In re: Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Securities Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-00071
District Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 1:24 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Louis Rubenstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Fleischman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 fleischman@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kuveikis & Vannatta, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/08/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY R. Timothy Vannatta +1 561 655 9091 +1 561 655 2921

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/07/2006 Christopher S. Polaszek +1 813 639 4248 +1 813 639 7501 cpolaszek@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Scott Wilens +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 dwilens@csgrr.com
v.
No Logo Allen R. Rowland, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liles, Gavin, Costantino, George & Dearing, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT BRUCE GEORGE +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rgeorge@lilesgavin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rutledge Richardson Liles +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rliles@lilesgavin.com
No Logo Frank Lazaran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Best Best & Krieger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2006 John Douglas Hershberger +1 619 525 1311 +1 619 233 6118 john.hershberger@bbklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fidelity National Financial

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Tara B. Van Rooy +1 904 854 5933 +1 904 357 1098 Tara.VanRooy@fnf.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liles, Gavin, Costantino, George & Dearing, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT BRUCE GEORGE +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rgeorge@lilesgavin.com
TERMINATED: 06/19/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rutledge Richardson Liles +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rliles@lilesgavin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Volpe Bajalia Wickes Rogerson & Galloway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Pearce McLauchlin +1 904 355 1700 +1 904 355 1797 mmclauchlin@vbwr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Rogerson, III +1 904 355 1700 +1 904 355 1797 jrogerson@vbwr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Wayne Volpe +1 904 355 1700 +1 904 355 1797 tvolpe@vbwr.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Leslie A. Wickes +1 904 355 1700 +1 904 355 1797 lwickes@vbwr.com
No Logo Richard P. McCook, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liles, Gavin, Costantino, George & Dearing, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT BRUCE GEORGE +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rgeorge@lilesgavin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rutledge Richardson Liles +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rliles@lilesgavin.com
No Logo PO Box B, Defendant
Officially listed as "Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R. Edgecombe +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 jedgecombe@kslaw.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liles, Gavin, Costantino, George & Dearing, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT BRUCE GEORGE +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rgeorge@lilesgavin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rutledge Richardson Liles +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rliles@lilesgavin.com
No Logo Brian Malvan, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Henzel +6106608000 888 643 6735 +1 610 660 8080 mhenzel182@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian M. Felgoise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M Felgoise +1 215 886 1900 felgoiselaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S. Hinton +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo David Rosenberg, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth A. Elan +1 212 619 0261 +1 212 385 2707 elanfirm@yahoo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Murray +1 212 682 1818 +6821 682 682 1892

Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com
No Logo Edward P. Worry, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Milberg LLP

No Logo Eva Chang, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wechsler Harwood Halebian & Feffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana B. Rubin +1 212 935 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by World Trade Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300 piven@browerpiven.com
No Logo Friends of Ariel Center for Policy Research, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abaham, Fruchter & Twersky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack G Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655

Represented by Milberg LLP

No Logo Hsing Man Tsai, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wechsler Harwood Halebian & Feffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana B. Rubin +1 212 935 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by World Trade Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300 piven@browerpiven.com
No Logo Nile Smith, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren S Antonino +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 LAntonino@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Robert Garfield, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paskowitz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence D. Paskowitz +1 212 692 0555 +1 212 685 2306

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Maniskas +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Thomas Nunziata, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Warren Wechsler, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo D. Michael Byrum, Movant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Liles, Gavin, Costantino, George & Dearing, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT BRUCE GEORGE +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rgeorge@lilesgavin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rutledge Richardson Liles +1 904 634 1100 +1 904 634 1234 rliles@lilesgavin.com
No Logo Jeff Jensen, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Toggle Switch Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Moshe Balsam +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 mbalsam@weisslurie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Jonathan Lee Riches, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by 7950 Jones Branch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Riches, r +1 843 387 9400
No Logo Joseph D. Speight, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Maxine A. Speight, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Stein +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jstein@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo PO Box B, Movant
Officially listed as "Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Lee +1 404 572 2820 +1 404 572 5100 blee@kslaw.com
No Logo David B. Ferebee, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Ferebee +1 904 358 7001 +1 904 353 2756 ferebeeatlaw@bellsouth.net
No Logo William A. Clineburg, Jr., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Clineburg, Jr. +1 404 572 4600 bclineburg@taylorenglish.com
No Logo William B. Federman, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0078m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Motion to Intervene, Motion to Enforce Consent Decree, and Motion for Change of Venue 115 is hereby STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. The Clerk is directed to remove the Motion 115 from the record. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/15/2008. (KAK) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    MOTION to intervene, MOTION to enforce consent decree, MOTION to change venue by Jonathan Lee Riches. (MGG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 7/16/2008, STRICKEN PER ORDER #116 on 7/15/2008 (MGG). (Entered: 07/07/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MGG) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint 94 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendants in each of the following cases and to close each of the following cases: 3:04-cv-71-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-78-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-84-J-33JRK; 3:04-cv-94-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-154-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-138-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-79-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-103-J-33MCR; 3:04-cv-153-J-33MCR; and 3:04-cv-111-J-33MCR. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/4/2007. (KAK) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 111 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/10/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            MOTION for M. Robert Thornton to appear pro hac vice by Allen R. Rowland and Richard P. McCook. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(George, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 10/9/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 10/05/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 109 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/13/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                Unopposed MOTION for John D. Hershberger & Tara Van Rooy to withdraw as attorney of Record and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Frank Lazaran. (Rogerson, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 106 is GRANTED. This Court defers its ruling on Lead Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 105 pending further order. See order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/12/2007. (kak) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Firm Name Change by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund (Reise, Jack) Modified on 9/12/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by all defendants. (Lee, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                        MOTION to certify class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Saxena, Maya) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                          REQUEST for oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Allen R. Rowland. (Lee, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
                            REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of motion re 94 MOTION to dismiss The Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Allen R. Rowland. (Lee, Benjamin) Modified on 8/28/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 100 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' reply is limited to ten (10) pages in length and is due to be filed on or before August 27, 2007. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/14/2007. (kak) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in opposition re 100 Motion for leave to file Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law by all defendants. (Lee, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in opposition re 94 Motion to dismiss, filed by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 85 Motion for protective order; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/1/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/27/2007. (WBR) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Filing Corrected Certificate of Service by Allen R. Rowland, Richard P. McCook re 94 MOTION to dismiss The Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support (Lee, Benjamin) Modified on 7/26/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to dismiss The Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Lee, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in support re 85 Motion for protective order, 86 Motion for protective order Reply Memorandum in Support of Motions for Protective Order filed by Defendants Allen Rowland, Richard McCook, and Frank Lazaran filed by Allen R. Rowland. (George, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 91 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/19/2007. (WBR) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages as to Motion to Dismiss on behalf of all Defendants by Frank Lazaran. (Rogerson, John) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 89 Motion for leave to file reply. Defendants and non-party, Winn Dixie Stores, Inc. shall file a reply brief no more than ten pages in length on or before 7/20/07. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/16/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum by all defendants. (Lee, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in opposition re 85 MOTION for protective order, 86 MOTION for protective order and Motion to Quash With Memorandum of Law in support of Motion filed by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Lead Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents# 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena)(Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER directing response to 85 MOTION for protective order and 86 MOTION for protective order and Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/5/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MOTION for protective order and Motion to Quash With Memorandum of Law in support of Motion by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Lee, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MOTION for protective order by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in support of Motion)(Lee, Benjamin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice 96 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record, which the Court treats as a motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/3/2007. (LGH) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record by Frank Lazaran (Van Rooy, Tara) Modified on 7/2/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by John Thomas Rogerson, III (Rogerson, John) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 6/14/2007 before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Court Reporter: L. Marie Splane. (filed separately and not scanned) (MGG) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER. Plaintiffs shall have NINETY DAYS from the date the amended complaint (Doc. # 73) was filed to file their motion for class certification. Defendants shall have FORTY-FIVE DAYS from the date the amended complaint (Doc. # 73) was filed to file their response to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/22/2007. (WBR) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/28/2008, Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2008, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for 7/7/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/19/2007. (DTS, ) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 77 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/19/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                MOTION for to withdraw as attorney for Frank Larazan by Frank Lazaran. (Liles, Rutledge) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington:Status Conference held on 6/14/2007. ORDER TO ENTER. Court Reporter: Marie Splane (DTS) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice 74 Motion to substitute attorney. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/18/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to substitute attorney and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Defendants Rowland, Lazaran and McCook (with proposed order) by Allen R. Rowland. (George, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Frank Lazaran, Allen R. Rowland, Richard P. McCook with Jury Demand filed by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund.(Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 71 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/7/2007. (MOH) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MOTION for Allen R. Rowland and Richard P. McCook to appear pro hac vice by all defendants. (George, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: re: 69 Unopposed MOTION to extend Deadlines AND REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE Status Conference set for 6/14/2007 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Counsel of record shall appear in person; any request to appear telephonically contained within said motion (Doc. #69) is DENIED. (DTS ) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to extend Deadlines AND REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Wilens, Douglas) Modified on 6/5/2007 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/1/2007, Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2007, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2008 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for 3/3/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/29/2007. (DTS, ) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER. Within FIVE DAYS of the date of this Order, any party desiring that this case remain stayed shall file a notice stating why the stay should not be lifted. If no such notice is filed, at the expiration of five days from the date of this Order, the stay is LIFTED without further order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/1/2007. (WBR) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT on Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.'s Bankruptcy Proceeding by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. (George, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT on Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.'s Bankruptcy Proceeding by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Securities Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1# 2 Exhibit A-2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Liles, Rutledge) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Douglas S. Wilens (Wilens, Douglas) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 61 Motion to withdraw. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/7/2006. (MOH) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to withdraw and for substitution of Counsel by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Saxena, Maya) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. (Liles, Rutledge) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Robert Bruce George (George, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER striking 57 Notice filed by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/21/2006. (MOH) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund of Substitution of Counsel (Saxena, Maya) Modified on 6/22/2006 (MGG).(STRICKEN per order #58) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER: The unopposed motion for extension of time to serve consolidated class action complaint 47 is denied without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/13/2006. (kak) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT on Winn-Dixie Bankruptcy Proceedings by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. (George, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Frank Lazaran of Correction (Volpe, Timothy) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT on Winn-Dixie Bankruptcy Proceeding by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Securities Litigation (Liles, Rutledge) Modified on 1/6/2006 as to docket text only (MGG). (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT on Winn-Dixie Bankruptcy Proceeding by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Securities Litigation. (Liles, Rutledge) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER entering a STAY pending Bankruptcy. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 5/10/2005. (CCE) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER - Filing of Documents that Exceed Twenty-Five Pages. Signed by all Jacksonville Judges on 04/27/05(JMAP) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund re 46 Order of Non-Opposition (Reise, Jack) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Kenneth J. Vianale (Vianale, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Consolidated Class Action Complaint by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Saxena, Maya) Modified on 4/6/2005 as to docket text(MGG). (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER regarding stay. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/5/2005. (CCE) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Louis Rubenstein Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saxena, Maya) Modified on 3/8/2005 (MGG).(Notice filed twice, See doc. #44) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Louis Rubenstein Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saxena, Maya) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Securities Litigation of Commencement of Bankruptcy Case (Liles, Rutledge) Modified on 2/23/2005 (MGG). (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Douglas Hershberger on behalf of Frank Lazaran (Hershberger, John) (Entered: 02/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER scheduling meeting. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/15/2005. (CCE) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER finding as moot 20 Motion, finding as moot 21 Motion to extend time, granting in part 37 Agreed Motion for Confirmation of Approval of Lead Counsel and Entry of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/4/2005. (CCE) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Marc A. Topaz (PAM) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address of law firm by Maya Saxena (MGG) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Confirmation of Approval of Lead Counsel and Entry of Scheduling Order re 7 Motion to consolidate casesMotion for miscellaneous reliefMotion for miscellaneous relief, 29 Order, 32 Stipulation, 34 Order by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Polaszek, Christopher) Modified on 10/13/2004 (MGG). (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment (signed by deputy clerk). (SMS) (Entered: 09/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER consolidating the securities cases and appointing lead counsel and lead plaintiff; also, directing clerk to re-assign certain cases.. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 8/31/2004. (CCE, ) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Joseph D. Speight NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Reise, Jack) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION To Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidate Certain Actions by National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund. (Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF and WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Joseph D. Speight, Maxine A. Speight re 10 Motion to consolidate cases, Motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel, Motion for liaison counsel filed by Joseph D. Speight, Maxine A. Speight. (MGG) Modified on 7/26/2004 (MGG). (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Jeff Jensen re 4 Motion for miscellaneous relief (for appointment as lead plaintiff) filed by Jeff Jensen. (MGG) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER cancelling hearing with instructions to counsel regarding a Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 7/23/2004. (CCE) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jeff Jensen re 4 Motion to consolidate casesMotion for miscellaneous reliefMotion for miscellaneous reliefMotion for miscellaneous reliefMotion for miscellaneous relief, 5 Memorandum in support, of Withdrawal of Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff (Vianale, Julie) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Nat'l Asbestos Fund of change of firm affiliation for counsel (mgg) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Motion hearing set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [7-2] consent motion for entry of scheduling order, set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [7-1] consent motion to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99HTS, set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [9-3] motion for approval of lead counsel , set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [10-1] motion to consolidate the actions, set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, set for 2:00 7/26/04 for [10-3] motion for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel Scheduled for Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger ( Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger ) ctc (lph) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by Jeff Jensen in opposition to [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [9-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff (mgg) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Nat'l Asbestos Fund to response to [9-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff, [9-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (Titled: Reply memorandum in further support of the National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund's motion for consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel) (mgg) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] agreed motion for leave to file reply memorandum in further support of his motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of lead counsel; The Clerk is directed to file the Reply Memorandum attached to the instant Motion (Doc. 19); ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson ) ctc (mgg) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [18-1] consent motion to file reply memorandum in further support of the National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund's motion for consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of selection of lead counsel; The Clerk is directed to file the Reply Memorandum located as Exhibit A to the instant Motion (Doc. 18); ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson ) ctc (mgg) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Louis Rubenstein with memorandum in support to extend time within which to comply with local rule 4.04(b) (mgg) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Nat'l Asbestos Fund for modification of time to file motion for class certification (mgg) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED MOTION by Jeff Jensen for leave to file reply memorandum in further support of his motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of his selection of lead counsel (agreed) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson (spw) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT MOTION by Nat'l Asbestos Fund to file reply memorandum in further support of the National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund's motion for consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of selection of lead counsel (consent) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson (spw) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Nat'l Asbestos Fund in opposition to [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [4-2] motion to appoint lead plaintiff (mgg) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Jeff Jensen in opposition to [9-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff (mgg) (Entered: 04/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Winn-Dixie Stores, Frank Lazaran, Allen R. Rowland, Richard P. McCook, D. Michael Byrum to [10-1] motion to consolidate the actions, [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [10-3] motion for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel, [9-1] motion to consolidate, [9-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff, [9-3] motion for approval of lead counsel, [7-1] consent motion to consolidate, [4-1] motion to consolidate, [4-2] motion to appoint lead plaintiff, [4-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [13-1] agreed motion for three-day extension of time to file response in further support of motion for consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel response to motion set to 4/22/04 for [10-1] motion to consolidate the actions, [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [10-3] motion for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel, [9-1] motion to consolidate, [9-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff, [9-3] motion for approval of lead counsel, [7-1] consent motion to consolidate ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson ) ctc (mgg) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREED MOTION by Jeff Jensen for three-day extension of time to file response in further support of motion for consolidation, appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of lead counsel (agreed) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson (mgg) (Entered: 04/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jack Reise by Joseph D. Speight, Maxine A. Speight re: [10-1] motion to consolidate the actions, [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [10-3] motion for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Joseph D. Speight, Maxine A. Speight in support of [10-1] motion to consolidate the actions, [10-2] motion to be appointed lead Plaintiff's, [10-3] motion for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Joseph D. Speight, Maxine A. Speight to consolidate the actions , to be appointed lead Plaintiff's , for approval of lead Plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED MOTION by Nat'l Asbestos Fund with memorandum in support to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99HTS, 3:04-cv-153-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-154-J-99MMH (proposed) , for appointment as lead plaintiff (proposed) , for approval of lead counsel (proposed) (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing of Motion for appointment of lead Plaintiff and for consolidation by Nat'l Asbestos Fund (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT MOTION by Winn-Dixie Stores, Frank Lazaran, Allen R. Rowland, Richard P. McCook to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99HTS (consent) , for entry of scheduling order (consent) (mgg) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Joseph H. Weiss by Jeff Jensen re: [4-1] motion to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20HTS, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-153-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-154-J-99MMH, [4-2] motion to appoint lead plaintiff, [4-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Jeff Jensen in support of [4-1] motion to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20HTS, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-153-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-154-J-99MMH, [4-2] motion to appoint lead plaintiff, [4-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE and MOTION by Jeff Jensen to consolidate with case 3:04-cv-78-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-79-J-20TEM, 3:04-cv-84-J-20MCR, 3:04-cv-94-J-20HTS, 3:04-cv-103-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-111-J-20MMH, 3:04-cv-138-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-153-J-99MCR, 3:04-cv-154-J-99MMH , to appoint lead plaintiff , for approval of lead counsel (mgg) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of [2-1] track 2 notice by Louis Rubenstein (Titled: Notice of Service) (mgg) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - TRACK 2. (ctc) (mgg) (Entered: 02/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed; jury demand Filing fee $ 150.00 Receipt J014421 (mgg) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 363 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?