TradeWinds Airlines, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 08-ap-01546
District Judge A. Jay Cristol, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2021 at 11:09 AM ST (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barry E Mukamal, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn Maynard Gollin, Esq. +1 305 668 4433 +1 305 428 5319 lgollin@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jennifar M Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifar M Hill +1 305 539 2450 +1 305 536 1116

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robin J Rubens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin J Rubens +1 305 536 1112 +1 305 536 1116

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine, Kellogg, Lehman, Schneider & Grossman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Lehman, Esq. +1 305 403 8788 +1 305 403 8789 trl@lkllaw.com
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Tradewinds Airlines, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Z. Jones, Esq. +1 305 375 6160 +1 305 374 7593 jjones@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine, Kellogg, Lehman, Schneider & Grossman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Lehman, Esq. +1 305 403 8788 +1 305 403 8789 trl@lkllaw.com
Citation Section ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Attachments U.S.C. § #
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 835 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Bruce J. Ressler Fee Amount $75 Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc.. (Bloom, Mark) Modified on 5/19/2017 -to match pdf (Eisenberg, Randy). (Entered: 05/19/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Ellen R. Werther Fee Amount $75 Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc.. (Bloom, Mark) Modified on 5/19/2017 -to match pdf (Eisenberg, Randy). (Entered: 05/19/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian G Rich (Re: 784 Notice of Hearing). (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Certificate of Service by Attorney Brian G Rich (Re: 782 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice, 783 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice). (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Hearing (Re: 776 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $181] Filed by Creditor Soros Fund Management LLC.) Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re: # 778) (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re: # 777) (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Certificate of Contested Matter Filed by Interested Party Soros Fund Management, LLC (Re: 776 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $181] filed by Creditor Soros Fund Management LLC). (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Objection to (776 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $181] filed by Creditor Soros Fund Management LLC) Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc. (Bloom, Mark) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Response and Objection to (776 Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $181] filed by Creditor Soros Fund Management LLC) Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) (Gollin, Lynn) Modified on 5/17/2017 - minor text edit (Adam, Lorraine). (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Martin Klotz Fee Amount $75 Filed by Interested Party Soros Fund Management, LLC. (Rich, Brian) Modified on 5/15/2017-to match pdf (Eisenberg, Randy). (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Arthur Biller Fee Amount $75 Filed by Interested Party Soros Fund Management, LLC. (Rich, Brian) Modified on 5/15/2017 -to match pdf (Eisenberg, Randy). (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion for Relief from Stay [Negative Notice] [Fee Amount $181] Filed by Creditor Soros Fund Management LLC. (Rich, Brian) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 774 Order Granting Motion To Clarify Re: 770) Notice Date 02/02/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order Granting Motion To Clarify Re: # 770 (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 772 Notice of Hearing (Re: 770 Violet Elizabeth Grayson Motion for Clarification of Order of February 2, 2016. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 02/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 01/28/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Hearing (Re: 770 Violet Elizabeth Grayson Motion for Clarification of Order of February 2, 2016. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 02/21/2017 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Certificate of Service Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson (Re: 769 Notice of Filing filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson, 770 Motion for clarification filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson). (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Violet Elizabeth Grayson Motion for Clarification of Order of February 2, 2016. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice of Filing Declaration of Violet Elizabeth Grayson in Support of Motion For Clarification, Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Order Denying Motion To Reconsider Setting Briefing Schedule # 717 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent or Motions to Request Redaction of Transcript. (Re: 766 Transcript of 7/27/2016 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 749 Summary of Amended First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment Compensation to Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document), 759 Objection to (749 Application for Compensation for Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson) Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc.). Redaction Request Due By 08/19/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 09/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 09/12/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/10/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin)) Redaction Request Due By 8/19/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 9/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 9/12/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/10/2016. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Transcript of 7/27/2016 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 749 Summary of Amended First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment Compensation to Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document), 759 Objection to (749 Application for Compensation for Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson) Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc.). Redaction Request Due By 08/19/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 09/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 09/12/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/10/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 763 Order on Motion to Amend Application, Order on Application to Employ). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Trustee's Interim Report. The trustee has submitted to the Office of the United States Trustee an interim report for the period ending 06/30/2016. The interim report provides information concerning asset administration and an accounting of the financial activity in the case. (Mukamal, Barry) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Order Approving Trustee's Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(E), 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser, LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. (Applicants) as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis (Re: # 755), Granting Application to Employ Brian Glasser and Nathan Duggins (Re: # 755) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate of Service [Amended Certificate of Service] by Attorney Scott M. Grossman Esq. (Re: 759 Objection filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc.). (Grossman, Scott) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice of Filing Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Verified Reply in Spport of Fee Application, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 759 Objection, 760 Objection). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Verified Reply in Support of Fee Application) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Objection to (749 Application for Compensation for Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson) Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Objection to (749 Application for Compensation for Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson) Filed by Creditor Coreolis Holdings, Inc. (Grossman, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 755 Amended Application (752 Motion Application Pursuant to U.S.C. 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingenc filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal, Application to Employ Nathan Duggins and Brian Glasser as Special Litigation Counsel [Affidavit Attached], 756 Notice of Hearing). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 756 Notice of Hearing (Re: 755 Amended Application (752 Motion Application Pursuant to U.S.C. 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis ) , Application to Employ Nathan Duggins and Brian Glasser as Special Litigation Counsel [Affidavit Attached] [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E)) Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2016 at 11:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 07/01/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/02/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice of Hearing (Re: 755 Amended Application (752 Motion Application Pursuant to U.S.C. 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis ) , Application to Employ Nathan Duggins and Brian Glasser as Special Litigation Counsel [Affidavit Attached] [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E)) Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2016 at 11:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Amended Application (752 Motion Application Pursuant to U.S.C. 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis ) , Application to Employ Nathan Duggins and Brian Glasser as Special Litigation Counsel [Affidavit Attached] [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 752 Miscellaneous Application). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by (Re: 543 Order on Motion To Limit Notice). (Grimm, Carmela) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Motion Application Pursuant to U.S.C. 328 for Authority to Employ Brian Glasser of the Law Firm of Bailey & Glasser LLP and Nathan Duggins of the Law Firm of Tuggle Duggins, P.A. as Special Litigation Counsel on a Contingency Fee Basis Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contingency Fee Agreement # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Nathan Duggins # 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian Glasser # 4 Exhibit Brian Glasser's personal biography # 5 Exhibit Tillman Breckenridge's personal biography) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 750 Notice of Hearing (Re: 749 Summary of Amended First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment Compensation to Violet Elizabeth Grayson , Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Attachments: # 1 Main Document)) Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2016 at 11:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 06/24/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/26/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Notice of Hearing (Re: 749 Summary of Amended First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment Compensation to Violet Elizabeth Grayson , Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Attachments: # 1 Main Document)) Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2016 at 11:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Summary of Amended First Interim Application for Allowance and Payment Compensation to Violet Elizabeth Grayson , Special Counsel, Period: 2/27/2008 to 6/15/2016, Fee: $725150.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Attachments: # 1 Main Document) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 747 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Order Approving Agreement To Compromise Controversy With Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Former Special Litigation Counsel to The Trustee (Re: # 740) (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 745 Clerk's Notice Re: Report of Judicial Settlement Conference Signed By Honorable Laurel Myerson Isicoff) Notice Date 05/19/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Clerk's Notice Re: Report of Judicial Settlement Conference Signed By Honorable Laurel Myerson Isicoff (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 740 Motion to Compromise Controversy with Violet Elizabeth Grayson filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal, 742 Trustee's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Notice the Hearing to Ten Days on Motion to Approve Agreement to Compromise Controversy with Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Former Special Litigation Counsel to the Trustee filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal, 743 Order Shortening Time). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Notice of the Hearing to Ten Days on the Chapter 7 Trustees Motion to Approve Agreement to Compromise Controversy With Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Former Special Litigation Counsel to theTrustee (Re: #742) Re: #740Hearing scheduled for 05/23/2016 at 11:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) Modified on 5/23/2016**To correct time** (Skinner-Grant, Sheila). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Trustee's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Notice the Hearing to Ten Days on Motion to Approve Agreement to Compromise Controversy with Violet Elizabeth Grayson, Former Special Litigation Counsel to the Trustee Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 739 Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent or Motions to Request Redaction of Transcript. (Re: 738 Transcript of 3/16/2016 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson., 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal.). Redaction Request Due By 05/13/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 05/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 06/6/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/4/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin)) Redaction Request Due By 5/13/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 5/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 6/6/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/4/2016.) Notice Date 05/11/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Motion to Compromise Controversy with Violet Elizabeth Grayson [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent or Motions to Request Redaction of Transcript. (Re: 738 Transcript of 3/16/2016 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson., 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal.). Redaction Request Due By 05/13/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 05/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 06/6/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/4/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin)) Redaction Request Due By 5/13/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 5/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 6/6/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/4/2016. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Transcript of 3/16/2016 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson., 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal.). Redaction Request Due By 05/13/2016. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 05/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Due by 06/6/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/4/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 736 Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Order On Grayson's Application For payment and Trustee's Motion To Abate Hearing On Grayson's Application For payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule The Application for An Evidentiary hearing Order Setting Status Conference Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson. Status hearing to be held on 05/11/2016 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Declaration re: Reply to Grayson's Declarations in Opposition to Motion to Abate; and Supplement to Motion to Abate Hearing on Grayson's Application for Payment; or Alternatively Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Grayson Declaration in Opposition To Motion To Abate Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing , Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Grayson's Declaration Attaching Second Circuit Summary Affirmance) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Order Setting Procedures For Settlement Conference. Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 at 09:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Declaration re: of Violet Elizabeth Grayon in Opposition to Filed by Attorney Gordon & Rees LLP (Re: 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2014 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 160345) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Miscellanous Correspondence Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 2/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 727 Notice of Hearing (Re: 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal.) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 02/21/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 2/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 725 Notice of Hearing (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 02/20/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/21/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing (Re: 724 Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal.) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 723 Notice of Hearing (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.) Notice Date 02/18/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Motion to Abate Hearing on Violet Elizabeth Grayson's Application for Payment or Alternatively, Re-Schedule the Application for an Evidentiary Hearing and Set a Briefing Schedule [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing (Re: 722 Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson .) Hearing scheduled for 03/16/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Application For Payment and Declaration in Support Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 720 Order on Motion To Reconsider). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Order Denying Motion To Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Compel Dismissal of New York Action. # 716 (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 718 Notice of Filing filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing , Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.Violet Elizabeth Graysons Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration # 2 Exhibit 2.Violet Elizabeth Graysons Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Motion to Reconsider to set Briefing Schedule for Trustee's Motion for Recondsideration Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order on Motion to set Briefing Schedule for Trustee's Motion for Reconsideration) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Reconsider (Re: 714 Order on Motion to Compel) Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 714 Order on Motion to Compel). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Order Denying Emergency Motion To Compel Dismissal of New York Action Against the Trustee (Re: # 699) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent or Motions to Request Redaction of Transcript. (Re: 712 Transcript of 11/2/2015 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 699 Emergency Motion to Compel Violet Elizabeth Grayson to Dismiss Her State Court Action Filed in New York Asserting Claims Against the Trustee, his Professionals and Creditors in Violation of the Barton Doctrine [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)). Redaction Request Due By 12/8/2015. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 12/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Due by 01/4/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 02/29/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin)) Redaction Request Due By 12/8/2015. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 12/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Due by 1/4/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/29/2016. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of 11/2/2015 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: 699 Emergency Motion to Compel Violet Elizabeth Grayson to Dismiss Her State Court Action Filed in New York Asserting Claims Against the Trustee, his Professionals and Creditors in Violation of the Barton Doctrine [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)). Redaction Request Due By 12/8/2015. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 12/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Due by 01/4/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 02/29/2016. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing Order on Two Letter Motions Requesting Court to Stay its Determination of Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue and Requesting and Pre-Motion Conference on Plaintiffs Purported Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal as Well as Plaintiffs Response and Defendants Response, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Motion to Transfer Venue, Declaration and Memorandum in Support, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing Grayson Declaration Attaching Dismissal of Trustee Parties From New York State Court Action, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Declaration of Ellen Werther, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Opinion and Order and Judgment Entered by U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to (702 Declaration filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson) Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 704 Notice of Filing filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Trustee's Notice of Errata, Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 699 Motion to Compel). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson (Re: 702 Declaration filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson). (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Declaration re: Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson (Re: 697 Declaration filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson). (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal (Re: 699 Emergency Motion to Compel Violet Elizabeth Grayson to Dismiss Her State Court Action Filed in New York Asserting Claims Against the Trustee, his Professionals and Creditors in Violation of the Barton Doctrine filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal, 700 Notice of Hearing). (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing (Re: 699 Emergency Motion to Compel Violet Elizabeth Grayson to Dismiss Her State Court Action Filed in New York Asserting Claims Against the Trustee, his Professionals and Creditors in Violation of the Barton Doctrine [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)) Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2015 at 11:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency Motion to Compel Violet Elizabeth Grayson to Dismiss Her State Court Action Filed in New York Asserting Claims Against the Trustee, his Professionals and Creditors in Violation of the Barton Doctrine [cal] Filed by Trustee Barry E Mukamal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Gollin, Lynn) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson (Re: 697 Declaration filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson). (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Concerning Filing of Summons with Notice in New York State Court Filed by Special Counsel Violet Elizabeth Grayson . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Filed by Creditor John Marshall . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Trustee's Interim Report. The trustee has submitted to the Office of the United States Trustee an interim report for the period ending 06/30/2015. The interim report provides information concerning asset administration and an accounting of the financial activity in the case. (Mukamal, Barry) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Final Compensation and holdback $55,205.10 for John L. Heller, Accountant, Period: 4/11/2012 to 8/14/2014, Fee: $18,107.50, Expenses: $1,466.70. [cal] Filed by Accountant John L. Heller. (Heller, John) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing (Re: 95 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor TradeWinds Airlines, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2008 at 02:00:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1410, Miami. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Corrective Entry (Re: 81 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Thales Avionics, Inc); When Event was Originally Docketed, the Filed Date was Incorrect. The Filed Date has Been Corrected and no Further Action is Required (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing (Re: 13 Application to Employ, filed by Debtor TradeWinds Airlines, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2008 at 04:00:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1410, Miami. (Cargill, Barbara) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 365 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?