SINNETT v. NGUYEN
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00454
District Judge MAURICE M PAUL, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID LEE SINNETT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Lee Sinnett
v.
No Logo CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, Defendant
No Logo D HARTSFIELD, Defendant
No Logo DARLENE LUMPKIN, Defendant
No Logo Eric Lane, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE PRIDGEON, Defendant
No Logo HERCULE, Defendant
No Logo HOLLISTER, Defendant
No Logo Johanson, Defendant
No Logo KEYS, Defendant
No Logo LOURDES CARRERO, Defendant
No Logo Macdonald, Defendant
No Logo MAYO, Defendant
No Logo Nguyen,, Defendant
No Logo ONG, Defendant
No Logo WALTER A MCNEIL, Defendant
No Logo WHITEHURST, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
ORDER directing clerk to provide a courtesy copy of this order to counsel whosigned the waiver of service form for Defendant Nguyen. ( Notify Chambers no later than 3/2/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 2/2/11. (pll) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward. Mail sent to DAVID LEE SINNETT Re: 49 ORDER. (pll) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
      Summons Reissued as to ONG. (pll) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
        ORDER redirecting service on Defendant Dr. JOHN DOE ONG by the USM re 35 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. ( Notify Chambers on 3/7/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 1/21/11. **Order, Summons and Service Copy sent to USM. (pll) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed, as to NGUYEN. (krb) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
            Summons Returned Unexecuted by DAVID LEE SINNETT as to KEYS. (pll) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NGUYEN. NGUYEN waiver sent on 10/22/2010, answer due 12/21/2010. (MAHER, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                Summons Re-Issued as to KEYS, NGUYEN. (jws) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. MACDONALD served on 11/1/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (pll) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                    Summons ReIssued as to MACDONALD. (pll) Modified on 10/21/2010 (pll). (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                      ORDER directing clerk to re-issue summons for Defendant MacDonald and directing service by the USM. ( Notify Chambers no later than 12/15/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 10/14/2010. **Summons, Order, AO Forms and Service Copy to USM. (pll) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS FOR DEFENDANTS' by KEYS, MACDONALD, NGUYEN re 39 Order. (pll) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID LEE SINNETT, 4102 WEST HILLSBOROUGH AVE, TAMPA, FL 33614. (pll) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                            ORDER directing clerk to provide Deputy General Counsel for the DOC copies and service forms. ( Miscellaneous Deadline for response - by 10/18/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 9/17/2010. **Copies and Service Forms provided to Deputy General Counsel per order. (pll) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                              Summons Returned Unexecuted by the USM as to KEYS, MACDONALD, NGUYEN. (pll) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to KEYS, MACDONALD, NGUYEN, ONG. (pll) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                  ORDER directing service by the USM re 35 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. ( Notify Chambers on 11/5/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 8/17/2010. **Consent Form sent with order to plaintiff. Summons, service copies and four copies of the order sent to the USM. (pll) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 35 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                    FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT, against KEYS, MACDONALD, NGUYEN, ONG, filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. **Four (4) service copies received. (krb) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      ORDER granting 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 20 Amended Complaint. DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to this order not filed earlier: 8/30/2010)., (Fourth Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 7/29/2010. **1983 form mailed with order. (pll) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                          PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 20 Amended Complaint by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 21 Order. **Receipt of four Service Copies. (pll) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID LEE SINNETT, FCC COLEMAN MEDIUM, PO BOX 1032, COLEMAN FL 33521. (pll) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                ORDER denying 26 MOTION TO ADD EXHIBIT filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. ( Fourth Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 6/29/2010. **1983 form mailed. (pll) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 21 Order remailed to DAVID LEE SINNETT, 33884-018, FCI COLEMAN MEDIUM, FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, PO BOX 1032, COLEMAN, FL 33521. (pll) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAVID LEE SINNETT Re: 21 ORDER re 20 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. ( Miscellaneous Deadline for receipt of four service copies - by 6/30/2010.). (pll) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                      PETITION, CONSTRUED AS A MOTION TO ADD EXHIBIT by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                        DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 21 Order remailed to DAVID LEE SINNETT, 33884-018, FEDERAL DETENTION CENTER, 501 CAPITAL CIRCLE NE, TALLAHASSEE FL 32301. (pll) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID LEE SINNETT, 33884-018, FEDERAL DETENTION CENTER, 501 CAPITAL CIRCLE NE, TALLAHASSEE FL 32301. (pll) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                            DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 21 Order remailed to updated address: 801 N FL AVE, 4TH FLOOR, TAMPA FL 33602. (pll) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAVID LEE SINNETT Re: 21 ORDER re 20 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER re 20 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. ( Miscellaneous Deadline for receipt of four service copies - by 6/30/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 5/26/2010. (pll) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against KEYS, MACDONALD, NGUYEN, ONG, filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER re 16 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. DENYING 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. DENYING 18 MOTION TO POSTPONE PROCEEDINGS. ( THIRD Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 4/16/2010. **1983 form mailed. (pll) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION TO POSTPONE PROCEEDINGS by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOURDES CARRERO, CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, D HARTSFIELD, HERCULE, JOHANSON, KEYS, MACDONALD, MAYO, NGUYEN, ONG, WHITEHURST, filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER re: 12 Amended Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT.( SECOND Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2010.) Denying without prejudice 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 3/10/2010. (pll) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID LEE SINNETT, H06344, JEFFERSON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, 1050 BIG JOE ROAD, MONTICELLO, FL 32344. (pll) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOURDES CARRERO, CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, D HARTSFIELD, HERCULE, JOHANSON, KEYS, MACDONALD, MAYO, NGUYEN, ONG, WHITEHURST, filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER granting 10 MOTION for Reconsideration. Plaintiff will not be required to submit the assessed initial partial filing fee. ( Amended Complaint due by 3/3/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 1/27/2010. **1983 form mailed. (pll) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (pll) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER, construing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration as a motion for enlargement of time and GRANTED. VACATING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee of $4.50 due by 3/1/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 1/26/2010. (pll) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PARTIAL FILING FEE, construed as a Motion for Reconsideration re 5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (pll) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            VACATED PER ORDER 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, It is RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice re 1 Complaint filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT, 6 R&R MOTION UTILITY for Prisoner Cases - R&R flag set. ( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/5/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 1/8/2010. (pll) Modified on 1/26/2010 (pll). (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DAVID LEE SINNETT. GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. DENYING 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee of $4.50 due by 12/31/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 11/30/09. **Copy to DOC. (pll) Modified on 12/1/2009 (pll). (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice to Pro Se. (krb) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (krb) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (krb) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against CORRECTIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES, WALTER A MCNEIL, KEYS, MACDONALD, D HARTSFIELD, JOHANSON, HERCULE, LOURDES CARRERO, ONG, WHITEHURST, DARLENE LUMPKIN, GEORGE PRIDGEON, MAYO, NGUYEN, HOLLISTER, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by DAVID LEE SINNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 2). **No service copies received. IFP Motion submitted. (krb) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?