Midland Steel Products Holding Company
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-10136
District Judge Kevin J. Carey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Trustee

Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. Jason Cornell +1 302 654 7444 +1 302 656 8920 jcornell@foxrothschild.com
Space Sheldon K. Rennie +1 302 654 7444 +1 302 656 8920 srennie@foxrothschild.com
Space MAGDALENA SCHARDT +1 215 299 2000 +1 215 299 2150 mschardt@frof.com
No Logo Midland Steel Products Holding Company, Debtor

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Davis Jones +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 ljones@pszjlaw.com
Space Rachel Lowy Werkheiser +1 302 652 4100 +1 302 652 4400 rwerkheiser@pszjlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Paula Ann Galbraith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula Ann Galbraith +1 302 658 1100 +1 302 658 1300

Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn M. Riley +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 sriley@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosalie L. Spelman +1 302 472 9039 +1 302 397 2828 rspelman@potteranderson.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Represented by drapgold.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Hiller +1 302 339 8776 +1 302 213 0043 adamh@drapgold.com

Represented by Law Offices of Paula Ann Galbraith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula Ann Galbraith +1 302 658 1100 +1 302 658 1300

Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
Notice of Address Change Filed by pro se CitiCapital Commercial Corporation. (VIB, ) (Entered: 02/14/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 11 Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 11 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 5 Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 5 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
        Objection to Debtors' Motion For An Order (i) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (ii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance and Cross-Motion For a Judicial Determination That the Debtors' Contract with Dominion Field Services, Inc. is a Forward Contract Under 11 U.S.C. Section 556, That Its Ipso Facto Clause is not Invalidated Under 11 U.S.C. Section 365(e), and That Termination of the Contract is Exempt From the Automatic Stay Filed by Dominion Field Services, Inc. (related document(s) 14 ). (Etkin, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
          Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Docket No. 91 Filed by General Motors Corporation. (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
            Request For Special Notice Disclosure Statement And Plan, And Inclusion On The Court's Master Calendar List ( Certificate Of Service)(Attached) Filed by Amplicon, Inc. ("Amplicon"). (VIB, ) Modified on 2/5/2003 (VIB, ). (Entered: 02/05/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
              Reply To Objection of Creditors' Committee to Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Authorizing Interim Post-Petition Financing Etc. Filed by GMAC Business Credit, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Baty, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                Response to Notice of General Motors Corporation's Joinder in Debtors' Response to Objections of the Creditors' Committee to the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing Filed by General Motors Corporation. (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                  Joinder by International Truck and Engine Corporation in Debtors' Response to Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors [Docket Nos. 81 and 89] Filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bifferato, Karen) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                    Motion to Allow Motion of the Debtors for Leave to File Debtors' Response to Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 46 , 15 , 81 , 35 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Docket No. 85 Filed by Pamela L. Pollock. (Vild, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                        Order signed on 2/4/2003 Granting Debtors' Motion to Continue Final Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing (related document(s) 84 ). (NJH, ) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (Amended) on February 5, 2003 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Vild, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                              Motion to Continue Hearing On Final Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 61 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                                Omnibus Hearing Order. Order signed on 2/4/2003. (VAW, ) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                  Stipulated Order Extending the Deadline by Which the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Must File a Response to Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing. Order signed on 2/3/2003 (related document(s)[15, 35]). (VAW, ) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                    Objection to Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements And Setting Final Hearing Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 35 ). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Hiller, Adam) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                      Application to Employ Amended Notice of Application for Order Authorizing the Continued Employment and Retention of J.J. Kokal & Associates, Inc. as Restructuring Consultant for the Debtors J.J. Kokal & Associates, Inc. as Restructuring Consultant Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2003 at 02:30 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                        Certification of Counsel in Support of Omnibus Hearing Order Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                          Objection to Objection of Dominion East Ohio Gas to the Debtors' Motion for Order (i) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services and (ii) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Dominion East Ohio Gas (related document(s) 42 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Certificate of Service) (Demmy, John) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Appearance of Michael S. Etkin, Esq. Filed by Dominion Field Services, Inc.. (Etkin, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 12, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Signed] Order (Interim) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 69 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 02/01/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulated Order Extending The Deadline By Which The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Must File A Response To Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers? Agreements, And Setting Final Hearing Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 35 ). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order Stipulated Order Extending The Deadline By Which The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Must File A Response To Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection [TRUNCATED]# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Hiller, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Application to Employ Application for Order Authorizing the Continued Employment and Retention of J.J. Kokal & Associates, Inc. as Restructuring Consultant for the Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 363 and 105 J.J. Kokal & Associates, Inc. as Restructuring Consultant Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2003 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Floor, Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 2/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Appointment of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Application to Employ Bankruptcy Services, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. Hearing scheduled for 2/12/2003 at 02:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/10/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Notice of Appearance Request for Service of Papers and Request to be added to Debtors' Matrix Filed by GMAC Business Credit, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Baty, Donald) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Order (Interim) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC. (related document(s) 57 ) signed on 1/28/2003. (GB, ) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors for February 21, 2003 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Julie L. Compton. (Compton, Julie) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Appearance Amended Filed by International Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, ("UAW"). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kaufman, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 57 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Objection to Motion Objection Of the Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors To Debtors' Motion For Authority To Enter Into A Post-Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement With AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 58 , 57 ). (Hiller, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Electronic Data Systems Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Snyder, David) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Approving Motion to Shorten Time Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion Requesting the Entry of Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC. (related document(s) 58 ) Signed on 1/24/2003. (GB, ) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 5, 2003 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by International Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, ("UAW"). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kaufman, Susan) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet for 1/17/03. (MAS, ) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion to Shorten Time Regarding Debtors' Emergency Motion Requesting the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 57 ). Hearing scheduled for 1/28/2003 at 03:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 1/28/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion to Approve Debtors' Emergency Motion Requesting the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Post Petition Insurance Premium Financing Agreement with AFCO Premium Credit LLC Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. Hearing scheduled for 1/28/2003 at 03:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 1/28/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Docket No. 54 Filed by General Motors Corporation. (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notices and Papers Filed by International Truck and Engine Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bifferato, Karen) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Appearance Filed by General Motors Corporation. (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order Authorizing Debtors' Interim Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Business Forms, and Cash Management System Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 31 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order Admitting Attorneys for Debtors Pursuant to Local District Court Rule 83.5 Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 27 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order (I) Granting Authority to Pay Prepetition Use and Other Taxes and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 28 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order (A) Debtors Granting Authorizing to (I) Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Items, (II) Reimburse Prepeptition Employee Business Expenses, and (III) Make Certain Payments for Whcih Payroll Deductions were Made, (IV) Honor Prepetition Contributions and Pay Prepetition Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans, and (V) Pay all Taxes, Costs, and Expenses Incident Thereto (B) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 29 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order Authorizing Debtors to (I) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 39 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Order (I) Authorizing Debtors' Payment of Certain Critical Prepeptition Vendor Charges; and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 40 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of [Signed] Interim Order Authorizing Limited PostPetition Financing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 25 ). (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Post Petition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing (Related Docket Nos. 15 and 35) Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 15 ). Hearing scheduled for 2/5/2003 at 03:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/31/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1# 2 Exhibit A, Part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/19/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Notice of Application for Order Under Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones P.C. as Bankruptcy Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 5 ). Hearing scheduled for 2/12/2003 at 02:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/3/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/19/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Notice of Debos' Application for Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing Employment McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Co., L.P.A., as Attorneys for Debtors Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 6 ). Hearing scheduled for 2/12/2003 at 02:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/3/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/19/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion for Administrative Order Under 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals and Committee Members Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 11 ). Hearing scheduled for 2/12/2003 at 02:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/3/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/19/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedure for Determining Adequate Requests for Additional Adequate Assurances Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 14 ). Hearing scheduled for 2/12/2003 at 02:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/3/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/19/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    List of Creditors Supplemental Consolidated List Of All Creditors Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Galbraith, Paula) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order (I) Authorizing Debtors' Payment of Certain Critical Prepetition Vendor Charges; and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief. Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s) 12 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Debtors to (I) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief. Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s) 10 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Amended Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b). Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s)[2, 26]). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Sign-in Sheet for Hearing on January 16, 2003. (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Order (Bridge) Pursuant to Section 366 of the Bankruptcy Code Extending Prohibition on Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service to the Debtors. Signed on 1/17/2003. (GB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Authorizing Interim Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing. (related document(s) 15 ) Signed on 1/17/2003. (GB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Order Admitting Attorney for General Motors Corporation Pursuant to Local District Court Rule 83.5. (Robert B. Weiss) Order signed on 1/17/2003 (related document(s) 21 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Pamela L. Pollock Regarding Docket No. 22 Filed by Pamela L. Pollock (related document(s) 22 ). (Vild, Michael) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Sign-in Sheet of Hearing of January 15, 2003. (Related document(s) 18 ) (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Debtors' Interim Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Business Forms, and Cash Management System. (Related document(s) 16 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Critical Prepetition Shipping Charges and (II) Authorizing All Financial Institutions to Honor and Pay All Checks Related Thereto. (Related document(s) 13 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Order (A) Debtors Granting Authority to (I) Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Items, (II) Reimburse Prepetition Employee Business Expenses, (III) Make Certain Payments For Which Payroll Deductions Were Made, (IV) Honor Prepetition Contributions and Pay Prepetition Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans, and (V) Pay All Taxes, Costs, and Expenses Incident Thereto (B) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process and Transfer Related to Such Relief. Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s) 9 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order (I) Granting Authority to Pay Prepetition Use and Other Taxes and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief. (Related document(s)[8}). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Order Admitting Attorneys for Debtors Pursuant to Local District Court Rule 83.5. Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s) 7 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b). (Related document(s) 2 ) Signed on 1/16/2003. (GB, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Interim Order Authorizing Limited Postpetition Financing. Order signed on 1/16/2003 (related document(s) 15 ). (VAW, ) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Interim Order Authorizing Limited Postpetition Financing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 15 ). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald F. Baty, Jr. (related document(s) 19 ) Signed on 1/15/2003. (GB, ) Modified on 1/15/2003 (GB, ). (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Objection to /Omnibus Objection of Bank of America, National Association to Certain First Day Pleadings Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Vild, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Robert B. Weiss Filed by General Motors Corporation. (Shannon, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 17 ). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Donald F. Baty, Jr., as Attorney for GMAC Business Credit, LLC Filed by John T. Carroll III. (Carroll, John) (Entered: 01/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing on First Day Motions Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. Hearing scheduled for 1/15/2003 at 03:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing to Consider the Interim Order Authorizing Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company (related document(s) 15 ). Hearing scheduled for 1/15/2003 at 03:00 PM at US District Court, 844 King St., Courtroom #2B, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Werkheiser, Rachel) (Entered: 01/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Motion for an Order Authorizing Interim Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Business Forms, and Cash Management System Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Approve Debtor In Possession Financing Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Postpetition Financing, Granting Adequate Protection, Approving Designated Customers' Agreements and Setting Final Hearing Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Authorize Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Critical Prepetition Shipping Charges and (II) Authorizing All Financial Institutions to Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers Related Thereto Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Critical Prepetition Vendor Charges; and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Motion for Administrative Order Under 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals and Committee Members Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Continue Customer Programs Motion for Order Authorzing Debtors to (I) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Pay Employee Wages Motion for Order (A) Granting Authority to (I) Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries, and Related Items, (II) Reimburse Prepetition Employee Business Expenses, (III) Make Certain Payments for Which Payroll Deductions Were Made, (IV) Honor Prepetition Contributions and Pay Prepetition Benefits Under Employee Benefit Plans, and (V) Pay all Taxes, Costs and Expenses Incident Thereto (B) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes Motion for an Order (I) Granting Debtors Authority to Pay Prepetition Use an Other Taxes and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Relief Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Appear pro hac vice Motion for Order Admitting Attorneys for Debtors Pro Hac Vice Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ/Retain Debtors' Application for Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Employment of McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Co., L.P.A. as Attorneys for Debtors Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Employ/Retain Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl, Young & Jones P.C. as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 2016 and Section 329 Statement# 2 Affidavit of Laura Davis Jones# 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit in Support Declaration of Darren Schwede in Support of Petitions and First Day Motions Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Transferring Chapter 11 Proceeding to the Honorable Lloyd King. Signed on 1/13/2003. (NAA, ) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number 063886, Fee Amount $830. Filed by Midland Steel Products Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Resolution# 2 Consolidated List of 20 Largest Creditors# 3 Declaration regarding List of 20 Largest# 4 Consolidated List of Equity Security Holders# 5 Certification regarding List of Equity Security Holders# 6 Consolidated List of All Creditors# 7 Certification regarding List of All Creditors) (Jones, Laura) Modified on 1/14/2003 (MNH, ). (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?