Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 02-12945
District Judge Peter J. Walsh, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Integrated Telecom Express, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Carickhoff, Jr +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 dcarickhoff@pszyj.com
Space James E. O'Neill, III +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 joneill@pszyjw.com
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance And Request For Notice. Filed by IOS Capital, Inc.. (MML, ) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None
    Minute Sheet 341 Meeting Held and Concluded on 11/15/02 Filed by United States Trustee. (McMahon Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
      Objection to Plan Of Reorganization. Filed by pro se Erich Riesenberg (related document(s) 37 ). (MML, ) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2002 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service & Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/14/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
          Motion to Allow REQUEST TO ADJOUN HEARING ON SALE OF ASSETS Filed by Official Committee of Equity Holders. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2002 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 11/12/2002. (Gross, Kevin) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 94 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
            Notice of Appearance of Baker & McKenzie and Rosenthal, Monhait, Gross & Goddess, PA Filed by Official Committee of Equity Holders. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Gross, Kevin) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
              Order Authorizing The Retention Of Bankruptcy Services LLC As Notice, Claims And Balloting Agent For Debtor. Signed on 11/13/2002 (Related Document 41 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 15, 2002 at 12:00 Noon Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                  Order Prohibiting Utilities From Altering, Refusing, Or Discontinuing Service; And Establishing Procedures For Determining Adequate Assurance Of Payment For Future Utility Services. Signed on 11/8/2002 (Related Document 10 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/13/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                    Affidavit Re: First Supplemental Affidavit of Laura Davis Jones Regarding Application for ORder Under Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment of Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones P.C. as Counsel for Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 3 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding (i) NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P.'s Objections to the Proposed Disclosure Statement Accompanying Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 [Docket No. 86]; and (ii) NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P.'s Objections to the Motion of the Debtor for an Order: (A) Approving Voting Procedures With Respect to Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (B) Scheduling Certain Dates in Connection Therewith [Docket No. 87] Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P. (related document(s) 87 , 86 ). (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 41 Application to Retain Bankruptcy Services LLC Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 41 ). (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                          Objection to the Motion of Debtor for an Order: (A) Approving Voting Procedures With Respect to Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (B) Scheduling Certain Dates in Connection Therewith Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P. (related document(s) 59 ). (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                            Objection to the Proposed Disclosure Statement Accompanying Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P. (related document(s) 37 ). (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/11/2002, Entered: None
                              Application to Employ Application Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 2014(a) for Order Under Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment and Retention of PriceWaterHouseCoopers LLP As Accountants to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession PriceWaterHouseCoopers LLP as Accountants Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Objections due by 12/2/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Affidavit of D. Timothy Carey# 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/11/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                                Notice of Appearance Filed by Harbor Capital, LLC. (Grey, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                  Order Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation And Expense Reimbursement Of Professionals And Committee Members. Signed on 11/6/2002 (Related Document 6 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 11/08/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket Nos. 10 and 33 Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 33 , 10 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
                                      Application to Employ Application for Order Under Sections 327(e) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati as Debtor's Special Corporate and Litigation Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 8, 2002 Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati as Debtor's Special Corporate and Litigation Counsel Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Objections due by 11/27/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                        Transcript Of Hearing Held On 10/30/2002. (MML, ) (Entered: 11/07/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of Service Filed by United States Trustee (related document(s) 78 ). (McMahon Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                            Objection to Application Objection of the Acting United States Trustee to the Debtor's Motion for Order Under 11 U.S.C. Secs. 105, 345, 363, 364, 1107 and 1108 Authorizing (A) Maintenance of Existing Accounts, (B) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (C) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and (D) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements Filed by United States Trustee (related document(s) 8 ). (McMahon Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 11/06/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                              Motion to Assume/Reject Notice of Motion of Debtor for Order Authorizing Rejection of IOS Capital Lease and Establishing a Bar Date in Connection Therewith Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Objections due by 11/25/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service w Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/06/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Sale Notice of Proposed Sale of De Minimis Assets Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service with Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/06/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 7 and Order Docket No. 27 (NO ORDER REQUIRED) Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 27 , 7 ). (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Prepetition Claims Against Debtor and Procedure Therefore Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Docket No. 6 - Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Expense Reimbursement for Professionals and Committee Members Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 6 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Affidavit of Service# 3 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens SUPPLEMENT to Motion of Debtor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 and 365 for an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Sell Certain Assets, Including Intellectual Property, to the Person with the Highest and Best Offer, (B) Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Other Agreements, and (C) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 14 ). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service# (2) Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Prepetition Claims Against Debtor and Procedure Therefore Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 63 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Service List)(Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Signed] Order Authorizing Debtor to Enter into New Commercial Real Property Lease Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 66 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Signed] Order (A) Setting a Date to Conduct Auction of or Otherwise Sell Certain Assets, (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Approve the Sale of Such Assets, (C) Approving Bidding Procedures and Auction Terms and Conditions, and (D) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 64 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: [Signed] Order Authorizing and Approving Expedited Procedures for the Sale or Abandonment of De Minimis Assets Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 65 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: [Signed] Order Establishing Deadline to File Prepetition Claims Against Debtor and Granting Other Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 63 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/31/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Order Authorizing Entry Into New Commercial Real Property Lease (Related Doc # 46 ) Signed on 10/30/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Authorizing and Approving Expedited Procedures for the Sale or Abandonment of De Minimis Assets (Related Doc # 45 ) Signed on 10/30/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Order (A) Setting a Date to Conduct Auction of or Otherwise Sell Certain Assets, (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Approve the Sale of Such Assets, (C) Approving Bidding Procedures and Auction Terms and Conditions, and (D) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 13 ) Signed on 10/30/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Establishing Deadline to File Prepetition Claims Against the Debtor an Granting Other Related Relief (Related Doc # 12 ) Signed on 10/30/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 60 ) . (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Appointment of Official Committee Notice of Appointment of Official Committee of Equity Security Holders Filed by United States Trustee. (McMahon Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (Amended) on October 30, 2002 at 1:00 p.m. Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion to Approve Motion of Debtor for an Order: (A) Approving Voting Procedures with Respect to Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter of the Bankruptcy Code; and (B) Scheduling Certain Dates in Connection Therewith Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2002 at 12:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 11/12/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Notice # 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    Motion to Dismiss Case Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (Objection Deadline and Hearing Date To Be Determined) Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Robert M. Granum II# 2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Adam A. Lewis (Part 1 of 2)# 3 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Adam A. Lewis (Part 2 of 2)# 4 Certificate of Service) (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief in Opposition to the Debtor's Motion for Order (A) Authorizing Rejection of Non-Residential Real Property Lease; and (B) Establishing Bar Date for the Filing of Any Rejection Damages Claim Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P. (related document(s) 11 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Robert M. Granum II# 2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Adam A. Lewis (Part 1 of 2)# 3 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Adam A. Lewis (Part 2 of 2)# 4 Certificate of Service) (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 30, 2002 at 1:00 p.m. Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Proposed Order RE: Authorizing Debtor to Enter Into New Commercial Real Property Lease Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 46 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Certificate of Service regarding: 1) Summary of Schedules; 2) Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 50 , 51 ). (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order Approving Motion Of Debtor For Shortened Notice WithRespect To Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing & Approving Expedited Procedures For The Sale Or Abandonment Of De Minimis Assets. Signed on 10/24/2002 (Related Document(s) 44 and 45 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Approving Motion Of Debtor For Shortened Notice With Respect To Motion For Order Authorizing Entry Into New Office Lease. Signed on 10/24/2002 (Related Document(s) 46 and 47 ). (TAS, ) (Entered: 10/25/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Statement of Financial Affairs Statement of Financial Affairs (related to Docket No. 50 - Schedules) Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Schedules Summary of Schedules Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Initial Monthly Operating Report Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service# 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Motion of Debtor for Order Authorizing Entry into New Office Lease Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion to Shorten Time of Debtor for Shortened Notice with Respect to Motion for Order Authorizing Entry Into New Office Lease Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 46 ). (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize of Debtor for Order Authorizing Entry Into New Office Lease Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2002 at 01:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion to Authorize and Approve Expedited Procedures for the Sale or Abandonment of De Minimis Assets Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 44 ). Objections due by 10/28/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Motion to Shorten Time with Respect to Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Approving Expedited Procedures for the Sale or Abandonment of De Minimis Assets Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Meeting of Creditors/Commencement of Case and Fixing of Certain Dates Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List Part 1# 3 Service List Part 2) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service re: Disclosure Statement Accompanying Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 37 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Application to Employ Bankruptcy Services LLC as Notice, Claims and Balloting Agent Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Objections due by 11/7/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing on Approval of Disclosure Statement Accompanying Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 37 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2002 at 12:00 PM at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, District of Delaware, 824 Market Street, 5th Floor, Wilmington, DE 19801. Objections due by 11/12/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List Part 1# 3 Service List Part 2) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/15/2002 at 10:00 AM at US District Court, 844 King St., Room 2112, Wilmington, Delaware. (MML, ) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR. Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/15/2002 at 10:00 AM at US District Court, 844 King St., Room 2112, Wilmington, Delaware. (MML, ) Modified on 10/18/2002 (MML, ). (Entered: 10/18/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement Accompanying Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 36 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Debtor's Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors (Requested date/time: 11/15/02 @ 10:00 A.M.) Filed by United States Trustee. (McMahon Jr., Joseph) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service for Service of Order Authorizing Payment of Sales and Use Taxes Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 29 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service Notice of Motion for Order Under 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 366(A) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service; and (B) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 10 ). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion of Debtor for Order Under 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 345, 363, 1107 and 1108 Authorizing (A) Maintenance of Existing Accounts, (B) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (C) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and (D) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 8 ). Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2002 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 11/4/2002. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service Notice of Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Commissions; (B) Reimburse Employee Business Expenses and (C) Maintain Existing Employee Benefits and Policies Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 7 ). (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service List) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Bridge Order Pursuant to Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code Extending Prohibition on Utilities from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service to the Debtor -signed on 10/11/2002 (related document(s) 10 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Sales and Use Taxes -signed on 10/11/2002 (related document(s) 9 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Order Authorizing (A) Maintenance of Existing Accounts, (B) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (C) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and (D) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements (Related Doc # 8 ) Signed on 10/11/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Commissions; (B) Reimburse Employee Business Expenses and (C) Maintain Existing Employee Benefits and Policies-signed on 10/11/2002 (related document(s) 7 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion for admission pro hac vice (Tobias Keller)(Related Doc # 4 ) Signed on 10/11/2002. (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Ramon Naguiat) -signed on 10/11/2002 (related document(s) 5 ). (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 15 ) . (LJJ, ) (Entered: 10/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service Notice of Motion of Debtor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 363 and 365 for an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Sell Certain Assets, Including Intellectual Property, to the Person with the Highest and Best Offer, (B) Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Other Agreements, and (C) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 14 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service Notice of Motion for Order Under 11 U.S.C. sections 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Expense Reimbursement for Professionals and Committee Members Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 6 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service Notice of Debtor's Application for Order Under Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment of Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones P.C. as Counsel for Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 3 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Service Notice of Motion of Debtor for Order (A) Fixing the Deadline to File Proofs of Prepetition Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3003, 3004, and 2002; and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 12 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service Notice of Motion of Debtor for an Order (A) Setting a Date to Conduct Auction of or Otherwise Sell Certain Assets, (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Approve the Sale of Such Assets, (C) Approving Bidding Procedures and Auction Terms and Conditions, and (D) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 13 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service Notice of Motion of Debtor for Order (A) Authorizing Rejection of Non-Residential Real Property Lease; and (B) Establishing Bar Date for the Filing of any Rejection Damages Claim Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc. (related document(s) 11 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 10/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Morrison & Foerster, LLP and Ashby & Geddes, P.A. Filed by NMSBPCSLDHB, L.P.. (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 10/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing on First Day Motions Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2002 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtor for an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Sell Certain Assets, Including Intellectual Property, to the Person with the Highest and Best Offer, (B) Authorizing Debtor to Assume and Assign Certain Executory Contracts and Other Agreements, and (C) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Approve Motion of Debtor for an Order (A) Setting a Date to Conduct Auction of or Otherwise Sell Certain Assets, (B) Scheduling a Hearing to Approve the Sale of Such Assets, (C) Approving Bidding Procedures and Auction Terms and Conditions, and (D) Granting Related Relief Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Motion of Debtor for Order (A) Fixing the Deadline to File Proofs of Prepetition Claims and (B) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Motion of Debtor for Order (A) Authorizing Rejection of Non-Residential Real Property Lease; and (B) Establishing Bar Date for the Filing of Any Rejection Damages Claim Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Motion for Order (A) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service; and (B) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Motion of Debtor for Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Sales and Use Taxes Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Motion of Debtor for Order Authorizing (A) Maintenance of Existing Accounts, (B) Continued Use of Existing Business Forms, (C) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, and (D) Limited Waiver of Section 345(b) Deposit and Investment Requirements Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Proposed Form of Order) (Carickhoff, David) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Pay Employee Wages Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, and Commissions; (B) Reimburse Employee Business Expenses and (C) Maintain Existing Employee Benefits and Policies Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Expense Reimbursement for Professionals and Committee Members Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice Parties# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion of Laura Davis Jones for an Order Admitting Ramon Naguiat as Attorney for the Debtor Pursuant to Local District Court Rule 83.5(c) Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification of R. Naguiat# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion of Laura Davis Jones for an Order Admitting Tobias Keller as Attorney for the Debtor Pursuant to Local District Court Rule 83.5(c) Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification of T.S. Keller# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ/Retain Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones P.C. as Counsel for Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Statement Under Rule 2016# 2 Affidavit of Laura Davis Jones# 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit in Support Affidavit of James E. Williams in Support of First Day Motions Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Jones, Laura) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition of Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. Receipt Number 062258, Fee Amount $830. Filed by Integrated Telecom Express, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Voluntary Petition# 2 Attachment Board Resolutions# (3) Attachment 20 Largest and Certification# 4 Attachment Equity Holders and Certification# 5 Attachment Creditor Matrix Part 1# 6 Attachment Creditor Matrix Part 2# 7 Attachment Creditor Matrix Certification) (Jones, Laura) Modified on 10/9/2002 (MNB, ). (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 208 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?