USA v. Birkenfeld et al
Criminal Case Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:08-cr-60099-WJZ

Tags
Last Updated May 18, 2017 at 11:12 PM EDT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Bradley Birkenfeld, Defendant (1)

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Peter Raben +1 305 379 1401 +1 305 374 0081 praben@bellsouth.net

Represented by Gelber Schachter & Greenberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Gelber +1 305 728 0950 +1 305 728 0951 dgelber@gsgpa.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald Edward Greenberg +1 305 728 0950 +1 305 728 0951 ggreenberg@gsgpa.com

Represented by Law Offices of Susan V. Tipograph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert William Stickney +1 954 767 8908 +7678 767 767 8938 rwstickney@yahoo.com

Represented by SCHERTLER & ONORATO, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Danny C. Onorato +1 202 628 4199 +1 202 628 4177 donorato@schertlerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/23/2008, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained David Schertler +1 202 628 4199 +1 202 628 4177 dschertler@schertlerlaw.com

Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained David E. Meier +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 dmeier@toddweld.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/14/2015 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
ORDER granting [108] Motion to Travel as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/14/2015. (bc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015, Terminated: 4/14/2015 Motion to Travel
    Agreed MOTION to Travel to Provide Testimony in French Law Enforcement Proceeding by Bradley Birkenfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B.)(Greenberg, Gerald)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
      PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot [104] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 2/17/2015. (bc)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [105] Motion to Travel as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 2/17/2015. (bc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015, Terminated: 2/17/2015 Motion to Travel
          Agreed MOTION to Travel to Provide Testimony to French Law Enforcement Proceedings by Bradley Birkenfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A French Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit B Article, # (3) Text of Proposed Order C)(Greenberg, Gerald)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015, Terminated: 2/17/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
            Defendant's MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A., # (2) Exhibit B., # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Gerald)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: 1/23/2015 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [102] Motion for Reconsideration as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/23/2015. (ots)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015, Terminated: 1/23/2015 Motion for Reconsideration
                Defendant's MOTION for Reconsideration re [101] Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 2/6/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Greenberg, Gerald)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [99] Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/12/2015. (bc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: 1/7/2015 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl re [99] Defendant's MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release Replies due by 1/20/2015. (Daly, Mark)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014, Terminated: 1/12/2015 Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release
                      Defendant's MOTION for Early Termination of Supervised Release by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 1/2/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Greenberg, Gerald)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel S. Gelber appearing for Bradley Birkenfeld . Attorney Daniel S. Gelber added to party Bradley Birkenfeld(pty:dft). (Gelber, Daniel)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald Edward Greenberg appearing for Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl . Attorney Gerald Edward Greenberg added to party Bradley Birkenfeld(pty:dft). (Greenberg, Gerald)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: 7/26/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mark F. Daly appearing for USA. . Attorney Mark F. Daly added to party USA(pty:pla). (Daly, Mark)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER Granting Defendant Bradley Birkenfeld's Unopposed Motion to Discharge Liens Place Upon Certain Real Estate as Conditions of Bail [93]. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/13/2010. (ccy)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING Motion [93] to Discharge Liens placed upon certain Real Estate as Conditions of Bail filed by Bradley Birkenfeld to Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/7/2010. (bc)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010, Terminated: 4/13/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Unopposed MOTION to Discharge Liens placed upon certain Real Estate as Conditions of Bail re [23] Bond,,,, [19] Bond,,,, by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 4/23/2010 (ls)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                    ORDER denying [89] Motion to Extend Report Date for Purposes of Continued Cooperation with U.S. Government Authorities and for Hearing on Reconsideration of Sentence as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 1/4/2010. (bc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 92 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                        SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 91 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/26/2009, Entered: 12/26/2009, Terminated: 1/4/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Defendant's MOTION extension of report date to BOP and hearing on reconsideration of sentence re [81] Judgment by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 1/12/2010 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A" Deferred Prosecution Agreement)(Stickney, Robert)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                            SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 88 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                              SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 87 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 86 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                  SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 85 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                    SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 84 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 83 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld held on 08-21-09 before Judge William J. Zloch. Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, Phone: 954-769-5488. 1-40 pages. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2009. (cs)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                          JUDGMENT as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Count 1, Defendant sentenced to BOP for a term of 40 months; 3 years supervised release; Assessment: $100.00; Fine: $30,000.00. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/21/2009. (bc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 SentencingCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Zloch: Sentencing held on 8/21/2009 as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, Phone: 954-769-5488 (bc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Appendix
                                                              APPENDIX re [77] Sentencing Memorandum filed by Bradley Birkenfeld by Bradley Birkenfeld (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit H, # (2) Exhibit I, # (3) Exhibit J)(Stickney, Robert)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Appendix
                                                              APPENDIX re [77] Sentencing Memorandum filed by Bradley Birkenfeld by Bradley Birkenfeld (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D, # (2) Exhibit E, # (3) Exhibit F, # (4) Exhibit G)(Stickney, Robert)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Bradley Birkenfeld (Attachments: # (1) Appendix of Exhibits A through J, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Stickney, Robert)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009, Terminated: 8/21/2009 Motion for Downward Departure
                                                                MOTION for Downward Departure Pursuant to 5K1.1 by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 9/4/2009 (Neiman, Jeffrey)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying [74] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 8/7/2009. (bc)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009, Terminated: 8/10/2009 Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing
                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl. Responses due by 8/24/2009 (Neiman, Jeffrey)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 70 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                        SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 71 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                          SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 72 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                            SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 73 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                              SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 68 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 69 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                  SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 65 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                    SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 66 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                      SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 67 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dby)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                                                        ANSWER of Garnishee by Bank of America Corporation as to Bradley Birkenfeld (ls)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Notice/Order of SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE Resetting Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Sentencing reset for 8/21/2009 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [61] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 4/13/2009. (bc)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009, Terminated: 4/13/2009 Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing
                                                                                              Fourth MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl. Responses due by 4/27/2009 (Neiman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Notice/Order of SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE Resetting Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Sentencing reset for 5/5/2009 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [58] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 3/3/2009). (at)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009, Terminated: 3/3/2009 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Regarding Encumbered Assets by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 3/19/2009 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit US Probation Officer's Statement Re Defendant, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Stickney, Robert)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [56] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/22/08). (at)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008, Terminated: 12/22/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 1/9/2009 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Modifying Conditions of Release)(Stickney, Robert)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert William Stickney appearing for Bradley Birkenfeld (Stickney, Robert)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Notice/Order of SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Sentencing reset for 5/1/2009 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Order on Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting [52] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 12/3/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/2/2008, Terminated: 12/3/2008 Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing
                                                                                                                THIRD Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl. Responses due by 12/19/2008 (Neiman, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/3/2008 to reflect text (tb).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [50] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Danny C. Onorato and David Schertler are withdrawn from case as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 10/23/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008, Terminated: 10/23/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Danny Onorato and David Schertler. by Bradley Birkenfeld. (Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting [48] Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Sentencing is rest for 1/8/2009 at 10:00 A.M. as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 9/30/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008, Terminated: 9/30/2008 Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Neiman, Jeffrey) Modified Removed party on 9/25/2008 (tp).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting [46] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David E. Meier, Esq. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 9/15/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David E. Meier, Filing Fee $75.00, Receipt #986945 Responses due by 9/29/2008 (cw)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting [44] Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing. Sentencing reset for 10/17/2008 at 10:30 A.M. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 7/21/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion to Continue Change of Plea and/or Sentencing Hearing
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 7/28/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Neiman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bradley Birkenfeld held on PLEA COLLOQUY held on 06/19/2008 before Judge WILLIAM J. ZLOCH. Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh - phone number 954-769-5488 1-30 pages. (amb)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS ORDER granting [41] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Schertler, Esq. as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 6/23/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Schertler, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #543461 Responses due by 7/7/2008 (cw)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Notice/Order of SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Sentencing set for 8/13/2008 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Zloch: Change of Plea Hearing as to Bradley Birkenfeld held on 6/19/2008. Bradley Birkenfeld (1) pleaded Guilty to Count 1. Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh - phone number 954-769-5488 (bc)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Bradley Birkenfeld If you attempt to access this document via the docket entry link and are not permitted to view the document, you may view it at the Southern District of Florida Clerk's Office. (bs)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                                                                                                                                              PLEA AGREEMENT as to Bradley Birkenfeld If you attempt to access this document via the docket entry link and are not permitted to view the document, you may view it at the Southern District of Florida Clerk's Office. (bs)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [35] Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danny Onorato, Esq. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 6/17/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danny Onorato. Responses due by 6/30/2008 (cw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice [32] Motion for Limited Appearance, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings of Attorney Danny C. Onorato. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Danny Onorato as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1). Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 6/12/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Change of Plea Hearing reset for 6/19/2008 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danny Onorato, Filing Fee $75, Receipt #543355. Responses due by 6/26/2008 (cw)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Second by Bradley Birkenfeld (Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jeffrey A. Neiman appearing for USA. (Neiman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/9/2008 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale before Judge William J. Zloch. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Cancel Status Conference Hearing by Bradley Birkenfeld (Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO IMPOSE ENCUMBRANCE granting [25] Motion GRANTED as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/08.) (at)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Bradley Birkenfeld (Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 5/23/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Motion to Order Encumbrance by Bradley Birkenfeld. Responses due by 6/9/2008 (Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Notice to Transfer to Fugitive Status
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Transfer to Fugitive Status as to Mario Staggl (bc)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          $100,000 CSB Bond Entered as to Bradley Birkenfeld Receipt # IF 100K 1140. Approved by Judge Barry S. Seltzer Special Conditions: Surrender all passports and travel documents to the Pretrial Services Office;Report to Pretrial Services as directed; in Boston MassachussettsSubmit to substance abuse testing and/or treatment as directed by Pretrial Services;Refrain from excessive use of alcohol, or any use of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance;Maintain or actively seek full-time employment; outside financial entities {services}Avoid all contact with victims of or witnesses to the crimes charged, except through counsel;Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device or other dangerous weapons;Home Confinement Program; will include electronic monitoring and curfew from 10:00 p.m. to 6:00 a.m. May travel to and from SD/FL and District of Massachussetts and intermediate districts, location, permitted to travel to Washington DC and must notify Pretrial Services of travel plans before leaving and upon return.;Comply with additional conditions of bond; continue to reside at current address, no access to monies, stock signed off, out of his control {10 days for status report} (at)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Bradley Birkenfeld re [21] Nebbia Proffer filed by Bradley Birkenfeld, (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/20/08.) (at)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Nebbia Proffer
                                                                                                                                                                              NEBBIA PROFFER and Stipulation by Bradley Birkenfeld (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Nebbia proffer)(Raben, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Initial Appearance & Bond Hearing as to Bradley Birkenfeld held on 5/13/08 before Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Court Reporter: Jerald Meyers- phone number 305-523-5635 1-46 pages. (nc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  $2,000,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Bradley Birkenfeld Approved by Judge Barry S. Seltzer Special Conditions: Surrender all passports and travel documents to the Pretrial Services Office;Report to Pretrial Services as directed; in Boston MassachussettsSubmit to substance abuse testing and/or treatment as directed by Pretrial Services;Refrain from excessive use of alcohol, or any use of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance;Maintain or actively seek full-time employment; outside financial entities (services)Avoid all contact with victims of or witnesses to the crimes charged, except through counsel;Refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device or other dangerous weapons;Home Confinement Program; will include electronic monitoring curfew from 10:00 p.m. to 6:00 a.m. May travel to and from SD/FL and District of Massachussetts and other intermediate districts, permitted to travel to Washington DC. location and must notify Pretrial Services of travel plans before leaving and upon return.;Comply with additional conditions of bond; continue to reside at current address, no access to money, stocks signed off {out of his control} {10 days for status report} (at)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Order on Trial InstructionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on Trial Instructions as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 5/15/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Setting Cause for Trial as to Bradley Birkenfeld. Calendar Call set for 6/27/2008 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale before Judge William J. Zloch. Jury Trial set for trial period beginning 6/30/2008 before Judge William J. Zloch. Signed by Judge William J. Zloch on 5/15/2008. (bc)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter Raben appearing for Bradley Birkenfeld (gw)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order Re: Status Conference/Speedy Trial/Pretrial MattersCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE, SPEEDY TRIAL, PRETRIAL MATTERS as to Bradley Birkenfeld Status Conference set for 5/28/2008 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/13/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Paperless Standing Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER as to Bradley Birkenfeld. All motions concerning matters not covered by this order must be filed within 28 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/13/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Arraignment Information SheetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ARRAIGNMENT INFORMATION SHEET Not Guilty Plea entered as to counts Bradley Birkenfeld (1) Count 1. Court accepts plea. Arraignment held on 5/13/2008 before Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Tape #08-024 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barry S. Seltzer : Initial Appearance as to Bradley Birkenfeld held on 5/13/2008 Atty. Peter Raben (local) Atty. daniel Onorato to file pro hac vice.Deft arraigned and bond set at 2 Million PSB & 100,000 CSB w/nebbia.(Tape #08-024.) (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 5/7/08 in district of arrest in case as to Bradley Birkenfeld (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order on Initial Appearance as to Bradley Birkenfeld for proceeding held on 5/13/2008 Attorney Peter Raben for Bradley Birkenfeld added for the defendant. as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1) 2 Million Dollar PSB & 100,000 CSB . Tape #08-BSS Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/13/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Report Commencing Criminal Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Bradley Birkenfeld - DOB: **/**/1965 Prisoner #: 26901-038 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Unseal Case as to Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/13/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial appearance of Bradley Birkenfeld (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion to modify sealing order as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1), Mario Staggl (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/6/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 73 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (at) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to modify sealing order by Government. Responses due by 5/20/2008 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 72 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (at) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1) count(s) 1, Mario Staggl (2) count(s) 1. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document (at) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [1] Motion to seal indictment as to Bradley Birkenfeld (1), Mario Staggl (2) (unsealed 5-13-08)Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 4/10/08. (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document (at) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to seal indictment/warrants (unsealed 5-13-08) by Bradley Birkenfeld, Mario Staggl. Responses due by 4/24/2008 (dd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?