Heller, et al v. Walton, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:03-cv-01011
District Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan L. Wurtzel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Fleischman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 fleischman@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Eugene Basch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Henzel +6106608000 888 643 6735 +1 610 660 8080 mhenzel182@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Miske +1 212 545 4600
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Frank Stagliano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Maniskas +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Gerald Nardella, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Jerome Koeske, Plaintiff

Represented by Milberg LLP

No Logo John Roderick Heller, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Fleischman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 fleischman@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Julie T. Schell, Plaintiff

Represented by Milberg LLP

No Logo Kenneth D. Thompson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jude George +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 dgeorge@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Linda Stein, Plaintiff

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
No Logo Todd S. Bolsius, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo William D. Elwell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott E. Poynter +1 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Emerson Poynter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Emerson, Jr. +1 281 488 8854 +1 281 488 8867 jemerson@emersonfirm.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com
v.
No Logo John V. Hargiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Brian Albritton +1 813 472 7557 +1 813 472 7570 brian.albritton@phelps.com
No Logo Wanda D. Dearth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Brian Albritton +1 813 472 7557 +1 813 472 7570 brian.albritton@phelps.com
No Logo Charles Bradford, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
No Logo Greg Graves, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
No Logo James F. Johnson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barker, Rodems & Cook, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris A. Barker +1 813 489 1001 +1 813 489 1008 cbarker@barkerrodemsandcook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Kenneth D. Thompson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo Marc Waeterschoot, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Fleischman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 fleischman@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Martin Hodas, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo Ray E. Gartner, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
No Logo Robert C. Reid, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
No Logo Robert Seeley, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barker, Rodems & Cook, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris A. Barker +1 813 489 1001 +1 813 489 1008 cbarker@barkerrodemsandcook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Ruth A. Johnson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barker, Rodems & Cook, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris A. Barker +1 813 489 1001 +1 813 489 1008 cbarker@barkerrodemsandcook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Troy C. Giffin, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo W. Ronald Johnson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barker, Rodems & Cook, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris A. Barker +1 813 489 1001 +1 813 489 1008 cbarker@barkerrodemsandcook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of change of Firm Address as to Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, Melville Office by William S. Lerach (apv, ) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 57 Motion for disbursement of funds . Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 10/14/2005. (jm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin re 57 MOTION for disbursement of funds and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (George, David) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
        MOTION for disbursement of funds and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Distribution Order# 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Frank Barkan of RSM McGladrey Claims Administrator# 3 Exhibit Final Report of RSM McGladrey Claims Administrator dated September 9, 2005)(George, David) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
          MOTION for disbursement of funds and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Distribution Order# 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Frank Barkan of RSM McGladrey Claims Administrator# 3 Exhibit Final Report of RSM McGladrey Claims Administrator dated September 9, 2005)(George, David) Document missing pages. Counsel to re-file. Modified on 10/13/2005 (apv, ). (Entered: 10/13/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER and Final Judgment pursuant to settlement hearing on 2/25/2005, re 53 Declaration filed by Kenneth D. Thompson,, Martin Hodas,, Troy C. Giffin. The Clerk of Court shall close this case and the consolidated cases to which this Order applies (Dkt. 33) . Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/25/2005. (jm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. Miscellaneous Hearing: Settlement Fairness Hearing held on 2/25/2005. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (cl-m) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of William B. Federman and David J. George by Martin Hodas, Troy C. Giffin, Kenneth D. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavits Regarding Settlement# 2 Exhibit Lodestar for Co-Lead Counsel)(George, David) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in support re 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 49 Order,, 51 Order, filed by Martin Hodas, Troy C. Giffin, Kenneth D. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit# 2 Exhibit Affidavit# 3 Exhibit Affidavit# 4 Exhibit Final Judgment)(George, David) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER re 47 MOTION for Preliminary approval of Class action settlement and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Kenneth D. Thompson, Martin Hodas, Troy C. Giffin, 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The preliminary approval order (Dkt. 48) was missing page 3 of Exhibit A-3. Attached is page 3 of Exhibit A-3 which is to be appended to the order, in the appropriate place, to correct the error.Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/29/2004. (sn) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Hearing: (Miscellaneous Hearing) Settlement Fairness Hearing scheduled for 2/25/2005 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. (cl-m) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER re 47 MOTION for Preliminary approval of Class action settlement and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Kenneth D. Thompson, Martin Hodas, Troy C. Giffin, 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The preliminary approval order (Dkt. 48) was missing page 8; the order is reentered to correct that error. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/23/2004. (jm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 47 Motion for preliminary approval in connection with settlement proceedings . Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/19/2004. (jm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Preliminary approval of Class action settlement and incorporated memorandum of law by Troy C. Giffin, Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit 1 of Exhibit A, #(4) Exhibit 2 of Exhibit A, #(5) Exhibit 3 of Exhibit A, #(6) Exhibit B, #(7) Exhibit 2)(apv) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT by Cryo-Cell International, Inc.. (Miller, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER re 43 Mediation report, directing status report. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 10/12/2004. (jm, ) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Frank Stagliano, Julie T. Schell, Gerald Nardella, Todd S. Bolsius, Linda Stein, Eugene Basch, William D. Elwell, Jerome Koeske, Kenneth D. Thompson of change of address for counsel (rm) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                    MEDIATION REPORT. Mediation conference held: 5/24/04. Gerald T.Wetherington, mediator. Hearing outcome: Settled (mrh) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner of change of address for counsel (jlg) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 41 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None
                                        CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel amending [1-1] complaint; jury demand (filed separately) (bls) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying [35-1] motion for status conference hearing on [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel ( Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich ) ctc (jlg) (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [38-1] agreed motion to extend time to file consolidated amended complaint until 4/30/04; reset amended complaint deadline at 4/30/04 for Kenneth D. Thompson, for Jerome Koeske, for William D. Elwell, for Eugene Basch, for Linda Stein, for Todd S. Bolsius, for Gerald Nardella, for Julie T. Schell, for Frank Stagliano, for Alan L. Wurtzel, for John Roderick Heller III ( Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich ) ctc (jlg) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/24/2004
                                              AGREED MOTION by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Frank Stagliano, Julie T. Schell, Gerald Nardella, Todd S. Bolsius, Linda Stein, Eugene Basch, William D. Elwell, Jerome Koeske, Kenneth D. Thompson (agreed) to extend time to file consolidated amended complaint until 4/30/04 (jlg) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                RETURN of service executed as to Mirsky, Furst Assoc. on 9/19/03 (jlg) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                  RETURN of service executed as to Weinick Sanders on 9/19/03 (jlg) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/6/2004
                                                    MOTION by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Marc Waeterschoot for status conference hearing on [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 02/20/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER terminating [13-1] motion for consolidation terminating [16-1] motion for consolidation denying [8-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, denying [8-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel denying [13-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, denying [13-3] motion for appointment as lead counsel granting [30-1] consent motion (consent) for leave to file reply memorandum, granting [28-1] motion for leave to file reply memorandum in further support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of lead counsel, granting [27-1] consent motion (consent) for leave to file reply in further support of motion for consolidation, appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel, granting [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, granting [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel ( Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich ) ctc (bls) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [8-1] motion for consolidation. ( Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich ) ctc (jab) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Wanda D. Dearth, John V. Hargiss by Tracy A. Nichols, Andrew Brian Albritton (bls) (Entered: 10/03/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of [30-1] consent motion for leave to file reply memorandum by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin (jlg) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                              CONSENT MOTION by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin (consent) for leave to file reply memorandum (proposed memorandum and declaration attached) (jlg) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner to response to [8-1] motion for consolidation, [8-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [8-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Marc Waeterschoot for leave to file reply memorandum in further support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    CONSENT MOTION by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner (consent) for leave to file reply in further support of motion for consolidation, appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner in further support of [8-1] motion for consolidation, [8-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [8-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        REQUEST for oral argument by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel re: [13-1] motion for consolidation, [13-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [13-3] motion for appointment as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel in opposition to [16-1] motion for consolidation, [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel, [10-1] motion to consolidate cases, [10-2] motion to appoint movants as lead plaintiffs, [10-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel and liaison counsel, [8-1] motion for consolidation, [8-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [8-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of withdrawal of motion for consolidation by W. Ronald Johnson, Ruth A. Johnson, James F. Johnson, Robert Seeley (jlg) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of withdrawal of motion for consolidation of related case, appointment as lead plaintiffs, and approval of their selection of lead counsel by W. Ronald Johnson, Ruth A. Johnson, James F. Johnson, Robert Seeley (jlg) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF ADDITIONAL SERVICE of [15-1] declaration, [14-1] support memorandum, [13-1] motion for consolidation, [13-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [13-3] motion for appointment as lead counsel by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel (jlg) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  THIRD NOTICE by Cryo-Cell Int'l Inc. of pendency of other actions (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of [18-1] declaration, [17-1] support memorandum, [16-1] motion for consolidation, [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Stein by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin re: [16-1] motion for consolidation, [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin in support of [16-1] motion for consolidation, [16-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [16-3] motion for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by Martin Hodas, Kenneth D. Thompson, Troy C. Giffin for consolidation , for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs , and for appointment of movants' counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kenneth J. Vianale by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Marc Waeterschoot re: [13-1] motion for consolidation, [13-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [13-3] motion for appointment as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Marc Waeterschoot in support of [13-1] motion for consolidation, [13-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [13-3] motion for appointment as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/17/2004
                                                                                                MOTION by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Marc Waeterschoot for consolidation , for appointment as lead plaintiffs , and for appointment as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Chris Barker by W. Ronald Johnson, Ruth A. Johnson, James F. Johnson, Robert Seeley Re: [10-1] motion to consolidate cases, [10-2] motion to appoint movants as lead plaintiffs, [10-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel and liaison counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by W. Ronald Johnson, Ruth A. Johnson, James F. Johnson, Robert Seeley in support of [10-1] motion to consolidate cases, [10-2] motion to appoint movants as lead plaintiffs, [10-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel and liaison counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by W. Ronald Johnson, Ruth A. Johnson, James F. Johnson, Robert Seeley to consolidate cases , to appoint movants as lead plaintiffs , and for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel and liaison counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Maya Saxena by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner re: [8-1] motion for consolidation, [8-2] motion for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs, [8-3] motion for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/22/2003
                                                                                                          MOTION by Charles Bradford, Greg Graves, Robert C. Reid, Ray E. Gartner with memorandum in support for consolidation , for appointment of movants as lead plaintiffs , and for appointment of movants counsel as lead counsel (jlg) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER granting [5-1] joint stipulation regarding scheduling (see order for details)( Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich ) ctc (jlg) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SECOND NOTICE by Cryo-Cell Int'l Inc. of pendency of other actions (jlg) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/28/2003
                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel, Cryo-Cell Int'l Inc. (stipulation) regarding scheduling (jlg) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Cryo-Cell Int'l Inc. on 6/5/03. Answer due on 8/4/03 for Cryo-Cell Int'l Inc. (jlg) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing waiver of service of summons by John Roderick Heller III, Alan L. Wurtzel (jlg) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - TRACK 3. (ctc) (jlg) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed; jury demand. Filing fee: $150.00. Receipt: T021782 (bls) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 264 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?