First Foliage, L.C.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-27532
District Judge Laurel M Isicoff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 15, 2017 at 1:28 AM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Insurance for Agriculture, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by neilaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary R Irwin +1 305 949 7474 girwin@neilaw.com
No Logo CREDITOR COMMITTEE, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard J Berlin +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 hberlin@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CREDITOR COMMITTEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CREDITOR COMMITTEE
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debi Evans Galler, Esq +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 dgaller@bergersingerman.com
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jordi Guso, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso, Esq. +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340
No Logo Foremostco, Inc., Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Paul L Orshan, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul L. Orshan, Esq. +1 305 529 9380 +1 305 402 0777 plorshan@orshanpa.com
No Logo First Foliage, L.c., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Infante, Zumpano, Hudson & Miloch, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis Salazar, Esq. +1 305 503 2990 +1 305 774 5908 luis.salazar@izhmlaw.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ariel Rodriguez +1 305 536 7285 +1 305 536 7360 ariel.rodriguez@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit ,(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Attachments: #
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 1309 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Deposit of Unclaimed Funds in the Total Amount of [$ 45456.04] with the Clerk, United States Bankruptcy Court for Tropical Plants & Foliage 6800 Mt. Plymouth Road Apopka, FL 32712 in the amount of $ 885.56; OFE International Inc. 12100 SW 129th Court Miami, FL 33186-6421 in the amount of $ 863.67; Gempler's Po Box 5176 Janesville, WI 53547-5176 in the amount of $ 79.75; South Point Express 1272 SW 139th Place Miami, FL 33184 Vas Agricultural Supply, Inc. 17650 SW 232 St. Miami, FL 33170 in the amount of $ 15237.79; Braam Young Plants USA 579 Poets Square Fallbrook, CA 92028 in the amount of $ 675.30; Container Centralen, Inc. 1331 Green Forrest Drive, Unit 20 Winter Garden, FL 34787 in the amount of $ 27713.97; (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1266 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1265 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1274 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1273 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1272 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1271 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1270 Order on Objection to Claims). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Amended Final Order Granting Motion For Entry Of Order (A) Authorizing The Sale Of Various Default Final Judgment Pursuant To 11 USC 363; (B)Establishing Bidding Procedures And Auction; Sal Process; (C) Scheduling Auction And Sale Hearing; And (D) Approving The Sale To The Highest Bidder At The Auction (Re: # 1254) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Order Sustaining Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#60,#61,#62,#63 and #64 (Re: # 1218) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Order Sustaining Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#54,#55,#57 and #58 (Re: # 1217) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Order Sustaining Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#48,#49,#50,#51 and #53 (Re: # 1216) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Order Sustaining Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#43,#44,#45,#46 and #47 (Re: # 1215) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Order Sustaining Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#31,#34 and#36 (Re: # 1213) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Order Sustaining Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#24,#25,#26,#28 and #29 (Re: # 1212) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order Sustaining Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#19,#20,#21,#22 and #23 (Re: # 1211) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Order Sustaining Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)#12,#13,#16 and #18 (Re: # 1210) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Application for Final Compensation for Margaret J. Smith, Financial Advisor, Period: 7/1/2014 to 9/9/2016, Fee: $23,747.50, Expenses: $76.23. [cal] Filed by Financial Advisor Margaret J. Smith. (Barbee, Alan) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1264 Trustee's Notice of Abandonment filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Ex Parte Motion to Modify Final Sale Order Re: 1262 Order on Motion to Sell, Order on Motion to Establish Procedures [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 9/9/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Order Sustaining Trustees Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims No.37, No.38, and No.40 (Re: # 1214) (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Agreed Order Sustaining In Part Objection to Claims No.41 and No.42 (Re: # 1214). (Cancels Hearing scheduled for September 12, 2016 at 2:30 p.m.) (Covington, Katrinka) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Trustee's Notice of Intent to Abandon Balance of Settlement Payments with A & E Nursery, Inc. [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Certificate of Service by Attorney Nicole Grimal Helmstetter (Re: 1262 Order on Motion to Sell, Order on Motion to Establish Procedures). (Helmstetter, Nicole) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Final Order Granting Motion For Entry of Order (A) Authorizing The Sale of Various Default Final Judgments Pursuant to 11 USC 363(B) Establishing Bidding Procedures And Auction; Sale Process; (C) Scheduling Auction And Sale hearing; And (D) Approving The Sale To The Highest Bidder At The Auction (Re: # 1254) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1260 Notice of Hearing). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Hearing (Re: 1214 Eighth Objection to Claim of Kubota Credit Corporation [# 41], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 42] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin.) Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2016 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate of Contested Matter Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1214 Eighth Objection to Claim of AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial [# 37], Toyota Motor Credit Corporation [# 38], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 40], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 41], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 4 filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin). (Helmstetter, Nicole) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Certificate of Service by Attorney Jacqueline Calderin Esq. (Re: 1256 Order on Motion to Sell, Order on Motion to Establish Procedures, 1257 Order Shortening Time). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time to Notice Period for Order Authorizing Sale of Various Default Final Judgments (Re: #1255) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Order: (A) Authorizing The Sale of Various Default Final Judgments Pursuant To 11 USC 363, (B) Establishing Bidding Procedures And Auction; Sale Process; (C) Scheduling Auction And Sale Hearing; And (D) Approving The Sale To The Highest Bidder At The Auction (Re: # 1254). Sale And Auction Hearing on August 17, 2016 at 1:30pm pm (EST) at The United States Bankruptcy Court, 301 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 8, Miami, FL 33128 (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Notice Period for Motion for Order Authorizing Sale of Judgment [ECF# 1254] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Expedited Ex Parte Motion for Sale of Property (Various Default Final Judgments) pursuant to 11 USC 363 b. [No Fee Due], in addition to Motion to Establish Procedures to Bid and Auction Sale Process; Scheduling Auction and Sale Hearing; and Approving the Sale to the Highest Bidder at the Auction Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1249 Notice of Filing). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Adversary Case 1:12-ap-1500 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Bid on First Foliage LC Judgments Filed by Creditor Panorama Asset Recovery LLC . (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Objection to (1245 Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property Outside the Normal Course of Business filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin) Filed by Creditor Panorama Asset Recovery LLC (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Notice of Filing Competing Bid and Auction, Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1245 Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property Outside the Normal Course of Business). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1248 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1246 Order on Miscellaneous Motion, 1247 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Order Granting Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Allow Section 503(b)(9) Claim in the amount of $54,062.85 and Section 502(h) Claim in the amount of $15,000.00 for Valroy Liners, Inc Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. Re: # 1242 (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1246 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Order Allowing Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 9 of Vas Agricultural Supply, Inc., in the amount of $34,363.97 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. Re: # 1241 (Gutierrez, Susan) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Sale of Property Outside of the Normal Course of Business of Various Default Final Judgments [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1243 Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property Outside the Normal Course of Business). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        **WITHDRAWN AS PER DE #1244**Notice of Proposed Sale of Property Outside of the Normal Course of Business Various Default Final Judgments [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 7/8/2016 (Garcia, Nelly). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Allow Section 503(b)(9) Claim in the amount of $54,062.85 and Section 502(h) Claim in the amount of $15,000.00 for Valroy Liners, Inc. [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Spuches, Christopher) *Modified on 7/8/2016 To Add Verbiage* (Garcia, Nelly). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 9 of Vas Agricultural Supply, Inc., in the amount of $34,363.97 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Spuches, Christopher) *Modified on 7/8/2016 To Add Verbiage* (Garcia, Nelly). (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1239 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Allow Section 502(h) Claim for Container Centralen, Inc., in the amount of $62,500.00Re: # 1238 (Rios, Amber) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Ex Parte Motion to Allow Section 502(h) Claim for Container Centralen, Inc., in the amount of $62,500.00 [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1232 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1231 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1230 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1229 Order on Miscellaneous Motion). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1228 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Order Allowing Claim No. 56 of Helena Chemical Company, in the amount of $165,036.20 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case Re: 1227 (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Order Allowing Claim #33 of BWI Companies, Inc., in the amount of $517,252.48 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case Re: # 1226 (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Order Allowing Claim#11 of Diaz Family Nursery Inc in The Amount of $4,768.04 For Purpose of Distribution in The Chapter 7 Case Re: # 1225 (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Order Allowing Claim #2 of Harrell's in The Amount of $231,419.74 for Purpose of Distribution in The Chapter 7 Case Re: # 1224 (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion To Compromise Controversy With Ave Maria Nursery, LLC (Re: # 1164) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 56 of Helena Chemical Company, in the amount of $165,036.20 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 33 of BWI Companies, Inc., in the amount of $517,252.48 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 11 of Diaz Family Nursery, Inc., in the Amount of $4,768.04 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Motion to Allow Claim No. 2 of Harrell's, in the amount of $231,419.74 for Purpose of Distribution in the Chapter 7 Case [cal] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service Supplemental Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1217 Eleventh Objection to Claim of B & K Cuttings, Inc. [# 54], Foremostco [# 55], Opa-Locka Pallets [# 57], Almonte Reinsurance, LLC [# 58] [Negative Notice] filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Supplemental Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1211 Fifth Objection to Claim of Dyna-Gro Nutrition Solutions [# 19], John Greene Logistics Company [# 20], Dale Morris [#21], Tire Masters International, LLC [#22], Kerry's Nursery, Inc. d/b/a Twyford International [#23] < filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1221 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service Supplemental Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1210 Fourth Objection to Claim of Sheppard West, Inc. [# 12], Gempler's [# 13], Ceiba Nursery, Inc. [#16], White Sand Nurseries[#18] [Negative Notice] filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 6/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing of Clerk's Notice of Transfer of Claim and Deadline to Object (Re: 1219 AMENDED Transfer/Assignment of Claim [Fee Amount $25] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company To Argo Partners Filed by Argo Partners. (Argo Partners (MGold))) Notice Date 06/19/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Transfer/Assignment of Claim [Fee Amount $25] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company To Argo Partners Filed by Argo Partners. (Argo Partners (MGold)) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Twelfth Objection to Claim of American Express Bank FSB [# 60], American Express Bank [# 61], Omega Farms [# 62], Office Depot [# 63], Color Spot Nurseries Inc. [# 64] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Eleventh Objection to Claim of B & K Cuttings, Inc. [# 54], Foremostco [# 55], Opa-Locka Pallets [# 57], Almonte Reinsurance, LLC [# 58] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Tenth Objection to Claim of General Electric Capital Corporation [# 48], General Electric Capital Corporation [# 49], Syngenta Corp Protection Inc. [# 50], Tropical Plants & Foliage [# 51], Floral Plant Grower LLC [# 53] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Ninth Objection to Claim of American Honda Finance Corp. [# 43], GMAC Commercial Finance LLC [# 44], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 45], Florida Department of Revenue [# 46], Redland Farms Inc. [# 47] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Eighth Objection to Claim of AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial [# 37], Toyota Motor Credit Corporation [# 38], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 40], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 41], Kubota Credit Corporation [# 42] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Seventh Objection to Claim of OFE International Inc. [# 31], Bank of America, N.A. [# 34], Southern Refrigerated Transport Inc. [#36] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Sixth Objection to Claim of Carroll Fulmer Logistics Corporation [# 24], Genesis Products & Services, Inc. [# 25], G.I. Trucking Corp. [#26], Sunshine Horticulture, LLC [#28], Hampshire Farms [#29] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Fifth Objection to Claim of Dyna-Gro Nutrition Solutions [# 19], John Greene Logistics Company [# 20], Dale Morris [#21], Tire Masters International, LLC [#22], Kerry's Nursery, Inc. d/b/a Twyford International [#23] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Fourth Objection to Claim of Sheppard West, Inc. [# 12], Gempler's [# 13], Ceiba Nursery, Inc. [#16], White Sand Nurseries[#18] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 6/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 1207 Notice of Deficiency in Request for Transfer of Claim. Claim has been Reassigned to the Previous Claimant: Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company To Argo Partners (Deficient Request Attached)) Notice Date 06/12/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 6/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 1207 Notice of Deficiency in Request for Transfer of Claim. Claim has been Reassigned to the Previous Claimant: Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company To Argo Partners (Deficient Request Attached)) Notice Date 06/12/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Deficiency in Request for Transfer of Claim. Claim has been Reassigned to the Previous Claimant: Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company To Argo Partners (Deficient Request Attached) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Transfer/Assignment of Claim [Fee Amount $25] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: John Greene Logistics Company (Claim No. 20, To Argo Partners Filed by Argo Partners. (Argo Partners (MGold)) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Adversary Case 1:10-ap-3591 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary Case 1:12-ap-1508 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary Case 1:12-ap-1505 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary Case 1:12-ap-1497 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 1199 Order Granting Motion To Compromise Controversy With Opa-Locka Pallets Inc (Re: 1169)) Notice Date 05/13/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service by Attorney Christopher B Spuches (Re: 1199 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy). (Spuches, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion To Compromise Controversy With Opa-Locka Pallets Inc (Re: # 1169) (Rodriguez, Olga) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Omnibus Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin (Re: 1189 Objection to Claim, 1190 Objection to Claim, 1191 Objection to Claim, 1192 Objection to Claim, 1193 Objection to Claim, 1194 Objection to Claim, 1195 Objection to Claim, 1196 Objection to Claim, 1197 Objection to Claim). (Calderin, Jacqueline) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claim of American Express Bank FSB [# 60], American Express Bank [# 61], Omega Farms [#62], Office Depot [#63], Color Spot Nurseries Inc. [#64] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claim of B&J Cuttings, Inc. [# 54], Foremostco [# 55], Helena Chemicals Company [#56], Opa-Locka Pallets [#57], Almonte Reinsurance, LLC [#58] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claim of General Electric Capital Corporation [# 48], General Electric Capital Corporation [# 49], Syngenta Corp Protection Inc. [#50], Tropical Plants & Foliage [#51], Floral Plant Grower LLC [#53] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claim of American Honda Finance Corp [# 43], GMAC Commercial Finance LLC [# 44], Kubota Credit Corporation [#45], Florida Department of Revenue [#46], Redland Farms Inc. [#47] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claim of FedEx Customer Information Services [# 37], Toyota Motor Credit Corporation [# 38], Kubota Credit Corporation [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claim of OFE International Inc. [# 31], BWI Companies Inc [# 33], Bank of America [#34], Astra Supply Chair LLC [#35], Southern Refrigerated Transport Inc. [#36] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claim of Carroll Fulmer Logistics Corporation [# 24], Genesis Products & Services, Inc. [# 25], G.I. Trucking Corp. [#26], Sunshine Horticulture, LLC [#28], Hampshire Farms [#29] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claim of Dyna-Gro Nutrition Solutions [# 19], John Greene Logistics Company [# 20], Dale Morris [#21], Tire Masters International, LLC [#22], Kerry's Nursery, Inc. d/b/a Twyford International [#23] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 to edit verbiage (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Fourth Objection to Claim of Diaz Family Nursery, Inc [# 11], Sheppard West, Inc. [# 12], Gempler's [#13], Ceiba Nursery, Inc. [#16], White Sand Nurseries[#18] [Negative Notice] Filed by Trustee Jacqueline Calderin. (Calderin, Jacqueline) Modified on 5/4/2016 (Rodriguez, Olga). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Withdraw Claim by: Rural Community Insurance Services Re Claim Number: 59 Filed by Creditor Rural Community Insurance Agency, Inc. d/b/a Rural Community Insurance Services. (Kucera, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 446
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 292
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 285
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of 1/13/2011 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 204 Emergency Motion to Approve - Emergency Motion for Entry of). Redaction Request Due By 02/14/2011. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/10/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/9/2011. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of 1/31/2011 Hearing [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] (Re: 243 Emergency Motion to Compel Debtor to Comply with Bidding Procedures Order and Allow Costa Farms, LLC to Participate in the Bidding Process and Auction Filed by Interested Party Costa Farms, LLC., 244 Emergency Motion to Strike- Debtors Emergency Motion to Strike Costa Farms, LLCs Emergency Motion to Compel Debtor to Comply with Bidding Procedures Order and Allow Costa Farms, LLC to Participate in the Bidding Process and Auction 243 Motion to Compel - Debtors Emergency Motion to Strike Costa Farms, LLCs Emergency Motion to Compel Debtor to Comply with Bidding Procedures Order and Allow Costa Farms, LLC to Participate in the Bidding Process and Auction Filed by Debtor First Foliage, L.C..). Redaction Request Due By 02/14/2011. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 02/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Due by 03/10/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/9/2011. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 261
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 245
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 243
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 230
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST13, DD) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Document was not signed and/or was not accompanied by the Local Form Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE WITHIN FIVE BUSINESS DAYS. FAILURE TO COMPLY WILL RESULT IN THIS PAPER BEING STRICKEN. (Re: 90 Schedules Filed: [A, B, D, E, F, G, H and Statement of Financial Affairs] Filed by Debtor First Foliage, L.C.) (Benitez, Judy) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Event Used. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO REFILE PLEADING USING THE CORRECT EVENT "SCHEDULES/STATEMENTS/LISTS (AMENDMENTS)" Under the "Other" Category Please See "Clerks Instructions for Preparing, Submitting and Obtaining Service Matrices (CI-3)" Found on The Court's Website. Amended Schedules and Summary of Schedules and Filing Fee of $26.00 Need to be Submitted with this Filing (Re: 59 Notice of Compliance Filed by Debtor First Foliage, L.C.) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Re: 26 Order Setting Initial Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 07/22/2010 at 11:30 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1409, Miami.) (Sanabria, Noemi) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete Event. Redocketed to Reflect Multi Part Motion (Correct Events). THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Also Use: Extend Time (Re: 9 Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts - Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete Entry. Redocketed to Reflect Multi Part Motion. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS ENTRY - NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. In the Future, Also Use: Adequate Protection (Re: 8 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral - Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 361, 362 and 363 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 4001 and 9014 Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral and Granting Adequate Protection Filed by Debtor First Foliage, L.C..) (Antillon, Jackie) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 377 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?