Smith (RESTRICTED FILER) v. Florida Department, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-14066
District Judge Kevin Michael Moore, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 12:09 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glenn C. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn C. Smith
v.
No Logo A. C. Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Jo Martin +1 561 350 3270 valerie.martin@myfloridalegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Monique E. L'Italien, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monique E. L'Italien +1 561 948 3000 ML'Italien@rosenandswitkes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana Elaine Quigley +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Dana_Quigley@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Officer Fulcher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana Elaine Quigley +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Dana_Quigley@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Officer A. Schultheiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana Elaine Quigley +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Dana_Quigley@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Officer C. Martens, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana Elaine Quigley +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Dana_Quigley@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Sergeant C. Thomas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Murdock, II +1 954 712 4600 +7124 712 712 4708 james.murdock@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Monique E. L'Italien, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monique E. L'Italien +1 561 948 3000 ML'Italien@rosenandswitkes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Jo Martin +1 561 350 3270 valerie.martin@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dana Elaine Quigley +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5102 Dana_Quigley@oag.state.fl.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (151) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) AFFIRMING judgment/order of the district court as to 129 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn C. Smith, 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Glenn C. Smith ; Date Issued: 5/7/10 ; USCA Case Number: 08-14236-GG (hh) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None
    Letter from the 11th Circuit directing the district court to recall the mandate and the opinion previously issued as mandate as to Glen C. Smith re 129 Notice of Appeal, 140 Notice of Appeal, USCA # 08-14236-GG (hh) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
      Appeal Record Returned from USCA (Miami/Records): Consisting of (2) Volumes of Pleadings, (2) Volumes of Transcripts and (1) Accordian Folder 129 Notice of Appeal, 140 Notice of Appeal, USCA # 08-14236-GG (hh) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) AFFIRMING judgment/order of the district court as to 129 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn C. Smith, 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Glenn C. Smith ; Date Issued: 4/7/10 ; USCA Case Number: 08-14236-GG (hh)(MANDATE RECALLED BY USCA ON 4/14/10) Modified on 4/20/2010 (hh). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 129 Notice of Appeal receipt of: COR/ROA date received by USCA 11/12/09 USCA number 08-14236-G (nc) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (Atlanta Office) Consisting of (2) Volumes of Pleadings, (2) Volumes of Transcripts and (1) Accordion Folder containing DE#'s 66 and 69 re 129 Notice of Appeal, 140 Notice of Appeal, USCA# 08-14236-G (jua) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE of Readiness transmitted to USCA re 129 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn C. Smith, 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Glenn C. Smith USCA# 08-14236-G (jua) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA pursuant to Appellant's August 31, 2009, Motion for Reconsideration/Re-examination of Procedural Status of Stay, which contains a request to strike No. 09-10962, is construed as a motion to dismiss No. 09-10962 without prejudice and is GRANTED. Appellant's motion for reconsideration is DENIED AS MOOT. This order does not affect No. 08-14236 re 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Glenn C. Smith; USCA Appeal# 08-14236-GG & 09-10962-GG (nc) (Entered: 10/10/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                  ORDER of USCA DENYING Appellants' request to return his "Notice" as acknowledgment that the filing fee for No. 09-10962 has been paid because there is no record of Appellant paying the filing fees as to 129 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn C. Smith. Appellant is directed to pay the appellate filing fee for No. 09-10962 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this appeal without further notice to Appellant if he fails to pay the appellate filing fee within the time allowed. USCA #08-14236-GG (amb) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                    ORDER of USCA DENYING the Appellants'request of this court to return his "Notice" as acknowledgment that the filing fee for No. 09-10962 has been paid because there is no record of Appellant paying the filing fees as to 140 Notice of Appeal, filed by Glenn C. Smith. Appellant is directed to pay the appellate filing fee for No. 09-10962 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this appeal without further notice to Appellant if he fails to pay the appellate filing fee within the time allowed. USCA #09-10962-GG (amb) Text Modified on 8/20/2009 (amb). (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FROM USCA re 140 Notice of Appeal, receipt of: NOA date received by USCA 02/17/2009 USCA number 09-10962-G (amb) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                        Amended NOTICE OF APPEALby Glenn C. Smith as to 128 Order, 138 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 125 Judgment, 136 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 127 Order on Motion for New Trial Within ten days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (abd) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on 6/10/2008 before Judge K. Michael Moore. Re: 129 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Official Reporting Service-Victoria Aiello, Phone: 954-467-8204 x1019. 1-19 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Form)(abd) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING 137 Motion for Relief from June 30, 2008 Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from June 30, 2006 Order 137 is DENIED for the reasons stated in this Court's Orders dated December 1, 2008 136 and June 30, 2006 128 . In light of the fact that this is Plaintiff's second motion for reconsideration of this Court's June 30, 2006, motion, no further motions for reconsideration on this matter will be entertained. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/17/2008. (rg1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for relief from June 30, 2008 order by Glenn C. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Paperless ORDER denying 135 Motion. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Relief (dkt # 135). Plaintiff seeks relief from this Court's Order dated June 30, 2008 (dkt # 128), which prohibited Plaintiff from petitioning to proceed in forma pauperis in any court of the United States in any civil action or appeal from a judgment in a civil action. Plaintiff contends that the Order violates his right to due process and infringes on his constitutional right to access the courts. The June 30, 2008, Order (dkt # 128) was entered pursuant to the express mandate of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Relief (dkt # 135) is DENIED. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/1/2008. (KMM) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Releif from 6/30/08 128 Order by Glenn C. Smith. (tas) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION the transcript order on 8/5/2008 has been filed. (abd) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Calendar Call for dates held on 5/29/2008 Hearing held before Judge K. Michael Moore, re 129 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Carly Horenkamp - phone number 305-523-5138 12 pages. (abd) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                        USCA Appeal Fees received by Glenn C. Smith re 129 Notice of Appeal, Filing Fee: $ 455.00 receipt number 985674 (abd) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                          TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Glenn C. Smith re 129 Notice of Appeal. Email sent to Court Reporter Coordinator. 5/29/2008, 6/10/2008, 6/11/2008 transcript. (abd) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Receipt of NOA Transmittal Letter from USCA on 7/28/2008 re USCA Case Number:08-14236-G for 129 Notice of Appeal filed by Glenn C. Smith. (abd) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Glenn C. Smith as to 128 Order, 125 Judgment, 127 Order on Motion for New Trial. Filing Fee: (FEE NOT PAID)(Check returned to defendant see letter attached) (abd) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Prohibiting Glenn C. Smith from Petitioning to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before any Court in the United States. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/27/08. (rg1) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying 126 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/26/08. (rg1) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for New Trial by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of the Sergeant Thomas and Captain Williams against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/16/2008. (ls) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Paperless ORDER denying as moot 122 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/13/8. (KMM) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Paperless ORDER denying as moot 94 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/13/8. (KMM) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Defendant's MOTION in Limine by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (L'Italien, Monique) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge K. Michael Moore: Jury Trial completed on 6/11/2008. Vicky Aiello, Court Reporter: Official Reporting Service- phone number 305-523-5635 (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                RELEASE OF EXHIBITS Trial exhibits (Defendants) released to Valerie Martin, Esquire (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Special JURY VERDICT Form. (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    Jury Notes. (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Court's Jury Instructions. (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Exhibit List re: trial held 6/10/08 and 6/11/08 before Judge Moore by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams, Fulcher, C. Martens, Jr, A. Schultheiss.. (cga) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge K. Michael Moore: Jury Trial begun on 6/10/2008. Court Reporter: Official Reporting Service- phone number 305-523-5635 (rg1) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            Exhibit List by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Trial Exhibit List)(Martin, Valerie) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying 111 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/6/08. (rg1) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Paperless ORDER denying 110 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/6/8. (KMM) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum for FDC Inmate Witnesses by Glenn C. Smith. (tp) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Trial for Critical Evidence Resolution in Pending Public Records Litigation by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 6/23/2008 (tp) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire Questions by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Martin, Valerie) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie Jo Martin on behalf of C. Thomas, A. C. Williams (Martin, Valerie) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge K. Michael Moore: Calendar Call held on 5/29/2008. Court Reporter: Carly Horenkamp- phone number 305-523-5138 (rg1) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying 105 Motion for Issuance and Service of Subpoenas for Inmate Witnesses. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/28/08. (rg1) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Issuance and Service of Subpoena by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE to 101 Order filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE/OBJECTION to 100 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 101 Order filed by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE.Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/9/08.(rg1) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER ADOPTING 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to place case on trial calendar.Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/7/08.(rg1) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER ADOPTING 91 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by A. C. Williams, C. Thomas, denying Plaintiff's 95 , 96 Motion for Sumary Judgment as supplemented and denying 88 Motion for Sanctions filed by Glenn C. Smith. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/23/08.(rg1) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Collateral Bad Act/Impeachment Evidence by Glenn C. Smith (ls) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE/OBJECTION to 92 Scheduling Order, filed by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to 90 Report and Recommendations by Glenn C. Smith. (ls) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RENEWED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 4/29/2008 (ls) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued for 5/29/08 (Miami) and 6/9/08 (Ft. Pierce). 92 Scheduling Order, Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/9/08.(rg1) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2008 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge K. Michael Moore. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2009 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge K. Michael Moore. Calendar Call set for 5/29/2009 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge K. Michael Moore.Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 4/9/08.(rg1) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE on 42 USC 1983 case Recommending 1) that the plaintiff's motion for sanctions (DE# 88) be denied; 2) that the defendants' joint motion for summary judgment (DE# 66) be GRANTED, IN PART, as to plaintiff's 1983 First Amendment claims for issuance of retaliatory disciplinary reports, and the related pendent state tort claim for malfeasance, and the defendants' motion (DE# 66)otherwise be DENIED, IN PART, as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims for excessive use of force, and the related pendent state tort claim for assault and battery; 3) that as to all claims and defendants the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, as supplemented (DE#s 68, 70), be DENIED; and 4) that the case remain pending against the defendants Sgt. Thomas and Captain Williams solely on the 1983 Eighth Amendment claims that they used excessive force against him at Martin Correctional Institution onAugust 1, 2005, and that the case also remain pending on the related state law claims of assault and battery against Thomas and Williams based on the same alleged uses of force which are the subject of his Eighth Amendment claims.. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2008.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 04/07/08.(tw) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Recommending that this case be placed on the trial calendar of the District Judge. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2008.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 04/07/08.(tw) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION for Sanctions filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions by Glenn C. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 60 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 84 Motion for Hearing, denying 86 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/4/08. (rg1) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration, objection to and appeal of re 83 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, Order on Motion for Judgment,, by Glenn C. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Glenn C. Smith (tb) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 80 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Glenn C. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the defendants motion for summary judgment for ten days from the date of this Order, the plaintiff has had a defacto extension of time to file his response and a motion to accept as timely filed, for the last two months, denying 82 Motion for ord to marshal to effect subpoena; it is the responsibility of the plaintiff to provide for service of subpoenas. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 12/18/07. (cz) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order of Marshal's Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena to Jennifer Hernandez by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration, Objection and Appeal directed to District Judge re 80 Order on 77 Motion for Court Order for Marshal to serve plaintiff's subpoenas. by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 77 Motion for Court Order for Marshal to serve plaintiff's subpoenas. The plaintiff must make his own arrangements for the serving of subpoenas. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/20/07. (cz) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 66 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Statement of: Pretrial by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Court order for Marshals service of subpoena by Glenn C. Smith. (cga) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to 66 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT In Opposition re 67 Statement of: Uncontested Facts in Support by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Pre-Trial Statement by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. Replies due by 11/1/2007. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition as to 67 Statement of Uncontested Facts in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. (ail) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER INSTRUCTING PRO SE PLAINTIFF CONCERNING RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/14/07. (tw) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDMENT/SUPPLEMENT to 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX to 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Appendix A# 2 Appendix B)(ail) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 10/24/2007 (ail) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of: Uncontested Facts in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams re 66 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. Responses due by 10/24/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index to Appendix# 2 Appendix Exhibits A - D# 3 Appendix Exhibits E - J# 4 Appendix Exhibits K - M)(Murdock, James) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Discovery by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (lk) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 58 Motion Enforce Duties to Clerk, denying 59 Motion for Contempt, denying 59 Motion for Sanctions, deferring ruling to the Honorable K. Michael Moore and it is recommended that it be denied 60 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 09/11/07. (tw) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, filed by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court pursuant to Federal Rule 28 USC Section 636(b)(1)(A) by Glenn C. Smith re 57 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, (pa) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (OBJECTION) to 57 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, filed by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 57 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,, by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Contempt against Clerk. MOTION for Sanctions against Clerk, by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 9/6/2007 (pa) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to enforce duties of Clerk by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 52 Defendants' Joint Motion, denying 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying as moot 56 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of pre-trial dates, all motions are due by 10/10/07, plaintiff's pre-trial is due by 10/24/07, and defendants pre-trial is due by 11/8/07. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 08/15/07. (cz) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time for pretrial deadlines; by Glenn C. Smith. (bs) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Glenn C. Smith. (bs) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Instruction to Filer: Originally filed as 52 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief; in the future select Motion to Continue (Pretrial Dates). (de) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Compliance with Court Order by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams re 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,, (Murdock, James) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Enlargement of Pretrial Dates re 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,,,,, 32 Scheduling Order, by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Clerk and Court of nonreceipt of Ordered subpoena, by Glenn C. Smith (pa) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 45 Motion Enforce Duties of Clerk to the extent that blank subpoenas shall be provided to the plaintiff contemporaneously to this order. It is the plaintiff's responsibility to serve the subpoenas. Further, granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is extended to 08/17/07. All other deadlines remain. This is a paperless order.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 07/17/07. (mb) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and extension of other pretrial deadlines set in the order of 1/11/07, by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 43 and granting 44 Motions by the defendants to take the plaintiff's deposition. The defendants are cautioned that this is an unrepresented plaintiff, and they must act accordingly. Further a copy of the deposition must be provided to the plaintiff. Ord granting 47 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. All dates entered in the pre-trial scheduling order are extended for sixty days from the dates entered in that order. This is a paperless order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 05/17/07. (cz) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time in re: Scheduling Pre-Trial Order, by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams of Filing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Murdock, James) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to enforce duties of Clerk by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Renewed Motion to Depose Incarcerated Plaintiff re 43 MOTION to Depose Incarcerated Plaintiff by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Depose Incarcerated Plaintiff by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (Murdock, James) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 37 plaintiff's motion for Hearing on his motion for summary judgment, and granting 38 Defendants' Motion to Strike plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff's motion relies only on a procedural issue, that the defendants have not filed a responsive pleading in this case, which is incorrect. Denying as moot 39 defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 38 to the summary judgment. This is a paperless order. Signed by Judge Patrick A. White on 03/07/07 (cz) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Docket Correction: Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; Should have selected additional relief: for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 38 MOTION to Strike re-dcoketed as 39 MOTION for Extension of Time (nt) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Instruction to Filer: Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; Should have selected additional relief: for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 38 MOTION to Strike (nt) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ALTERNATE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. (nt) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams. Responses due by 3/15/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Murdock, James) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hearing re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. (pa) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [STRICKEN by DE# 42] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Glenn C. Smith. Responses due by 3/6/2007 (pa) Modified to reflect "stricken" on 3/8/2007 (wc). (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams.(Murdock, James) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James D. Murdock, II on behalf of all defendants (Murdock, James) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADOPTING 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS . Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/15/07. (rg1) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SCHEDULING PRE-TRIAL DATES: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2007. Discovery due by 5/8/2007. Motions due by 6/12/2007. plaintiff's Pretrial Statement due by 6/26/07; Defendants' Pretrial Statement due by 7/10/07. Signed by Judge Patrick A. White on 1/11/07. (br) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to 30 Report and Recommendations by Glenn C. Smith. (dg) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denied as moot re 28 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Glenn C. Smith and Granted in part, 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by A. C. Williams,, C. Thomas,, Fulcher,, C. Martens, Jr., A. Schultheiss. See order for details Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2006. Signed by Judge Patrick A. White on 11/06/06. (tw) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Glenn C. Smith to [27-1] motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Glenn C. Smith (Attorney ) for relief of [13-2] order (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams, Fulcher, C. Martens Jr., A. Schultheiss to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [25-1] motion to extend time to serve response to Complaint ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 08/25/06) [EOD Date: 8/31/06] (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by C. Thomas, A. C. Williams, Fulcher, C. Martens Jr., A. Schultheiss (Attorney Dana Elaine Quigley) to extend time to serve response to Complaint (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed for C. Thomas, by serving Captain A.C. Williams on 8/8/06 Answer due on 8/28/06 for C. Thomas (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed for A. C. Williams on 8/8/06 Answer due on 8/28/06 for A. C. Williams (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Fulcher on 8/8/06 Answer due on 8/28/06 for Fulcher (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed for A. Schultheiss on 8/8/06 Answer due on 8/28/06 for A. Schultheiss (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed for C. Martens Jr. on 8/8/06 Answer due on 8/28/06 for C. Martens Jr. (cg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for A. Schultheiss (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for C. Martens Jr. (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for Fulcher (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for C. Thomas (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for A. C. Williams (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: service of process requiring personal service upon an individual (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 7/31/06) [EOD Date: 8/2/06] (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER adopting [6-1] report and recommendations dismissing Defendants Conner and Department of Corrections as parties for failure to stat a claim upon relief can be granted ( Signed by Judge K. M. Moore on 7/31/06) [EOD Date: 8/1/06] CCAP (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons for Officer C. Martens,Jr., Mailed on: May 3, 2006 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons for Officer Fulcher Mailed on: May 3, 2006 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to Officer A. Schultheiss Mailed on May 3, 2006 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to C. Thomas Mailed on: May 3, 2006 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service for summons as to A. C. Williams Mailed on: May 3, 2006, 30 days to file waiver. (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Glenn C. Smith to [6-1] report and recommendations (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRELIMINARY REPORT OF Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White Signed on 4/18/06 recommending that defendants Conner and Dept., of Corrections be dismissed as parties and the claim against defendants Thomas, Williams, Schulthesis, Martens and Fulcher remain pending. Case no longer referred. Objections to R and R due by 4/30/06 CCAP (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Permitting Plaintiff To Proceed Without Prepayment Of Filing Fee But Establishing Debt To Clerk Of $250; granting [2-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 3/14/06) Date: 3/16/06] (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT (Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 3/15/06) [EOD Date: 3/16/06] (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Order of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Patrick A. White, re: Administrative Order (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Glenn C. Smith to proceed in forma pauperis (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed; FILING FEE, ifp ; Magistrate Judge Patrick A White (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?