Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Progress Power Corporation d/b/a Progress Energy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund S. Whitson, III +1 813 223 7333 +1 813 223 2837 edmund.whitson@akerman.com
No Logo Accentia Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., et al, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena Paras Ketchum +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811

Toggle Switch Represented by Rocke, McLean & Sbar, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan B. Sbar +1 813 769 5600 +1 813 769 5601 jsbar@rmslegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Raymond Fogarty +1 813 229 0144 dfogarty.ecf@srbp.com
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Accentia Specialty Pharmacy, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Accent Rx Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Amelia Island Company, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stutsman, Thames & Markey PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Robert Markey +1 904 358 4000 +1 904 358 4001 brm@stmlaw.net
Space Eric N McKay +1 904 358 4000 +1 904 358 4001
Space Richard Roemheld Thames +1 904 358 4000 +1 904 358 4001 rrt@stmlaw.net
No Logo Analytica International, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo AutovaxID, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Biolender II, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Biolender, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Biovax, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Biovest International, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Black Crow Media Group, LLC, Debtor

Represented by Latham Shuker Eden & Beaudine LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dylan Gillespie Trache +1 703 905 2800 +1 703 905 2820 dtrache@wileyrein.com
No Logo Certified Diabetic Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, (Jointly Administered), Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush Ross Gardner Warren & Rudy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Wayne Warren +1 813 224 9255 +1 813 223 9620 jwarren@bushross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush Ross PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Lawton Alpert +1 813 204 6466 +1 813 223 9620
Space Andrew T. Jenkins +1 813 224 9255
No Logo Ecoventure Wiggins Pass, Ltd, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harley E. Riedel +1 813 229 0144

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Goodlette Coleman Johnson Yovanovich Koester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Goodlette Coleman Johnson Yovanovich Koester

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R Leslie +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Raymond Fogarty +1 813 229 0144 dfogarty.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Fiddler's Creek, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mariaelena Gayo-Guitian +1 954 453 8000 +1 954 453 8010
Space Bart Alan Houston +1 954 453 8000 +1 954 453 8010 bhouston@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
Space Heather L Yonke +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodward,Pires & Lombardo PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Woodward
No Logo Gps Industries, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre, Panzarella, Thanasides, Hoffman, Bringgold & Todd, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Jehangir McIntyre +1 813 899 6059 +1 813 899 6069 rich@mcintyrefirm.com
No Logo Haemacure Corporation, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Island One, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Green +1 407 649 4000 +1 407 841 0168 egreen@bakerlaw.com
Space Jimmy Dale Parrish +1 407 649 4048 +1 407 841 0168 jparrish@bakerlaw.com
Space Tiffany D Payne +1 407 649 4079
No Logo Juan M. Silva, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles G Moore PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles G Moore +1 727 381 8080 +1 727 381 0234
No Logo Leigh N Feldsteen, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan B Alper PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan B Alper +1 407 444 0404 +1 407 333 2040
No Logo Mirabilis Ventures, Inc, Debtor

Represented by Latham Shuker Eden & Beaudine LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Roy S Kobert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy S Kobert +1 407 839 4200 +1 407 425 8377

Toggle Switch Represented by Stump Callahan Dietrich & Spears PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd K Norman +1 407 425 2571 +1 407 425 0827
No Logo Rafael Gonzalez, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rafael Gonzalez 1 +10 +10 1000
No Logo RQB Resort, LP, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Hulsey & Busey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia C. Jackson +1 904 359 7700
No Logo Shells Seafood Restaurant, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A.

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Raymond Fogarty +1 813 229 0144 dfogarty.ecf@srbp.com
Space Don M Stichter +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811
No Logo Starco Ventures, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Reissman & Blanchard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall G Reissman +1 727 322 1999 +1 727 327 7999
No Logo Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation, Debtor
Officially listed as "Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell Merrin Blain +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 rblain@srbp.com
Space Amy L. Harris +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 aharris.ecf@srbp.com
Space Edward J. Peterson, III +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 epeterson.ecf@srbp.com
Space Richard Craig Prosser +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 rprosser@srbp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James David Dantzler, Jr. +1 404 885 3314 +1 404 962 6799 David.Dantzler@troutmansanders.com
Space Jeffrey W Kelley +1 404 885 3383 +1 404 962 6847 jeffrey.kelley@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Teamm Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles A Postler, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 cpostler.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Tierra Del Sol Resort, Inc, Debtor

Represented by Latham Shuker Eden & Beaudine LLP

No Logo Westshore Cove Acquisition Group LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harley E. Riedel +1 813 229 0144

Toggle Switch Represented by Fanelli Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie V Fanelli +1 813 384 4841 +1 813 749 9475

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lindsey M. Porter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsey M. Porter +1 727 577 9646

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A.

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Raymond Fogarty +1 813 229 0144 dfogarty.ecf@srbp.com
Space Amy L. Harris +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 aharris.ecf@srbp.com
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur J Spector +1 954 525 9900 +1 954 523 2872

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Daryl Gassenheimer +1 305 714 4383 +1 305 714 4340 jgassenheimer@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Official Committee for Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Forizs & Dogali, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rachel S Green +1 813 289 0700 +1 813 289 9435
Space Robert J Wahl +1 813 289 0700
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian G. Rich +1 850 561 3010 +1 850 561 3013 brich@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas A Bates, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas A Bates, +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Island One, Inc., et al., Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush Ross PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Lawton Alpert +1 813 204 6466 +1 813 223 9620
No Logo The Official Unsecured Creditors' Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debi Evans Galler +1 305 714 4397 +1 305 714 4340

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Crysta A Silva, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles G Moore PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles G Moore +1 727 381 8080 +1 727 381 0234
No Logo Lizette Caballero, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lizette Caballero
No Logo Denise E. Barnett, Trustee

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise E. Barnett +1 813 228 2303
No Logo Emerson C Noble, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by John H Meininger III PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Meininger, III +1 407 246 1585 +1 407 246 7101
No Logo Larry S. Hyman, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler White Boggs, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Travis Appleby +1 813 222 2081 +1 813 229 8313 kappleby@fowlerwhite.com
Space Donald R. Kirk +1 813 222 2022 +1 813 229 8313 dkirk@fowlerwhite.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larry S. Hyman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry S. Hyman +1 813 875 2701 +1 813 875 2797
No Logo Richard A. Yanagi, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendell Finner +1 904 242 7070 +1 904 242 7054 wendell@beacheslaw.com
No Logo I. Randall Gold, Intervenor

Represented by United States Department of Justice

United States of America United States of America, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott H. Park +1 407 648 7500 +1 407 648 7588 scott.park@usdoj.gov
No Logo J. Michael Weathers, Liquidating Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shane G. Ramsey +1 404 745 2429 +1 404 541 3439 sramsey@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Michael Markham, Liquidating Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Charles Markham +1 727 461 1818 +4436 443 443 6548 mikem@jpfirm.com
No Logo United States Trustee - FTM, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space T Patrick Tinker +1 813 228 2000 +1 813 228 2303
Space J Steven Wilkes +1 813 228 2000 +1 813 228 2303

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia Burnette +1 813 228 2000 +1 813 228 2303 Cindy.P.Burnette@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Trustee - JAX, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Laffredi, Timothy S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy S Laffredi +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - JAX 11, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Elena L Escamilla TB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - JAX 11, 11, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Elena L Escamilla TB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - JAX, 11, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Elena L Escamilla TB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elena L Escamilla TB +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - ORL, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miriam G Suarez BG +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - ORL, 11, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill E Kelso +1 407 648 6301 +1 407 648 6323
No Logo United States Trustee - TPA, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise E Barnett +1 813 228 2303
No Logo United States Trustee - TPA, 11, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa M Boatner +1 813 228 2000
  Entries (9132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8217 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Certificate of Mailing
Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of A Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 2-20-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8211). (BMC Group (JM))
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8216 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Certificate of Mailing
    Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 2-20-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8203). (BMC Group (JM))
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8215 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Proof of Service
      Proof of Service Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (related document(s)8212). (Stewart, Gavin)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8214 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: 2/23/2015 Notice of Hearing.
        Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Limited Modification of § 524 Injunction to Permit Action to Recover Against Debtor's Surety (Insurance) Company Filed by Clayton T Miller on behalf of Richard Cotta, Carol Hays, Franklin James Jr., Charles Kerns, Jon Staats (related document(s)8208). Hearing scheduled for 3/30/2015 at 03:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Miller, Clayton)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8213 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Karen A Maxcy on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Maxcy, Karen)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8212 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Order(Generic)
            Agreed Order Granting Motion to Confirm No Stay is in Effect (related document(s)8192). Service Instructions: Gavin Stewart is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8211 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Order on Motion for Approval
              Order Granting Motion for Approval for the Filing of a Motion Using Negative Notice (Related Doc # 8203). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
                Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 3/30/2015 03:00 PM Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion for Limited Modification of § 524 Injunction to Permit Action to Recover Against Debtor's Surety (Insurance) Company Doc 8208. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Clayton T Miller is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (related document(s)8208). (Chap, Dkt)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8209 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Certificate Of Service.
                  Certificate of Service Re: Motion for Limited Modification of § 524 Injunction to Permit Action to Recover Against Debtor's Surety (Insurance) Company Filed by Clayton T Miller on behalf of Richard Cotta, Carol Hays, Franklin James Jr., Charles Kerns, Jon Staats (related document(s)8208). (Miller, Clayton)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8208 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 ~Generic~ MOTION
                    Motion for Limited Modification of § 524 Injunction to Permit Action to Recover Against Debtor's Surety (Insurance) Company Filed by Clayton T Miller on behalf of Jon Staats, Charles Kerns, Franklin James Jr., Carol Hays, Richard Cotta (Miller, Clayton)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8206 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Proposed Order
                      Proposed Order Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (related document(s)8192). (Stewart, Gavin)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8210 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Order / Judgment By District Court/11th Circuit Court of Appeals re: AppealCourt Filing
                        Order entered on 2/11/15 by District Court Judge Judge Hodges, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 5:13-cv-571-Oc-10, Bankruptcy Court AFFIRMED (related document(s)7563). (Perkins, Cathy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8207 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                          Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Confirm No Stay in Effect(Fee Paid.) Re: 8744-46 W. 70th Street, Mission, Kansas 66202. Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Stewart, Gavin) (See the "Corrective Action Taken" entry dated 01/21/2015.) Modified on 01/21/2015 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 1/21/2015 (Perkins, Cathy). Doc #8192 GRANTED ORD/GALLER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8205 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Proposed Order
                            Proposed Order Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (related document(s)8192). (Stewart, Gavin)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8204 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Proposed Order
                              Proposed Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion for Order Authorizing Filing of a Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8203). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8203 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015, Terminated: 2/20/2015 Motion for Approval
                                Ex Parte Motion for Approval For Order Authorizing Filing of Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8202). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8202 Filed: 2/16/2015, Entered: 2/16/2015 Motion for Approval
                                  Motion for Approval of a Second Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8201 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Financial Report
                                    Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2014 to December 31, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8200 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Financial Report
                                      Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2014 to December 31, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Home America Mortgage, Inc. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8199 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Financial Report
                                        Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2014 to December 31, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for REO Specialist, LLC Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8198 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Sixty Second Omnibus Objection To Claims With Respect To Claim No. S26365 Scheduled For Home America Mortgage, Inc. Service Date 2-6-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8197). (BMC Group (JM))
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8197 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Order(Generic)
                                            Order Sustaining Sixty Second Omnibus Objection to Claims with Respect to Claim No. S26365 Scheduled for Home America Mortgage, Inc. (related document(s)5879). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8196 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Proposed Order
                                              Proposed Order Sustaining Sixty Second Omnibus Objection to Claims With Respect to Claim No. S26365 Scheduled for Home America Mortgage, Inc. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)5879). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8195 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Notice of Change of Address
                                                Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Sonar Credit Partners, LLC. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8194 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Memorandum
                                                  Memorandum Filed by Todd M Hoepker on behalf of Creditor Urban Trust Bank Holdings, Inc., aka. (Attachments: # 1 # (2) Main Document) (Hoepker, Todd) (See the "CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED BY FILER" entry dated 01/23/2015.) Modified on 01/23/2015 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required
                                                    CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED BY FILER (Related Doc: Memorandum Filed by Todd M Hoepker on behalf of Creditor Urban Trust Bank Holdings, Inc., aka. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Main Document)) Deficiency: The document was filed in the incorrect case by the filer. Solution: The filer is directed to re-file the document in the correct case. No further action will be taken on this document by the Court. (related document(s)8194). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8193 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                      Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Confirm No Stay in Effect filed by Wells Fargo Bank (related document(s)8192). Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                        Substitution of Counsel. Alice Blanco Aldridge Connors, LLP - Substituted for Whitney Warnke Groff of Aldridge Connors, LLP . (Mason, Sara)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Taken
                                                          Corrective Action Taken (Related Doc: Motion for Relief from Stay (Fee Paid.) Re: 8744-46 W. 70th Street, Mission, Kansas 66202. Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)) Deficiency: The PDF image of the document and the docket entry or docket event do not match. Solution: The Clerk's office has re-docketed the filing or has modified the docket entry to match the document filed and will process accordingly. If applicable, the filer is directed to file the intended document. (related document(s)8192). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8192 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015, Terminated: 2/20/2015 Motion for Relief From Stay
                                                            Motion to Confirm No Stay in Effect(Fee Paid.) Re: 8744-46 W. 70th Street, Mission, Kansas 66202. Filed by Gavin Stewart on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Stewart, Gavin) (See the "Corrective Action Taken" entry dated 01/21/2015.) Modified on 01/21/2015 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 1/21/2015 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Auto Docket Credit Card Payment
                                                              Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(3:09-bk-07047-JAF) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 43933450, Amount Paid $ 176.00 (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8191 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) To ABS Loan Trust. Service Date 1-15-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8189). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8190 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) To Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP. Service Date 1-15-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8188). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8189 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Order on Motion To Sell
                                                                    Order Granting Motion To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) to ABS Loan Trust (Related Doc # 8157). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8188 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Order on Motion To Sell
                                                                      Order Granting Motion To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) to Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP (Related Doc # 8158). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8187 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) To Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8158). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8186 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Proposed Order
                                                                          Proposed Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion for Authority to Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) to ABS Loan Trust Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8157). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8185 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (POOL 2) To 25 Capital Residential Mortgage Opportunities Master Fund, LLC. Service Date 1-7-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8181). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8184 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Authorization To Make A Distribution Of Outstanding Servicing Funds To Investors And Notice Of Proposed Distribution. Service Date 1-7-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8180). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8183 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Approval Of An Interim Distribution To Allowed TBW Class 8 General Unsecured Claims. Service Date 1-7-15. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8179). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8181 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Order(Generic)
                                                                                  Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion for Authority to Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 2) to 25 Capital Residential Mortgage Opportunities Master Fund, LLC (related document(s)8147). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8182 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Objection - Other than Motions
                                                                                    Objection to the Sale of My Loan from Clawback Suit Filed by Creditor Katina L. Duran. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8180 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Approval /Authorization to Make a Distribution of Outstanding Servicing Funds to Investors and Notice of Proposed Distribution (Related Doc # 8142). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8179 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                        Order Granting Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 8 General Unsecured Claims (Related Doc # 8141). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8178 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: 12/31/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                          Proposed Order Granting Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 2) to 25 Capital Residential Mortgage Opportunities Master Fund, LLC Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8147). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8177 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: 12/31/2014 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                            Settlement Agreement Between Neil F. Luria, as Plan Trustee for the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust and The ResCap Liquidating Trust (successor-in-interest to GMAC Mortgage, LLC) Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria. (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8175 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                              Proposed Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion for Authorization to Make a Distribution of Outstanding Servicing Funds to Investors and Notice of Proposed Distribution Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8142). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8174 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 8 General Unsecured Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8141). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8176 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                  Motion to Stay Pending Appeal in the Interest of Justice Relating to Docket Number 8147 (may be construed as a response) Filed by Creditor Katina L. Duran (related document(s)8147, 1658). (Perkins, Cathy )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8173 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Seventh Motion For Extension Of Time To Object To Claims. Service Date 12-16-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8167). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8172 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-16-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8166). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8171 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-16-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8165). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8170 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-16-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8164). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8169 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - 1. Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice [Re: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) To ABS Loan Trust] and 2.Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice [Re: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion for Authority to Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) to Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP] Service Date 12-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8159, 8160). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8168 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing re: 1. Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) To ABS Loan Trust and 2. Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) To Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP. Service Date 12-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8158, 8157). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8167 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Object to Claims(Seventh Motion) (Related Doc # 8154). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Craft, Tonya)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8166 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Approval of Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice (Related Doc 8160). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Craft, Tonya) Modified on 12/16/2014 (Craft, Tonya).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8165 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion for Approval for Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice (Related Doc # 8159). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Craft, Tonya)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8164 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion for Approval for Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice (Related Doc # 8148). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8163 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                        Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor CoreLogic Appraisal Services. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8162 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Plan Trustee's Motion for Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8160). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8161 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Plan Trustee's Motion for Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8159). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8160 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014, Terminated: 12/16/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Motion for Approval For Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8158). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8159 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014, Terminated: 12/16/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Motion for Approval For Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8157). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8158 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014, Terminated: 1/15/2015 Motion to Sell
                                                                                                                                  Motion to Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 3) to Marathon Structured Product Strategies Fund, LP. Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8157 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014, Terminated: 1/15/2015 Motion to Sell
                                                                                                                                    Motion to Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 1) to ABS Loan Trust. Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8156 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)8154). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8155 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of Certain Motions Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-9-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8153). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8154 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014, Terminated: 12/16/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                          Motion to Extend Time to Object to Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8153 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion for Approval of Plan Trustee for Order Authorizing Filing of Certain Motions Using Negative Notice (Related Doc # 8143). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                              Change of address submitted to the Court on November 21, 2014 by attorney Charles Tatelbaum formerly with Hinshaw Culbertson now with Tripp Scott, P.A., 110 SE 6th Street, 15th Floor - Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8151 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of The Sale Motion Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-5-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8148). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8150 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s Motion For Authority To Sell Mortgage Loans (Pool 2) To 25 Capital Residential Mortgage Opportunities Master Fund, LLC. Service Date 12-4-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8147). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8149 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion for Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8148). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8148 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014, Terminated: 12/16/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Motion for Approval For Order Authorizing Filing of the Sale Motion Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8147). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8147 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014, Terminated: 1/6/2015 Motion to Sell or Lease Property
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Sell (Other) Mortgage Loans (Pool 2) To 25 Capital Residential Mortgage Oppertunities Master Fund, LLC. Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8146 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Motion For Authorization To Make A Distribution Of Outstanding Servicing Funds To Investors And Notice Of Proposed Distribution. Service Date 12-2-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8142). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8145 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - 1. Plan Trustee's Motion For Authorization To Make A Distribution Of Outstanding Servicing Funds To Investors And Notice Of Proposed Distribution and 2. Plan Trustee's Motion For Order Authorizing Filing Of Certain Motions Using Negative Notice. Service Date 12-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8142, 8143). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8144 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Motion For Approval Of An Interim Distribution To Allowed TBW Class 8 General Unsecured Claims. Service Date 12-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8141). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8152 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion for Order Authorizing Filing of Certain Motions Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8142, 8143, 8141). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8143 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014, Terminated: 12/9/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Approval of Filing of Certain Motions Using Negative Notice Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8142 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014, Terminated: 1/5/2015 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Approval to Make a Distribution of Outstanding Servicing Funds to Investors and Notice of Proposed Distribution Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8141 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014, Terminated: 1/5/2015 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 8 Unsecured Claims Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                        Change of address submitted to the Court on November 24, 2014 by attorney Eugene H. Johnson of the Johnson Law Firm, P.A., 100 N. Laura Street, Suite 701 - Jacksonville, FL 32202. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8140 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing Agreed Order on GMP LISBOA, LLC Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Paul R Pearcy on behalf of unknown GMP LISBOA (related document(s)8137). (Pearcy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8139 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve The Stipulation Regarding Claim Number 3020 Between Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation As Receiver For Colonial Bank And The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 11-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8138). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8138 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Order on Motion Approval of Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion for Approval of Stipulation regarding Claim Number 3020 between Federal Deposit Insurance Corp. as Receiver for Colonial Bank and the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (Related Doc # 8124). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution of Counsel. James D. Gassenheimer of Berger Singerman, LLP - Substituted for Kristopher Aungst of Berger Singerman, LLP. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8137 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Order on GMP Lisboa, LLC Motion for Relief from Stay (related document(s)8129). Service Instructions: Paul Pearcy is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8136 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Kevin A Ashley on behalf of unknown Columbia Air Services BHB, LLC. (Ashley, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8135 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice Of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Wendell Finner on behalf of Interested Party Richard A. Yanagi. (Finner, Wendell)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8134 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8124). (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8133 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                          Financial Reports for the Period July 1, 2014 to September 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for REO Specialists, LLC Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8132 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                            Financial Reports for the Period July 1, 2014 to September 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Home America Mortgage, Inc. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8131 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              Financial Reports for the Period July 1,2014 to September 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8130 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order on Motion of GMP LISBOA for Relief from Stay Filed by Paul R Pearcy on behalf of unknown GMP LISBOA (related document(s)8129). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8129 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014, Terminated: 11/18/2014 Motion for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion of GMP LISBOA for Relief from Stay Filing Fee Not Required. Re: Mortgage interest on real property. Filed by Paul R Pearcy on behalf of unknown GMP LISBOA (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Order # 2 Exhibit Debtor's counsel consent) (Pearcy, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8128 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Objection [ECF No. 5924] To Claim Numbers 2644, 2645, 2646, 2647, 2648, 2649, 2650 And 2651 Filed By Us Bank National Association, As Trustee. Service Date 11-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8127). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8127 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim Numbers 2644, 2645, 2646, 2647, 2648, 2649, 2650, and 2651 Filed by US Bank National Association, as Trustee Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)5924). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8126 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Order Authorizing Destruction of Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Destruction of Evidence from hearing on objection to Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 filed by Sovereign Bank (related document(s)8087, 8047). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Perkins, Cathy) Modified on 11/13/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).Picked up by Courier 11/13/14 at 11:16
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8125 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Motion To Approve The Stipulation Regarding Claim Number 3020 Between Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation As Receiver For Colonial Bank And The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 10-21-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8124). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8124 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014, Terminated: 11/19/2014 Approval of Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Claim Number 3020 Between Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Colonial Bank and the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Contains negative notice. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Removal of Restrictions on Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants (related document(s)8076). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8123 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Notice of Taking Depositions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Taking Depositions Filed by Todd M Hoepker on behalf of Creditor Urban Trust Bank Holdings, Inc., aka. (Hoepker, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8122 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8120)). Notice Date 10/02/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8121 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Under §362(j) Confirming No Automatic Stay in Effect Filed by Maurice D Hinton on behalf of Creditor Selene Finance LP (related document(s)8114). (Hinton, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8120 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Order Striking
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Striking Notice that The Corporation Trust Company is not the registered agent for Bank of America (related document(s)8119). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8119 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice that The Corporation Trust Company is not the registered agent for Bank of America Filed by unknown CT Corporation. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:12-ap-130 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:09-ap-439 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-572 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8118 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: 9/24/2014 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Orders Entered by the Court in Adversary Proceeding Case Nos. 3:19-ap-00096-JAF and 3:19-ap-00100-JAF Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria. (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:10-ap-100 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:10-ap-96 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing cancelled on this specific matter due to notice and service not appearing on the docket. Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/27/14 01:30 pm Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion for an Order Confirming No Automatic Stay is in Effect Doc 8114. No new hearing will be scheduled unless and until a Request for Hearing is filed with the court that addresses this specific matter. (ADIclerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8117 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Charging Lien Filed by Nicholas V. Pulignano Jr. on behalf of Creditor Centurion Asset Partners, Inc.. (Pulignano, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-532 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Maurice D Hinton is reminded to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/27/14 01:30 pm Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion for an Order Confirming No Automatic Stay is in Effect Doc 8114. Failure to do so will result in the cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (ADIclerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8116 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8115)). Notice Date 09/18/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8115 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Order on Motion for Payment of Unclaimed Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Denying Motion For Payment of Unclaimed Funds Lawyers Title Insurance Corporation (Related Doc # 8111). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (McEachin, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/27/14 01:30 pm Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion for an Order Confirming No Automatic Stay is in Effect Doc 8114. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Maurice D Hinton is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (related document(s)8114). (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8114 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014, Terminated: 9/30/2014 Motion for Order Confirming Absence or Termination of Automatic Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for an Order Confirming No Automatic Stay is in Effect Filed by Maurice D Hinton on behalf of Creditor Selene Finance LP (Hinton, Maurice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8113 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s6184 Of Checkpoint Technologies, Inc. Service Date 9-12-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8112). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8112 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #s6184 of Checkpoint Technologies, Inc. (Related Doc # 8081). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8110 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s6184 of Checkpoint Technologies, Inc. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8081). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8111 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: 9/11/2014 Motion for Payment of Unclaimed Funds
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Unclaimed Funds Lawyers Title Insurance Corporation, $17.50. Power of Attorney required but not filed. Filed by (McEachin, Patrick )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution of Counsel. Nirvani Singh of Robertson, Anschutz & Schneid, P.L. Substituted for Anila S. Rasul formerly of Robertson, Anschutz & Schneid, P.L.. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8109 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: 8/27/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Denying Creditor's Motion For Relief From The Automatic Stay. Service Date 8-22-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8107). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8108 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof of Service of Agreed Order Denying Creditor's Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay. Filed by Adam A Diaz on behalf of Creditor US Bank, National Association (related document(s)8107). (Diaz, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8107 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Denying Motion For Relief From Stay re: U.S. Bank National Assoc. (Related Doc # 8086) Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8106 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve Elimination Of Administrative And Priority Claims Reserve As Set Forth In The Plan. Service Date 8-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8101). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8105 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim No. 3229 Filed By Centurion Asset Partners, Inc. Service Date 8-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8100). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8104 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between (A) Bank Of America, N.A. And Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, As Successor By Merger To Banc Of America Securities, LLC And (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 8-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8099). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8103 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Notice Of Distributions Deemed Undeliverable. Service Date 8-18-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8097). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8102 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Filed by Adam A Diaz on behalf of Creditor US Bank, National Association (related document(s)8086). (Diaz, Adam) Modified on 8/20/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 8/20/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8101 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion for Approval for Elimination of Administrative and Priority Claims Reserve as set forth in the Plan (Related Doc # 8067). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8100 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim No. 3229 Filed by Centurion Asset Partners, Inc. (related document(s)4835). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8099 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion To Approve Compromise of Controversy between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Me4rill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (Related Doc # 8066). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8098 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Notice Of Distributions Deemed Undeliverable. Service Date 8-014-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8097). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8097 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Distributions Deemed Undeliverable Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution of Counsel. Kevin A. Comer of the Law Office of Daniel C. Consuegra Substituted for Allison D. Thompson previously of the Law Office of Daniel C. Consuegra. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8096 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as Successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8066). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8095 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Financial Reports for the Period April 1, 2014 to June 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for REO Specialists, LLC Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8094 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Financial Reports for the Period April 1, 2014 to June 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Home America Mortgage, Inc. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8093 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Financial Reports for the Period April 1, 2014 to June 30, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8092 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Motion to Approve Elimination of Administrative and Priority Claims Reserve as Set Forth in the Plan Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)8067). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-967 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-29 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of address submitted to the Court on August 11, 2014 by attorney Kimberly H. Israel of Held & Israel, 4465 Baymeadows Road, Suite 3 - Jacksonville, FL 32217. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8091 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: *1. $Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy Related Case and Parties: 3:10-00096 and 3:10-00100. Between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as Successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James) Doc #8066 APPROVED ORD/GASSENHEIMER 2. Motion for Approval of the Elimination of the Administrative and Priority Claims Reserve as Set Forth in the Plan Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James) (Entered: 07/14/2014)(8067) GRANTED ORD/GASSENHEIMER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8090 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Adam A Diaz on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association (related document(s)8086). Hearing scheduled for 9/2/2014 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Diaz, Adam) Modified on 8/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8089 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Taylor, Bean & Whitaker's Corrected Objection To Claim Numbers 3519, 3520, And 3521 Filed By Sovereign Bank. Service Date 8-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8087). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8088 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Taylor, Bean & Whitaker's Corrected Objection To Claim Numbers 3519, 3520, And 3521 Filed By Sovereign Bank. Service Date 8-6-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8087). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8087 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #3519, 3520, and 3521 of Sovereign Bank (Related Doc # 7878). Service Instructions: James Gassenheimer is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Baldwin, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 9/2/14 10:00 AM Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion for Relief from Stay (Fee Paid.) Re: 33 GORDON AVE, ENFIELD, CT 06082. Contains negative notice. Doc 8086. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Adam A Diaz is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (related document(s)8086). (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8086 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014, Terminated: 8/21/2014 Motion for Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Relief from Stay (Fee Paid.) Re: 33 GORDON AVE, ENFIELD, CT 06082. Contains negative notice. Filed by Adam A Diaz on behalf of Creditor US Bank, National Association (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Diaz, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8085 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed Proposed Order Resolving Objection to Claim No. 3229 Filed by Centurion Asset Partners, Inc. Filed by Jeffrey W Kelley on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (related document(s)4835). (Kelley, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Auto Docket Credit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(3:09-bk-07047-JAF) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 41822431, Amount Paid $ 176.00 (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8084 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Corrected Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection To Claims With Respect To Claim No. 194 Filed By Phillips Printing And Transferred To Riverside Claims LLC. Service Date 8-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8083). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8083 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Sustaining Corrected Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims with Respect to Claim No. 194 filed by Phillips Printing and Transferred to Riverside Claims LLC (related document(s)4590, 4605). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of address submitted to the Court on July 28, 2014, effective August 1, 2014, by attorney Marsha G. Rydberg of The Rydberg Law Firm, P.A., 1304 Desoto Avenue, Suite 202 - Tampa, FL 33606. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8082 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Objection To Scheduled Claim Number s6184 In Favor Of Checkpoint Technologies, Inc. Service Date 7-28-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8081). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8081 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014, Terminated: 9/12/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Claim(s). Scheduled Claim Number S6184 of Checkpoint Technologies, Inc.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-581 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-528 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8080 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: 7/26/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8077)). Notice Date 07/25/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Removal of Restrictions on Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants (related document(s)8022). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8079 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: 7/24/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim Number 2565 Filed By JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Service Date 7-23-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8078). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8078 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Order (Generic -Large Cases or Service on LR 1007-2 Parties)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim Number 2565 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (related document(s)4606). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8077 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail (related document(s)8076). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution of Counsel. Nicolette Vilmos of Broad and Cassel - Substituted for Roy S. Kobert of Broad and Cassel. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8076 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 11/18/13 on Status Conference. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Statewide Reporting Service: 904-353-7706 (related document(s)8075). Transcript access will be restricted through 10/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 signature page) (Statewide Reporting Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8075 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Certificate of Mailing - 1. Motion To Approve Elimination Of The Administrative And Priority Claims Reserve As Set Forth In The Plan and 2. Notice Of Preliminary Hearing. Service Date 7-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8069, 8070, 8071, 8067). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8074 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Certificate of Mailing - 1. Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between (A) Bank Of America, N. A. And Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, As Successor By Merger To Banc Of America Securities, LLC, And (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust and 2. Notice Of Preliminary Hearing. Service Date 7-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8068, 8066, 8070, 8071). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8073 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed Proposed Order Resolving Objection to Claim Number 2565 Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4606). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8072 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Sustaining Corrected Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims with Respect to Claim No. 194 filed by Phillips Printing and Transferred to Riverside Claims LLC Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4605). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8071 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between (A) Bank Of America, N. A. And Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, As Successor By Merger To Banc Of America Securities, LLC, And (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust] and 2. Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion To Approve Elimination Of The Administrative And Priority Claims Reserve As Set Forth In The Plan]. Service Date 7-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8068, 8069). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8070 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - 1. Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between (A) Bank Of America, N. A. And Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, As Successor By Merger To Banc Of America Securities, LLC, And (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust and 2. Motion To Approve Elimination Of The Administrative And Priority Claims Reserve As Set Forth In The Plan. Service Date 7-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8066, 8067). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8069 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Approval of the Elimination of the Administrative and Priority Claims Reserve as Set Forth in the Plan Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)8067). Hearing scheduled for 8/11/2014 at 04:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8068 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Preliminary Hearing Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy Related Case and Parties: 3:10-00096 and 3:10-00100. Between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as Successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)8066). Hearing scheduled for 8/11/2014 at 04:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8067 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014, Terminated: 8/18/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Approval of the Elimination of the Administrative and Priority Claims Reserve as Set Forth in the Plan Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Change of name submitted to the Court on July 14, 2014 by Cameron H.P. White of Miller South and Milhausen, PA. Now known as Cameron H.P. White of South Milhausen, PA. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 8/25/14 03:30 pm Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. Re: Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy Related Case and Parties: 3:10-00096 and 3:10-00100. Between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as Successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Doc 8066. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: James D Gassenheimer is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (related document(s)8066). (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8066 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014, Terminated: 8/18/2014 Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy Related Case and Parties: 3:10-00096 and 3:10-00100. Between (A) Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch Pierce, Fenner & Smith, as Successor by Merger to Banc of America Securities, LLC and (B) The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:12-ap-367 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:12-ap-206 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-977 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-914 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-929 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:10-ap-209 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-710 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Change of address submitted to the Court on July 7, 2014 by attorney George E. Wise of Morris Hardwick Schneider, 9409 Philadelphia Road, Baltimore, MD 21237. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of address submitted to the Court on July 3, 2014 by attorney Rubina K. Shaldjian of Albertellil Law, PO Box 23028, Tampa, FL 33623. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:14-ap-102 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8065 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Resolving Thirty Second Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims Of Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc.) Service Date 6-24-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8062). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8064 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #7: Claims For Which Debtors Are Not Liable As It Relates To Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc. Service Date 6-24-214. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8061). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8063 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #1: Claims Improperly Filed As Secured As It Relates To Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc. Service Date 6-24-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8060). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8062 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/24/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Resolving Thirty Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (as claims that relate to Greg Steinmetz Construction) (related document(s)4109). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Mullikin, Cathy) Modified on 6/25/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8061 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #7: Claims for Which Debtors Are Not Liable as it Relates to Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc (related document(s)2243). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Mullikin, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8060 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #1: Claims Improperly Filed as Secured as it Relates to Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc (related document(s)2237). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Mullikin, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8059 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Resolving Thirty Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims of Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc.) Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4109). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8058 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #7: Claims For Which Debtors Are Not Liable as it Relates to Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)2243). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8057 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: 6/20/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Resolving Omnibus Objection #1: Claims Improperly Filed as Secured as it Relates to Greg Steinmetz Construction Inc. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)2237, 1). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Change of address submitted to the Court on June 19, 2014 by attorney Thomas W. Cartwright of the Law Office of Thomas W. Cartwright, 1301 NE 14th Street - Ocala, FL 34470-4641. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of address submitted to the Court on June 18, 2014 by attorney Michael R. Dal Lago of Hahn Loeser & Parks, LLP, 5811 Pelican Bay Blvd., Suite 650 - Naples, FL 34108. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8056 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: 6/18/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Thirty Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims Pertaining To Claim No. 3064 Filed By Henley Holdings, LLC. Service Date 6-17-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8055). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8055 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: 6/17/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Sustaining Thirty Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims Pertaining to Claim No. 3064 filed by Henley Holdings, LLC (related document(s)4606). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8054 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: 6/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim Of Deloitte & Touche. Service Date 6-13-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8052). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8053 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Sustaining Thirty Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims Pertaining to Claim No. 3064 Filed by Henley Holdings, LLC Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4606). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8052 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: 6/13/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #Scheduled Claim of Deloitte & Touche (Related Doc # 3352). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-500 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8051 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim of Deloitte & Touche Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3352). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution of Counsel. Allison D. Thompson of the Law Office of Daniel C. Consuegra - Substituted for Ashley L. Sigrist of the Law Office of Daniel C. Consuegra. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8050 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Adam A Diaz on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank National Association, et. al.. (Diaz, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of address submitted to the Court on May 28, 2014 by attorney John H. McCorvey, Jr. formerly with McCorvey & Myers now with McCorvey Law & Mediation, PLLC, 301 West Bay Street, Suite 1458 - Jacksonville, FL 32202. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution of Counsel. Rubina K. Shaldjian of Albertelli Law Substituted for John C. Brock, Jr. formerly of Albertelli Law now known as John C. Brock, Jr of the Solomon Law Group. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of address submitted to the Court on May 27, 2014 by attorney Angelina E. Lim of Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP, PO Box 1100, Tampa, FL 33601-1100. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8049 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc. And The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 5-16-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8048). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-515 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-584 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-643 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-909 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-462 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-954 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-649 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-690 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-513 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-790 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-956 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-589 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-457 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-551 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-882 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:12-ap-301 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-963 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-521 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-524 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-525 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-480 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-641 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-923 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-601 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-451 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-455 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-917 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-573 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-560 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-937 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-979 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-617 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:10-ap-111 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8048 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: 5/16/2014 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement Agreement between Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc. and The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (Related Doc # 7977). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-326 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8047 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: 5/15/2014 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: AGREED UPON AND JOINTLY ADMITTED RULING: 1. FINAL EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE: Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7876). (Mason, Alisa) (Entered: 01/15/2014) [CM44](7878) Response to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Creditor Sovereign Bank (related document(s)7878). (Soriano, Robert) Doc #7940 (EXHIBITS A-E ADMITTED) UNDER ADVISE ORD IN DUE COURSE Reply to Response of Santander Bank, N.A. to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7940). (Gassenheimer, James) Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Doc #7952 *2. PRELIMINARY HEARING RE: THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS (AS IT RELATES TO PHILLIPS PRINTING ONLY), Filed by Arthur J Spector on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4590). (Spector, Arthur) (Entered: 12/15/2011) [Sustaining by #6550] [CM44](4605) SUSTAINED ORD/GASSENHEIMER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt) Modified on 11/5/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8046 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Financial Reports for the Period January 1, 2014 to March 31, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for REO Specialists, LLC Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8045 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Financial Reports for the Period January 1, 2014 to March 31, 2014. Post Confirmation Quarterly for Home America Mortgage, Inc Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Change of address submitted to the Court on May 14, 2014 by attorney David N. Stern of Frank, Weinberg & Black, P.L., 1875 N.W. Corporate Boulevard - Boca Raton, FL 33431. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8044 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: 5/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Financial Reports for the Period January 1, 2014 to March 31, 2014. (Post Confirmation Quarterly) for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-604 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8043 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Request For Judicial Notice In Regard To The May 15, 2014 Final Evidentiary Hearing On Objection To Claims 3519, 3520 And 3251 Filed By Sovereign Bank. Service Date 5-8-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8042, 8041). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8042 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: 5/9/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustees Request For Judicial Notice In Regard To The May 15, 2014 Final Evidentiary Hearing On Objection To Claims 3519, 3520 And 3251 Filed By Sovereign Bank. Service Date 5-8-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8041). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8041 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Plan Trustee's Request for Judicial Notice in Regard to the May 15, 2014 Final Evidentiary Hearing on Objection to Claims 3519, 3520 and 3251 filed by Sovereign Bank Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)7878). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8040 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/8/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8038)). Notice Date 05/07/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8039 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Transfer. Service Date 5-2-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8034). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8038 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: 5/5/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Denying Request for Verification in Discovery and Denying Request to Seal Filed by Katina Duran (related document(s)8016). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8037 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Second Amended Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims as to Phillips Printing, Inc c/o Riverside Claims LLC Only]. Service Date 4-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8031). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8036 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8025)). Notice Date 04/30/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8035 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8024)). Notice Date 04/30/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8034 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 ~Generic~ Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Transfer (Related Doc # 7992). Service Instructions: Conor McLaughlin is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8033 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Amended Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection To Claims]. Service Date 4-29-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8024). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8032 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement. Service Date 4-29-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8027). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8031 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Amended Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims as to Phillips Printing, Inc c/o Riverside Claims LLC Only (Amended to reflect that this hearing pertains to Phillips Printing Inc only) (related document(s)4590, 8024). Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL (3-40) - Suite 1-200, 300 North Hogan St.. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8030 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW RESPONSE TO CORRECTED THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS. Filed by Richard A. Perry on behalf of Creditor Phillips Printing, Inc. (related document(s)8028). (Perry, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8029 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Stipulation (Joint) and Report to Court Regarding May 15, 2014 Final Evidentiary Hearing on Objection to Claims 3519, 3520 and 3251 Filed by Sovereign Bank Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7878). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8028 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 ~Generic~ Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Response to corrected Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Related Doc # 8015). Service Instructions: Richard Perry is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8027 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: 4/29/2014 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement (Related Doc # 7967). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-663 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-645 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-969 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-898 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8026 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC. (McLaughlin, Conor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8025 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail (related document(s)8022). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8024 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4590). Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL (3-40) - Suite 1-200, 300 North Hogan St.. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8023 Filed: 4/27/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 8021)). Notice Date 04/27/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8022 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 4/22/14 on Motion to Approve Compromise. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Statewide Reporting Service: 904-353-7706 (related document(s)8018). Transcript access will be restricted through 07/24/2014. (Attachments: # 1 signature page) (Statewide Reporting Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8021 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Preliminary Hearing on THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS (related document(s)4590, 4605). Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy) Modified on 4/25/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8020 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: 1. Motion to Transfer Certain Notes Free and Clear of Liens Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC (related document(s)[3929]). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # [2] Schedule 1) (McLaughlin, Conor) Doc #7992 GRANTED ORD/NORTON ~2. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RE: THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS, Filed by Arthur J Spector on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4590). (Spector, Arthur) (Entered: 12/15/2011) [Sustaining by #6550] [CM44](4605) SET PRELIMINARY HEARING MAY 15 @ 10:00 CLERK TO NTC. (MAKE SURE NTC. OF HEARING GOES TO: RIVERSIDE CLAIMS LLC (TRANSFEROR PHILLIPS PRINTING), P.O. BOX 626, PLANETARIUM STATION, NEW YORK, NY 10024-0540) Response to Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Richard A. Perry on behalf of Creditor Phillips Printing, Inc. (related document(s)4605). (Perry, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2012)(4687) ~3. Motion TO WITHDRAW RESPONSE TO CORRECTED THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS Filed by Richard A. Perry on behalf of Creditor Phillips Printing, Inc. (related document(s)4605). (Perry, Richard) Doc #8015 GRANTED ORD/PERRY Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8019 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW RESPONSE TO CORRECTED THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS Filed by Richard A. Perry on behalf of Creditor Phillips Printing, Inc. (related document(s)8015). (Perry, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-713 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-579 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8018 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: Home America Mortgage, Inc., the United States, Relators, and Bothwell. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Galler, Debi) Doc #7967 GRANTED/APPROVED ORD/CAVENDER Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8017 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Filed by Jeffrey W Kelley on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (related document(s)7967). (Kelley, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-582 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-505 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-466 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8015 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014, Terminated: 4/29/2014 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion TO WITHDRAW RESPONSE TO CORRECTED THIRTY FOURTH OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS Filed by Richard A. Perry on behalf of Creditor Phillips Printing, Inc. (related document(s)4605). (Perry, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution of Counsel. Frank J Gomez of Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC Substituted for Jerrold Golson formerly of Florida Foreclosure Attorneys, PLLC now of Douglas C Zahm, PA. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8014 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Claim Number 3523 Filed By Michael Ward. Service Date 4-17-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8011). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8013 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Claim Number 3516 Filed By Bendett & McHugh P.C. Service Date 4-17-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8010). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8012 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)7977). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8011 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #3523 by Michael Ward (Related Doc # 7951). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8010 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #3516 of Bendett & McHugh, P.C. (Related Doc # 7950). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of name submitted to the Court on April 17, 2014 by Robert A Heekin of Stutsman Thames & Markey, P.A.. Now known as Robert A. Heekin, Jr. of Thames Markey & Heekin, P.A.. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 3:11-ap-978 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-629 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8009 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No. 3516 Filed by Bendett & McHugh, P.C. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7950). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8008 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No. 3523 Filed by Michael Ward Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7951). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8007 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/8/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Scheduling Conference On Objection To Claim No. 194 Of Phillips Printing And Response Of Phillips Printing. Date 4-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8006). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8006 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: 4/7/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Scheduling Conference Hearing on Objection to Claim No. 194 of Phillips Printing and Response of Phillips Printing Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)4687). Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2014 at 02:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-594 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8005 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Claim Number 3324 Filed By David & Claire Hedgecoe, As Set Forth In The Plan Trustees Thirty Sixth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 4-3-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)8003). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Change of address submitted to the Court on April 4, 2014 by attorney Antonio Alonso of Choice Legal Group, PA, P.O. Box 9908, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33310. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8004 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kevin L Hing on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Hing, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED BY FILER (Related Doc: Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC]. Service Date 4-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7997). (BMC Group) Deficiency: An incomplete PDF image was attached by the filer. Solution: The filer is directed to re-file the document and attach the complete PDF image. No further action will be taken on this document by the Court. (related document(s)8001). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8003 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim Number 3324 filed by David & Claire Hedgecoe, as set forth in the Plan Trustee's Thirty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)5129, 4960). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8002 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC]. Service Date 4-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7997). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8001 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: 4/2/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC]. Service Date 4-1-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7997). (BMC Group (JM)) (See the "CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED BY FILER" entry dated 04/03/2014.) Modified on 04/03/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8000 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC (related document(s)7992). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (McLaughlin, Conor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7999 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Claim(s): Claim No. 811 Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Creditor Integrity Field Services, Inc.. (Dal Lago, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7998 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Stipulation and Report to Court Regarding May 15, 2014 Final Evidentiary Hearing on Objection to Claims 3519, 3520 and 3251 Filed by Sovereign Bank Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7878). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7997 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC (related document(s)7992). Hearing scheduled for 4/24/2014 at 02:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7996 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Motion To Transfer. Service Date 3-28-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7992). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7995 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim Number 3324 Filed by David & Claire Hedgecoe, as Set Forth in the Plan Trustee's Thirty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4960). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7994 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Integrity Field Services, Inc. for Final Determination of Trade Creditor Classificaiton Filed by Michael R Dal Lago on behalf of Creditor Integrity Field Services, Inc. (related document(s)2334). (Dal Lago, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7993 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Change of Address for RS Mechanical Services LLC (Claim No. 532). Filed by Creditor Liquidity Solutions Inc. (Liquidity Solutions Inc (HD))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7992 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: 3/28/2014, Terminated: 4/30/2014 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Transfer Filed by Conor J McLaughlin on behalf of Creditor Henley Holding LLC (related document(s)[3929]). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Schedule 1) (McLaughlin, Conor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Taken
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corrective Action Taken (Related Doc: Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim No. 1593 Filed By Integrity Field Services, Inc., As Set Forth In The Fourteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 3-26-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7986). (BMC Group) Deficiency: The PDF image of the document and the docket entry or docket event do not match. Solution: The Clerk's office has re-docketed the filing or has modified the docket entry to match the document filed and will process accordingly. If applicable, the filer is directed to file the intended document. (related document(s)7989). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8016 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Verification in Discovery Filed by Creditor Katina L. Duran. (Schumpert, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7991 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Seventy Third Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 3-26-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7988). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7990 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Claim Number 3050 Filed By JLB Corporation D/B/A Golden Oak Lending. Service Date 3-26-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7987). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7989 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Seventy Second Omnibus Objection to Claims. Service Date 3-26-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7986). (BMC Group (JM)) (See the "Corrective Action Taken" entry dated 03/28/2014.) Modified on 03/28/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 3/28/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7988 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Sustaining Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) #Seventy Third (Related Doc # 7923). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7987 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #3050 of JLB Corporation d/b/a Golden Oak Lending (Related Doc # 7921). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7986 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Sustaining Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) #Seventy Second (Related Doc # 7922). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7985 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To The Application Of Integrity Field Services, Inc. For Allowance And Payment Of Administrative Expense Claim. Service Date 3-24-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7983). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7984 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim No. 1593 Filed By Integrity Field Services, Inc., As Set Forth In The Fourteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 3-24-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7982). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-564 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-881 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7983 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed Order Resolving Objection to the Application of Integrity Field Services, Inc. for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s)4652, 4571). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7982 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed Order Resolving Objection to Claim No. 1593 filed by Integrity Field Services, Inc., as set for th in the Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)4011, 3521). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7981 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc. And The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 3-21-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7977). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7980 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim Number 3050 Filed by JLB Corporation d/b/a Golden Oak Lending Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7921). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7979 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Sustaining Seventy Third Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7923). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7978 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Sustaining Seventy Second Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7922). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7977 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014, Terminated: 5/16/2014 Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: Greg Steinmetz Construction, Inc. and Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7976 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving (I) The Omnibus Objection To Claims [ECF No. 7892] As To Claim Nos. 1525, 1526, 3474, 3300, 3299, 3301 And 539; (II) Objection To Claim Nos. 1526 And 3299 [ECF No. 5941]; (III) Objection To Claims [ECF No. 4606] As To Claim Nos. 3474, 1561, 3300, 3301 And 539; And (IV) Objection To Claims [ECF No. 3522] As To Claim No. 539. Service Date 3-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7971). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7975 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Motion For Approval Of An Interim Distribution To Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims. Service Date 3-19-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7970). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7974 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)4571). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7973 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: 3/20/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)3521). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7972 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: Home America Mortgage, Inc., the United States, Relators, and Bothwell]. Service Date 3-18-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7969). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7971 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed Order Resolving (I) The Omnibus Objection to Claims as to Claim NOS. 1525, 1526, 3474, 3300, 3299, 3301 and 539; (II) Objection to Claim NOS. 1526 and 3299; (III) Objection to Claims as to Claim NOS 3474, 1561, 3300, 3301and 539; and (IV) Objection to Claims as to Claim No. 539 (related document(s)7892). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7970 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Order on Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims (Related Doc # 7924). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7969 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: Home America Mortgage, Inc., the United States, Relators, and Bothwell. (related document(s)7967). Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2014 at 10:30 AM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7968 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement. Service Date 6-17-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7967). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7967 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014, Terminated: 4/29/2014 Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement. Related Case and Parties: Home America Mortgage, Inc., the United States, Relators, and Bothwell. Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7966 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Complaint Filing Spread Text
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Complaint by Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust against Godrick Entertainment, Inc. 3:14-ap-00102-JAF; Nature of Suit(s): 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Cunningham, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7965 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Seventy First Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 3-13-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7959). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7964 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Hearing [Re: Objection to Claim(s) Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank]. Service Date 3-13-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7958). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:13-ap-235 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7963 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Change of Address for GLEASON PERSONNEL INC (Claim No. 1548) Filed by Creditor Liquidity Solutions Inc. (Liquidity Solutions Inc (NS))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7962 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)7924). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7961 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Proposed Order Resolving (I) the Omnibus Objection to Claims [ECF No. 7892] as to Claim Nos. 1525, 1526, 3474, 3300, 3299, 3301 and 539; (II) Ojbection to Claim Nos. 1526 and 3299 [ECF No. 5941]; (III) Objection to Claims [ECF No. 4606] as to Claim Nos. 3474, 1561, 3300, 3301 and 539; and (IV) Objection to Claims [ECF No. 3522] as to Claim No. 539 Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7892, 5941, 4606, 3522). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7960 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Settlement With Integrity Field Services, Inc. And Notice In Accordance With Footnote 3 Of The Motion For Approval Of An Interim Distribution To Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims [ECF No. 7924]. Service Date 3-12-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7956). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7959 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Sustaining Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) #Seventy First Omnibus (Related Doc # 7875). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7958 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/13/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Final Evidentiary Hearing on Objection to Claim(s) Nos. 3519, 2520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank (related document(s)7878, 7876). Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7957 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: 1. Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James) Doc #7924 GRANTED ORD/GASSENHEIMER 2. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RE: Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7876). (Mason, Alisa) (Entered: 01/15/2014) [CM44](7878) SET FEH ON OBJ TO CLAIMS FOR MAY 15 @ 10:00 CLERK TO NTC. Response to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Creditor Sovereign Bank (related document(s)7878). (Soriano, Robert) Doc #7940 Reply to Response of Santander Bank, N.A. to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7940). (Gassenheimer, James) Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Doc #7952 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Chap, Dkt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7956 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Settlement with Integrity Field Services, Inc. and Notice in Accordance with Footnote 3 of the Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims [ECF No. 7924] Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria (related document(s)7924). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7955 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - The Plan Trustee's Reply To Response Of Santander Bank, N.A. To Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection To Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 And 3521. Service Date 3-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7952). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7954 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Objection To Claim Number 3523 Filed By Michael Ward. Service Date 3-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7951). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7953 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Objection To Claim Number 3516. Service Date 3-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7950). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-576 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-666 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7952 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Response - Other than Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to Response of Santander Bank, N.A. to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7940). (Gassenheimer, James) Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy). Modified on 3/11/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7951 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014, Terminated: 4/17/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 3523 Filed by Michael Ward. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7950 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014, Terminated: 4/17/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 3516 Filed by Bendett & McHugh P.C.. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7949 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Sustaining Seventy First Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7875). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-585 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-568 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-498 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-464 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of address submitted to the Court on March 3, 2014 by attorney Kevin E. Mangum, formerly with Mangum & Associates, P.A., now with Mateer & Harbert, P.A., P.O. Box 2854 - Orlando, FL 32802-2854. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 3:11-ap-467 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7948 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 3/1/2014 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 7945)). Notice Date 02/28/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7947 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 Request for Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Notice Filed by Alice A Blanco on behalf of Creditor Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Blanco, Alice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 3:11-ap-957 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 3:11-ap-476 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 3:11-ap-456 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7946 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Notice Of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Interested Parties Trademark Recruiting, Inc., GMAC Mortgage LLC, BSC Ventures, LLC, Sekas Custom Pools, LLC, Allure Global Solutions, Inc., CJ Sales & Service of Ocala, Inc.. (Fernandez, Lara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7945 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Service of Previously Entered Order/Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Service of Previously Entered Order/Notice via Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Title of Previously Entered Document: Order Striking Entered on the Docket 2/26/14 (related document(s)7944). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7944 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Order Striking
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Striking Response to Seventy Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)7943). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Perkins, Cathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2014 (Perkins, Cathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7942 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Scheduling Conference On Corrective Objection To Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 And 3521 Of Sovereign Bank. Service Date 2-20-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7941). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7941 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Scheduling Conference on Corrective Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank and Response by Sovereign Bank (related document(s)7878, 7940). Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2014 at 03:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution of Counsel. Antonio Alonso of Choice Legal Group, P.A. Substituted for Tennille Shipwash of Choice Legal Group, P.A. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7943 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Response - Other than Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Seventy Third Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Creditor Nancy Comstock (related document(s)7923). (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7940 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Response - Other than Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection to Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 and 3521 Filed by Robert A. Soriano on behalf of Creditor Sovereign Bank (related document(s)7878). (Soriano, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7939 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Financial Reports for the Period 10/1/2013 to 12/31/2013. (Post Confirmation Quarterly) for Home America Mortgage, Inc. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7938 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Financial Reports for the Period 10/1/2013 to 12/31/2013. (Post Confirmation Quarterly) for REO Specialists, LLC Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7937 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Financial Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Financial Reports for the Period 10/1/2013 to 12/31/2013. (Post Confirmation Quarterly) for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee. (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7936 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Rescheduled Preliminary Hearing. Service Date 2-11-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7932). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7935 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Preliminary Hearing [Re: Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims]. Service Date 2-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7929). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7934 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Claim No. 3318 Filed By Vicki Boldrick As Set Forth In The Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 2-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7928). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7933 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim Number 1576 Filed By Lakehills Center At Laguna, LLC, As Set Forth In The Plan Trustee's Sixty Eighth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 2-10-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7927). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7932 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: 2/11/2014 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Rescheduled Preliminary Hearing Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7924). Hearing scheduled for 3/12/2014 at 03:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution of Counsel. Tennille M. Shipwash of the Choice Legal Group, P.A. Substituted for Scott R. Weiss of the Choice Legal Group, P.A. (Mason, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7931 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Motion For Approval Of An Interim Distribution To Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims. Service Date 2-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7924). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7930 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Objection To Claim Number 1622 Filed By Bank Of America Home Loans. Service Date 2-7-14.(Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7920). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7929 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Notice of Hearing (Bk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims (related document(s)7924). Hearing scheduled for 3/27/2014 at 01:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - 300 North Hogan St. 4th Floor Courtroom 4D. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7928 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No. 3318 filed by Vicki Boldrick as set forth in the debtor's Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)2243, 2392). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7927 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Order Resolving Obejction to Claim Number 1576 filed by Lakehills Center at Laguna, LLC, as set forth in the Plan Trustee's Sixty Eighth Omnibus Obejction to Claims (related document(s)7618, 7546). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7926 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Seventy Third Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims Should be Disallowed under Section 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code). Service Date 2-6-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7923). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7925 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - 1. Plan Trustees Objection To Claim Number 3050 Filed By JLB Corporation d/b/a Golden Oak Lending and 2. Seventy Second Omnibus Objection To Claims (Claims Should be Disallowed under Section 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code). Service Date 2-6-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7922, 7921). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7924 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014, Terminated: 3/19/2014 Motion for Approval
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Approval of an Interim Distribution to Allowed TBW Class 9 General Unsecured Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7923 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014, Terminated: 3/26/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Omnibus Objection to Claim(s). Various Claimants. Seventy Third Omnibus Objection to Claims Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7922 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014, Terminated: 3/26/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Omnibus Objection to Claim(s). Various Claims. Seventy Second Omnibus Objection to Claims Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7921 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014, Terminated: 3/26/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Claim(s). Claim No. 3050 Filed by JLB Corporation d/b/a Golden Oak Lending. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7920 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Claim Number 1622 Filed by Bank of America Home Loans Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)4606). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7919 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Proposed Order Resolving Objection to Claim Number 1576 Filed by Lakehills Center at Laguna, LLC, as Set Forth in the Plan Trustee's Sixty Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7546). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7918 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: 2/6/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No. 3318 Filed by Vicki Boldrick as Set Forth in the Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)2243). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7917 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order Authorizing Destruction of Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Authorizing Destruction of Evidence from hearing 6/28/13 - by TBW (related document(s)7427). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7916 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26478 Of Courtney Craddock, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-31-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7906). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7915 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim Number s26301 Of Lauri Thomas, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-31-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7905). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7914 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: 2/3/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26382 Of Glen Vittitow, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-31-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7904). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7913 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s5875 Of Kimberly Porter. Service Date 1-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7902). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7912 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7901). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7911 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim Number s26551 Of Brenda Hughes, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7900). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7910 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim Number s26335 Of Jerry Smith, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7899). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7909 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26189 Of Rachelle Rodgers, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-30-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7898). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7908 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Sustaining Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26155 Of Sarah Bell And Malcolm Shane Bell, As Set Forth In The Twelfth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 1-30-14. Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7897). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7907 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Inc.'s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On Objection To Claim # 3229 Filed By Centurion Asset Partners, Inc. Service Date 1-30-14. Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7896). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7906 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. S26478 of Courtney Craddock, as set forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7905 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim Number s26301 of Lauri Thomas, as set forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7904 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: 1/31/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. S26382 of Glen Vittitow, As set forth in The Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7903 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Omnibus Objection To Claim Nos. 3474, 3300, 3299, 3301, 3508, 1525, 1526 And 539 Filed By Zurich American Insurance Company. Service Date 1-29-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7892). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7902 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection to Scheduled Claim No. S5875 of Kimberly Porter (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7901 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7900 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim Number s26551 of Brenda Hughes, as set forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7899 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim Number s26335 of Jerry Smith, as set forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7898 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. S26189 of Rachelle Rodgers, as set forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7897 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. S26155 of Sarah Bell and Malcolm Shane Bell, as Set Forth in theTwelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3346). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7896 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Objection to Claim #3229 Filed by Centurion Asset Partners, Inc. (related document(s)7669, 7611, 7680). Service Instructions: Jeffrey Kelley is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7895 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26301 of Lauri Thomas, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7894 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26478 of Courtney Craddock, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7893 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26382 of Glen Vittitow, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7892 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014, Terminated: 3/19/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Omnibus Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3474, 3300, 3299, 3301, 3508, 1525, 1526 and 539 of Zurich American Insurance Company. Contains negative notice. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7891 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Third Order Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7890 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s5875 of Kimberly Porter Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7840). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 3:11-ap-926 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7889 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim Number s26551 of Brenda Hughes, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7888 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26189 of Rachelle Rodgers, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7887 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26155 of Sarah Bell and Malcolm Shane Bell, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7886 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Scheduled Claim Number s26335 of Jerry Smith, as Set Forth in the Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)3346). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-600 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-553 Closed. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7885 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Katina Duran's Three Successive Motions For Reconsideration Of The Court's Order On Debtor's Omnibus Objection #8: Claims For Which Debtors Are Not Liable Entered On August 18, 2011 And Denying Motion For Judicial Notice. Service Date 1-21-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7884). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7883 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: 1/20/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26435 Of Eagle Eye Office Cleaning, Inc. Service Date 1-17-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7882). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7882 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #Claim S26435 of Eagle Eye Office Cleaning, Inc. (Related Doc # 7769). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7884 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Denying Katina Duran's Three Successive Motions for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Debtor's Omnibus Objection #8: Claims for which Debtors are not Liable entered on August 18, 2011 and Denying Motion for Judicial Notice (related document(s)7537, 7557, 7542, 7543). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7881 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - The Plan Trustee's Corrected Objection To Claim Numbers 3519, 3520 And 3521 Filed By Sovereign Bank. Service Date 1-15-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7878). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7880 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice Of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Michael Gulisano on behalf of Creditor Mortgage First. (Gulisano, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7879 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: 1/16/2014 Notice Of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by S. Hunter Malin on behalf of Creditor John Crain. (Malin, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7878 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014, Terminated: 8/6/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrective Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank. Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7876). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7877 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Seventy First Omnibus Objection To Claims (Borrower Claims are Fully Satisfied). Service Date 1-13-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7875). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7876 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: 1/14/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Claim(s). Claim Nos. 3519, 3520 and 3521 of Sovereign Bank. Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7875 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014, Terminated: 3/13/2014 Objection to Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Omnibus Objection to Claim(s). Various. Seventy First Omnibus Objection to Claims Contains negative notice. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7874 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection to Scheduled Claim No. s26435 of Eagle Eye Office Cleaning, Inc. Filed by Alisa Paige Mason on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7769). (Mason, Alisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7873 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Claimant's Motion For Reconsideration. Service Date 1-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7870). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7872 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: 1/8/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Mailing - Order Denying Pro Se Claimant's Motion For Judicial Notice, Service Date 1-7-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7869). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7871 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request to be Removed from All Creditor/Parties Mailing Matrix Filed by L Todd Budgen on behalf of Attorney L Todd Budgen. (Budgen, L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7870 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 ~Generic~ Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration (Related Doc # 7675). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7869 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 ~Generic~ Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Denying Motion for Judicial Notice filed by Pro Se Jay D. Oyler (Related Doc # 7536). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of name submitted to the Court on January 6, 2014 by Robert N. Gilbert of Carlton Fields, PA. Now known as Robert N. Gilbert of Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7868 Filed: 1/4/2014, Entered: 1/4/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Plan Trustee's Sixth Motion For Extension Of Time To Object To Claims. Service Date 1-2-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7866). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7867 Filed: 1/4/2014, Entered: 1/4/2014 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Order Granting Motion To Approve Settlement Agreement Between The Government National Mortgage Association And The Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust. Service Date 1-2-14. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7865). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Change of name submitted to the Court on January 3, 2014 by Hywel Leonard of Carlton Fields, PA. Now known as Hywel Leonard of Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7866 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Sixth) to Object to Claims (Related Doc # 7863). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7865 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise or Settlement Agreement Between the Government National Mortgage Association and The Taylor Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (Related Doc # 7809). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 3:11-ap-591 Closed. (Sosnicki, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Substitution of Counsel. Mariam Zaki of the Law Offices of Elizabeth R. Wellborn Substituted for Taji Foreman of Kahane and Associates. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution of Counsel. Marc G Granger Substituted for Jason A. Weber. (Wiener, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7864 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order on Plan Trustee's Sixth Motion for Extension of Time to Object to Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Trustee Plan Trustee for Taylor, Bean and Whitaker (related document(s)7863). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7863 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013, Terminated: 1/2/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sixth Motion to Extend Time to Object to Claims Filed by James D Gassenheimer on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust (related document(s)7670). (Gassenheimer, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7862 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Between the Government National Mortgage Association and the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7809). (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7861 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Response or Settlement and Request for Entry of Order Filed by Debi Evans Galler on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee (related document(s)7809). (Galler, Debi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7860 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: 12/23/2013 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service Re: Order Denying Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Filed by Cenlar FSB. Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Creditor Cenlar FSB (related document(s)7850). (Noel, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7859 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Claim No. 1727 Filed By RG Colling Apartments, Inc., As Set Forth In The Plan Trustee's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection To Claims. Service Date 12-20-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7854). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7858 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection To Claim Number 1677 Filed By Ellsworth Van Patten. Service Date 12-20-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7853). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7857 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Order Resolving Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection To Claims With Respect To Scheduled Claim No. s6220 Of Barfield & Associates Of Ocala, Inc. Service Date 12-20-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7852). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7856 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Plan Trustee's Objection To Scheduled Claim No. s26622 For 24/7 Call Capture. Service Date 12-20-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7851). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7855 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Notice Of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal from Case and Request to Stop Electronic Notice Filed by Jennifar M. Hill on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (related document(s)4962, 4878). (Hill, Jennifar)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7854 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Sustaining Objection to claim No. 1727 filed by RG Colling Apartments, Inc. as set for th in the Plan Trustee's Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)3521). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7853 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #1677 of Ellesworth Van Patten (Related Doc # 5379). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7852 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Resolving Thirty Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims with Respect to Scheduled Claim No. S6220 of Barfield & Associates of Ocala, Inc. (related document(s)4605). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7851 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order on Objection to Claims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #S26622 for 24/7 Call Capture (Related Doc # 3343). Service Instructions: Alisa Mason is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7850 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: 12/20/2013 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Denying Motion For Relief From Stay RE: Cenlar FSB (Related Doc # 7811) Service Instructions: Nicole Noel is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Perkins, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7849 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Mailing - Plan Trustee's Objection To Scheduled Claim Number S5875 Of Kimberly Porter. Service Date 12-16-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7840). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7848 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim Numbers 62, 320, 1191 And 1271. Service Date 12-16-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7838). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7847 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing - Agreed Order Resolving Objection To Claim Number 2637. Service Date 12-16-13. (Admin.) Filed by Other Prof. BMC Group (related document(s)7837). (BMC Group (JM))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7846 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service of Agreed Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay Nunc Pro Tunc. Filed by George E Wise on behalf of Creditor Webster Bank N.A. (related document(s)7839). (Wise, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7845 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Denying Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Creditor Cenlar FSB (related document(s)7811). (Noel, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Close Adversary Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 3:11-ap-659 Closed. (Craft, Tonya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,882 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?