Bielansky, et al v. Salberg & Company, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:03-cv-80596
District Judge William J. Zloch, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge William J. Zloch
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Aaron K. Han, Plaintiff

Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Frank Bielansky, Plaintiff

Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
v.
No Logo April Green, Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Boullon Rodriguez +1 305 577 7045 +1 305 577 7001 cristina.rodriguez@squiresanders.com
No Logo Edward Steele, Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Boullon Rodriguez +1 305 577 7045 +1 305 577 7001 cristina.rodriguez@squiresanders.com
No Logo John F. Klecha, Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Boullon Rodriguez +1 305 577 7045 +1 305 577 7001 cristina.rodriguez@squiresanders.com
No Logo Salberg & Company, PA, Defendant

Represented by Conroy, Simberg, Ganon, Krevens, Abel, Lurvey, Morrow & Schefer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Blaker +1 561 697 8088 +6978 697 697 8664 jblaker@conroysimberg.com

Represented by DeMahy Labrador Drake & Payne, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/23/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Klein +1 305 443 4850 +4435 443 443 5960

Represented by DeMahy Labrador Drake Payne & Cabeza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/23/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pedro Louis DeMahy +1 305 443 4850 +1 305 443 5960 pdemahy@dldlawyers.com
No Logo The Singing Machine Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Boullon Rodriguez +1 305 577 7045 +1 305 577 7001 cristina.rodriguez@squiresanders.com
Other Parties
No Logo Aaron K. Han, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Arthur Nething, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Douglas K. Waddell, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

No Logo Heinz Bonde, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Barrett, Johnston & Parsley

Represented by Lee & Amtzis, P.L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Lee +1 561 981 9988 +9819 981 981 9980 lee@leeamlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc M. Umeda +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 notice@ruflaw.com
No Logo James Klarides, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo Larry Ellberger, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo Marc Bocciardi, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 pgeller@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Marc Gregoire, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com

Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +1 410 685 1300 piven@browerpiven.com

Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
No Logo Nicholas Wagenea, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Broad & Cassel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Siegel +1 305 373 9400 hmiller@broadandcassel.com
No Logo Robert De Angelis, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Lee & Amtzis, P.L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Lee +1 561 981 9988 +9819 981 981 9980 lee@leeamlaw.com
No Logo Theodore Klarides, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 954 847 4939 +1 954 627 6640 wsleavitt@mdwcg.com

Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo Tyson Michael Wetzel, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth J. Vianale +1 561 392 4750 +3924 392 392 4775

Represented by Vianale & Vianale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Prag Vianale +1 561 949 9100 +1 561 961 5191 jvianale@vianalelaw.com
No Logo April Green, Consol Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
No Logo Edward Steele, Consol Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
No Logo John F. Klecha, Consol Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
No Logo Singing Machine Company, Inc.,, Consol Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garry William O'Donnell +1 561 393 5660 +1 561 338 8698 godonnell@adorno.com

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [87-1] motion for entry of an order authorizing distribution of settlement fund and reimbursement of final administrative expenses {see order for details} ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 12/27/05) [EOD Date: 12/29/05] (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of law by All Plaintiffs in support of [87-1] motion for entry of an order authorizing distribution of settlement fund and reimbursement of final administrative expenses (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/27/2005
MOTION by All Plaintiffs for entry of an order authorizing distribution of settlement fund and reimbursement of final administrative expenses (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney by Frank Bielansky, Aaron K. Han (represent plaintiff as per attorney) (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT granting [74-1] motion of approval of settlement, plan of allocation and approval of application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/30/04) [EOD Date: 8/2/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of Final Hearing/Approval of Settlement held before Judge William J. Zloch on 7/30/04; Court Reporter Name or Tape Carl Schazleh (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 83 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing (exhibits "B" and "C" to the declaration) by All Plaintiffs (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS by Heinz Bonde, Robert De Angelis submitted in support of [81-1] motion for approval of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: None
DERIVATIVE counsels' application by Heinz Bonde, Robert De Angelis for approval of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Eric Lee, Esq. by All Plaintiffs in support of derivative counsels' [74-1] application for award of attorney fees and expenses (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of final approval of proposed settlement agreement (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [74-1] motion of approval of settlement, plan of allocation and approval of application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
COMPENDIUM of declarations submitted in support of application for approval of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses by All Plaintiffs (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Kenneth J. Vianale by All Plaintiffs in support of [74-1] motion of approval of settlement, plan of allocation and approval of application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [74-1] motion of approval of settlement, plan of allocation and approval of application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None
MOTION in support by All Plaintiffs of approval of settlement, plan of allocation and approval of application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
NOTICE of Unavailability by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine for dates of: 6/14/04 through 7/5/04 (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [68-1] motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/30/04) [EOD Date: 5/3/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/03/2004)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
Minutes of Preliminary Hearing/Approval of Settlement held before Judge William J. Zloch on 4/27/04; Court Reporter Name or Tape Carl Schanzleh (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Heinz Bonde, Robert De Angelis in support of [68-1] motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None
STIPULATION and agreement of settlement by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides, Salberg & Company, Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/30/2004
AGREED MOTION with memorandum in support by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides (Attorney Wendy Susan Leavitt, Kenneth J. Vianale, Julie Prag Vianale) for preliminary approval of the class action settlement (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting settlement conference for 10:00 4/26/04 before Judge William J. Zloch ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/19/04) [EOD Date: 3/22/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [63-1] motion to extend time to serve reply memorandum in support of motion to dismiss the amended complaint ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 3/10/04) [EOD Date: 3/11/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None
REPLY by Singing Machine to response to [54-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint (gp, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM by Salberg & Company in support of [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/10/2004
NUNC PRO TUNC MOTION by Salberg & Company (Attorney ) to extend time to serve reply memorandum in support of motion to dismiss the amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [61-1] motion to extend time to serve reply brief in support of motion to dismiss the amended complaint and defendants shall have up to 3/8/04 to file( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 2/25/04) [EOD Date: 2/25/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/25/2004
AGREED MOTION by Singing Machine (Attorney ) to extend time to serve reply brief in support of motion to dismiss the amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides in opposition to [54-1] motion to dismiss amended complaint, [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [57-1] motion to extend time to serve memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss and to enlarge page limitations granting [58-1] amended motion. Plaintiffs' response to defendants' motions to dismiss is extended to 30 pages. ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/21/04) [EOD Date: 1/21/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None
AMENDED MOTION by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides referring to [57-1] motion to extend time to serve memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss and to enlarge page limitations (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/21/2004
AGREED MOTION by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides to extend time to serve memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss and to enlarge page limitations (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [53-1] motion for enlargement of pages ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/12/04) [EOD Date: 1/13/04] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/13/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
REQUEST by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine for Oral Argument on [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
MOTION by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine to dismiss amended complaint and memorandum of law (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/12/2004
MOTION by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine for enlargement of pages (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
DOCUMENTS by Salberg & Company in support of [51-1] motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
MOTION by Salberg & Company to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/09/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [47-1] motion to extend time to respond to amended complaint resetting answer due for 1/9/04 for Singing Machine, for April Green, for John F. Klecha, for Edward Steele, for Salberg & Company ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 12/29/03) [EOD Date: 12/30/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [48-1] joint motion to substitute Jeffrey A. Blaker as Attorney (Added: Jeffrey A. Blaker) ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 12/23/03) [EOD Date: 12/24/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/23/2003
STIPULATION by Salberg & Company to substitute Jeffrey A. Blaker as Attorney (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/29/2003
AGREED MOTION by Salberg & Company, Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine to extend time to respond to amended complaint (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Robert J. Weinberg (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None
CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides, (Answer due 12/1/03 for Singing Machine, for Edward Steele, for John F. Klecha, for April Green, for Josef A. Bauer, Howard W. Moore, for Robert J. Weinberg) amending [1-1] complaint (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [41-1] motion to extend time to file consolidated amended class action complaint and Lead Plaintiffs shall have up to 11/21/03 to file ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/17/03) [EOD Date: 11/18/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER consolidating cases with 03-61854-CIV-ZLOCH ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/14/03) [EOD Date: 11/17/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [34-1] motion to reconsider Order consolidating Shareholder Derivative Action with Securities Fraud Actions ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 11/14/03) [EOD Date: 11/17/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/17/2003
MOTION by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides to extend time to file consolidated amended class action complaint (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: None
REPLY by Heinz Bonde to response to [34-1] motion to reconsider Order consolidating Shareholder Derivative Action with Securities Fraud Actions (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Singing Machine to [34-1] motion to reconsider Order consolidating Shareholder Derivative Action with Securities Fraud Actions (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/21/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides to [34-1] motion to reconsider Order consolidating Shareholder Derivative Action with Securities Fraud Actions (mh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
OMNIBUS ORDER granting [15-1] motion under section 21d(a)(3)(b) denying [23-1] motion to consolidate cases, denying [23-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs, denying [23-3] motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel granting [32-1] motion to time to serve reply memorandum of law in support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of lead counsel. granting 27 motion for enlargement of time, that lead plaintiffs Theodore Klarides and James Klarides shall file a consolidated amended class action complaint on or before 11/14/03; and defendants, Salberg & Company, P.A., Edward Steele, John G. Klecha, April Green and The Singing Machine Company, Inc. shall answer or respond to the consolidated amended class action complaint on or before 12/19/03. ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 10/10/03) Date: 10/10/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing original verification of the verified derivative complaint by Heinz Bonde (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM of law by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides in further support on their motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of their selection of lead counsel. (bs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/14/2003
MOTION by Heinz Bonde to reconsider Order consolidating Shareholder Derivative Action with Securities Fraud Actions (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Greg Kurdoglanyan, Joe Kurdoglanyan of [21-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [21-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: None
AGREED MOTION by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides to extend time to serve reply memorandum of law in support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of lead counsel (nt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides in support of [23-1] motion to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs, [23-3] motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (nt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER sua sponte, consolidating cases with #03-61336-CIV-ZLOCH, #03-61386-CIV-ZLOCH, #03-80602-CIV-ZLOCH, #03-80654-CIV-ZLOCH, #03-80714-CIV-ZLOCH, #03-80739-CIV-ZLOCH and #03-61636-CIV-ZLOCH; and that all pleadings filed hereinafter shall bear case #03-80596-CIV-ZLOCH ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 9/18/03) [EOD Date: 9/19/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Stephen Dennis, Fredrick J. Gorsline of [18-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [18-3] motion for approval of their choice of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Greg Kurdoglanyan, Joe Kurdoglanyan in further support of [21-1] motion for consolidation, [21-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [21-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine to [23-1] motion to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs, [23-3] motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel, [21-1] motion for consolidation, [21-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [21-3] motion for approval of lead counsel, [18-1] motion for consolidation of the cases, [18-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [18-3] motion for approval of their choice of lead counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [13-1] motion to consolidate cases ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 9/3/03) [EOD Date: 9/5/03] (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Jack Reise in support of motion of Aaron K. Han Re: [23-1] motion to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs, [23-3] motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Aaron K. Han in support of [23-1] motion to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to be appointed lead plaintiffs, [23-3] motion for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Aaron K. Han to consolidate cases , to be appointed lead plaintiffs ,and for approval of lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Maya Saxena by Greg Kurdoglanyan, Joe Kurdoglanyan in support of [21-1] motion for consolidation, [21-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [21-3] motion for approval of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
MOTION with memorandum in support by Greg Kurdoglanyan, Joe Kurdoglanyan for consolidation , for appointment as lead plaintiffs , and for approval of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Emily C. Komlossy by Stephen Dennis, Fredrick J. Gorsline in support of [18-1] motion for consolidation of the cases, [18-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [18-3] motion for approval of their choice of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Stephen Dennis, Fredrick J. Gorsline in support of [18-1] motion for consolidation of the cases, [18-2] motion for appointment as lead plaintiffs, [18-3] motion for approval of their choice of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Stephen Dennis, Fredrick J. Gorsline for consolidation of the cases , for appointment as lead plaintiffs , and for approval of their choice of lead counsel (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides in support of [15-1] motion under section 21d(a)(3)(b) and for approval of their selection of lead counsel (rb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
Statement of Declaration of by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides re: [15-1] motion to intervene as lead counsel for consolidation per Kenneth J. Vinale. (rb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/10/2003
MOTION by Theodore Klarides, James Klarides for consolidation as lead plaintiff under section 21d(a)(3)(b) and approval of plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel (rb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/29/2003 (Entered: 08/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER substituting Lewis F. Murphy as Attorney ( Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/29/03) [EOD Date: 8/29/03] (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/3/2003
AGREED MOTION by Salberg & Company, Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine to consolidate cases (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
Stipulation for Substitution of counsel/NOTICE of attorney appearance for Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine by Lewis Franklin Murphy (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER consolidating case with 03-80639-CIV-WJZ (Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/12/03) [EOD Date: 8/14/03] (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying [7-1] motion for enlargement of time to respond to summons and complaint, Denying [9-1] motion to extend time to file a response to the complaint (Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/12/03) [EOD Date: 8/14/03] (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine to extend time to file a response to the complaint (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance for Edward Steele, John F. Klecha, April Green, Singing Machine by Garry William O'Donnell (lh, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/12/2003
AGREED MOTION by Salberg & Company for enlargement of time to respond to summons and complaint (ss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS() issued for Singing Machine (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS() issued for April Green (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS() issued for John F. Klecha (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS() issued for Edward Steele (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS() issued for Salberg & Company (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $150.00 RECEIPT # 718639; A-7 Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (at, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 266 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?