MONTGOMERY WARD, LLC
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00201
District Judge Kevin Gross, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Attorneys for Debtors and the PA Committee of Montgomery Ward, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Attorneys for Debtors and the PA Committee of Montgomery Ward

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2004 Jason William Harbour +1 302 658 9200 +1 804 788 8218
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and NHB Assignments, LLC as Plan Administrator of Montgomery Ward, LLC, et al., Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Cross, Jr. +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 rcross@crosslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Martin Winter +1 302 657 4904 +1 302 397 2455 cmwinter@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek C. Abbott +1 302 658 9200 +1 302 658 3989 dabbott@mnat.com
TERMINATED: 06/16/2004 Jason William Harbour +1 302 658 9200 +1 804 788 8218
No Logo Ian Connor Bifferato, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Bifferato Gentilotti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian Connor Bifferato +1 302 429 0907 cbifferato@bglawde.com
No Logo Montgomergy Ward, Debtor In Possession

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Cross, Jr. +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 rcross@crosslaw.com
No Logo Oakwood Living Centers, Inc., Debtor In Possession

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Minuti +1 302 421 6840 +1 302 421 5873 mminuti@saul.com
Space Jeremy W. Ryan +1 302 421 6805 +1 302 421 5861 jryan@saul.com
No Logo Montgomery Ward LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Faye B. Feinstein +1 312 715 5000
TERMINATED: 10/09/2003 Mark Andrew Fink
Space Michelle Kathleen McMahon +1 212 541 2000 +1 212 541 1439
Space John Patrick Sheahan

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/2002 Marion M. Quirk +1 302 652 3131 +1 302 652 3117 bankruptcy@coleschotz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cross & Simon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard H. Cross, Jr. +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 rcross@crosslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mmwr.co Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2002 Mark L. Desgrosseilliers mdesgrosseilliers@mmwr.co

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2004 Jason William Harbour +1 302 658 9200 +1 804 788 8218

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg M. Galardi +1 302 651 3000 +1 302 651 3001 ggalardi@skadden.com
State Street Bank & Trust Company, Inc. State Street Bank & Trust Company, Inc., Trustee
Officially listed as "State Street Bank and Trust Company, as Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Monzack Mersky McLaughlin & Browder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis A. Monaco Jr. +1 302 656 8162 +1 302 656 2769 fmonaco@monlaw.com
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
        ORDER Signed and Located in Original Document Granting Admission of William L. Hallam, Esq. Re: Item # 14, [MAS], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #106 (Entered: 01/10/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Joel H. Levitin, Atty/UNIVERSAL CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #89 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Brett D. Orlove, Atty/IVERSON MALL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #88 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Michael Reed, Atty/CITY OF WACO, WACO ISD] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #87 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Michael Reed, Atty/TAX APPRAISAL DISTRICT OF BELL COUNTY] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #86 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Michael Reed, Atty/COUNTY OF BOWIE] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #85 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Michael Reed, Atty/COUNTY OF DENTON] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #84 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                      REQUEST for Special Notice [Filed by Shelly Rothschild, Atty/M. FABRIKAND & SONS INC & LEER GEM LTD] , [MDW] PROOF of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #83 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                        REQUEST for Notice & Service of Pleadings [Filed by Mary M. Maloney Huss, Atty/ROSY BLUE JEWELRY INC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #82 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Stephen M. Miller, Atty/MRO SOUTHWEST INC] , [MDW] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #81 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Stephen M. Miller, Atty/MID ATLANTIC REALTY TRUST] , [MDW] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #80 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Motion and Hearing on 01/24/01 at 09:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #2, Wilmington, 19801, [ID], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #79 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: None
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                  COUNSEL'S Letter Not Waiving §362[e] [Filed by Kevin J. Mangan, Atty./PORTSMOUTH REDEVELOPMENT AND HOUSING AUTHORITY] Re: Item # 86, [ID], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #77 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Relief from Stay [Filed by Kevin J. Mangan, Atty./PORTSMOUTH REDEVELOPMENT AND HOUSING AUTHORITY] [Disposed], [ID], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #76 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald M. Tucker [Filed by Henry A. Heiman, Atty/SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LP] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #75 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Daniel Sheridan, Atty/GENERAL GROWTH MANAGEMENT INC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #74 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Jeffrey C. Wisler, Atty/MALL PROPERTIES INC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #73 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by John P. Brody, Atty/THE COLUMBUS SHOW CASE COMPANY] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #72 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                              REQUEST for Notice [Filed by Roger G. Jones, Atty/EJ Footwear LLC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #71 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 11, [MDW] & Re: Item # 12, [MDW] & Re: Item # 15, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #70 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service Re: Item # 57, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #69 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST for Notice & Request to be Added to Mailing Matrix [Filed by Michael G. Menkowitz, Atty/FIRST DATA MERCHANT SERVICES CORPORATION] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #68 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Glenn M. Reisman, Atty/GE SUPPORT SERVICES LP] , [MDW] AFFIDAVIT of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #67 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Joanne B. Wills, Atty/GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #66 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment of Judge to Judge Raymond T. Lyons Effective January 17, 2001 Re: Item # 74, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #65 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Entered Assigning Case No. 00-4667 through 00-4675 to Peter J. Walsh, Judge, U.S.B.C. , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #64 (Entered: 01/08/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Ronald M. Tucker, Atty/SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LP] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #63 (Entered: 01/05/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                COUNSEL'S Agenda with Matters Scheduled on 01/09/01 at 09:30 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #2, Wilmington, 19801, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #62 (Entered: 01/05/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE as Attorney [Filed by Gerard D. Ring, Atty/CENTURY PLAZA LLC & AMERICAN RESURGENS MANAGEMENT CORP] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #61 (Entered: 01/05/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Niclas A. Ferland, Atty/WESTFIELD CORPORATION INC, ANNAPOLIS MALL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP & ANNAPOLIS LAND LLC, EAGLE ROCK PLAZA LLC, MISSION VALLEY PARTNERSHIP, OAKRIDGE MALL LLC, PLAZA BONITA LLC, TOPANGA PLAZA LLC & WHEATON PLAZA REGIONAL SHIPPIN G CENTER LLP] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #60 (Entered: 01/05/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Kevin M. Newman, Atty/THE SENPIKE MALL COMPANY, POUGHKEEPSIE GALLERIA COMPANY & CHICAGO RIDGE 035 PARTNERS LP] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #59 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Theodore J. Tacconelli, Atty/BEXAR COUNTY, CITY OF EL PASO, DALLAS COUNTY, CAMERON COUNTY & TARRANT COUNTY] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #58 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Lawrence D. Coppel, Atty/MID-ATLINTIC REALTY TRUST] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #57 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Thomas A. Labuda, Atty/THF REALTY] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #56 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              REQUEST for Service of Notices Pleadings & Orders [Filed by Lyndall J. Huggler, Atty/LAUREL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC & LAUREL OF DUBOIS] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #55 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of 341 meeting on 02/16/01 at 10:00 A.M. at U.S. District Court, 844 King Street, Room 2313, Wilmington, 19801 Re: Item # 63, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #54 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  U.S. TRUSTEE'S Notification of Scheduled 341 Creditor's Meeting , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #53 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Approval of Order Maintaining Bank Accounts Continuing Use of Existing Business Forms & Cash Management System [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 30, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #52 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion [Hearing only if objections filed by 1/11/01 at 4:00 PM] [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 41, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #51 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Approval of Order Waiving Investment & Deposit Requirements - Hrg Date: 1/24/01 at 9:30 AM; Obj Due: 1/18/01 at 4:00 PM [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 31, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #50 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Final Hearing on Order Authorizing Debtors in Possession to Use Cash Collateral & to Provide Adequate Protection - Hrg Date: 1/24/01 at 9:30 AM; Obj Due: 1/17/01 at 4:00 PM [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 39, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #49 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Final Hearing on Order Providing Adequate Protection to General Electric Capital Corporation - Hrg Date: 1/24/01 at 9:30 AM; Obj Due: 1/19/01 at 4:00 PM [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 51, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #48 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Order [I] Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Adequate Assurance [II] Prohibiting Utilities from Altering Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Unpaid Prepetition Invoices [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 28, [MD W] NOTICE of Motion [Hearing only if objections filed by 1/8/01 at 12:00 PM] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #47 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Jeffrey M. Schlerf, Atty/BT COMMERCIAL CORPORATION] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #46 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Rachel B. Mersky, Atty/COUNTRY CLUB CENTRE, CAFARO NORTHWEST PARTNERSHIP, CBL ASSOCIATES PROPERTIES INC & GLIMCHER PROPERTIES LP] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #45 (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Lisa A. Thompson, Atty/LEND LEASE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS INC, GENERAL GROWTH PROPERTIES INC & JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS INC] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #44 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REQUEST for Service of Notices Pleadings & Orders [Filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler, Atty/MRO SOUTHWEST INC] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #43 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by David L. Pollack, Atty/KRAVCO COMPANY, THE ROUSE COMPANY AFFILIATES, NEW PLAN EXCEL REALTY TRUST INC, STRATEGIC RESOURCES, HUTENSKY GROUP, MACERICH GROUP & AMERICAN RESURGENS] , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #42 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                          INTERIM Stipulation & Order Providing Adequate Protection to General Electric Capital Corporation [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS & Joanne B. Wills, Atty/GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION] , [MDW] ORDER Signed and Located in Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #41 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents [Filed by Newton G. Pritchett Jr, Atty/NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #40 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reclamation Demand [Filed by Shelly Rothschild, Atty/LEER GEM LTD & M. FABRIKANT & SONS INC] , [MDW] PROOF of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #39 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REQUEST for Special Notice [Filed by Thomas J. Polis, Atty/ANATON ASSOCIATES] , [MDW] PROOF of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #38 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REQUEST for Notices by Joyce A. Kuhns, Atty/SEARS ROEBUCK & COMPANY , [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #37 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance [Filed by Christian E. Niklas, Atty/SPOTSYLVANIA MALL COMPANY] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #36 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance [Filed by Christian E. Niklas, Atty/MEADOWBROOK MALL COMPANY] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #35 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Mailing Re: Item # 1 [4 copies], [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #34 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Budget to Interim Order Authorizing Debtors in Possession to Use Cash Collateral & to Provide Adequate Protection [FILED UNDER SEAL] Re: Item # 39, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #33 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            INTERIM Order Signed in Court [A] Authorizing Debtors and/or Their Agent to Conduct Store Closing Sales & Granting Ancillary Relief Related Thereto [B] Granting Other Relief Re: Item # 41, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #32 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Interim & Final Orders [A] Authorizing Debtors and/or Their Agent to Conduct Store Closing Sales & Granting Ancillary Relief Related Thereto [B] Granting Other Relief [Disposed], [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #31 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed in Court Regarding Consumer Credit Card Program for Montgomery Ward LLC & for Related Relief [Filed by David S. Kurtz, Atty/DEBTORS & Joanne B. Wells, Atty/GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION, MONOGRAM CREDIT CARD BANK OF GEORGIA, MONTGOMERY WARD CREDIT CORPORATION & SIGNATURE FINANCIAL/MARKETING INC] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #30 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  INTERIM Order Signed in Court Authorizing Debtors in Possession to Use Cash Collateral & to Provide Adequate Protection [Disposed], [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ORDER Signed In Court Approving Debtors' Reclamation Procedures Re: Item # 37, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #28 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Approving Reclamation Procedures , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #27 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Customs Duties & Customs Broker Charges , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #26 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Distribution Charges , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #25 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed In Court Authorizing Debtors to Implement Customer Policies to Satisfy Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers Re: Item # 33, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #24 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Implement Customer Policies to Satisfy Certain Prepetition Obligations to Customers , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #23 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order Confirming Authority to Pay Prepetition Sales Use & Other Taxes , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #22 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Interim & Final Order Waiving Investment & Deposit Requirements , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts Continued Use of Existing Business Forms & Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order [I] Authorizing [A] Payment of Prepetition Employee Obligations [B] Continuation of Employee Benefit Plans & Programs Postpetition [II] Confirming That Debtors are Able to Pay Withholding & Payroll-Related Taxes [III] Directing All Banks to Honor Prepetit ion Checks for Payment of Employee Obligations , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #19 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Order [I] Extending 366[b] Period [II] Prohibiting Utilities from Altering Refusing or Discontinuing Services on Account of Prepetition Invoices and/or Requiring Adequate Assurance , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #18 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order Granting Additional Time to File Schedules & Statements , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Authorizing Debtors to Mail Initial Notices & to File List of Creditors [Without Claim Amounts] in Lieu of Matrices , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Order Appointing Logan & Company Inc as Claims & Noticing Agent of Bankruptcy Court [Filed by Philip D. Delk] , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                An order has been entered in this case directing procedural consolidation & joint administration of Chapter 11 cases of MONTGOMERY WARD LLC [Case Numbers 00-4667PJW through 00-4675PJW]. The docket in Case No. 00-4667PJW should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14A (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases [Filed by Philip D. Delk, Vice President/DEBTORS] , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark K. Thomas [Filed by Jeffrey M. Schlerf, Atty/BT COMMERCIAL CORPORATION] , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harley J. Goldstein [Filed by Jeffrey M. Schlerf, Atty/BT COMMERCIAL CORPORATION] , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary T. Holtzer & Jacqueline Marcus [Filed by Joanne B. Wills, Atty/GENERAL ELECTRIC CREDIT CORP] , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Kurtz & John K. Lyons , [MDW] ORDER Signed In Court And Located In Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Philip D. Delk in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions & First Day Orders , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING Held The Following First Day Pleadings Were Filed in Open Court by Gregg M. Galardi, Esq Re: Item # 13, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #8 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                EMERGENCY Motion for Interim Order [I] Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Wages Salaries & Employee Benefits [II] Directing All Banks to Honor Prepetition Checks for Payment of Prepetition Employee Obligations [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] , [MDW] ORDER Signed and Located in Original Document , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7 (Entered: 01/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing & Hearing [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6 (Entered: 01/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William L. Hallam [Filed by Neal J. Levitsky, Esq/ALLFIRST BANK] [Disposed], [MDW] CERTIFICATE of Service , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5 (Entered: 01/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNSEL'S Agenda with Matters Scheduled on 12/29/00 at 11:00 A.M. at U.S. Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market Street, 6th Floor, Courtroom #2, Wilmington, 19801, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4 (Entered: 01/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Notice of Bankruptcy Filing & Debtors' Presentation of Motions & Applications to Court for Consideration [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] Re: Item # 11, [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3 (Entered: 01/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing & Debtors' Presentation of Motions & Applications to Court for Consideration [Filed by Gregg M. Galardi, Atty/DEBTORS] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #2 (Entered: 01/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            LIST of Creditors [Volume IX of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1I (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              LIST of Creditors [Volume VIII of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1H (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                LIST of Creditors [Volume VII of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1G (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LIST of Creditors [Volume VI of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1F (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LIST of Creditors [Volume V of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1E (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LIST of Creditors [Volume IV of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1D (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LIST of Creditors [Volume III of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1C (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LIST of Creditors [Volume II of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1B (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LIST of Creditors [Volume I of IX] , [MDW], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1A (Entered: 01/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              VOLUNTARY Petition Under Chapter 11 w/List of Creditors Holding Largest Unsecured Claims w/Declaration & Written Consent of Members w/Certificate of Secretary , [LL], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1 (Entered: 12/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?