I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-28834
District Judge Laurel M Isicoff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 4:36 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arrow Air Holdings Corp., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Singerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordi Guso +1 305 755 9500 +1 305 714 4340 jguso@bergersingerman.com
No Logo I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David W. Langley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Langley +1 954 356 0450 +1 954 356 0451
No Logo Marc P Barmat, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert C Furr, +1 561 395 0500 +1 561 338 7532
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 74 Order on Application to Employ, 75 Order on Application to Employ). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
    Order Granting Application to Employ Robert C. Furr (Re: # 53) (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
      Order Granting Application to Employ Alan R. Barbee as Accountant (Re: # 59) (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
        Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 59 Application to Employ Alan R. Barbee as Accountant [Affidavit Attached] filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat, 72 Notice of Hearing). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
          Notice of Hearing (Re: 59 Application to Employ Alan R. Barbee as Accountant [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat.) Hearing scheduled for 08/01/2013 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/28/2013, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case (Re: 69 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case (Re: 64). Dismissal Shall Be with 180 Days Prejudice [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00]) Notice Date 07/28/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
              Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 69 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case (Re: # 64). Dismissal Shall Be with 180 Days Prejudice [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 67 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                    Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Re: # 60) (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                      Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing July 24, 2013 9:30 a.m. by Attorney David W. Langley (Re: 64 Second Motion to Dismiss Case and Motion to Shorten Notice Provisions Expedited Hearing Request filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc., 65 Notice of Hearing). (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice of Hearing (Re: 64 Second Motion to Dismiss Case and Motion to Shorten Notice Provisions Expedited Hearing Request Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc..) Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2013 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                          Second Motion to Dismiss Case and Motion to Shorten Notice Provisions Expedited Hearing Request Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.. (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 60 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat, 61 Notice of Hearing). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/21/2013, Entered: None
                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (Re: 61 Notice of Hearing (Re: 60 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale.) Notice Date 07/21/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice of Hearing (Re: 60 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2013 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Robaina, Betty) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                  Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                    Application to Employ Alan R. Barbee as Accountant [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat (Re: 53 Ex Parte Application to Employ Robert C. Furr as Attorney [Affidavit Attached] filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat, 55 Notice of Hearing). (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Unavailability from July 26, 2013 to August 9, 2013 by Attorney David W. Langley. (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 52 Order Granting Application for Approval of Selection of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (Re: 50)) Notice Date 07/17/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Hearing (Re: 53 Ex Parte Application to Employ Robert C. Furr as Attorney [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat.) Hearing scheduled for 08/01/2013 at 09:30 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Taking Rule 2004 Examination Duces Tecum of I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc. on Thursday, July 25, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. Filed by Creditors Doris Freudman, RSAS, LLC, USA Express, Inc.. (Dubosar, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                Ex Parte Application to Employ Robert C. Furr as Attorney [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Trustee Marc P Barmat. (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Order Granting Application for Approval of Selection of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee (Re: # 50) (Weldon, Melva) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 48 Order Directing Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee.) Notice Date 07/13/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/14/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Ex Parte Application for Approval of Selection of Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee MARC BARMAT [Verified Statement of Trustee attached] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (^UST12, KES) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Notice Appointing Marc P Barmat as Chapter 11 Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Order Directing Appointment of Chapter 11 Trustee. (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Opposition Response to (42 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc., Motion to Enforce (Re: 41 Notice of Hearing) and Expedited Hearing Requested) Filed by Creditors Doris Freudman, RSAS, LLC, USA Express, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Dubosar, Howard) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Opposition Response to (40 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Expedited Hearing Requested filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.) and Motion to Terminate Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Creditors Doris Freudman, RSAS, LLC, USA Express, Inc. (Dubosar, Howard) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc. (Re: 43 Notice of Hearing). (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc. (Re: 41 Notice of Hearing). (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Hearing (Re: 42 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Case , in addition to Motion to Enforce (Re: 41 Notice of Hearing) and Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C)) Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 at 10:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Romano, Susan) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Renewed Motion to Dismiss Case , in addition to Motion to Enforce (Re: 41 Notice of Hearing) and Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Notice of Hearing (Re: 40 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc..) Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 at 10:00 AM at 299 E Broward Blvd Room 308 (RBR), Fort Lauderdale. (Gomez, Edy) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Expedited Hearing Requested Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.. (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of 5/1/13 to 5/31/13 Filed by Debtor I. Kushnir Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 # 2 Part 3) (Langley, David) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Case (Re: # 33). (Rodriguez, Amelia) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded (^UST13, DD) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge A. Jay Cristol added to case. Involvement of Judge Laurel M Isicoff Terminated as per Order in LEAD Case 10-28831, DE #37 (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?