Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc
Bankruptcy Case Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-47196
District Judge Erik P. Kimball, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the US Trustee"
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case (Re: 26 Order Dismissing Case with 180 Days Prejudice for Failure to File Chapter 11 Small Business Documents, [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] .) Service Date 01/07/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/08/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
      Order Dismissing Case with 180 Days Prejudice for Failure to File Chapter 11 Small Business Documents, [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
        Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexander J Kranz Esq. Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc. (Kranz, Alexander) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/25/2010, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 22 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Balance Sheet) Service Date 12/25/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/26/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/25/2010, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 21 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Retain Legal Representation) Service Date 12/25/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/26/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
              Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Balance Sheet (Re: # 19), Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Cash Flow Statement (Through Jan 3,2011). (Re: # 20) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Retain Legal Representation (Through Jan 3,2011). (Re: # 18) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                  Motion to Extend Time to Cash Flow Statement Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Replaces Entry #12) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                    Motion to Extend Time to File Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (replaces Entry #10) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                      Second Motion to Extend Time to Retain Legal Representation Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                        Schedules Filed: [ALL] Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                          Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Re: 14 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Retain Legal Representation) Service Date 12/17/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/18/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                              Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Retain Legal Representation (Re: # 7) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                Federal Income Tax Return of Debtor. [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                  Statement of Unavailability of Documents (Cash Flow Statement) Required for Small Business Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                    Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                      Statement of Unavailability of Documents (Balance Sheet) Required for Small Business Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc (Re: 2 Notice of Deficiency). (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                        List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                          Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                            Motion to Extend Time to Retain Legal Representation Filed by Debtor Norman Quintero Ministries, Inc . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by H Elizabeth Weller Filed by Creditor Dallas County. (Weller, H) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 4 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 1/14/2011 at 08:30 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 3/15/2011. Proofs of Claim due by 4/14/2011.) Service Date 12/11/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/12/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 1/14/2011 at 08:30 AM at 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 870, West Palm Beach. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 3/15/2011. Proofs of Claim due by 4/14/2011. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: 2 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 12/13/2010]. Deadline for Attorney Representation: 12/13/2010. List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Due: 12/13/2010.Corporate Ownership Statement due 12/13/2010.Chapter 11 Small Business Documents due by 12/13/2010. List of Equity Security Holders due 12/20/2010. Summary of Schedules due 12/20/2010. Schedule A due 12/20/2010. Schedule B due 12/20/2010. Schedule D due 12/20/2010. Schedule E due 12/20/2010. Schedule F due 12/20/2010. Schedule G due 12/20/2010. Schedule H due 12/20/2010.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 12/20/2010.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 12/20/2010. [Incomplete Filings due by 12/20/2010].) Service Date 12/08/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 12/13/2010]. Deadline for Attorney Representation: 12/13/2010. List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Due: 12/13/2010.Corporate Ownership Statement due 12/13/2010.Chapter 11 Small Business Documents due by 12/13/2010. List of Equity Security Holders due 12/20/2010. Summary of Schedules due 12/20/2010. Schedule A due 12/20/2010. Schedule B due 12/20/2010. Schedule D due 12/20/2010. Schedule E due 12/20/2010. Schedule F due 12/20/2010. Schedule G due 12/20/2010. Schedule H due 12/20/2010.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 12/20/2010.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 12/20/2010. [Incomplete Filings due by 12/20/2010]. (Rodriguez, Marcelo) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. (Rodriguez, Marcelo) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Space Space

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?