BAGLEY v. MCDONOUGH
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:07-cv-00559
District Judge Robert L. Hinkle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
No Logo DUFFIE HARRISON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SHERRY ANITA TOOTHMAN +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 ToothmaS@dor.state.fl.us
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo J DIXOIE, Defendant
No Logo JAMES R MCDONOUGH, Defendant
No Logo LAURA E BEDARD, Defendant
No Logo MICHELLE PALMER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHERRY ANITA TOOTHMAN +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 ToothmaS@dor.state.fl.us
No Logo ORLESTER DICKENS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SHERRY ANITA TOOTHMAN +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 ToothmaS@dor.state.fl.us
No Logo WALTER MCNEIL, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
ORDER - The parties' stipulated dismissal with prejudice is accepted. Docs. 56 and 59 . The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this cause upon entry of this order and terminate any pending motions.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 3/30/09. (dlt) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR (dlt) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
      ORDER STAYING CASE( Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 4/17/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 3/18/09. (pll) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Change of Address by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR, 297093 to JEFFERSON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1050 BIG JOE ROAD, MONTICELLO, FL 32344. (pll) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Settlement by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
            Partial Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 4-6664(Bal.$109.67) (dlt) Modified on 3/5/2009 to correct typo(dlt). (Entered: 03/05/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
              First MOTION to Stay re 16 Amended Complaint, 53 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                ORDER Granting 52 Fourth MOTION to Extend Time filed by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Defendants' response to amended complaint not filed earlier: 2/27/2009).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 02/23/09. (dlt) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                  Fourth MOTION to Extend Time by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                    ORDER GRANTING 50 Third MOTION to Extend Time to file a Responsive Pleading filed by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Defendants Dickens, Harrison, and Palmer response to complaint not filed earlier: 2/20/2009).,Petitioner's Reply to Response due by 3/20/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 02/04/09. (dlt) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                      Third MOTION to Extend Time to file a Responsive Pleading by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                        Partial Filing fee: $ 28.00, receipt number 4-6248(Bal.$159.67) (dlt) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                          ORDER granting 47 Second MOTION to Extend Time filed by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. ( Answer due by 1/30/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 12/30/08. (pll) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                            Second MOTION to Extend Time by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                              ORDER Granting 44 First MOTION to Extend Time to file Response to Civil Rights Complaint filed by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Defendants' response to complaint not filed earlier: 12/29/2008). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 11/12/08. (dlt) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                Partial Filing fee: $ 40.00, receipt number 4-5920(Bal.$187.67) (dlt) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                  First MOTION to Extend Time to file Response to Civil Rights Complaint by ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON. (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT:**Wrong PDF attached by error of the clerk correct PDF is now attached** Re 42 Summons Returned Executed filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR (dlt) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed(USM 285 Form) as to ORLESTER DICKENS served on 11/4/2008, answer due 11/24/2008. (dlt) (dlt). (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by SHERRY ANITA TOOTHMAN on behalf of MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON (TOOTHMAN, SHERRY) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                          Partial Filing fee: $ 8.00, receipt number 4-5803(Bal.$227.67) (dlt) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                            ORDER ( Answer due by 11/7/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 10/7/08. (pll) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                              Partial Filing fee: $ 6.00, receipt number 4-5680. Balance $235.67. (pll) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE from Department of Corrections re 35 Supplemental Service Order (dlt) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Summons Issued as to ORLESTER DICKENS, J DIXOIE. (pll) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL SERVICE ORDER as to Defendant Dickens and Dixole. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/27/2008).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 9/25/08. ***Summons, Order, Service Copies and Waiver provided to RICHARD SALIBA. (pll) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM LETTER) re 32 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Orlester Dickens. (dlt) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed MICHELLE PALMER served on 9/8/2008, answer due 11/7/2008. (dlt) Modified on 9/22/2008 (dlt). (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ORLESTER DICKENS. (dlt) Modified on 9/22/2008 (dlt). (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted as to J DIXOIE. (dlt) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed on DUFFIE HARRISON served on 9/12/2008, answer due 10/2/2008. (dlt) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER DENYING as MOOT 23 MOTION For Issuance of Summons and Service of Process Forms. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 09/09/08. (dlt) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE re 16 Second Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR - There are five Defendants in this action: Orlester Dickens, Michelle Palmer, Duffie Harrison, J. Dixole, and a John Doe Defendant. ( Notify Chambers no later than 11/27/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 08/25/08. (dlt)**Summonses, Second Amended Complaint and Order provided to the US Marshal and Consent to Magistrate form sent to Plaintiff with order** (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Partial Filing fee: $ 11.00, receipt number 4-5373 Bal.$241.67 (dlt) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Partial Filing fee: $ 7.50, receipt number 4-5344 (dlt) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Partial Filing fee: $ 6.00, receipt number 4-5301 (Bal.$260.17) (dlt) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION For Issuance of Summons and Service of Process Forms by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. (dlt) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Partial Filing fee: $ 4.00, receipt number 4-5159(Bal.$266.17) (dlt) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              Partial Filing fee: $ 6.00, receipt number 4-5150 (Bal.$270.17) (dlt) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF INQUIRY by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR re 1 Complaint, 16 Second Amended Complaint, (dlt) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER, re 16 Amended Complaint, 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel, doc. 17 , is DENIED. (Notify Chambers on 8/12/2008, Miscellaneous Deadline: Plaintiff shall submit five identical copies of his second amended civil rights complaint - by 8/12/2008.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 07/10/2008. (krb) Modified on 7/10/2008 (krb). (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Partial Filing fee: $ 4.00, receipt number 4-4936( Bal.$276.16) (dlt) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION For Appointment Of Counsel by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support) (dlt) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALTER MCNEIL, ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON, J DIXOIE, filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR.(No service copies provided) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C2) (dlt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2008: # 1 Exhibits A-C2) (dlt). (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF Filing Exhibit "D" to Second Amended Complaint by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR (dlt) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Partial Filing fee: $ 8.00, receipt number 4-4758 (Bal.$280.17) (dlt) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER re 12 Amended Complaint filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. ( Second Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 5/9/08. ***1983 Form mailed. (pll) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against WALTER MCNEIL, ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON, J DIXOIE, filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. (No Service Copies.) (pll) Modified on 5/8/2008 (pll). (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Partial Filing fee: $ 8.00, receipt number 4-4436(Bal.$296.17) (dlt) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR, ( Amended 1983 Complaint due by 4/30/2008. Plaintiff shall immediately file a notice to the Clerk's Office in the event that his address changes or he is transferred or released from custody. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 03/27/08. (dlt)*1983 Complaint Form mailed with Order* (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Partial Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 4-4236 (Bal.$304.17) (dlt) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Initial Filing fee: $ 20.83, receipt number 4-4169($Bal.314.17) (dlt) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Partial Filing fee: $ 15.00, receipt number 4-4094(Bal.335.00) (dlt) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ORDER re 5 Letter is treated as a motion for extension of time to submit initial partial filing fee and the requested relief isGRANTED(Initial Partial Filing Fee($20.83) due by 3/14/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 02/13/08. (dlt) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Letter from Larry Bagley re 4 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account (dlt) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Larry Mcarther Bagley re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR is GRANTED to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee. (Partial Filing Fee due by 2/4/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 01/04/08.***Order sent to Dept of Corrections Office of the General Counsel, Tallahassee, Florida*** (dlt) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice to Pro Se Sent to Larry Bagley Jr (dlt) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate) (dlt) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT(1983) against DOE, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMES R MCDONOUGH, LAURA E BEDARD, ORLESTER DICKENS, MICHELLE PALMER, DUFFIE HARRISON, J DIXOIE, filed by LARRY MCARTHUR BAGLEY, JR.(No Service Copies Provided) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C) (dlt) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?