Wellington Preserve Corporation
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-21225
District Judge A. Jay Cristol, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust by and through Kenneth A. Welt, Liquidating Trustee, pursuant to the confirmed Third Amended Plan of Liquidation of the Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mindy A. Mora, Esq. +1 305 350 2414 +1 305 351 2242 mmora@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Adrian C. Delancy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ido J Alexander, Esq +1 305 670 5008 ialexander@mrthlaw.com
Space Rilyn A Carnahan +1 305 670 5000 rcarnahan@mrthlaw.com
Space Adrian C. Delancy +1 305 670 5000 +1 305 670 5011 adelancy@mrthlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A. Underwood, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott A. Underwood, Esq. +1 954 712 7400 +1 954 712 7401 sunderwood@mws-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William M Hawkins, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M Hawkins, Esq +1 212 407 4800
v.
No Logo Goldberg, Bruce, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo Howard Flanders, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo Lola Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo Paul Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo Samuel Wiggins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo William Hasler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Hasler

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/09/2010 Michael P Brundage,. +1 813 221 3900 +1 813 221 2900 mbrundage@hwhlaw.com
No Logo All American Semiconductor, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Z. Jones, Esq. +1 305 375 6160 +1 305 374 7593 jjones@bilzin.com
Space Mindy A. Mora, Esq. +1 305 350 2414 +1 305 351 2242 mmora@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Scott A. Underwood, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott A. Underwood, Esq. +1 954 712 7400 +1 954 712 7401 sunderwood@mws-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010 Tina M. Talarchyk +1 561 472 2121 +1 561 472 2122 ttalarchyk@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Traci Hope Rollins +1 561 650 7256 +6551 655 655 1509 Trollins@ssd.com
No Logo Arch Aluminum & Glass Company, Inc., Debtor
Officially listed as "Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Heather L Harmon, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 HHarmon@gjb-law.com
Space Michael L Schuster +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 mschuster@gjb-law.com
No Logo Arrow Air, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kelli M. Stephenson +1 212 547 2000 +1 212 547 2600

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doug H. Edwards +1 713 547 2000 +1 713 547 2688 edwardsd@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Blaine F Bates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Blaine F Bates +1 713 547 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kenric D Kattner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenric D Kattner +1 713 547 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kourtney Lyda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry Flores +1 713 547 2000 +1 713 236 5499
Space Kourtney Lyda +1 713 547 2000 +1 713 236 5686

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter C Ruggero

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter C Ruggero +1 713 547 2000 +1 713 547 2600
No Logo Artecity Holding LTD, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Kellogg Lehman Schneider & Grossman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifar M. Hill, Esq. +1 305 722 8996 +1 305 403 8789 jmh@lkllaw.com
Space Thomas R. Lehman, Esq. +1 305 403 8788 +1 305 403 8789 trl@lkllaw.com
Space Robin J. Rubens, Esq. +1 305 403 8788 +1 305 403 8789 rjr@lkllaw.com
No Logo Cabi Downtown, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mindy A. Mora, Esq. +1 305 350 2414 +1 305 351 2242 mmora@bilzin.com
No Logo Catalina Lighting, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen LLP (Miami Office)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen P. Drobny, Esq. +1 305 347 7362 sdrobny@shutts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter H Levitt, Esq +1 305 415 9447 plevitt@shutts-law.com
No Logo Christopher A West, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Christian J. Olson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian J. Olson, Esq. +1 954 492 1013 +1 954 485 7281 chris@simonsonolson.com
No Logo Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/05/2010 Scott L Baena, Esq +1 305 350 2403 +1 305 374 7593 sbaena@bilzin.com
Space Jason Z. Jones, Esq. +1 305 375 6160 +1 305 374 7593 jjones@bilzin.com
Space Mindy A. Mora, Esq. +1 305 350 2414 +1 305 351 2242 mmora@bilzin.com
No Logo Gulfstream Crane, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Seese, Esq. +1 954 467 7900 +1 954 467 1024 mseese@hinshawlaw.com
Space Steven E Seward +1 954 467 7900 +1 954 467 1024 sseward@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Manuel Farach, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manuel Farach, Esq. +1 561 803 3501 +1 561 820 1608 mfarach@richmangreer.com
No Logo Maria A. Coto, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Sanchez, Esq. +1 305 687 8008 +1 305 685 3244 attorneysanchez@yahoo.com
No Logo Medical Staffing Network Holdings, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie Gern Cloyd, Esq. +1 954 525 9900 +1 954 523 2872 lcloyd@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Mercedes Homes, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Tina M Talarchyk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010 Tina M Talarchyk +1 561 899 3333 +1 561 899 3379

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/04/2010 Tina M. Talarchyk +1 561 472 2121 +1 561 472 2122 ttalarchyk@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Traci Hope Rollins +1 561 650 7256 +6551 655 655 1509 Trollins@ssd.com
No Logo Nicolas F. Coto, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Sanchez, Esq. +1 305 687 8008 +1 305 685 3244 attorneysanchez@yahoo.com
No Logo PPOA Holding, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debi Evans Galler, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 dgaller@bergersingerman.com
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Protective Products Of America, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debi Evans Galler, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 dgaller@bergersingerman.com
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
No Logo QOC I LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather L Harmon, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 HHarmon@gjb-law.com
Space Glenn D Moses, Esq +1 305 372 2522 +1 305 349 2310 gmoses@gjb-law.com
No Logo Rafael Rodriguez, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rafael Rodriguez 1 +14 +14 1444
No Logo Systemone Technologies, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ari Newman +1 305 579 0500 +1 305 579 0717 newmanar@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Luis Salazar, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis Salazar, Esq. +1 305 374 4848 +1 305 397 1021
No Logo Teleplus World, Corporation, Debtor
Officially listed as "Teleplus World, Corp."
No Logo Tousa, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Triangle Management Investments, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/01/2010 Anna B Middleton +1 954 393 6328 annabmiddleton@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian S Behar, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian S Behar, Esq +1 305 931 3771 bsb@bgglaw.net
No Logo Vision Care Holdings, LLC, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P Gruher +1 954 453 8000 bgruher@gjb-law.com
Space Bart Alan Houston +1 954 453 8000 +1 954 453 8010 bhouston@gjb-law.com
No Logo Wellington Preserve Corporation, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler White Boggs, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald G Neiwirth +1 305 789 9200 +1 305 789 9201 rgn@fowler-white.com
No Logo Committee of Creditors, Creditor Committee
No Logo CREDITOR COMMITTEE, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn D Moses, Esq +1 305 372 2522 +1 305 349 2310 gmoses@gjb-law.com
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Battista, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 pbattista@gjb-law.com
Space Glenn D Moses, Esq +1 305 372 2522 +1 305 349 2310 gmoses@gjb-law.com
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee
No Logo Deborah D West, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Christian J. Olson, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian J. Olson, Esq. +1 954 492 1013 +1 954 485 7281 chris@simonsonolson.com
No Logo James S. Feltman, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather L Harmon, Esq +1 305 349 2300 +1 305 349 2310 HHarmon@gjb-law.com
Space Marilee A Mark +1 305 349 2300 mmark@gjb-law.com
Space Glenn D Moses, Esq +1 305 372 2522 +1 305 349 2310 gmoses@gjb-law.com
No Logo Soneet Kapila, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Becky Ferrell-Anton +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 BeckyF@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Friedman , +1 212 506 1700 +1 212 506 1800 dfriedman@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harley E. Riedel, Esq +1 813 229 0144 +1 813 229 1811 hriedel.ecf@srbp.com
Space Susan Heath Sharp +1 813 229 0144 +2291 229 229 1811 ssharp.ecf@srbp.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heidi A Feinman +1 305 536 7285 +1 305 536 7360 Heidi.A.Feinman@usdoj.gov
No Logo The Garden City Group, Inc., Noticing / Claims Agent

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Emily S Gottlieb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily S Gottlieb +1 312 368 4000 jessica.wasserstrom@gcginc.com
No Logo Trustee Services Inc, Noticing / Claims Agent

Toggle Switch Represented by www.trusteewelt.com

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A Welt +1 954 889 3403 court@kawpa.com
Citation Section ,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (^Aungst2, Kristopher) (Entered U.S.C. § 01/19/2010)
  Entries (206) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2485 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
Transcript of 7/29/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 2048 Final Application for Compensation for Barry E Mukamal, Financial Advisor, Period: 8/17/2009 to 5/19/2010, Fee: $6,330.50, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by., 2058 Third and Final Fee Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Glenn D Moses Esq, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2010 to 4/19/2010, Fee: $38,669.00, Expenses: $1,511.85. Filed by Attorney Glenn D Moses Esq., 2059 Third and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Michael J. Viscount, Jr., Esq. and the Law Firm of Fox Rothschild LLP for Creditors Committee, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2010 to 4/12/2010, Fee: $12,934.50, Expenses: $360.17. Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee., 2068 Second Interim Application for Compensation for Jeffrey R. Truitt, Examiner, Period: 2/1/2010 to 5/31/2010, Fee: $22,680.00, Expenses: $7,354.48. Filed by Examiner Jeffrey R. Truitt., 2069 Second Interim Application for Compensation of Stutman, Treister & Glatt, PC for Christine M. Pajak, Attorney, Period: 2/1/2010 to 5/31/2010, Fee: $50,090.60, Expenses: $14,040.97. Filed by Attorney Christine M. Pajak., 2070 Second Interim Application for Compensation for Frank Terzo Esq., Attorney, Period: 2/1/2010 to 5/31/2010, Fee: $8,997.00, Expenses: $107.88. Filed by Attorney Frank Terzo Esq.., 2193 Ex Parte Application to Employ David M. Friedman of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP as Special Litigation Counsel to Trustee [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila.). Redaction Request Due By 08/24/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 09/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 09/17/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/15/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2422 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
    Notice of Corrective Entry to Reflect (Re: 2418 **Due to System Failure PDF image was not Generated. Refer to DE#2421**Notice of Filing of Evidence of Partial Transfer/Assignment of Claim) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2418 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
      **Due to System Failure PDF image was not Generated. Refer to DE#2421**Notice of Filing of Evidence of Partial Transfer/Assignment of Claim (Re: 2413 PARTIAL Transfer/Assignment of Scheduled Claim from Carlyle High Yield Partners X, Ltd to Morgan Stanley Senior Funding Inc in the Amount of $1,647,759.47) (Gutierrez, Susan) Modified on 8/11/2010 (Gutierrez, Susan). (Entered: 08/11/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2346 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
        Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 2016 Transcript of 4/21/2010 Hearing) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2301 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
          Notice of Corrective Entry to correct Linkage (Re: 2287 Certificate of Service) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2124 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1345 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2123 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1452 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2116 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-M-15) (Shuler, Pamela) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2115 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                  Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-M-14) (Shuler, Pamela) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2108 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1384 Closed - Settled. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1381 Closed - Settled. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2106 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1342 Closed. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                          Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1952 Transcript of 3/2/2010 Hearing (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 9/4/2010, Entered: None
                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1863 Transcript of 4/8/2009 Hearing ; .) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 09/04/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2077 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1385 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1352 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2075 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                  Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1442 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2074 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1418 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2073 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1417 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2072 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1408 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                          Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1396 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2070 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1374 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2069 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1359 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1348 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1467 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1390 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1366 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1464 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2063 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1411 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1407 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1406 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2060 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1405 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2059 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1402 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1365 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1362 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1357 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1333 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2054 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1399 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2049 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1425 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2034 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1698 Transcript of 10/5/2009 Hearing, 1699 Transcript of 10/14/2009 Hearing, 1700 Transcript of 10/22/2009 Hearing, 1701 Transcript of 10/30/2009 Hearing, 1702 Transcript of 11/6/2009 Hearing, 1703 Transcript of 11/12/2009 Hearing, 1704 Transcript of 11/18/2009 Hearing, 1705 Transcript of 11/20/2009 Hearing, 1706 Transcript of 11/24/2009 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2027 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Corrective Entry (Re: 2026 **ENTERED IN ERROR. TRANSCRIPT REMAINS RESTRICTED TO ALL EXTERNAL USERS** Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1.) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2026 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    **ENTERED IN ERROR. TRANSCRIPT REMAINS RESTRICTED TO ALL EXTERNAL USERS** Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1863 Transcript of 4/8/2009 Hearing .) (Antillon, Jackie) Modified on 6/17/2010 (Antillon, Jackie). (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2023 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1461 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2022 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1445 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2021 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1358 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2016 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Transcript of 4/21/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 1538 Motion to Approve Sale of Inventory to Mitigate Damages Filed by Creditor DWI Holdings, Inc.., 1945 Motion to Modify Order Converting Cases under Chapter 11 to Cases under Chapter 7 Filed by Creditor M&M Lienholders., 1959 Motion To Clarify Order Converting Cases Under Chapter 11 to Cases Under Chapter 7 Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.). Redaction Request Due By 05/12/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 05/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 06/7/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/3/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2015 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1683 Transcript of 1/27/2010 Hearing Redaction Request Due By 02/9/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/5/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/3/2010. .) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2011 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: The Firm's Name was Added as Applicant for this Event. In the Future, DO NOT Add Firm's Name and Only Select Individual's Name as Filer and Party Requesting Employment. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 2007 Application to Employ Russell M Blain as Attorneys for Trustee [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Soneet Kapila) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Corrective Entry (Re: 1958 Agreed Order Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Debtors Third Omnibus Objection to Claims .) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Corected Image Attached To Entry) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1934 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1469 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1427 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1932 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1415 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1930 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Transcript of 4/2/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 1538 Motion to Approve Sale of Inventory to Mitigate Damages Filed by Creditor DWI Holdings, Inc.., 1765 Second Application for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC and for Jack J. Kessler, Special Counsel, Period: 10/1/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $85,391.00, Expenses: $228.39. Filed by Special Counsel Jack J. Kessler., 1766 Application for Interim Compensation for Frank Terzo Esq., Attorney, Period: 11/1/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $20293.00, Expenses: $386.50. Filed by Attorney Frank Terzo Esq.., 1767 Second Application for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP and for David M. Friedman, Special Counsel, Period: 10/1/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $433,092.00, Expenses: $23,939.61. Filed by Special Counsel David M. Friedman., 1768 Second Application for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP and for Scott L Baena Esq, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 10/1/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $2,255,575.00, Expenses: $29,220.91. Filed by Attorney Scott L Baena Esq., 1769 Application for Interim Compensation for Eve H. Karasik, Attorney, Period: 10/16/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $761807.50, Expenses: $18260.73. Filed by Attorney Eve H. Karasik.., 1770 Application for Interim Compensation for Jeffrey R. Truitt, Examiner, Period: 10/16/2009 to 1/31/2010, Fee: $195718.75, Expenses: $42215.15. Filed by Examiner Jeffrey R. Truitt.., 1771 Second Interim Fee Application for Compensation for Glenn D Moses Esq, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 11/1/2009 to 2/28/2010, Fee: $106,331.50, Expenses: $3,598.89. Filed by Attorney Glenn D Moses Esq., 1784 Second Interim Fee Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Fox Rothschild, LLP counsel for Creditors Committee, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 11/1/2009 to 2/28/2010, Fee: $62,923.00, Expenses: $1,079.75. Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee., 1822 Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Moelis & Company LLC, Financial Advisor and Investment Banker to the Debtors and for Thane W. Carlston, Financial Advisor, Period: 6/9/2009 to 2/18/2010, Fee: $2,505,206.23, Expenses: $91,029.92. Filed by Financial Advisor Thane W. Carlston., 1838 Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Ordinary Course Professional Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P., General Leed and Tax Incentive Counsel to the Debtors-in-Possession and for Leslie E. LoBaugh, Special Counsel, Period: 6/9/2009 to 3/11/2010, Fee: $418,160.50, Expenses: $47,523.43. Filed by Special Counsel Leslie E. LoBaugh.). Redaction Request Due By 04/14/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/10/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/6/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1927 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Attorneys may not share an assigned login pursuant to Local Rule 9011-4(A)(2)(b) [the login code does not match the signature on the document]. THIS DOCUMENT DOES NOT SUFFICE AS AN APPEARANCE FOR THE ATTORNEY LISTED. (Re: 1919 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Paul J Burkhart Filed by Creditor National Home Insurance Company.) (Cradic, Cameron) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20953-CMA (Re: 1153 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1916 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-21019-CMA (Re: 1253 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20983-CMA (Re: 1154 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20984-CMA (Re: 1155 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20985-CMA (Re: 1156 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20986-CMA (Re: 1157 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20987-CMA (Re: 1159 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-20988 (Re: 1165 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditor M&M Lienholders) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-20930-CV-CMA (Re: 1139 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-20831-CV-KMM (Re: 1249 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1903 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  **DOCKETED IN ERROR** Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-20831-CV-KMM (Re: 1253 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Antillon, Jackie) Modified on 3/29/2010 (Antillon, Jackie). (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-20864-KAM (Re: 1257 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-208651-KAM (Re: 1259 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20928-CMA (Re: 1135 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV20929-CMA (Re: 1137 Notice of Appeal Filed by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV20931CMA (Re: 1140 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20914-KMM (Re: 1132 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-209111-KMM (Re: 1452 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1468 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1420 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1377 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20868-KMM (Re: 1445 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditor M&M Lienholders) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20866-FAM (Re: 1408 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20865-KAM (Re: 1159 Notice of Appeal Filed by Creditors Cashman Equipment Company, Crescent Electric Supply Company, Derr and Gruenewald Construction Co., Greybar Electric Company, Inc., Hilti, Inc., Integrated Mechanical Group, LLC, Morris Shea Bridge Company, Inc., Quality Cabinet & Fixture Company, Sierra Glass & Mirror, Inc., Tracy & Ryder Landscape, Inc., Water FX, LLC, Z Glass, Inc., ZETIAN SYSTENS) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 4/8/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 1056 Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization, 1105 Objection to, 1106 Objection to Confirmation of, 1108 Limited Objection to, 1114 Confirmation Declaration of Kenneth A. Welt Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee, 1125 Motion to Compromise Controversy with Elpida Memory, 1134 Application to Employ Mindy A. Mora and the Law Firm of Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 327, 1135 Motion by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All American Semiconductor, Inc., et al., for Order Conferring Derivative Standing Upon Committee to Pursue Estates' Avoidance Actions Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee., 1136 Application by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All American Semiconductor, Inc., et al., for Approval of Expanded Scope of Employment of its Local Counsel, Jerry M. Markowitz, Esquire of the Law Firm of Markowitz, Davis, Ringel & Trusty, P.A, to Include Prosecution of the Estates' Avoidance Actions, Nunc Pro Tunc to February 23, 2009, and for Approval of Contingency Fee Arrangement Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee.). Redaction Request Due By 03/25/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/8/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/19/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/16/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1463 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20832-KMM (Re: 1255 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc.) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal. Case Number: 10-CV-20833-KAM (Re: 1251 Notice of Appeal by Contractor Claimants Filed by Creditors Absocold Corporation, d/b/a Econ Appliance, Austin General Contracting, Inc., Bombard Electric, LLC, Bombard Mechanical, LLC, Desert Fire Protection Co., Powell Cabinet and Fixture Co., SAMFET, Safe Electronics, Inc, Union Erectors, LLC, Warner Enterprises, Inc)(Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1446 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1410 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1403 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1332 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1421 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1451 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1429 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 1349 Transcript of 12/2/2009 Hearing , 1350 Transcript of 12/8/2009 Hearing, 1351 Transcript of 12/10/2009 Hearing.) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Corrective Entry - Transmittal to District Court did not include Motion for Leave to Appeal instead it was a Transmittal of Record on Appeal. (Re: 1830 Transmittal of Record on Appeal to US District Court)(Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 1:09-ap-1401 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 959 Transcript of 11/5/2009 Hearing) (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 11/24/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 955 Motion for Relief from Stay to Cancel Group Contract as of Date Prior to December 1, 2009, with Request for Hearing On or Before November 30, 2009, [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Interested Party West Publishing Company.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of 11/20/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 1006 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of 11/18/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 984 Motion to Approve Successor Administrative Agent Agreement and Successor Disbursement Agent Agreement Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 11/12/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 972 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral , in addition to Emergency Motion for Adequate Protection for Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of 11/6/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 922 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of 10/30/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 880 **REDOCKETED See DE#884 for correct entry** Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and to Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC..). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of 10/22/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 832 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and to Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 10/14/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 767 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Consensually Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and to Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 10/5/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 28 Emergency Application to Employ Citadel Derivatives Group LLC as Financial Advisors and Investment Bankers to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and for Entry of Interim and Final Orders [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., 37 Emergency Application to Employ Moelis & Company LLC as Financial Advisors and Investment Bankers to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and for Entry of Interim and Final Orders [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC., 528 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and to Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to Sections 361, 363, and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Debtor Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED **MOTION/DOCUMENT** WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. (Re: 1692 Notice of Continued Hearing from February 9, 2010 Filed by Attorney Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of 1/27/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 02/9/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/5/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/3/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 10/27/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 729 Application for Administrative Expenses Filed by Creditor Cabi Developers, LLC., 744 Fourth Amended Disclosure Statement, 750 Objection to, 838 First and Final Application for Compensation to FBS Property Tax Abatement, LLC as Property Tax Consultant to the Debtor in Possession and for Mitchell A Feldman, Consultant, Period: 9/11/2009 to 7/31/2010, Fee: $273,368.43, Expenses: $. Filed by Other Professional Mitchell A Feldman., 848 Objection to, 856 Fifth Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization 743 Fourth Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC) Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC., 907 Limited Objection to Confirmation of, 908 Final Application for Compensation , 909 Third and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP and for Mindy A. Mora Esq., Debtor's Attorney, Period: 4/1/2010 to 9/10/2010, Fee: $675,479.15, Expenses: $63,157.92. Filed by Attorney Mindy A. Mora Esq.., 910 Third and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Algon Capital, LLC d/b/a Algon Group and for Paul F Rubin, Financial Advisor, Period: 4/1/2010 to 8/31/2010, Fee: $74,712.50, Expenses: $3,602.38. Filed by Financial Advisor Paul F Rubin., 911 Third and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses to Siegfried, Rivera, Lerner, De La Torre & Sobel, P.A. and for Oscar R Rivera, Special Counsel, Period: 4/1/2010 to 8/31/2010, Fee: $65,212.00, Expenses: $2,463.98. Filed by Special Counsel Oscar R Rivera., 912 Third and Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP and for Andrew K. Glenn, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 4/1/2010 to 9/10/2010, Fee: $435,838.00, Expenses: $9,069.84. Filed by Attorney Andrew K. Glenn., 919 Application to Employ Mitchell A. Feldman as Property Tax Consultant and Approval of Contingency Fee Arrangement, nunc pro tunc to September 16, 2010 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC., 979 Motion to Extend Time to the Administrative Claims Bar Date Filed by Creditors Nicholas Grossi, Marka-Tech Associates, Inc.., 1025 Limited Objection to Confirmation of, 1053 Limited Objection to, 1058 Limited Objection to Confirmation of, 1073 Application for Administrative Expenses Filed by Creditors Nicholas Grossi, Marka-Tech Associates, Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 11/18/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 12/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 12/13/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 02/9/2011. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:10-ap-2713 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 767 Transcript of 7/20/2010 Hearing .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 1:10-ap-3086 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary Case 1:09-ap-2545 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary Case 1:09-ap-2184 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary Case 1:10-ap-3526 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Re: 1089 Supplemental Final Fee Application for Compensation ) - Scheduled In Error To Be Heard at Confirmation (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 9/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 669 Transcript of 5/14/2010 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 09/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed was Incorrectly Linked. Document Should Be Linked To The Last Disclosure Statement Filed THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 857 Fifth Amended Disclosure Statement) (Tooks, Ida) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed was Incorrectly Linked. Document Should Be Linked To The Last Plan Filed THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 856 Fifth Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization) (Tooks, Ida) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 1:10-ap-2772 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 8/6/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 758 Motion to Seal Unredacted Version of Motion to Compromise Controversy and Approve Settlement Agreement Between Cabi Downtown, LLC and W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company and Set an In Camera Hearing for Consideration Thereof Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC., 789 Expedited Motion to Approve and Establish September 1, 2010 as Administrative Claims Bar Date and, 791 Emergency Motion to Seal Underacted Version of Management Services Agreement and Set an In Camera Hearing for Consideration Thereof in Connection with the Confirmation Hearing Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC., 804 Debtor's Motion to Extend Time to Mail Ballot, in addition to Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement and Solicit Votes Thereon Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC., 807 Motion to Approve Solicitation Letter Filed by Creditor Committee Creditors Committee.). Redaction Request Due By 08/24/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 09/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 09/17/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/15/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Expedited Hearing (Re: 741 Motion to Modify Plan filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc., Interested Party AAG Holdings, Inc., Interested Party AWP, LLC, Interested Party Arch Aluminum, L.C., Interested Party Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). *** Expedited hearing scheduled for 11/16/2010 at 10:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale. *** SO ORDERED by The Honorable John K. Olson. (This is a text-only virtual docket entry with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A). Debtors' counsel is directed to immediately serve copies of this text-only order and file a certificate of service.) (Howell, William) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Answer/Response (Re: 715 **Incorrect event used, refer to replacement entry DE#729**Motion in Response to Debtor's Objection to Claim [D.E. 581] Filed by Creditor Wachovia Bank, N.A.. .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 536 Transcript of 2/24/2010 Hearing .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed was Incorrectly Linked. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 681 Certificate of Service by Attorney Craig V Rasile Esq .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 495 Transcript of 2/4/2010 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 468 Transcript of 2/4/2010 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Corrective Entry to reflect correct linkage (Re: 605 Response to .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 422 Transcript of 12/30/2009 Hearing, 424 Transcript of 1/7/2010 Hearing) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 390 Transcript of 12/28/2009 Hearing, 391 Transcript of 12/18/2009 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-W-11) (LaCoursiere, Chris) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 350 Transcript of 12/2/2009 Hearing. 351 Transcript of 11/23/2009 Hearing. 360 Transcript of 12/15/2009 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 350 Transcript of 12/2/2009 Hearing. 351 Transcript of 11/23/2009 Hearing.) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 312 Transcript of 9/2/2009 Hearing; .) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of 2/24/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 487 Application to Employ Michael A. Furshman of Solomon & Furshman LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Cabi Downtown, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 03/15/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/8/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/7/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete Entry. Pleading filed Requires Two Separate Reliefs. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Motion for Relief from Stay and Motion for Adequate Protection (Re: 517 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Creditor PNCEF, LLC.) (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled on 2/24/10 (Re: 467 Order to Show Cause Hearing why Bank of America NA and its counsel should not be sanctioned) (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 410 Transcript of 1/14/2010 Hearing) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 9/27/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 10/20/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 11/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 11/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 01/11/2011. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of 2/4/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 02/24/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/18/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 292 Transcript of 1/14/2010 Hearing) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document filed requires multiple relief. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 478 Motion to Compel Debtor to pay Administrative Rent and to Assume or Reject Unexpired Lease, in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay and/or Adequate Protection [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Creditor Kelly Tractor Company.) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 249 Transcript of 10/15/2009 Hearing) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 2/4/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 02/17/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 03/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/15/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/11/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of 7/21/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 09/23/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 10/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 10/18/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/15/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of 8/20/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 16 Motion to Approve , 206 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Creditors Ron Condren, Lanette Gervato., 216 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Interested Party Adriana Giggey., 259 Objection to, 276 Objection to, 278 Limited Objection to, 279 Limited Objection to, 280 Objection to, 281 Limited Objection to, 283 Objection to, 290 Emergency Motion to Amend Re: 194 Order on Motion to Approve, Order on Miscellaneous Motion, Order on Motion for Sale of Property In Regard to Terms Pursuant to Which Debtors May Assume and Assign Contracts Filed by Interested Parties InteliStaf Group, Inc., InteliStaf Healthcare Management, L.P., InteliStaf Healthcare, Inc., InteliStaf Holdings, Inc., InteliStaf Partners No. 1, LLC, InteliStaf Partners No. 2, LLC, MSN-Illinois Holdings, Inc., Medical Staffing Holdings, LLC, Medical Staffing Network Assets, LLC, Medical Staffing Network of Illinois, LLC, Medical Staffing Network, Inc., Debtor Medical Staffing Network Holdings, Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 09/23/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 10/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 10/18/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/15/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 8/20/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 09/23/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 10/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 10/18/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/15/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Objection, located under Answer/Response, then select Reference an Existing Motino/Application and link to pleading being objected to. (Re: 396 Motion Limited objection to disclosure statement Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc.) (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Corrective Entry to edit docket text (Re: 387 Response to 29 Motion for Order Approving Asset Purchase Agreement) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 7/8/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 75 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection and, Motion For Turnover Of Property, 83 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation., 113 Verified Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor U.S. Bancorp Equipment Finance, Inc.., 162 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Payments Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc., 256 Motion for Payment of Past Due Rent on Commercial Property, in the Amount of $152,500.00. Filed by Creditor Steve Retterath., 277 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Creditor Bank Midwest, N.A.., 292 Second Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Michael D. Seese Esq., Attorney, Period: 3/1/2010 to 4/30/2010, Fee: $71,025.00, Expenses: $2,191.53. Filed by Attorney Michael D. Seese Esq.., 317 Motion to Set Hearing, 328 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Filed by Debtor Gulfstream Crane, LLC.). Redaction Request Due By 07/22/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 08/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 08/16/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/13/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Corrective Entry - Replaced illegible PDF image (Re: 329 Motion to Intervene and for Counsel Ross R. Hartogs' Recusal, due to Financial and Personal Conflicts of Interest, Filed by Creditors Isong Akpon, Mario Alvarado, George Barbour, Andre Cowley, Iran Duarte, Jermod Holmes, Justin Laube, Ali Murray, Jimmy O'Neal Brown, Jeffrey Pierre, Jonathan Lee Riches, Maurice Shelly, Eddie Whitlow). (Cradic, Cameron) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-W-09) (reference entry #332) (Cradic, Cameron) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed was Not Linked to All Applicable Documents. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 319 Certificate of Service by Attorney Gregory L Scott Esq .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 94 Transcript of 7/2/2010 Hearing Re: 14 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Administrative Order Establishing Procedure for Monthly and Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 15 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing a Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim and Proofs of Interest Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 16 Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Continued use of Existing Business Forms and Records and Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Corporate Bank Accounts and Cash Management System Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 17 Emergency Motion to Reject Executory Contract , 18 Emergency Motion to Reject Lease , 19 Application to Employ Haynes and Boone, LLP as Counsel to the Debtors and Declaration of Kenric D. Kattner in Support of Application and Proposed Order [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 20 Application to Employ Berger Singerman, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Declaration of Jordi Guso in Support of Application and Proposed Order [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 21 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 22 Emergency Motion to Approve Stipulation Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1110). Redaction Request Due By 07/21/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 08/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 08/16/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2010. .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-F-05) (LaCoursiere, Chris) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 6/10/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 18 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Debtor Gulfstream Crane, LLC., 65 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection and, Motion For Turnover Of Property, 75 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection and, Motion For Turnover Of Property, 83 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation., 113 Verified Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor U.S. Bancorp Equipment Finance, Inc.., 162 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $150], or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Payments Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Equipment Finance, Inc., 209 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Administrative Expenses Filed by Creditor SL Financial Services Corporation. *This Replaces de # 207*, 277 Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $150] Filed by Creditor Bank Midwest, N.A..). Redaction Request Due By 06/23/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 07/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 07/19/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/14/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 1/14/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 9 Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Existing Business Forms and Records, Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts , Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Section 345 Investment Guidelines Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 29 Motion for Order Approving Asset Purchase Agreement with Arch Glass Acquisition Corporation, An Affiliate of Grey Mountain Partners, Motion to Sell All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear and for Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Asset Purchase Agreement with Arch Glass Acquisition Corporation, Motion to Establish Procedures for the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests, Application for Order Authorizing the Debtors to Provide Certain Stalking Horse Bid Protections, Motion to Set Hearing to Consider the Approval of and Approving the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, Motion to Assume Executory Contract and Unexpired Leases at the Sale Hearing, Motion to Limit Notice and for Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Connection Therewith and Granting Related Relief Filed by Interested Parties AAG Holdings, Inc., AWP, LLC, Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Arch Aluminum, L.C., Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc..., 142 Emergency Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105 And 365, 150 Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 364, 169 Application to Employ Hunton & Williams LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to December 15, 2009 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors., 170 Application to Employ Conway MacKenzie, Inc. as Financial Advisors and Investment Bankers to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to December 19, 2009 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors., 171 Application to Employ Freeborn & Peters LLP as Special Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to December 15, 2009 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Creditor Committee Committee of Creditors., 176 Motion for Adequate Assurance of Future Payments Filed by Creditor Fort Pierce Utilities Authority., 204 Expedited Application to Employ Kohner Mann & Kailas, S.C. as Special Collections Counsel EXPEDITED HEARING REQUESTED FOR JANUARY 14, 2010 [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Interested Parties AAG Holdings, Inc., AWP, LLC, Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Arch Aluminum, L.C., Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 02/3/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/1/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/27/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Motion to Assume/Reject (Re: 276 Emergency Motion For Entry Of Order) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document Filed was Incorrectly Linked. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 280 ) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 0:10-ap-2631 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Corrective Entry (Re: 253 ***DISREGARD; ENTERED IN ERROR.*** Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: The attorney's name on the certificate of service does not match the CM/ECF login code. THE E-FILER IS DIRECTED TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2002-1.) (Cradic, Cameron) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document Under Seal. (Assigned ID Number: 10-F-01) (LaCoursiere, Chris) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DISREGARD; ENTERED IN ERROR.*** Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: The attorney's name on the certificate of service does not match the CM/ECF login code. THE E-FILER IS DIRECTED TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2002-1(G). (Re: 251 Certificate of Service Filed by Noticing / Claims Agent The Garden City Group, Inc.) (Rodriguez, Marcelo) Modified on 8/6/2010 - edited text (Cradic, Cameron). (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (^UST13, DD) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 9/7/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 193 Emergency Motion to Approve the Debtors Selection of JW Acquisition, Inc. as the Party Submitting the Highest and Best Offer for the Acquisition of the Debtors Business Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 194 Expedited Motion to Compromise Controversy with Arrow Air, Inc. and LAN Cargo, S.A. and Prime Airport Services, Inc. Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 09/20/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 10/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 10/14/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/13/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Party Filer Selected. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - IN THE FUTURE WHEN DOCKETING APPLICATIONS FOR COMPENSATION IN THE CM/ECF SYSTEM THE NAME OF THE ATTORNEY AND/OR PROFESSIONAL MUST BE ENTERED IN ORDER FOR FEES TO BE AWARDED. NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 223 First Interim Fee Application for Compensation of Arent Fox, LLP as Counsel for Creditor Committee, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 1/28/2010 to 4/30/2010, Fee: $378,848.00, Expenses: $5,241.83. Filed by Creditor Committee Creditor Committee.) (Weldon, Melva) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of 12/17/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral , Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 9 Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Existing Business Forms and Records, Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts , Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Section 345 Investment Guidelines Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 12 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Sales Taxes and Other Related Pre-Petition Tax Obligations [Expedited Relief Requested] Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 15 Emergency Application to Employ Paul J. Battista and the Law Firm of Genovese Joblove & Battista, P.A. as Counsel to Debtors-in-Possession [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 16 Emergency Application to Employ Piper Jaffray & Co. as Investment Bankers for the Debtors-in-Possession [Affidavit Attached], Motion to Approve Proposed Fee Structure in Connection Therewith Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 17 Emergency Application to Employ Vincent J. Colistra and PMCM, LLC as Chief Restructuring Officer [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 18 Motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Expense Reimbursement of Professionals Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 28 Emergency Application to Employ Joseph J. Devine and the Law Firm of Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP as Special Corporate Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Interested Parties AAG Holdings, Inc., AWP, LLC, Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Arch Aluminum, L.C., Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 29 Motion for Order Approving Asset Purchase Agreement with Arch Glass Acquisition Corporation, An Affiliate of Grey Mountain Partners, Motion to Sell All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear and for Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Asset Purchase Agreement with Arch Glass Acquisition Corporation, Motion to Establish Procedures for the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests, Application for Order Authorizing the Debtors to Provide Certain Stalking Horse Bid Protections, Motion to Set Hearing to Consider the Approval of and Approving the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, Motion to Assume Executory Contract and Unexpired Leases at the Sale Hearing, Motion to Limit Notice and for Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Connection Therewith and Granting Related Relief Filed by Interested Parties AAG Holdings, Inc., AWP, LLC, Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Arch Aluminum, L.C., Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc..., 90 Motion to Establish Procedures for the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals in the Ordinary Course of Business Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [EMERGENCY RELIEF REQUESTED] Filed by Interested Parties AAG Holdings, Inc., AWP, LLC, Arch Aluminum and Glass International, Inc., Arch Aluminum, L.C., Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 01/20/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 02/16/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/13/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Corrective Entry to edit docket text (Re: 214 Objection to 29 Motion for Order Approving Asset Purchase Agreement) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of 12/30/2009 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral , Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 9 Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Existing Business Forms and Records, Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts , Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Section 345 Investment Guidelines Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 11 Emergency Motion For Continuation of Utility Service and to Determinate Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by Debtor Arch Aluminum & Glass Co., Inc.., 149 Motion to Reconsider, 150 Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 364). Redaction Request Due By 01/20/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 02/16/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/13/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Haas, Ellen) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete Entry. Pleading Filed Requests two Separate Reliefs. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Motion for Adequate Protection and Motion for Administrative Expense (Re: 207 Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor SL Financial Services Corporation.) (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 152 Transcript of 3/29/2010 Hearing Redaction Request Due By 04/14/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/10/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/6/2010. ., 153 Transcript of 3/29/2010 Hearing ., 154 Transcript of 3/25/2010 Hearing .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pursuant to Local Rule 5005-1(2)(b) and Court Guidelines on Electronic Availability of Transcripts and Procedures for Transcript Redaction, Transcript is now electronically accessible (Re: 114 Transcript of 3/10/2010 Hearing ., 115 Transcript of 3/11/2010 Hearing .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Request for Notice; Located Under "Other" (Re: 194 Motion for Judicial Notice Filed by Debtor Gulfstream Crane, LLC.) (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of 3/25/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1039], 9 Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and for Authority to Continue Use of Existing Business Forms and for Extension of Time to Comply with 11 U.S.C. Section 345 Investment Guidelines Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc.., 12 Motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Professionals Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc.., 17 Emergency Motion to Authorize Debtors to Pay Prepetition Critical Vendor Claims Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc.., 18 Emergency Motion of the Debtors-in-Possession for Interim and Final Orders Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc., 25 Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 364, 84 Application to Employ Barry P. Gruher, Esq. and the Law Firm of Genovese Joblove & Battista, P.A. as Counsel for the Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Creditor Committee Creditor Committee., 85 Motion to Approve /Evolution Lighting, LLC's Motion to Credit Bid Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363, 95 Expedited Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc.., 100 Emergency Motion for Authority to Enter Into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc.., 106 Limited Objection to, 107 Limited Objection to, 111 Objection to). Redaction Request Due By 04/14/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/10/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/6/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 3/29/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 25 Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to Sections 364, 85 Motion to Approve /Evolution Lighting, LLC's Motion to Credit Bid Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363, 106 Limited Objection to, 107 Limited Objection to, 111 Objection to). Redaction Request Due By 04/14/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/10/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/6/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of 3/29/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users]. Redaction Request Due By 04/14/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/28/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/10/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/6/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (^UST13, DD) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 3/11/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 21 Emergency Motion to Approve Asset Purchase Agreement with Evolution Lighting, LLC, an Affiliate of Boyne Capital Partners, Inc., Establishing Bidding Procedures for the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests, Authorizing the Debtors to Provide Certain Stalking Horse Bid Protections, Scheduling a Hearing to Consider the Approval of and Approving the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases at the Sale Hearing, Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Connection Therewith and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 04/1/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/26/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/23/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of 3/10/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 21 Emergency Motion to Approve Asset Purchase Agreement with Evolution Lighting, LLC, an Affiliate of Boyne Capital Partners, Inc., Establishing Bidding Procedures for the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests, Authorizing the Debtors to Provide Certain Stalking Horse Bid Protections, Scheduling a Hearing to Consider the Approval of and Approving the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases at the Sale Hearing, Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Connection Therewith and Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor Catalina Lighting, Inc..). Redaction Request Due By 04/1/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/26/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/23/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. Objection to Confirmation of the Plan is used when Objecting to the Plan only. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Objection and Link to the Disclosure Statement (Re: 111 Objection to Confirmation of) (Leonard, Dawn) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: SCANNING IN COLOR IS NOT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO CLERK'S GUIDELINES FOR SCANNING DOCUMENTS. IN THE FUTURE PLEASE SCAN YOUR DOCUMENTS IN BLACK AND WHITE. THE COURT HAS NOT CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 101 Emergency Motion to Approve Amended and Restated Asset Purchase Agreement Between Debtors and Protective Products Enterprises, Inc., and Grant Related Relief Filed by Debtor Protective Products of America, Inc.) . (Aarons, Micheline) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: SCANNING IN COLOR IS NOT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO CLERK'S GUIDELINES FOR SCANNING DOCUMENTS. IN THE FUTURE PLEASE SCAN YOUR DOCUMENTS IN BLACK AND WHITE. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. (Re: 100 Notice of Filing Redlined Amended and Restated Asset Purchase Agreement, Filed by Debtor Protective Products of America, Inc..) (Aarons, Micheline) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of 7/2/2010 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 14 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Administrative Order Establishing Procedure for Monthly and Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 15 Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing a Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim and Proofs of Interest Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 16 Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Continued use of Existing Business Forms and Records and Authorizing Maintenance of Existing Corporate Bank Accounts and Cash Management System Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 17 Emergency Motion to Reject Executory Contract , 18 Emergency Motion to Reject Lease , 19 Application to Employ Haynes and Boone, LLP as Counsel to the Debtors and Declaration of Kenric D. Kattner in Support of Application and Proposed Order [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 20 Application to Employ Berger Singerman, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Declaration of Jordi Guso in Support of Application and Proposed Order [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 21 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.., 22 Emergency Motion to Approve Stipulation Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1110). Redaction Request Due By 07/21/2010. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 08/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Due by 08/16/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/12/2010. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Selected Event Does Not Match PDF Image. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT EVENT: Final Report of Estate (Ch.11); FOUND UNDER CATEGORY: Other. (Re: 90 Notice of Filing Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree Closing Case, Filed by Debtor SystemOne Technologies Inc). (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Selected Event Does Not Match PDF Image. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT EVENT: Debtor in Possession Report, (Re: 83 Notice of Filing Debtor's Monthly Operating Report for the Period from February 1, 2010 to February 28, 2010, Filed by Debtor SystemOne Technologies Inc). (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Case Management Summary (Re: 71 **REDOCKETED AS DE #80** Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures Filed by Debtor Medical Staffing Network Holdings, Inc.) (Manboard, Sandra) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Corrective Entry to edit docket text (Re: 71 Certificate of Service Supplemental by Attorney Heather L Harmon Esq .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors [found in the Notices menu] (Re: 61 Notice of Filing) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Corrective Entry to edit docket text (Re: 66 Interim Order Granting Application to Employ Piper Jaffray & Co. As Investment Bankers .) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Set Status Conference (Re: 62 Expedited Motion for Status Conference Filed by Debtor Protective Products of America, Inc..) (Weldon, Melva) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect and Incomplete Events Used. Redocketed to Reflect Correct Events and Multiple Relief THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use Both: Employ and Payment of (Re: 46 Motion Authorizing Debtors to Employ and Compensate Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.. .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Use: Pre-Petition Wages (Re: 45 Motion to Pay Prepetition Qualified Employee Expense Reimbursements Filed by Debtor Arrow Air, Inc.. .) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Corrective Entry To Reflect Notice Regenerated on 3/4/10 To Include Creditors. (Re: 33 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/1/2010 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/1/2010. Proofs of Claim due by 6/30/2010. .) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Corrective Entry to Copy Images of Schedules from DE#44 to DE#42 (omitted on initial upload) (Re: 42 Amended Summary of Schedules,Schedule F, Filed by Debtor Vision Care Holdings, LLC. ., 44 Filed by Debtor Vision Care Holdings, LLC.) (Floyd, Mike) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Corrective Entry *This Entry Contains Two Notices, Notice #1 Has Been Restricted From Public Viewing, Notice #2 is Avaialable to All Parties* (Re: 30 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 1/7/2010 at 01:30 PM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 411, Fort Lauderdale. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 3/8/2010. Proofs of Claim due by 4/7/2010.) (Montygierd, Hebe) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document filed was not accompanied by the Local Form Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE APPROPRIATE **Declaration Re: Electronic Filing** AND CORRECTLY LINK TO THE AMENDED DOCUMENT WITHIN FIVE BUSINESS DAYS. FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL RESULT IN THIS PAPER BEING STRICKEN. (Re: 33 ) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Trustee's Request for Entry of Order Confirming Chapter 13 First Amended Plan After Confirmation Hearing [Confirmation Hearing Date: 5/17/2007] Filed by Trustee Robin R Weiner. (^Weiner3, Robin) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST13, DD) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The information required by 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) as provided by the debtor(s) in this case is complete to the satisfaction of the trustee. No creditor or other party in interest has filed a request for an order of dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i)(2) and the trustee does not believe that this case is subject to automatic dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i). (^Weiner6, Robin) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 340 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?