Butler v. Randall Mechanical, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00762
District Judge Mary S. Scriven, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 10:26 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward C. Butler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bogin, Munns & Munns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel A. Perez +1 321 254 3939 +1 321 254 3929 dperez@boginmunns.com
v.
No Logo Jeffrey S. Condello, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowndes Drosdick Doster Kantor & Reed, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Davis +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 jill.davis@lowndes-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D. Gebaide +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 rachel.gebaide@lowndes-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melody Benbow James +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 melody.james@lowndes-law.com
No Logo Randall Mechanical, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowndes Drosdick Doster Kantor & Reed, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Davis +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 jill.davis@lowndes-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D. Gebaide +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 rachel.gebaide@lowndes-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melody Benbow James +1 407 843 4600 +1 407 843 4444 melody.james@lowndes-law.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 23 Judgment entered In favor of Edward C. Butler Against Randall Mechanical, Inc., In favor of Edward C. Butler Against Jeffrey S. Condello by Edward C. Butler. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
    FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Edward C. Butler and against Randall Mechanical, Inc., Jeffrey S. Condello, jointly and severally, in the total amount of $10,000.00. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) COPIES SENT. (LAK) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 21 Motion for judgment. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/20/2011. COPIES SENT. (LAK) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Final judgment Against Defendants & Memorandum of Law by Edward C. Butler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Edward C. Butler Filing Defendant's Offer of Judgment and Plaintiff's Acceptance (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Offer of Judgment, # 2 Plaintiff's Acceptance letter)(Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/19/2010. (JNY) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION for entry of a Case Management Scheduling Order/Case Management Report by Edward C. Butler, Jeffrey S. Condello and Randall Mechanical, Inc. (Perez, Daniel) Modified on 10/19/2010 (JET). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE re 9 FLSA scheduling order. The Plaintiff shall file a joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT within (14) days from the date of this Order. The Case Management Report shall be filed under the event code Motion for Entry of Case Management Report Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/15/2010. (NBL) (copies e-mailed) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                  SETTLEMENT/TRIAL REPORT by Edward C. Butler. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Edward C. Butler re 9 FLSA scheduling order (Perez, Daniel) Modified on 9/29/2010 (JET). Attorney will refile as Settlement Report. (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of filing attachments re 13 Answer to court interrogatories by Edward C. Butler. (Perez, Daniel) Modified on 8/10/2010 (JET). (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 9 FLSA scheduling order by Edward C. Butler. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                          RETURN of service executed on 06/16/2010 by Edward C. Butler as to Jeffrey S. Condello by substitute service on spouse Debra Condello. (Perez, Daniel) Modified on 7/23/2010 (JET). (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 2 Related case order and notice of designation of track 1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeffrey S. Condello, Randall Mechanical, Inc.. Related case(s): y (Gebaide, Rachel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Interested persons order by Jeffrey S. Condello, Randall Mechanical, Inc.. (Gebaide, Rachel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 07/19/2010 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 09/07/2010 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 8/9/2010; Settlement Report due by 9/27/2010. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/25/2010. (NBL) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendants RANDALL MECHANICAL, INC., and JEFFREY S. CONDELLO shall respond within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/22/2010. (NBL) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Jeffrey S. Condello, Randall Mechanical, Inc..(Gebaide, Rachel) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                      RETURN of service executed on 05/25/2010 by Edward C. Butler as to Jeffrey S. Condello, Randall Mechanical, Inc.. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Interested persons order by Edward C. Butler identifying Corporate Parent Lowndes, Drosdick, Doster, Kantor & Reed, P.A., Corporate Parent Bogin, Munns & Munns, P.A., Corporate Parent Randal Mechanical, Inc. for Edward C. Butler.. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 2 Related case order and notice of designation of track 1 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edward C. Butler. Related case(s): yes (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Response due within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/18/2010. (NBL) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              RELATED CASE ORDER. Response due within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/18/2010. (NBL) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against Jeffrey S. Condello, Randall Mechanical, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34836) filed by Edward C. Butler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(IGC) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 951 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?