Napier et al v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-61158
District Judge Patricia A. Seitz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Albert Napier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Justice Institute, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Challen Berg, Jr. +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 rberg@floridajusticeinstitute.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA AARON GLICKMAN +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 josh@sjlawcollective.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dante Pasquale Trevisani +1 305 358 2081 dtrevisani@floridajusticeinstitute.org
No Logo Jane Napier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Justice Institute, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Challen Berg, Jr. +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 rberg@floridajusticeinstitute.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA AARON GLICKMAN +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 josh@sjlawcollective.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dante Pasquale Trevisani +1 305 358 2081 dtrevisani@floridajusticeinstitute.org
v.
No Logo Alejandro Urrutia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2010 Trelvis Deneuois Randolph +1 305 350 5332 +1 305 373 2294 trelvis.randolph@csklegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Lury +1 954 523 7008 +1 954 523 7009 slury@qpwblaw.com
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 344 1100 +1 239 344 1200 gregg.toomey@henlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheridan Weissenborn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheridan K. Weissenborn +1 305 648 9660 +1 305 648 9663 skw@sweissenbornlaw.com
No Logo MHM Correctional Services, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2010 Michael E. Brand +1 305 350 5380 +1 305 373 2294 michael.brand@csklegal.com
TERMINATED: 02/19/2010 Trelvis Deneuois Randolph +1 305 350 5332 +1 305 373 2294 trelvis.randolph@csklegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quintairos Prieto Wood Boyer PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Lury +1 954 523 7008 +1 954 523 7009 slury@qpwblaw.com
No Logo Prison Health Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 344 1100 +1 239 344 1200 gregg.toomey@henlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF FINAL DISMISSAL re 108 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/10/2011. (lh) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Albert Napier, Jane Napier (Berg, Randall) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
      Order Granting Third Joint Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke for Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/24/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re 105 Order, 104 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Responses due by 6/9/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 OrderCourt Filing
          Order Granting Second Joint Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/9/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
            Order Granting Second Joint Motion for Enlargement of Deadline to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 5/9/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice re 102 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Responses due by 5/23/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                Order Granting Joint Motion For Enlargement Of Deadline To File Stipulation Of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 4/18/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 99 Notice of Court Practice by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Responses due by 5/2/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Report of Mediation
                    REPORT of Mediation Disposition: Settled(jcy) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice of Court PracticeCourt Filing
                      Notice of Court Practice on Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 3/30/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011 Notice of Settlement
                        NOTICE of Settlement by Albert Napier, Jane Napier (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 3/25/2011. (Digital 15:44:37.) (Tape #N/A.) (cg1) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Notice of Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: DISCOVERY HEARING set for 3:30 p.m. on 03/25/2011, before the Honorable John J. OSullivan, United States Magistrate Judge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re 84 Memorandum filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc., 83 Memorandum in Support filed by MHM Correctional Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/24/2011. (tro) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying as moot 90 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/17/2011. (tro) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Notice of Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: DISCOVERY HEARING set for 3:30 p.m. on 03/25/2011, before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan (Trevisani, Dante) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE by Albert Napier, Jane Napier of Cancellation of Hearing (Trevisani, Dante) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011 Notice of Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: DISCOVERY HEARING set for 9:00 a.m. on 03/17/2011, before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan (Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Response/Reply (Other)
                                            RESPONSE/REPLY to 84 Memorandum, 83 Memorandum in Support by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Trevisani, Dante) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dante Pasquale Trevisani on behalf of Albert Napier, Jane Napier (Trevisani, Dante) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gerald T. Wetherington Mediation Hearing set for 3/28/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 3/7/2011. (lbc) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Memorandum
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW re 80 Order by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Memorandum in Support
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 80 Order related to Motion for Protective Order by MHM Correctional Services, Inc. (Lury, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE by Alejandro Urrutia of Filing Expert Disclosure (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lury, Steven) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE by Albert Napier, Jane Napier of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER on Informal Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/1/2011. (tro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2011: # 1 Seal Exhibits) (nc). (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER denying 75 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/1/2011. (tro) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Discovery Hearing held on 3/1/2011. (Digital 14:58:11.) (Tape #11-A-13 and 14.) (mso) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 Defendant's MOTION to Strike 72 Notice of Hearing by Attorney, filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice of Hearing by Attorney
                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: Plaintiff's Second Revised Notice of Hearing set for 3:00 p.m. on 03/01/2011 (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Motion to Strike
                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Strike 72 Notice of Hearing by Attorney, by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/18/2011 (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                      Order Denying Motion to Enlarge Remaining Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 2/28/2011. (jcy) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Enlarge Remaining Pretrial Deadlines by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/14/2011 (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 Notice of Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: Plaintiff's Revised Notice of Hearing set for 3:00 p.m. on 03/01/2011, before Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Notice of Hearing by AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY re: Unauthorized Early Termination of the Deposition of Cindy Ojeda set for 3:00 p.m. on 03/01/2011, Before Magistrate Judge John J. OSullivan (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              Order Granting Joint Motion for Enlargement of Pretrial Deadlines and Resetting Trial ( Discovery due by 3/16/2011., Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2011., In Limine Motions due by 7/22/2011., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/22/2011., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2011 01:15 PM in Miami Division before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Jury Trial set for 8/29/2011 before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2011 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Patricia A. Seitz.). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 11/19/2010. (jcy) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Reset Pretrial Deadlines by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Resetting Pretrial Deadlines)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 9/28/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                      AGREED ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gerald T. Wetherington Mediation Hearing set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/27/10. (tp) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                        NOTICE by Albert Napier, Jane Napier of Filing Proposed Agreed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agreed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 63 Defendant's Motion to Continue Mediation. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/5/2010. (ebs) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Continue Mediation Date by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2010 (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                              Defendants MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC AND ALEJANDRO URRUTIA'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.(Lury, Steven) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc..(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Gregg Alan Toomey (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks
                                                                                                    Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 58 Amended Complaint,. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (ebs) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Florida Department of Corrections, MHM Correctional Services, Inc, Prison Health Services, Inc., Alejandro Urrutia filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier.(ebs) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 7/7/2010. (ebs) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc. re 51 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 50 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 41 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 50 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 41 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, of Non-Objection (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc..(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gerald T. Wetherington: Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/23/2010. (lh) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to MediateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 52 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/23/2010. (lh) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate
                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by Alejandro Urrutia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lury, Steven) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 50 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 41 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order DE 41 Granting Extension to File Pleadings until 3/31/10, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Exh. B)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 42 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/16/2010. (ail) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to MediateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/16/2010. (ail) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 6/16/2010. (ail) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate and Defendants Joinder re [DE 46] filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Berg, Randall) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc. re 45 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate (Notice of Joinder in Motion) (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate
                                                                                                                                Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by MHM Correctional Services, Inc. (Lury, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 42 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Replies due by 4/23/2010. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring
                                                                                                                                    Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc. re 20 MOTION to Dismiss 15 Amended Complaint filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend the Joint Scheduling Report; granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct. The deadline by which amended pleadings can be filed is through and including 3/31/10. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 3/9/2010. (asl) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Responses due by 3/22/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE (Stipulation) of Substitution of Counsel by Steven M. Lury on behalf of Alejandro Urrutia instead of prior counsel of record Michael Brand. (Lury, Steven) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gerald T. Wetherington Mediation Hearing set for 6/30/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 1/15/2010. (tb) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Albert Napier, Jane Napier Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss 15 Amended Complaint filed by Prison Health Services, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                    Initial Disclosure(s) by MHM Correctional Services, Inc. (Randolph, Trelvis) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                      Initial Disclosure(s) by Alejandro Urrutia. (Randolph, Trelvis) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 31 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Notice of Mediator Selection
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Gerald Wetherington added. DOCKET CORRECTION SEE DE 31 FOR IMAGE(tp) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Albert Napier, Jane Napier OF FILING SELECTION OF MEDIATOR (Glickman, Joshua) Modified on 11/20/2009 (tp). See DE 32 for corrected entry (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Amended OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Amending re 21 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, ( Calendar Call set for 6/1/2011 01:15 PM in Miami Division before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 before Judge Patricia A. Seitz. ). Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 11/18/2009. (ls) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Dismiss 15 Amended Complaint filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Horn v. Volusia County (M.D. Fla. 2008))(Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Aaron Glickman on behalf of Albert Napier, Jane Napier (Glickman, Joshua) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File response. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 11/6/2009. (tb) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PRISON HEALTH SERVICES AND FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 17, 2009 and attached PROPOSED ORDER. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (tp) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by MHM Correctional Services, Inc, Alejandro Urrutia for dates of 12/28/09 thru 01/04/10 (Randolph, Trelvis) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PRISON HEALTH SERVICES AND FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT THROUGH AND INCLUDING NOVEMBER 17, 2009 by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Berg, Randall) Modified added link on 11/6/2009 (tp). (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Noticing Information for Shawn Heller has been modified to receive notice. (jc) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Order Referring Case to MediationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/3/2009. (tb) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Jury Trial set for 6/7/2011 before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2011 01:15 PM before Judge Patricia A. Seitz., Discovery due by 10/20/2010., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/13/2011.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Discovery Proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/3/2009. (tb) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss 15 Amended Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alejandro Urrutia.(Randolph, Trelvis) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.(Randolph, Trelvis) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alex Heller on behalf of Albert Napier, Jane Napier (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (see image 10 )(tb) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss; granting 10 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 10/7/2009. (tb) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint filed by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Shawn Alex Heller (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint filed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Horn v. Volusia County (M.D. Fla. 2008))(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 9/8/09. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/27/2009. (asl) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. (Berg, Randall) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc. of Filing Executed Affidavit of Scott King (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Scott King with PHS-FDOC Contract)(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/26/2009. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz on 8/13/2009. (cqs) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss 1 Notice of Removal - Complaint by Florida Department of Corrections, Prison Health Services, Inc.. Responses due by 8/31/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FDOC Conviction Sheet, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Scott King & FDOC-PHS Contract, # 3 Exhibit C - Order)(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.(Jackson, Valerie) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alejandro Urrutia.(Jackson, Valerie) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Albert Napier, Jane Napier. Alejandro Urrutia waiver sent on 7/20/2009, answer due 9/18/2009; MHM Correctional Services, Inc waiver sent on 7/20/2009, answer due 9/18/2009., SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Albert Napier; Jane Napier. Alejandro Urrutia served on 7/20/2009, answer due 9/18/2009; MHM Correctional Services, Inc served on 7/20/2009, answer due 9/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Return of Service Executed on Prison Health Services, # 2 Affidavit Return of Service Executed on FDOC by serving McNeil, # 3 Affidavit Acknowlegment of Service on MHM, # 4 Affidavit Acknowledgement of Service on Alejandro Urrutia)(Berg, Randall) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $350.00 Receipt#: 1005727, filed by MHM Correctional Services, Inc.(lbc) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?