 13 ). (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance Filed by Toronto Dominion (Texas), Inc. as Agent for the Pre-Petition Lenders. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by Fleet Business Credit LLC. (Iorii, Regina) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of William J. Maffucci of Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP Filed by HUB Properties Trust. (Lemisch, Raymond) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Notice of Entry of Order Authorizing Debtors to Provide Adequate Assurance of Future Payment to Utility Companies Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(b) of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket Nos. 14 & 35} Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 35 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/25/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion and Interim Order) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Notice of (i) Entry of Interim Order and (ii) Hearing on Motion for Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Obligations to Certain Critical Vendors [Docket Nos. 10 & 34] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc. (related document(s) 34 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/5/2002 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 10/29/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion and Interim Order) (Beach, Sean) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim Order Authorizing and Restricting Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 17 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Order (1) Prohibiting Utilities From Discontinuing, Altering or Refusing Service, and (2) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurances of Future Utility Services -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 14 , 31 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 10 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Appear pro hac vice [Andrew L. Buck] (Related Doc # 18 ) Signed on 10/4/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Debtors' Application for Order Approving Debtors' Agreement With Bankruptcy Services LLC ("BSI") and Appointing BSI as Agent of the Bankruptcy Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 156(c) -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 15 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, for Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 14 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to File (a) Consolidated List of Creditors (Without Claim Amounts) In Lieu of Matrices and (b) Consolidated List of 40 Largest Unsecured Creditors -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 13 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Pursuant to Section 105(a), 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Them to Honor or Pay Prepetition Obligations to Their Customers -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 12 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to Maintain and Continue Their Insurance Programs and Related Relief (Related Doc # 11 ) Signed on 10/4/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to Pay Prepetition Trust Fund Taxes and for Related Relief (Related Doc # 9 ) Signed on 10/4/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them To (a) Continue Their Workers' Compensation Insurance Programs and (b) Pay Certain Prepetition Workers' Compensation Premiums and Related Expenses (Related Doc # 8 ) Signed on 10/4/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Pursuant to Section 105, 507 & 549 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Them To Pay: (a) Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries and Related Items; (b) Prepetition Employee Business Expenses; (c) Prepetition Contributions to and Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans; (d) Prepetition Employee Payroll Deductions and Withholdings; and (e) All Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments and Contributions -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 7 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order granting Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Entry of Order: (a) Approving Cash Management Systems, and Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms; (b) According Administrative Expense Status to All Postpetition Intercompany Claims and (c) Granting Interim Waiver of Investment and Deposit Pursuant to Section 345 of the Bankruptcy Code -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 6 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 5 ) Signed on 10/4/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order granting Motion for Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases -signed on 10/4/2002 (related document(s) 4 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 16 ) . (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Filed by CSI Leasing. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice Respecting David S. Curry Filed by Toronto Dominion Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Huggett, James) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Appear pro hac vice [Andrew L. Buck] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral Emergency Moton of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 361, 363, 503(b) and 507(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001(b) for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (a) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral (b) Granting Adequate Protection and Administrative Expense Priority and (c) Scheduling a Final Hearing on the Motion Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing to Consider First Day Motions Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/4/2002 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent Debtors' Application for Order Approving Debtors' Agreement With Bankruptcy Services LLC ("BSI") and Appointing BSI as Agent of the Bankruptcy Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 156(c) Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 366(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, for Order Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Mail Notices Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to File (a) Consolidated List of Creditors (Without Claim Amounts) In Lieu of Matrices and (b) Consolidated List of 40 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Continue Customer Programs Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Pursuant to Section 105(a), 1107 and 1108 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Them to Honor or Pay Prepetition Obligations to Their Customers Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to Maintain and Continue Their Insurance Programs and Related Relief Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them to Pay Prepetition Trust Fund Taxes and for Related Relief Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Authorizing Them To (a) Continue Their Workers' Compensation Insurance Programs and (b) Pay Certain Prepetition Workers' Compensation Premiums and Related Expenses Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Pay Employee Wages Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Order Pursuant to Section 105, 507 & 549 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Them To Pay: (a) Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries and Related Items; (b) Prepetition Employee Business Expenses; (c) Prepetition Contributions to and Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans; (d) Prepetition Employee Payroll Deductions and Withholdings; and (e) All Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments and Contributions Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion Waiving Investment/Deposit Requirements Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for Entry of Order: (a) Approving Cash Management Systems, and Use of Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms; (b) According Administrative Expense Status to All Postpetition Intercompany Claims and (c) Granting Interim Waiver of Investment and Deposit Pursuant to Section 345 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice [Erica M. Ryland] Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Joint Administration Motion of Debtors and Debtors In Possession for an Order Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit in Support Affidavit of John D. Pittenger In Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and Requests for First Day Relief Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of Creditors Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition CTC Communications Group, Inc.. Receipt Number 062141, Fee Amount $830. Filed by CTC Communications Group, Inc.. (Morgan, Pauline) Modified on 10/4/2002 (CLO, ). (Entered: 10/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 525 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?