HARTLEY v. CLARK
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00559
District Judge ROGER VINSON, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 7:05 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DREW C HARTLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DREW C HARTLEY

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Andrew Range +1 850 224 9634 +1 850 325 2585 tom.range@akerman.com
v.
No Logo Butler, Defendant
No Logo Cook, Defendant
No Logo Diamond, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Savor +1 954 712 4600 +1 954 712 4700 kathleen.savor@myfloridalegal.com

Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

No Logo GIELOW, Defendant
No Logo Givens, Defendant
No Logo Hawthorne, Defendant
No Logo Jackson, Defendant
No Logo JANE DOE #1, Defendant
No Logo Quinn, Defendant
No Logo RANDY TIFFT, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

No Logo Reeves, Defendant
No Logo RODNEY CLARK, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

No Logo Romine, Defendant
No Logo STEENE, Defendant
No Logo Torres, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (184) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER ADOPTING 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Warden Tifft (as successor to Warden Ellis), Captain Jackson, Lieutenant John Doe #1, Lieutenant Torres, Correctional Officer Butler, Sergeant Cook, Sergeant Steen, Sergeant Reeves, Sergeant Quinn, Sergeant Diamond, Lieutenant Romine, A.J. Torino, Sergeant Givens, Sergeant Raybon, Correctional Officer Wallace, Correctional Officer Roberts, Correctional Officer DeWaters, Lieutenant Gielow, T. Shell, and Correctional Officer John Does are DISMISSED as parties from this action. Counts 3 through 8 of the Amended Complaint 110 are DISMISSED, without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling them in a new lawsuit. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a complaint form for use by prisoners in actions filed under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, to facilitate Plaintiff's commencing a new action against the dismissed Defendants. The plaintiff's motion for leave to amend and supplement the complaint 204 is DENIED, as moot. The case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida. All pending motions related to defendant Sergeant Clark will carry with the case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 3/23/10. (lcu) 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint mailed to Plaintiff.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Warden Tifft (as successor to Warden Ellis), Captain Jackson, Lieutenant John Doe #1, Lieutenant Torres, Correctional Officer Butler, Sergeant Cook, Sergeant Steen, Sergeant Reeves, Sergeant Quinn, Sergeant Diamond, Lieutenant Romine, A.J. Torino, Sergeant Givens, Sergeant Raybon, Correctional Officer Wallace, Correctional Officer Roberts, Correctional Officer DeWaters, Lieutenant Gielow, T. Shell, and Correctional Officer John Does be DISMISSED as parties from this action. That Counts 3 through 8 of the Amended Complaint 110 be DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling them in a new lawsuit. That the clerk be directed to send Plaintiff a complaint form for use by prisoners in actions filed under 42 U.S.C. § 1983, to facilitate Plaintiff's commencing a new action against the dismissed Defendants. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/12/2010). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/12/10. (lcu) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
      ORDER granting 164 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney THOMAS ANDREW RANGE terminated. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/12/10. (lcu) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
        ORDER denying 183 Motion for Leave to File and denying 184 Motion for Leave to File. So long as Plaintiff is represented by counsel, Plaintiff shall proceed through counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/10/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution (Entered: 02/10/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
          ORDER denying 181 Motion for Leave to File. So long as Plaintiff is represented by counsel, Plaintiff shall proceed throught counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/10/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution (Entered: 02/10/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
            ORDER denying 179 Motion for Leave of Court and denying 180 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/10/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution (Entered: 02/10/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File RE: Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's Referral and Order DE 170 on Documents 163 , 165 , 166 , 167 , and 169 by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (lcu) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to File RE: Plaintiff's Objection to the Magistrate's Referral and Order DE 170 on Motion for Leave of Court for Filing Attached Motion to Strike Extrinsic Material RE: DE 132 by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Supplement, and # 3 Exhibit A) (lcu) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                  ORDER denying 174 Motion, 175 Motion, and 176 Motion. So long as Plaintiff is represented by counsel, Plaintiff shall proceed through counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/8/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution. (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave (titled, "of Court RE: Plaintiff's Objection to 171 Order"), by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement and # 2 Exhibit 1-2) (lcu) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response (twenty (20) days) as to 164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcu) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave of Court re 164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (titled, Time to Respond) by DREW C HARTLEY. (lcu) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE TO 150 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit of Mary McLees) (RANGE, THOMAS) Modified on 2/2/2010 to create link to Order. (lcu). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                            RULE 7.1(B) CONFERENCE STATEMENT re 164 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DREW C HARTLEY. (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave of Court RE: Plaintiff's Third Affidavit in Opposition to Defendants Clark, Tifft and McNeil's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint 125 by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, and # 3 Exhibits 1-10) (lcu) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave of Court RE: Second Affidavit RE: Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Appendix Exhibits 1-3, # 3 Appendix Exhibits 4-6, # 4 Appendix Exhibits 7-9, # 5 Appendix Exhibits 10-11, # 6 Appendix Exhibits 12-13, # 7 Appendix Exhibits 14-16, # 8 Appendix Exhibits 17-19, # 9 Appendix Exhibits 20-22, and # 10 Appendix Exhibits 23-27) (lcu) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave of Court RE: First Affidavit RE: Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, and # 2 Appendix Exhibits A-E) (lcu) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                    ORDER, in re: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO THE MAGISTRATE'S REFERRAL AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR FILING OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: (DE 125), received by the clerk of court on January 26, 2010. The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned to Plaintiff by the Clerkwithout electronic filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/28/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution. (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                      ORDER, in re: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, received by the clerk of court on January 21, 2010, and NOTICE OF APPEAL, received by the clerk of court on January 22, 201. The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned to Plaintiff by the Clerk without electronic filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/25/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution with documents. (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                        ORDER denying 163 Motion for Leave; denying 165 Motion for Leave; denying 166 Motion for Leave; denying 167 Motion for Leave; and denying 169 Motion for Leave. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/25/10. (lcu) NOTE: mailed copy of Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, Milton, FL (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to File re 156 Order on Motion to Strike, by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (lcu) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Leave to File (titled, RE: Sworn 17 Page Document), by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcu) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Objection re 144 Response by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (lcu) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike, re 132 Notice by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (lcu) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DREW C HARTLEY. (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Leave of Court for Filing Attached Objections re 125 Motion, by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (lcu) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DREW C HARTLEY. (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DREW C HARTLEY. (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER denying 154 Motion for Leave to File. The court construes the motion as a motion for permission to be heard pro se under Rule 11.1(D) of the Local Rules for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/14/10. (lcu) NOTE: copy mailed to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, Milton, FL. (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/14/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                              ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/14/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER granting 128 Motion to Strike. The clerk shall STRIKE the following pro se filings from the docket, since Plaintiff was represented by counsel at the time the documents were filed: Docs. 107, 111, 121, 123, and 127. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/14/10. (lcu) NOTE: copy mailed to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, Milton, FL (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER granting 119 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft, and Rodney Clark shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 113 on or before FEBRUARY 16, 2010. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/16/2010. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/14/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time RE: (DE 125) by DREW C HARTLEY. (lcu) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER, in re: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO WITHDRAW DOCUMENT 144, received by the clerk of court on January 12, 2010. The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned to Plaintiff by the clerk without electronic filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/13/10. (lcu) NOTE: order and pleading returned to Plaintiff at Santa Rosa Correctional Institution (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER. Within TWENTY (20) DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed as to all Defendants except the three that have been served for failure to timely serve the complaint. (Show Cause Response due by 1/31/2010). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/11/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER, in re: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (to respond to Defendant Clark, Tifft, and McNeil's Motion to Dismiss), received by the clerk of court on January 5, 2010. The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned to Plaintiff by the Clerk without electronic filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/11/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER denying 143 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff is now represented by counsel (see document 145 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/11/10. (lcu) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Transfer of Original Documents to Other District received from Southern District of Florida (Miami) re 137 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (lcu) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ANDREW RANGE on behalf of DREW C HARTLEY (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 125 MOTION to Dismiss 110 Notice (Other) and Amended Complaint filed by DREW C HARTLEY. (RANGE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Pro Se Affidavits in Opposition re 125 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, by DREW C HARTLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and # 2 Affidavit) (lcu) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Notice to Pro Se (lcu) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement mailed to Jeffrey Thomas Cook, Esquire. (lcu) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement mailed to Alice Guyton Hector, Esquire. (lcu) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE Regarding Admission to Practice mailed to Jeffrey Thomas Cook, Esquire (lcu) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Admission to Practice mailed to Alice Guyton Hector, Esquire. (lcu) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:06-cv-21434. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 125 MOTION to Dismiss 110 Notice (Other) and Amended Complaint by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER adopting 122 Magistrate's Report recommending that the case be transferred to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2009. (rss) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Jackson, Torres. (tas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 132 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Service of Grievances and Grievance Appeals by Rodney Clark, Randy Tifft re 125 MOTION to Dismiss 110 Notice (Other) and Amended Complaint (Kilinski, Caryl) Modified on 12/4/2009 (ls). [Text modified by Clerk] [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 125 MOTION to Dismiss 110 Notice (Other) and Amended Complaint by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 128 MOTION to Strike Hartley's post October 2, 2008 Filings (by Clark, Tifft, McNeil) filed by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Drew C. Hartley re 122 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re 118 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue filed by Randy Tifft, Florida Department of Corrections Recommending granting, and this case be transferredto the United States District Court for the NortheREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re 118 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue filed by Randy Tifft, Florida Department of Corrections Recommending granting, and this case be transferredto the United States District Court for the NortheREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re 118 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue filed by Randy Tifft, Florida Department of Corrections Recommending granting, and this case be transferredto the United States District Court for the Northe (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Hartley's post October 2, 2008 Filings (by Clark, Tifft, McNeil) by Rodney Clark, Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft. Responses due by 12/7/2009 (Hiers, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER -- AFFIDAVIT signed by : Drew C. Hartley. by Drew C. Hartley. (tas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] Modified on 1/14/2010 (lcu). (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark J. Hiers on behalf of Rodney Clark, Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft (Hiers, Mark) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 110 Notice (Other) and Amended Complaint by Rodney Clark, Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft. Responses due by 12/4/2009 (Kilinski, Caryl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caryl Kilinski on behalf of Rodney Clark, Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft (Kilinski, Caryl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER --FOURTH AFFIDAVIT by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] Modified on 1/14/2010 (lcu). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              REPORT RE TRANSFER TO CORRECT VENUE on 42 USC 1983 case re 118 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue filed by Randy Tifft, Florida Department of Corrections. Recommending granting, and this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1406(a). It is further recommended that the motion for a stay of 30 days following the ruling on this motion be denied. Objections to R&R due by 11/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/9/2009. (tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER --THIRD AFFIDAVIT signed by : Drew C. Hartley. by Drew C. Hartley. (tas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2009: # 1 Part B, # 2 Part C, # 3 Part C) (tas). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] Modified on 1/14/2010 (lcu). (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft. (Savor, Kathleen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft. (Savor, Kathleen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue by Florida Department of Corrections, Randy Tifft. Responses due by 11/23/2009 (Savor, Kathleen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Florida Department of Corrections. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Drew C. Hartley of Substituted Party (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Drew C. Hartley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice to Filer re 113 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (tp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Drew C. Hartley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Cook, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/8/2009 (tp). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re 110 Notice (Other). Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the filing. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. Please file Notice to Strike and re-file document using correct event. (tp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER --AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Drew C. Hartley.(tp) Modified file date on 9/28/2009 (tp). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] Modified on 1/14/2010 (lcu). (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Drew C. Hartley of Filing Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White for Report and Recommendation per 106 . (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Status Conference held on 9/9/2009. Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158 (im) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STRICKEN PER 156 ORDER -- AFFIDAVIT in Support of Amending Complaint; re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Drew C. Hartley. (asl) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] Modified on 1/14/2010 (lcu). (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 84 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 85 Motion for Protective Order; denying 87 Motion to Stay; granting 90 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 91 Motion for Discovery; striking 101 Motion to obtain case docket and records. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/8/2009. (rss) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Drew C. Hartley re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint of Filing Revised Proposed Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Supplemental Authority re 88 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Drew C. Hartley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attached Motion/Order)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of 9/18/09-9/21/09 and 9/28/09-10/2/09 (Plaintiff's Counsel Alice Hector unavailable) (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of 8/21/09-8/30/09 (Counsel for Plaintiff Unavailable) (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to obtain case docket and records by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of June 4, 2009 - June 11, 2009 re unavailability of Alice G. Hector, counsel for Plaintiff (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 9/9/2009 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/29/2009. (lc2) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Status Conference held on 5/20/2009, ( Status Conference set for 9/9/2009 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke.). Court Reporter: Robin Dispenzieri, Phone: 305-523-5158 (im) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority re 88 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Drew C. Hartley (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bajger on behalf of Clark (Bajger, John) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of July 2, 2009 through and including July 7, 2009 (Plaintiff's counsel, Alice Hector, unavailability) (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION for Discovery filed by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Discovery Subpoena or Protective Order of Florida Department of Correcrtions by Clark. Responses due by 5/29/2009 (igo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Drew C. Hartley. Responses due by 5/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Depositing Case Filing fee:$ 350.00, receipt number 999777 (igo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Discovery, 87 MOTION to Stay filed by Drew C. Hartley. (Cook, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Discovery by Clark. Responses due by 5/11/2009 [See Image at DE #84](ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re 84 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Discovery filed by Clark. Error - Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; Correction - Additional relief(s) docketed by Clerk. Instruction to filer - In the future, please select all applicable reliefs. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Depositions Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Stay Discovery by Clark. Responses due by 5/11/2009 (Mahl, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/28/2009 (ls). (Additional Motion Re-docketed as Entry 87 ) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 5/20/2009 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/7/09. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of 04/24/09-05/07/09 Counsel for Plaintiff Alice Hector Unavailable (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 1/12/2009 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. (im) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Calendar Entry Status Conference set for 1/7/2009 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 75 Motion to Set Status Conference and Vacate Pretrial Deadlines. 74 Scheduling Order entered 11/25/08 is VACATED. Status Conference 1/7/09 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/15/08. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer re 75 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Drew C. Hartley,. Error - Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; Correction - Additional relief(s) ___ 77 MOTION to Vacate filed by Drew C. Hartley docketed by Clerk. Instructions to filer - In the future, please select all applicable reliefs. It is not necessary to refile this document. Error - Wrong Event Selected; Correction - Redocketed by Clerk as __ Motion for Hearing/Status Conference. Instruction to Filer - In the future, please select the proper event. It is not necessary to refile this document. (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines by Drew C. Hartley. **See 75 for Image** Responses due by 12/22/2008 (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Drew C. Hartley (tas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Renewed MOTION for status conference and to vacate pretrial deadlines by Drew C. Hartley. (Hector, Alice) -Modified event on 12/8/2008 (gp). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 9/14/2009 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 9/9/2009 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2009., Fact Discovery due by 3/13/2009., Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2009., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/3/2009.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator. ( Mediation Deadline 5/29/2009.). Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/25/2008. (im) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Clark re 70 Order to Show Cause Regarding agreement on discovery alleviation (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY to 70 Order to Show Cause filed by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: Status Conference held on 11/12/2008. Court Reporter: Robert Ryckoff, Phone: 954-769-5657 (im) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/19/2008.. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/12/08. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING REPORT- Rule 26(f). (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Continue. Parties to submit by 11/7/08 proposed joint scheduling order. Parties shall attend status conference 11/12/08 at 3:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/28/08. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Drew C. Hartley for dates of 11/25/08 through and including 12/1/08 and 12/26/08 through and including 1/7/09 (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue /Reset Deadlines and/or For Status Conference & Incorporated Memo of Law by Drew C. Hartley. Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in the case of the 12/28/2007 deposition to 42 Order on Motion to Produce,, Order on Motion to Take Deposition, filed by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) -Modified text on 10/7/2008 (gp). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice Guyton Hector on behalf of Drew C. Hartley (Hector, Alice) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel the defendant to file and serve upon plaintiff a true and correct certified copy of the deposition transcript of December 28, 2007 by Drew C. Hartley. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (ra) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 56 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice. The Defendants have filed a notice of compliance. This is a paperless order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 07/29/08. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 52 Motion for Reconsideration. The defendants have filed a notice of compliance. This is a paperless order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 07/29/08. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Drew C. Hartley (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Compliance re 34 Order by Clark (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mahl, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/6/2008 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #34] [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of inquiry by Drew C. Hartley (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sanctions by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to 53 Report and Recommendations by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pretrial Statement by Drew C. Hartley. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT THAT CASEE IS READY FOR TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 02/19/08.(tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration, objection to and appeal of re 49 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER deferring ruling on 47 Motion for Reconsideration. This motion is deferred to the United States District Judge. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/4/08. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 46 Motion for Default Judgment, denying 46 Motion for Hearing, denying 46 Motion for Sanctions, except that the defendants shall either file a notice of compliance to the Court or objections to the discovery requested. denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/1/08. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Drew C. Hartley. (bs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 45 Order on Motion for Hearing by Drew C. Hartley. (bs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Default Judgment, MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Sanctions by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 44 Motion for Hearing. (See Order)Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 01/17/08. (tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Hearing re 26 Order, by Drew C. Hartley. (gp) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Discovery: First Set of interrogatories, by Drew C. Hartley.(lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER dismissing 39 Motion to Produce, it is a discovery request, not a motion, denying 40 Motion to Take Deposition of defendants, the plaintiff may request responses to additional interrogatories. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/28/07. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONCESSION OF ERROR by Drew C. Hartley (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Take Deposition from Sgt. Clark by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Document by Drew C. Hartley. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LIMITED RESPONSE and objections to 34 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Take Deposition filed by Drew C. Hartley. (tb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 35 Notice (Other) filed by Clark, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction=Redocketed as Notice to Take Deposition. Instruction to Filer=In the future please select the proper Event; under "Other Filings" "Discovery Documents". (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Drew Hartley by Clark. [See Image at DE #35](ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Clark of Taking Deposition of Drew C. Hartley (Mahl, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/20/2007 (ls). "Wrong Event Used, Re-docketed as 36 ; Notice to Take Deposition". [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 28 Motion to accept out of time, granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, granting 31 Motion to Take Deposition from Drew c. Hartley Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/12/07. (tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer: re 30 Notice (Other) filed by Clark, Error: Wrong Event Selected; Correction=Redocketed as Notice of Attorney Appearance. Instruction to Filer=In the future please select the proper Event; (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Mahl on behalf of Clark [See Image at DE #30] (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Take Deposition from Drew Hartley (incarcerated inmate) by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Clark of Appearance (Mahl, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2007 (ls). "Wrong Event Used, Re-docketed as Entry 32 ; Notice of Attorney Appearance". [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by 60 days by Clark. (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Compliance re 26 Order by Clark (Mahl, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/12/2007 (ls). [Added relationship to DE #26] [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Clark.(Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER 1. The defendants shall comply with the Court's Order on or before November 28, 2007, notifying the Court that they have complied by providing the plaintiff with discovery and/or filing objections thereto.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/19/07.(tw) Modified on 11/26/2007 (dg). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER dismissing 22 Motion to Produce, it is a discovery request, denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice, granting 24 plaintiff's Motion to Compel production of documents to the extent that the defendants shall file a notice of compliance with the Court, or objections thereto on or before November 12,07. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/05/07. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel the Defendant to Produce for Inspection and Copying documents requested on September 24, 2007 by Drew C. Hartley. Responses due by 11/16/2007 (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Drew C. Hartley. Responses due by 11/16/2007 (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's First request for Production of Documents by Clark. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2007. Motions due by 1/10/2008. Plaintiff shall file a document called "Pretrial Statement" due by 1/24/08. Defendants shall a document called "Pretrial Statement" due by 2/08/08.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 08/17/07.(tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Clark, Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/29/07.(tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE dismissing re 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Clark. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2007.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 04/23/07.(tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE and Memorandum in Opposition re 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,filed by Drew C. Hartley.(gw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Reply due by 4/10/2007. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 03/20/07. (cz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Plaintiff's Complaint, by Drew C. Hartley. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Plaintiff's Complaint by Clark. Responses due by 3/8/2007 (Mahl, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drew C. Hartley. Clark served on 2/1/2007, answer due 2/21/2007. (pa) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Clark. (br) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS REQUIRING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON AND INDIVIDUAL as to Sergeant Clark, Everglades Correctional Institution. Signed by Judge Patrick A. White on 12/15/06. (tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Clark for dates of December 11, 2006 Through And Including December 22, 2006. Modified on 11/8/2006 (sk). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting, as a notification of prior cases [9-1] motion for hearing on 12 previous filings in federal court (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/23/06) [EOD Date: 8/24/06] (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Drew C. Hartley for hearing on 12 previous filings in federal court (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER adopting [6-1] report and recommendations (Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/11/06) [EOD Date: 7/12/06] CCAP (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Clark Mailed on: 7/7/06 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRELIMINARY REPORT OF Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White Signed on 6/19/06 recommending that the complaint proceed against defendant Clark. Case no longer referred. Objections to R and R due by 6/29/06 CCAP (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Permitting Plaintiff To Proceed Without Prepayment Of Filing Fee But Establishing Debt To Clerk Of $350; granting [2-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/15/06) Date: 6/16/06] (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/15/06) [EOD Date: 6/16/06] (mh, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Order of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Patrick A. White, re: Administrative Order (dg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Drew C. Hartley to proceed in forma pauperis (dg, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed; IFP ; Magistrate Judge White (dg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/08/2006 [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/21/2009.] (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?