Phylos, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-11303
District Judge Mary F. Walrath, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Margaret L. Harrison, U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"
No Logo Phylos, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael R. Lastowski +1 302 657 4900 +1 302 657 4901 mlastowski@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Joseph Harrington +1 212 637 2331 +1 212 637 2937 william.harrington@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit 455 - Revoke Plan Confirmation
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 412
    LREF
    Blank 391
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
      Quarterly Application for Interim Professional Compensation --First Interim Quarterly Fee Application Request of Duane Morris LLP for the Period April 30, 2003 through September 30, 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. Objections due by 10/31/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
        Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 97 ) (KPM, ) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None
          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before The Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2003 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
            Certificate of Service (related document(s) 88 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
              Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) for the Period August 1, 2003 Through August 31, 2003, Filed by First Jensen Group, Inc. Objections due by 10/16/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
                Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) for the Period August 1, 2003 Through August 31, 2003, Filed by Deutsch Williams DeRensis Brooks & Holland, P.C. Objections due by 10/16/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
                  Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 09/26/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                    Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 79 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: None
                      Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 78 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                        Order (LICENSE APPROVAL) Regarding Stipulation By and Among Debtor, Gryphon Therapeutics, Inc. and Brian Seed with Respect to Research and Development Collaboration and Non-Exclusive License Agreement. (related document(s) 77 ) Order Signed in Court on 9/15/2003. (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                          Order Authorizing Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession to Retain and Employ Clark & Elbing LLP as Patent and Intellectual Property Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Application Date. (related document(s) 76 ) Order Signed in Court on 9/15/2003. (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                            Order Establishing Bar Date and Approving Notice Procedures. (related document(s) 75 ) Order Signed in Court on 9/15/2003. (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                              Order Extending Plan Exclusivity Periods. (related document(s) 74 ) Order Signed in Court on 9/15/2003. (KPM, ) Modified on 9/16/2003 (KPM, ). (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 85 ) (KPM, ) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before the Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2003 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of No Objection to Motion for Approval of Stipulation By and Among Debtor, Gryphon Therapeutics, Inc. and Brian Seed With Respect to Research and Development Collaboration and Non-Exclusive License Agreement, (related document(s) 77 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of No Objection to Application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession for an Order Authorizing It To Retain and Employ Clark & Elbing LLP as Patent and Intellectual Property Counsel to the Debtor, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Application Date, (related document(s) 76 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                        Certificate of No Objection to Debtor's Motion to Establish Bar Date, (related document(s) 75 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of No Objection to Debtor's First Motion for Extension of Plan Exclusivity Periods for a Period of Sixty (60) Days, (related document(s) 74 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers Filed by General Electric Capital Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Berkoff, Leslie) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) for the Period July 1, 2003 Through July 31, 2003, Filed by First Jensen Group, Inc. Objections due by 9/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) for the Period July 1, 2003 Through July 31, 2003, Filed by Deutsch Williams DeRensis Brooks & Holland, P.C. Objections due by 9/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Motion to Approve Stipulation by and among Debtor, Gryphon Therapeutics, Inc. and Brian Seed with Respect to Research and Development Collaboration and Non-Exclusive License Agreement Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2003 at 04:00 PM (check with court for location). Objections due by 9/8/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Application to Employ DEBTOR AND DEBTOR IN POSSESSION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING IT TO RETAIN AND EMPLOY CLARK & ELBING LLP AS PATENT AND INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY COUNSEL TO THE DEBTOR, NUNC PRO TUNC TO THE APPLICATION DATE CLARK &ELBING LLP as COUNSEL Filed by Special Counsel Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2003 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/8/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Motion to Establish Deadline to File Proofs of Claim Debtor's Motion to Establish Bar Date, Filed by Phylos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Bar Date Notice)# 2 Notice # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service)(Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Motion to Extend Time Debtor's First Motion for Extension of Plan Exclusivity Periods for a Period of Sixty (60) Days, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2003 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/8/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required (related document(s) 69 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate of No Objection - No order Required (related document(s) 68 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (THIS HEARING HAS BEEN CANCELLED), Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 8/15/2003 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) for the Period June 1, 2003 Through June 30, 2003, Filed by First Jensen Group, Inc. Objections due by 8/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) for the Period June 1, 2003 Through June 30, 2003, Filed by Deutsch Williams DeRensis Brooks & Holland, P.C. Objections due by 8/18/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Granting Application to Employ Duane Morris, LLP as Counsel to the Debtor (Related Doc # 20 ) Order Signed on 7/21/2003. (MJY, ) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Order: (A) Authorizing Debtor's Retention of Advanced Asset Services, Inc. as Auctioneer; (B) Authorizing and Approving Procedures to Sell Certain Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (C) Granting Related Relief Signed in Court on 7/23/03 (related document(s) 49 ) (JML, ) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Order Authorizing Debtor to (A) Execute Lease Amendment and (B) Assume Unexpired Lease With Ledgemont Realty Trust (As Amended) Signed in Court on 7/23/03 (related document(s) 47 ) (JML, ) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Order (WITH REVISIONS) Authorizing Postpetition Financing Signed in Court on 7/23/03 (related document(s) 45 ) (JML, ) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 58 ) (JML, ) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required - to First Monthly Fee Application for May 1, 2003 Through May 31, 2003, (related document(s) 48 ) Filed by Deutsch Williams DeRensis Brooks & Holland, P.C. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required - to First Monthly Fee Application for May 1, 2003 Through May 31, 2003, (related document(s) 50 ) Filed by First Jensen Group, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection to Motion of the Debtor and Debtor in Possession for Entry of Final Order Authorizing Secured Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(C) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, (related document(s) 45 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s) 54 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before The Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection to Motion for Order: (A) Authorizing Debtor's Retention of Advanced Asset Services, Inc. as Auctioneer; (B) Authorizing and Approving Procedures to Sell Certain Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (C) Granting Related Relief, (related document(s) 49 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection to Debtor's Motion for Authority to (A) Execute Lease Amendment and (B) Assume Unexpired Lease With Ledgemont Realty Trust (As Amended), (related document(s) 47 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection to Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Retain and Employ Duane Morris LLP as Counsel to the Debtor, (related document(s) 20 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order Exhibit A) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates -Order Signed on 7/17/2003. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Related document(s) 51 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 8/15/2003 at 10:30 AM., 9/15/2003 at 04:00 PM., 10/14/2003 at 09:30 AM., 11/6/2003 at 09:30 AM., 12/16/2003 at 10:30 AM. (MDE, ) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices American Express Travel Related Svcs Co Inc Corp Card c/o BECKET AND LEE, LLP P.O. BOX 3001 Malvern, PA 19355-0701. (Lee, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Dates, Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order Exhibit A) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Interim Professional Compensation " FIRST" for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Debtor for the Period from May 1, 2003 through May 31, 2003 Filed by First Jensen Group, Inc. Objections due by 7/21/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Application# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion to Authorize Debtor's Retention of Advanced Asset Services, Inc. as Auctioneer; (B) Authorizing and Approving Procedures to Sell Certain Assets of the Debtor Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (C) Granting Related Relief, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Notice # 5 Proposed Form of Order # 6 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            First Application for Compensation (Monthly) for the Period May 1, 2003 Through May 31, 2003, Filed by Deutsch Williams DeRensis Brooks & Holland, P.C. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Notice # 7 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion to Approve Debtor's Motion for Authority to (A) Execute Lease Amendment and (B) Assume Unexpired Lease With Ledgemont Realty Trust (As Amended), Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Notice # 4 Proposed Form of Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion to Authorize Secured Postpetition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/16/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order# 3 Notice # 4 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Order Authorizing Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Retain and Employ Richards Barry Joyce & Partners LLC as Real Estate Consultants -Order Signed in Court (related document(s) 27 ) on 6/19/2003 (MDE, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2003 (MDE, ). (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Administrative Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals -Order Signed in Court (related document(s) 6 ) on 6/16/2003 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (MDE, ) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Retain and Employ First Jensen Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor -Order Signed in Court (related document(s) 5 ) on 6/16/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 36 ) (MDE, ) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance /Request for Service Filed by Ledgemont Realty Trust (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (MDW, ) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re-Notice of Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain and Employ Duane Morris LLP as Counsel to the Debtor, (related document(s) 20 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2003 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/16/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice and Approve Form, Manner and Sufficiency of Notice (Re: Application to Employ Richards Barry Joyce & Partners, LLC as Real Estate Consultants)(related document(s) 27 , 28 ) -Order Signed on 6/12/2003 (MDE, ) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance /Request for Service Filed by InforMax, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (MDW, ) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before The Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2003 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certification of Counsel (related document(s) 6 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service - Notice of Filing of Initial Monthly Operating Report for Phylos, Inc. (related document(s) 33 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period (INITIAL) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Statement of Professionals' Compensation -- Notice of Filing of Debtor's Budget for the Period of June 2003 through September 2003 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Affidavit - Notice of Amount of Retainer After Reconciliation Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel (related document(s) 5 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Jack Malley (SUPPLEMENTAL) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Shorten Time /Notice and Approve Form, Manner and Sufficiency of Notice (related document(s) 27 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 6/9/2003. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Application to Employ Richards Barry Joyce & Partners, LLC as Real Estate Consultants Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 6/9/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Application# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Extension of Time for Filing Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs Signed in Court (related document(s) 12 ) Signed on 5/30/2003 (LC, ) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Order Authorizing Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Retain and Employ Deutsch Williams Brooks Derensis & Holland, P.C. as Counsel Signed in Court (related document(s) 7 ) Signed on 5/30/2003 (LC, ) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 15 ) (LC, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2003 (JML, ). (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service - Notice of Filing of Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for Phylos, Inc. (related document(s) 21 , 22 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Schedules of Assets and Liabilities Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Employ Duane Morris, LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Application# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Certificate of Service) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 12 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 7 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 6 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 5 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Before The Honorable Mary F. Walrath, Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Statement That Unsecured Creditors' Committee Has Not Been Appointed Filed by Margaret Louise Harrison. (Harrison, Margaret) (Entered: 05/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Shorten Time / Notice and Approve Form, Manner and Sufficiency of Notice (related document(s) 12 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 5/23/2003. (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 5/23/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Service List) (Harrington, William) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Admitting Carolyn A. Bankowski for Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 3 ) Signed on 5/5/2003. (JML, ) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Admitting James F. Coffey for Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 2 ) Signed on 5/5/2003. (JML, ) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Certificate of Service (related document(s) 1 , 2 , 3 , 4 , 5 , 6 , 7 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request of US Trustee to Schedule Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Filed by Margaret Louise Harrison. (Harrison, Margaret) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Employ -- Application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession for an Order Authorizing it to Retain and Employ Deutsch Williams Brooks Derensis & Holland, P.C. as Counsel Deutsch Williams Brooks Derensis & Holland,P.C. as Counsel Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 5/22/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Authorize --Motion of Debtor and Debtor in Possession for an Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(A) and 331 of the Bankruptcy Code, Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 5/22/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ -- Application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession for an Order (A) Authorizing it to Retain and Employ First Jensen Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor and (B) Approving Proposed Fee Structure First Jensen Group, Inc. as Financial Advisor Filed by Phylos, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/30/2003 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). Objections due by 5/22/2003. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Certificate of Service) (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2 , 3 ) Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Motion of Michael R. Lastowski for an Order Admitting Carolyn A. Bankowski for Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Pro Hac Vice, Pursuant to District Court Local Rule 83.5 and Del. Bankr. LR 9010-1 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Motion of Michael R. Lastowski for an Order Admitting James F. Coffey for Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Pro Hac Vice, Pursuant to District Court Local Rule 83.5 and Del. Bankr. LR 9010-1 Filed by Phylos, Inc. (Lastowski, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number 065875, Fee Amount $830. Filed by Phylos, Inc.. (Lastowski, Michael) Modified on 5/1/2003 (BJM). (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 236 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?