Arrival Star, Inc. v. Maersk Logistics USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-21046
District Judge James Lawrence King, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 3:23 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arrivalstar, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher & Weisberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Michael Weisberg +1 954 828 1488 +8289 828 828 9122 aweisberg@cwiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Conley +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 rconley@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Christopher Laney , +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 1471 laney@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 rnirojr@nshn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Robert Englander +1 813 227 8149 +1 954 524 5506 jenglander@shutts.com
No Logo Con-way Transportation Services, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Owens +1 650 843 7509

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dion M. Bregman +1 650 493 4935 +1 650 493 5556 dbregman@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Gray, IV +1 650 843 4000 +1 650 843 4001 agray@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Eduardo Leon +1 305 415 3000 +4153 415 415 3001 dleon@morganlewis.com
No Logo Maersk Logistics USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Martin Rosenberg +1 305 530 0050 +5300 530 530 0055 crosenberg@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick R McKelvie +1 202 662 5195 +1 202 778 5195 rmckelvie@cov.com
No Logo NYK Logistics (ETA), Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Heller,. +1 973 639 6973 +2973 297 297 3884

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M.H. Short +1 973 622 4444 +2973 297 297 3884 jshort@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Abraham Cohen +1 202 662 2088 +1 202 662 2190 jcohen@rdblaw.com
v.
No Logo Abf Freight System, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony C. Roth +1 202 467 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Eduardo Leon +1 305 415 3000 +4153 415 415 3001 dleon@morganlewis.com
No Logo Con-way Transportation Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Owens +1 650 843 7509

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dion M. Bregman +1 650 493 4935 +1 650 493 5556 dbregman@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Gray, IV +1 650 843 4000 +1 650 843 4001 agray@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek Eduardo Leon +1 305 415 3000 +4153 415 415 3001 dleon@morganlewis.com
No Logo Maersk Logistics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Swanson +1 202 662 6000 +6626 662 662 6291

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Martin Rosenberg +1 305 530 0050 +5300 530 530 0055 crosenberg@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Guyler White +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 JGWhite@cov.com

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Oppenheim Zebrak, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin B. Collins +1 202 962 4800
No Logo NYK Logistics (ETA), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Heller,. +1 973 639 6973 +2973 297 297 3884

Toggle Switch Represented by MACCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M.H. Short +1 973 622 4444 +2973 297 297 3884 jshort@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Abraham Cohen +1 202 662 2088 +1 202 662 2190 jcohen@rdblaw.com
No Logo Arrivalstar, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher & Weisberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Michael Weisberg +1 954 828 1488 +8289 828 828 9122 aweisberg@cwiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Conley +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 rconley@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Christopher Laney , +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 1471 laney@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 rnirojr@nshn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Robert Englander +1 813 227 8149 +1 954 524 5506 jenglander@shutts.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 0271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER of dismissal and order denying all pending motions as moot; regarding [63-1] dismissal stipulation, [62-1] dismissal stipulation, [61-1] dismissal stipulation ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 01/11/06) [EOD Date: 1/12/06] (bs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to defendant NYK Logistics (Americas), Inc. ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 1/9/06) [EOD Date: 1/10/06] (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/11/2006
      STIPULATION of dismissal by Arrival Star, Inc., Maersk Logistics USA (bs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
        STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. by Arrival Star, Inc., Con Way Transport (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant ABF Freight Systems, Inc. by Arrival Star, Inc., ABF Freight System (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 60 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of dismissal by Arrival Star, Inc., NYK Logistics (ETA) (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting [31-1] motion for William J. Heller and Jonathan M.H. Short to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 12/29/05) [EOD Date: 12/30/05] (bs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                ANSWER by Arrival Star, Inc. to [48-1] counter claim (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of disclosure pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 by NYK Logistics (ETA) (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
                    ANSWER by Arrival Star, Inc. to [37-1] counter claim (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
                      ANSWER by Arrival Star, Inc. to [36-2] counter claim (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 54 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
                        ANSWER by Arrival Star, Inc. to Counterclaims of ABF Freight Systems, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [52-1] motion for Sinan Utku to appear pro hac vice. ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 6/29/05) [EOD Date: 6/30/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/29/2005
                            MOTION by Maersk Logistics USA for Sinan Utku to appear pro hac vice (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Setting Jury trial for 9:30 8/7/06 before Judge James Lawrence King , and Setting calendar call for 2:00 8/3/06 before Judge James Lawrence King , and Set pretrial conference for 10:00 7/7/06 before Judge James Lawrence King , and Setting discovery deadline for 5/3/06 , and Set motion filing deadline for 5/8/06 ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 06/27/05) [EOD Date: 6/29/05] (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by NYK Logistics (ETA) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                  Preliminary Statement of patent claims to be asserted by Arrival Star, Inc. (dg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                    COUNTERCLAIM by NYK Logistics (ETA) against Arrival Star, Inc., (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for NYK Logistics (ETA) by Jonathan Cohen (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 6/15/05) [EOD Date: 6/16/05] (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Roderick R. McKelvie by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Kevin B. Collins by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Kurt G. Calia by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Keith A. Teel by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Alec P. Rosenberg by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of John G. White by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Peter A. Swanson by Maersk Logistics USA Re: [38-1] motion for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/15/2005
                                                        MOTION by Maersk Logistics USA (Attorney ) for Roderick R. McKelvie, Kurt G. Calia, Kevin B. Collins, Keith A. Teel, Alec P. Rosenberg, John G. White, Peter A. Swanson to appear pro hac vice (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                          COUNTERCLAIM by Con Way Transport against Arrival Star, Inc. (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by Maersk Logistics USA () against Arrival Star, Inc. (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Answer and affirmative defenses by ABF Freight System (Attorney ),; jury demand (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [33-1] motion for Anthony C. Roth to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on June 10,2005) [EOD Date: 6/13/05] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/10/2005
                                                                  MOTION by ABF Freight System (Attorney Robert Mark Brochin) for Anthony C. Roth to appear pro hac vice $75.00; 922299 (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Minutes of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Judge James Lawrence King on 6/8/05; Court Reporter Name or Tape #: Vicki Miller (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/29/2005
                                                                      Application by NYK Logistics (ETA) for William J. Heller and Jonathan M.H. Short to appear pro hac vice (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/8/2005
                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by Con Way Transport for David R. Owens to appear pro hac vice (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/8/2005
                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION by Con Way Transport for Andrew J. Gray to appear pro hac vice (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION by Con Way Transport for Dion M. Bregman to appear pro hac vice (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting motion for Dion M. Bregman to appear pro hac vice (motion not found on docket) ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 6/8/05) [EOD Date: 6/9/05] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [30-1] motion for David R. Owens to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 6/7/05) [EOD Date: 6/24/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Andrew J. Gray to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 6/7/05) [EOD Date: 6/24/05] (lk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certification of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Con Way Transport (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      Certification of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        Scheduling Report of Scheduling Meeting by Arrival Star, Inc., Maersk Logistics USA, ABF Freight System, NYK Logistics (ETA), Con Way Transport (tb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion to extend time to file scheduling report Reset answer due for 6/20/05 for NYK Logistics (ETA) ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on May 31, 2005) [EOD Date: 6/1/05] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION by NYK Logistics (ETA) (Attorney Michael P. Williams ) for special or limited appearance by Attorney , and to waive local counsel designation (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/31/2005
                                                                                              MOTION by Arrival Star, Inc. (Attorney ) to extend time to file scheduling report (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed for NYK Logistics (ETA) on 5/17/05 Answer due on 6/6/05 for NYK Logistics (ETA) (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [15-1] motion to extend time to respond to complaint ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 05/18/05) [EOD Date: 5/19/05] (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [12-1] motion to extend time to respond to complaint set answer due for 6/13/05 for ABF Freight System ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 05/17/05) [EOD Date: 5/18/05] (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/18/2005
                                                                                                      MOTION by Con Way Transport (Attorney Robert Mark Brochin) to extend time to respond to complaint (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting [13-1] motion to extend time to answer complaint ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 05/16/05) [EOD Date: 5/17/05] (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                          MOTION by Maersk Logistics USA (Attorney Charles Martin Rosenberg, Roderick R. McKelvie) to extend time to answer complaint (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                            MOTION by ABF Freight System (Attorney Derek Eduardo Leon) to extend time to respond to complaint (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Con Way Transport on 4/26/05 Answer due on 5/16/05 for Con Way Transport (bs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Raymond P. Niro, Raymond P. Niro, Jr., Fredrick Laney, Richard Conley, Matthew G. McAndrews to appear pro hac vice ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 04/29/05) [EOD Date: 5/2/05] (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed for ABF Freight System on 4/22/05 Answer due on 5/12/05 for ABF Freight System (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Maersk Logistics USA on 4/22/05 Answer due on 5/12/05 for Maersk Logistics USA (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Arrival Star, Inc. (Attorney ) for Raymond P. Niro, Raymond P. Niro, Jr., Fredrick Laney, Richard Conley, Matthew G. McAndrews to appear pro hac vice (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference for 10:00 6/8/05 before Judge James Lawrence King ( Signed by Judge James Lawrence King on 04/21/05) [EOD Date: 4/22/05] (sk, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for Con Way Transport (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for NYK Logistics (ETA) (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for ABF Freight System (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Maersk Logistics USA (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $250.00; RECEIPT # 533861; Magistrate Judge Barry L. Garber (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 380 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?