USA v. Meng
Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00056
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 12:35 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hong Meng, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Custom Screen Printing & Promotions

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/05/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Bernstein +1 302 656 9850 +1 302 656 9836 jmbernstein@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Block, Schorr and Solis-Cohen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Jennings +1 302 777 5860 kjennings@wolfblock.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of People's Republic of China passport by Katherine E. Pattillo on 3/2/2012.(fms) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DIRECTING RETURN OF People's Republic of China passport as to Hong Meng (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/13/2012. (fms) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      JUDGMENT as to Hong Meng, Count 1: 14 MONTHS IMPRISONMENT; FINE WAIVED; $100.00 SPECIAL ASSESSMENT. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/26/2010. (nms) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
        Emergency MOTION Reconsideration of Defendant's Release Status by USA as to Hong Meng. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by Hong Meng re 18 MOTION for Downward Departure Defendant's Reply to Government's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Downward Departure and Supporting Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
            Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kathleen M. Jennings regarding Enclosing letter from Hong Meng as part of Defendant's Sentencing Submission. (Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Hong Meng re 18 MOTION for Downward Departure and Defendant's Setencing Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C, # 4 Attachment D, # 5 Attachment E, # 6 Attachment F, # 7 Attachment G, # 8 Attachment H, # 9 Attachment I, # 10 Attachment J, # 11 Attachment K)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER as to Hong Meng granting 22 MOTION to Continue Sentencing currently scheduled for October 13, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Hong Meng, ( Sentencing reset for 10/20/2010 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/10/2010. (lid) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                  Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kathleen M. Jennings regarding Supplementing August 30, 2010 Sentencing Memorandum to the Court - re 19 Sentencing Memorandum filed by Hong Meng. (Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Continue Sentencing currently scheduled for October 13, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. by Hong Meng. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER as to Hong Meng, ( Sentencing reset for 10/13/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/8/2010. (lid) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph M. Bernstein appearing for Hong Meng (Bernstein, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Hong Meng (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5 - 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8 - 10)(Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Downward Departure by Hong Meng. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 3)(Jennings, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER SCHEDULING SENTENCING as to Hong Meng. Sentencing set for 9/14/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/10/2010. (lid) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM OF PLEA AGREEMENT as to Hong Meng (lid) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Hong Meng (lid) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER SCHEDULING RULE 11 HEARING as to Hong Meng.( Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/8/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.), ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Hong Meng. Time excluded from 5/13/2010 until 6/8/2010. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2010. (lid) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                      FELONY INFORMATION as to Hong Meng (1) count 1. (kjk) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                        SEALED MOTION by USA as to Hong Meng (To be maintained on file in Clerk's Office). (kjk) Modified on 4/9/2010 (kjk). [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                          SEALED MOTION by USA as to Hong Meng (To be maintained on file in Clerk's Office). (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER as to Hong Meng re 9 GRANTING MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) filed by USA. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/26/10. (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by USA as to Hong Meng. (Kravetz, Robert) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                SEALED MOTION by USA as to Hong Meng (To be maintained on file in Clerk's Office) (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Joseph M. Bernstein, Esquire regarding Request for Permission to travel out of state. (Bernstein, Joseph) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/2/09 in case as to Hong Meng. (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Passport and Permanent Resident Card by Hong Meng. (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Hong Meng (1) Own Recognizance with special conditions. ( Original Bail Order does not include the deft.'s address ). Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/2/09. (kjk) (kjk). [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Hong Meng. (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                            WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Hong Meng. (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by FBI Special Agent, sworn to before Judge Mary Pat Thynge as to Hong Meng (1). (kjk) [1:09-mj-00127] (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?