Blum v. Security Trust Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-00031-DGC
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael, Blum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Steven Friedman +1 602 776 5902 +1 602 274 1199 afriedman@bffb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD A. MANISKAS +1 484 588 5516 +1 610 667 7056 rmaniskas@rmclasslaw.com
Space Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Beth A Seeger, Defendant
No Logo Capital Management Investors Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrill & Aronson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin A. Aronson +1 602 650 4122 +1 602 285 9544 maronson@maazlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M Andrew +1 616 752 2000
Space Daniel R. Gravelyn +1 616 752 2000 +1 616 752 2500 dgravelyn@wnj.com
Space William Kenneth Holmes +1 616 752 2000 +1 616 222 2108 wholmes@wnj.com
Space Brian J Masternak +1 616 752 2000 bmasternak@wnj.com
No Logo Grant D Seeger, Defendant
No Logo Security Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrill & Aronson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin A. Aronson +1 602 650 4122 +1 602 285 9544 maronson@maazlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M Andrew +1 616 752 2000
Space Daniel R. Gravelyn +1 616 752 2000 +1 616 752 2500 dgravelyn@wnj.com
Space William Kenneth Holmes +1 616 752 2000 +1 616 222 2108 wholmes@wnj.com
Space Brian J Masternak +1 616 752 2000 bmasternak@wnj.com
No Logo Sharon D Kenyon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roshka DeWulf & Patten, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J Roshka, Jr. +1 602 256 6100 +1 602 256 6800 roshka@rdp-law.com
No Logo William A Kenyon, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roshka DeWulf & Patten, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J Roshka, Jr. +1 602 256 6100 +1 602 256 6800 roshka@rdp-law.com
No Logo Bret Bushaw, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Carol A Martin, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Clayton Bennett, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Frances DeVore, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Gary Gesualdi, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Glen D Turbysill, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo H Patterson Hezmall, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
Space Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

No Logo Jean K Damson, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com
No Logo Joseph C Curtis, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Joseph E Tether, III, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Julie Levine, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Kristina Moore, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Lewis Monte, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Liam Mullan, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Lisa Messina, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
Space Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

No Logo Mark Tonello, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Oliver Trone, II, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Richard French & Associates 401 (K) Profit Sharing Plan, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Ricky R Klawitter, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
Space Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

No Logo Robert Kinnear, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Sandra Jones, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Shirley Fogland, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Susan K Rose, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Todd C Dudley, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo William Canielli, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo William L Fogo, Movant

Represented by Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/7/2004
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/3/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags MULTI-DISTRICT, STD, TERMED, TRANSFER
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Neil V. Wake hereby recuses himself from this action FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell All further papers/pleadings should now list the following complete case number: CIV-04-31-PHX-DGC (cc: all counsel/DGC) (MAP)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Neil V. Wake granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Eric J. Belfi, atty for movant Jean K Damson [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
      Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Eric J Belfi (BAS)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/30/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
        MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Eric J. Belfi, atty for movant Jean K Damson [28-1] (MAP)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
          Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Richard A Maniskas - not paid as to this attorney- added due to administrative cleanup after case terminated (BAS)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
            no $25 pro hac vice fee required for Marc A Topaz- attorney added per administrative cleanup (BAS)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
              Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Joseph R Seidman Jr - no fee required - attorney added per administrative cleanup (BAS)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Sandy A Liebhard - no fee paid - attorney added per administrative correction (BAS)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Remark - Public
                  ACKNOWLEDMENT OF Receipt of transferred case at USDC Dist of Maryland; New Case No: CIV-04-1445 (MAP)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Order
                    CERTIFIED COPY OF MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the District of Maryland to be included in MDL-1586 (cc: all counsel/MDL Panel) (MAP)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Case Transferred Out to Another District
                      CERTIFIED copies of transfer order and docket sheet, and transmittal letter Federal Expressed to Maryland (MAP)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        The Court has ORDERED that effective June 28, 2004, the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge Neil V. Wake for all further proceedings. Any hearing, conference, or trial scheduled to be held between 6/28/04 and 7/9/04, is vacated. All other matters remain as scheduled. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel review and comply with the attached instructions. All further pleadings and papers filed in this action on or after 6/28/04, should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel/NVW/ SRB) [26-1] (KAL)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                          REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Alfred G Yates Jr 519 Allegheny Bldg 429 Forbes Ave Pittsburgh PA 15219 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission date of 4/18/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                            REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Peter E Seidman Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP 1 Pennsylvania Plaza 49th Floor New York NY 10116 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 4/23/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                              REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Charles J Piven World Trade Ctr 401 E Pratt St Ste 2525 Baltimore MD 21202 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 4/23/04 pty represented by other admitted coounsel (BAS)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                                REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Brian Murray Rabin & Peckel LLP 275 Madison Ave 34th Floor New York NY 10016 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 4/18/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                                  REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Sharon M Lee Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP 1 Pennsylvania Plaza 49th Floor New York NY 10119 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 4/18/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Remark - Public
                                    REMARK as to Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Eric J Belfi Rabin & Peckel LLP 275 Madison Ave 34th Floor New York NY 10016 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 4/18/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT by Security Trust Lead pla movants to motion for appointment of lead pla by movants [12-2], motion appointment of Steering Committed by movants [12-3], motion approval of selection of coordinating counsel, lead counsel, and liaison counsel by movants [12-4] and in opposition the competing motion (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting stipulation that plas time to file responses concerning the appointment of lead pla in the actions be extended to 3/19/04 and plas time to file any reply memoranda be extended to 4/1/04 by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina and attorneys for the Clendening Proposed Lead Plas (Clendening Proposed Lead Plas- Attorney Aaron Brody & Bradley Dyer, 6 East 45th St., 5th Fl, NY, NY 10017 are not counsel to any parties in CV 04-31 PHX-SRB (cc: all counsel/ABrody/BDyer) (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Remark - Public
                                          REMARK as to H Patterson Hezmall, Ricky R Klawitter, Lisa Messina re atty Joseph R Seidman Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz LLP 10 E 40th St New York NY 10016 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 3/28/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Remark - Public
                                            REMARK as to Security Trust Co, Bret Bushaw, Jean K Damson, Frances DeVore, Shirley Fogland, William L Fogo, Carol A Martin, Kristina Moore, Liam Mullan, Susan K Rose, Glen D Turbysill, Gary Gesualdi, Julie Levine, Lewis Monte, Clayton Bennett, William Canielli, Todd C Dudley, Robert Kinnear, Joseph E Tether III, Mark Tonello, Joseph C Curtis, Sandra Jones, Oliver Trone II, Richard French Assoc re atty Steven G Schulman Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP 1 Pennsylvania Plaza 49th Floor New York NY 10119 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 3/28/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Remark - Public
                                              REMARK as to H Patterson Hezmall, Ricky R Klawitter, Lisa Messina re atty Sandy A Liebhard Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz LLP 10 E 40th St New York NY 10016 removed from database for noncompliance w/admission deadline of 3/28/04 pty represented by other admitted counsel (BAS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Melvyn Weiss, atty for pla Michael Blum [22-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                                                  Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Brian M Andrew (BAS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004, Terminated: 3/25/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                    MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Melvyn Weiss, atty for pla Michael Blum [22-1] (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                                                      Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Melvyn I Weiss (BAS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Memorandum
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAWS IN FURTHER SUPPORT by lead pla movants of motion to consolidate cases CV 03-2508 LOA; CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-JAT, 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC by Security Trust Lead Pla Movants [12-1], motion for appointment of lead pla by movants [12-2], motion appointment of Steering Committed by movants [12-3], motion approval of selection of coordinating counsel, lead counsel, and liaison counsel [12-4] and in opposition to the competing motions (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Brian Andrew, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [18-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION that pls time to file responses concerning the appointment of lead pla in the actions be extended to 3/19/04 and plas time to file any reply memoranda be extended to 4/1/04 by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina and attorneys for the Clendening Proposed Lead Plas (Clendening Proposed Lead Plas- Attorney Aaron Brody & Bradley Dyer, 6 East 45th St., 5th Fl, NY, NY 10017 are not counsel to any parties in CV 04-31 PHX-SRB (former emp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004, Terminated: 3/17/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                              MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Brian Andrew, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [18-1] (former emp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting stipulation; dfts shall not be required to answer or respond to the initial complaint filed in this action; after consolidation an appointment of lead pla and lead counsel, the parties shall agree ans submit to the Court an appropriate schedule for the filing of a consolidated complaint and for briefing any responsive motions to the consolidated complaint (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Stipulation
                                                                  STIPULATION to extend time for all dfts to respond to the initial complaint (dfts do not have to answer to the complaint in this case-parties requesting consolidated complaint) by pla, dfts (former emp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton finding the motion to consolidate cases (CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-PGR, CV 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC), appointment as lead plas and for approval of their seclection of lead counsel by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina [10-1] denied as moot. (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                                                                      Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Brian J Masternak (BAS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Brian J Masternak, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [14-1] (former emp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Declaration
                                                                          DECLARATION of Sharon M Lee in support of motion to consolidate cases CV 03-2508 LOA; CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-JAT, CV 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC by Security Trust Lead Pla Movants [12-1] [12-1], re motion for appointment of lead pla by movants [12-2] [12-2], re motion appointment of Steering Committed by movants [12-3] [12-3], re motion approval of selection of coordinating counsel, lead counsel, and liaison counsel by movants [12-4] by movants (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                            MOTION to consolidate cases CV 03-2508 LOA; CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-JAT, CV 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC by Security Trust Lead Pla Movants [12-1] , for appointment of lead pla by movants [12-2] , appointment of Steering Committed by movants [12-3] , approval of selection of coordinating counsel, lead counsel, and liaison counsel by movants [12-4] (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Declaration
                                                                              DECLARATION of Joseph R Seidman, Jr in support of motion to consolidate cases (CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-PGR, CV 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC) appointment of lead plas and for approval of their selection of lead counsel by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina [10-1] [10-1] by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                MOTION to consolidate cases (CV 04-31 PHX-SRB, CV 04-82 PHX-PGR, CV 04-87 PHX-PGR, CV 04-143 PHX-SMM, CV 04-230 PHX-EHC), appointment as lead plas and for approval of their seclection of lead counsel by movant H Patterson Hezmall, movant Ricky R Klawitter, movant Lisa Messina [10-1] (former emp) Modified on 02/25/2004
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to William K Holmes, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [5-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Daniel R Gravelyn, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Capital Mgt Invstr, by service on John Hunt, Manager on 1/27/04 in Chicago, IL (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to William K Holmes (BAS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Daniel R Gravelyn (BAS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Daniel R Gravelyn, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [6-1] (former emp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2004 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to William K Holmes, atty for dft Security Trust Co, dft Capital Mgt Invstr [5-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Grant D Seeger, dft Beth A Seeger, by service on Jane Doe on 1/28/04 in Phoenix, AZ (former emp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Sharon D Kenyon, dft William A Kenyon Jron by service on William Kenyon on 1/19/04 in Phoenix, AZ (former emp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Security Trust Co, by service on statutory agent, Dennis Wilenchick on 1/15/04 in Phoenix, AZ (former emp)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FILED (MRB)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 275 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?