Plassein International Corp.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-11489
District Judge Kevin Gross, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 9:45 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo William Brandt, as Chapter 7 Trustee of PL Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors, Plaintiff

Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason A. Cincilla +1 302 657 2100 jcincilla@cmjlaw.com

Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Page Simon +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 csimon@crosslaw.com
No Logo Jeoffrey L. Burtch, Trustee

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeoffrey L. Burtch +1 302 652 3641 +1 302 652 5379 jlburtch@ctlaw.org
No Logo William A. Brandt, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee of Pl Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors, Trustee

Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Scott Mann +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 kmann@crosslaw.com
No Logo William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee, Trustee

Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Cross, Jr. +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 rcross@crosslaw.com
Space Amy Elizabeth Evans +1 302 777 4200 aevans@crosslaw.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia Beth Davis +1 302 575 5113 +1 302 425 3096 adavis@mnat.com
Space Laura V. McGeoch +1 302 575 5147 +1 302 425 4693 lmcgeoch@mnat.com

Represented by Pinckney & Harris, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna L. Harris +1 302 655 5213 dharris@php-law.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Firth, III +1 302 295 4875 +1 302 295 4876 WFirth@offitkurman.com

Represented by Murphy & King, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles R. Bennett, Jr. +1 617 423 0400 +1 617 423 0498 bankruptcy@hanify.com

Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

No Logo Plassein International Corp., Plassein International Corp., Debtor

Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Cross, Jr. +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 rcross@crosslaw.com

Represented by Landis Rath & Cobb, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam G. Landis +1 302 467 4400 +1 302 467 4450 landis@lrclaw.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia Beth Davis +1 302 575 5113 +1 302 425 3096 adavis@mnat.com
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Service (related document(s) 1768 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
    Order Approving the Fourteenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period November 1, 2008 Through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 1766 ) Order Signed on 5/13/2010. (SDJ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Fourteenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period November 1, 2008 Through March 31, 2010 (related document(s) 1766 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Schwartz, Eric) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
        Fourteenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period November 1, 2008 Through March 31, 2010 Filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. Objections due by 5/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A 1# 3 Exhibit A 2# 4 Exhibit B 1# 5 Exhibit B 2# 6 Proposed Form of Order # 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 1764 ) Service Date 04/16/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/17/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
            Transcript regarding Hearing Held 1/13/2009 RE: Trial. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/14/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribers, Telephone number (609)586-2311.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/21/2010. Redaction Request Due By 5/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/17/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/14/2010. (BJM) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
              Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period //Semi-Annual Report for Period Ending December 31, 2009 Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                Notice of Service Re: Order Approving Second and Final Interim Application of David S. Scharfstein and the Analysis Group, Inc. for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Experts to the Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s) 1761 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                  Order Approving Second and Final Interim Application of David S. Scharfstein and the Analysis Group, Inc. for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Experts to the Chapter 7 Trustee. (Related Doc # 1759 ) Order Signed on 7/28/2009. (SDJ) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                    Certificate of No Objection Re: Second And Final Application Of David S. Scharfstein And The Analysis Group, Inc., For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Financial Experts To The Chapter 7 Trustee (Incurred For The Period June 1, 2007 Through January 31, 2009) (related document(s) 1759 ) Filed by David S. Scharfstein and the Analysis Group, Inc.. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                      Application for Compensation Second (Incurred For The July 29, 2008 Through January 31, 2009) And Final Application Of David S. Scharfstein And The Analysis Group, Inc., For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Financial Experts To The Chapter 7 Trustee (Incurred For The Period June 1, 2007 Through January 31, 2009) Filed by David S. Scharfstein and the Analysis Group, Inc.. Objections due by 7/8/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (Part 1)# 3 Exhibit B (Part 2)# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Notice # 7 Proposed Form of Order # 8 Certificate of Service # 9 Service List (List 1)# 10 Service List (List 2)) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                        Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Semi-Annual Report (Period Ending December 31, 2008) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                          Notice of Service (related document(s) 1753 , 1754 , 1756 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                            Order Approving the Thirteenth Interim Application of Morris Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, as Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Actual and Necessary Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period July 1, 2008 Through October 31, 2008. (Related Doc # 1750 ) Order Signed on 1/7/2009. (LCN) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Thirteenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period July 1, 2008 Through October 31, 2008 (related document(s) 1750 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                Order Approving the Twelfth Interim Application of Morris Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, as Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Actual and Necessary Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of all Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred for the Period March 1, 2008 Through June 30, 2008. (Related Doc # 1738 ) Order Signed on 1/5/2009. (LCN) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                  Order Approving First Interim Application of David S. Scharfstain and the Analysis Group, Inc. for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Experts to the Chapter 7 Trustee. (Related Doc # 1739 ) Order Signed on 1/5/2009. (LCN) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                    HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s) 1751 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2009 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2009 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                        Application for Compensation (Thirteenth) for the Period July 1, 2008 through October 31, 2008 Filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2009 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A-1# 3 Exhibit A-2# 4 Exhibit B-1# 5 Exhibit B-2# 6 Proposed Form of Order # 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                          HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee of Pl Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                            Order Approving Fifth Interim Application of Cross & Simon, LLC for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Conflicts Counsel to William Brandt, as Chapter 7 Trustee, for the Period of March 1, 2008 Through October 31, 2008. (related document(s) 1741 ) Order Signed on 12/4/2008. (LCN) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                              Virtual Minutes of: 12/09/2008 Subject: FEE APPLICATIONS. Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: CNO FILED - ORDER SIGNED. (vCal Hearing ID (82924)). (related document(s) 1746 ) (SS) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 9, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee of Pl Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 1741 (related document(s) 1741 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee of Pl Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors. (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Hearing on Professional Fee Applications Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2009 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Interim Application David S. Scharfstein And The Analysis Group, Inc., For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Expenses As Financial Experts To The Chapter 7 Trustee (Incurred For The Period June 1, 2007 Through October 31, 2007) (related document(s) 1739 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Twelfth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period March 1, 2008 Through June 30, 2008 (related document(s) 1738 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Interim Application for Compensation (Fifth) 3/1/2008 through 10/31/08. Filed by Cross & Simon, LLC. The case judge is Kevin Gross. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (BAM) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims Filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board. The case judge is Kevin Gross. (BAM) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                              Application for Compensation (First) for the Period June 1, 2007 through October 31, 2007. Filed by David S. Scharfstein And The Analysis Group. Objections due by 11/17/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Proposed Form of Order # 6 Certificate of Service # 7 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Application for Compensation (Twelfth) for the Period March 1, 2008 through June 30, 2008. Filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. Objections due by 11/17/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A1# 3 Exhibit A2# 4 Exhibit B1# 5 Exhibit B2# 6 Proposed Form of Order # 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Service (related document(s) 1735 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s) 1734 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2008 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Authorizing Chapter 7 Trustee To Proceed With Settlement Amending Settlement Agreement By And Among The Trustee, Bank Of America, N.A., (As Successor In Interest To Fleet National Bank), For Itself And As Agent For Bank Of America, N.A., Heller Financial, Inc., Wachovia Bank, N.A. And Citizens Bank Of New Hampshire. (Related Doc # 1731 ) Order Signed on 10/6/2008. (LCN) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2008 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion By The Chapter 7 Trustee For Approval Of Settlement Amending Settlement Agreement By And Among The Chapter 7 Trustee, Bank Of America, N.A., As Successor In Interest To Fleet National Bank, For Itself And As Agent Of A Group Of Lenders Consisting Of Bank Of America, N.A. Heller Financial, Inc., Wachovia Bank, N.A. And Citizens Bank Of New Hampshire (related document(s) 1731 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            (COPY FROM DISTRICT COURT) Order Administratively Closing Civil Action No. 07-764. (related document(s) 1659 ) Order Signed on 9/23/2008 by the Honorable Joseph J. Farnan, Jr. (LCN, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Motion to Approve Motion By The Chapter 7 Trustee For Approval Of Settlement Amending Settlement Agreement By And Among The Chapter 7 Trustee, Bank Of America, N.A., As Successor In Interest To Fleet National Bank, For Itself And As Agent Of A Group Of Lenders Consisting Of Bank Of America, N.A. Heller Financial, Inc., Wachovia Bank, N.A. And Citizens Bank Of New Hampshire Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/8/2008 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/1/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                Minutes of Hearing held on: 09/05/2008 Subject: TELECONFERENCE and TELECONFERENCE ; RE: MOVING TRIAL FOR 9/8/9/10;. (vCal Hearing ID (78275)). (SS, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2008 (SS, ). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/13/2008 Subject: Pretrial Conference and Pretrial Conference in Adv. 05-51472. (vCal Hearing ID (74285)). (related document(s) 1727 ) (SS, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2008 (SS, ). (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Service Re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 13, 2008 at 2:00 P.M. (related document(s) 1727 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 1725 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Service Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 13, 2008 at 2:00 P.M. (related document(s) 1725 ) Filed by William Brandt, as Chapter 7 Trustee of PL Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/13/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period Ending June 30, 2008 [Semi-Annual Report] Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Semi-Annual Report# 2 Certificate of Service) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Proceeding Memo : # 1 Attachment Court Sign-In-Sheet) (related document(s) 1722 ) Telephonic hearing held 6/11/08 @ 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Judge Kevin Gross. (SS) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order Approving Third Application For Interim Compensation of William A. Brandt, Jr. Trustee, For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period April 1, 2008 Through February 29, 2008. (related document(s) 1698 ) Order Signed on 5/6/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Trustee's Third Application For Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period April 1, 2006 Through February 29, 2008 (related document(s) 1698 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Order Approving The Eleventh Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period September 1, 2007 Through February 29, 2008. (Related Doc # 1696 ) Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order [Revised] Approving The Ninth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual, And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period January 1, 2007 Through April 30, 2007. (Related Doc # 1646 ). Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order [Revised] Approving The Tenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual, And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbusement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period May 1, 2007 Through August 31, 2007. (Related Doc # 1647 ). Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) Modified to correct typographical error on 5/5/2008 (BMT, ). (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Approving First Application Of Fiondella, Milone, & Lasaracina, LLP, As Accountant For William A. Brandt Jr. Chapter 7 Trustee, For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual Reasonable And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period July 1, 2007 Through March 18, 2008. (Related Doc # 1695 ). Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Order Granting First And Final Application Of Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, P.A. As Special Counsel To Trustee, For Final Allowance Of Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses (For The Period March 20, 2006 Through December 31, 2007). (Related Doc # 1694 ). Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order Approving Fourth Interim Application Of Cross & Simon, LLC For Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Conflicts Counsel To William Brandt, As Chapter 7 Trustee, For The Period Of November 1, 2005 Through February 29, 2008. (Related Doc # 1693 ) Order Signed on 5/5/2008. (BMT, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 1696: Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2007 Through February 29, 2008 (Eleventh) (related document(s) 1696 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Application Of Fiondella, Milone & Lasaracina, LP As Accountant For William A. Brandt Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual Reasonable And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period Of July 1, 2007 Through March 18, 2008 (related document(s) 1695 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding First And Final Application Of Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, P.A. For Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Special Counsel To Trustee (For The Period Of March 20, 2006 Through December 31, 2007) (related document(s) 1694 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Certification of Counsel Regarding Tenth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period May 1, 2007 Through August 31, 2007 (related document(s) 1647 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Ninth Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, As Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period January 1, 2007 Through April 30, 2007 (related document(s) 1646 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection (related document(s) 1693 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Evans, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Service Re: Second Supplemental Declaration Of Eric D. Schwartz In Support Of Application By William Brandt, Chapter 7 Trustee, Pursuant To Section 327 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rule 2014, To Retain And Employ Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell lLP As Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc To February 4, 2004 (related document(s) 1704 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit Second Supplemental Declaration Of Eric D. Schwartz In Support Of Application By William Brandt, Chapter 7 Trustee, Pursuant To Section 327 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rule 2014, To Retain And Employ Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell lLP As Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc To February 4, 2004 (related document(s) 949 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Schwartz, Eric) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Order Approving Sixth Interim Application of Hanify & King Professional Corporation as Counsel to the Chapter 7 Trustee for Compensation for Services and Reimbursment of Expenses for the Period From November 1, 2006 Through February 29, 2008. (Related Doc # 1688 ) Order Signed on 4/23/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Order Approving the Eight Interim Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Counsel To The Chapter 7 Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Actual, Reasonable And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual, Reasonable And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period September 1, 2006 Through December 31, 2006. (Related Doc # 1605 ) Order Signed on 4/23/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2008 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2008 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Exhibit Notice of Filing of Corrected Exhibit B1 (related document(s) 1696 ) Filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B1# 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation Trustee's Third Application For Interim Compensation For Actual And Necessary Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred For The Period April 1, 2008 Through February 29, 2008 Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., as Chapter 7 Trustee of Pl Liquidation Corp. and Its Affiliated Debtors. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/1/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A Part 1# 3 Exhibit A Part 2# 4 Exhibit A Part 3# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Certificate of Service # 10 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Sixth Interim Application Of Hanify & King, Professional Corporation For Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Counsel To The Chapter 7 Trustee For The Period From November 1 2006 Through February 29, 2008 (related document(s) 1688 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 1, 2007 Through February 29, 2008 (Eleventh) Filed by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/30/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A1# 3 Exhibit A2# 4 Exhibit B1# 5 Exhibit B2# 6 Proposed Form of Order # 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      First Application for Compensation for the Period July 1, 2007 through March 18, 2008. Filed by Fiondella, Milone & Lasaracina, LLP. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Proposed Form of Order # 6 Certificate of Service) (Cordo, Ann) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation (First And Final) for Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, P.A., Trustee's Attorney, period: 3/20/2006 to 12/31/2007, fee: $3,880.00, expenses: $6,098.90. Filed by Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, P.A.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/29/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Cordo, Ann) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Interim Application for Compensation For Service Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Conflicts Counsel to William Brandt, as Chapter 7 Trustee, for the Period of November 1, 2005 Through February 29, 2008 (Fourth) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Floor, Room 309, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/25/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Attachment Cover Sheet# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Affidavit Verification of Amy Evans# 6 Proposed Form of Order # 7 Certificate of Service) (Evans, Amy) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1692 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service (related document(s) 1691 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1691 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Date. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s) 1690 ). Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2008 at 02:00 PM. Signed on 3/28/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing on Professional Fee Applications Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2008 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation (Sixth) For The Period November 1, 2006 Through February 29, 2008 Filed by Hanify & King Professional Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2008 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit A# 9 Exhibit B# 10 Exhibit C# 11 Exhibit D# 12 Exhibit E# 13 Proposed Form of Order # 14 Certificate of Service # 15 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service re Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Date (related document(s) 1686 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Date. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s) 1685 ). Omnibus Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2008 at 11:00 AM. Signed on 3/7/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1685 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service (related document(s) 1683 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Approving Motion to Destroy Books and Records and for Approval of Associated Stipulation Between the Trustee and Iron Mountain. (Related Doc # 1678 ) Order Signed on 2/15/2008. (LCN, ) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1682 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion To Destroy Books And Records And For Approval Of Associated Stipulation Between The Trustee And Iron Mountain (related document(s) 1678 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report of Semi-Annual Report for Period Ending December 31, 2007 Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Certificate of Service) (Butz, Daniel) Modified text on 1/30/2008 (BAM, ). (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/30/2008 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Service (related document(s) 1678 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Approve Destruction of Books and Records and for Approval of Associated Stipulation Between the Trustee and Iron Mountain Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Objections due by 2/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service Re: Supplemental Declaration Of Eric D. Schwartz In Support Of Application By William Brandt, Chapter 7 Trustee, Pursuant To Section 327 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rule 2014, To Retain And Employ Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP As Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc To February 4, 2004 (related document(s) 1676 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Schwartz, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration in Support (Eric D. Schwartz) of Application by William Brandt, Chapter 7 Trustee, Pursuant to Section 237 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 2014, to Retain and Employ Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP as Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to February 4, 2004 (related document(s) 949 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Schwartz, Eric) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service Re: Order Approving Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee To Pay Allowed Administrative Claims (related document(s) 1674 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Approving Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee To Pay Allowed Administrative Claims (Related Doc # 1669 ) Signed on 12/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (ALC, ) (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s) 1671 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2007 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Re: Motion Of Chapter 7 Trustee To Pay Allowed Administrative Claims (related document(s) 1669 ) Filed by William A. Brandt, Jr., Chapter 7 Trustee. (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Plassein International Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2007 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service and Service List) (Butz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 278 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?