Rothstein Rosenfeldt Adler, PA
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-F-37
District Judge Raymond B. Ray, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aran Development Inc., Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Genovese, Esq +1 305 349 2300 jgenovese@gjb-law.com
No Logo Bonnie Barnett, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Genovese, Esq +1 305 349 2300 jgenovese@gjb-law.com
No Logo Roger Wittenberns,, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey R Sonn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R. Sonn +1 954 763 4700 +7631 763 763 1866 jsonn@sonnerez.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Genovese, Esq +1 305 349 2300 jgenovese@gjb-law.com
No Logo Universal Legal, Petitioning Creditor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Universal Legal
No Logo Herbert Stettin, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L Gay +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 dgay@bergersingerman.com
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
Space Charles H Lichtman +1 954 525 9900 +5232 523 523 2872 clichtman@bergersingerman.com
Space Isaac M Marcushamer, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 imarcushamer@bergersingerman.com
Space Paul Steven Singerman +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 singerman@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity GT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Genovese, Esq +1 305 349 2300 jgenovese@gjb-law.com
Space Jesus M Suarez +1 305 349 2300 jsuarez@gjb-law.com
No Logo Nayda I. Zepeda, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maylene Abad +1 954 965 6033 +1 954 965 2646 may6995@aol.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven D Schneiderman +1 305 536 7285 +1 305 536 7360 Steven.D.Schneiderman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rothstein Rosenfeldt Adler, PA, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
No Logo Santos R. Zepeda, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maylene Abad +1 954 965 6033 +1 954 965 2646 may6995@aol.com
Citation Section ,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Singerman, Paul) (Entered U.S.C. § 12/29/2009)
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
Trustee's Request for Entry of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Second Amended Plan After Confirmation Hearing [Confirmation Hearing Date: 2/18/2010] (^Weiner3, Robin) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
    The information required by 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) as provided by the debtor(s) in this case is complete to the satisfaction of the trustee. No creditor or other party in interest has filed a request for an order of dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i)(2) and the trustee does not believe that this case is subject to automatic dismissal pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(i). (^Weiner8, Robin) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 107 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?