v. Bravo
Federal Court Proceeding Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-mc-20559
Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 2:34 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AUSA USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia R. Wood +1 305 961 9001 cynthia.wood@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Roberto Guillermo Bravo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal R. Sonnett, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Russell Sonnett +1 305 358 2000 +1 305 358 1233 nrs@sonnett.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 3181
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Order Out of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 10/4/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
      CLERK'S NOTICE of exhibit location. Signed by Deputy clerk (lk) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/3/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Roberto Guillermo Bravo of Fling Proposed Opinion and Order Denying Extradition (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/3/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Order Out of Time by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 10/03/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 57
              LREF
              Blank 57 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW Post Hearing Memorandum in Opposition to Extradition by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 54 Motion for One Final Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings. Bravo shall have through and including Wednesday, September 29, 2010 to file any Post-Hearing Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/27/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 52 Motion for Additional Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/27/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File One Final Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting One Final Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                      SUPPLEMENT Memorandum on Political Offense Exception, Military Exoneration, and Amnesty by USA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings, by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Cynthia) Modified on 9/27/2010 to convert event from memorandum to motion (bb). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER denying as moot 48 Agreed Motion for Additional Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/21/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 49 Corrected Agreed Motion for Additional Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings. The parties shall have through and including Thursday, September 23, 2010 to file any Post-Hearing Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/21/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                              Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting CORRECTED Agreed Motion For Additional Extension Of Time To File Post-Hearing Pleadings)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Additional Extension of Time To File Post-Hearing Pleadings)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER denying 35 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/17/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings. The parties shall have through and including Monday, September 20, 2010 to file any Post-Hearing Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 9/17/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Pleadings by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Corrected Transcript and Notice of Correction of Extradition Hearing held on 08/31/10 before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube, 1-114 pages, re: 43 Transcript,, Court Reporter: Larry Herr, 305-523-5290 / Larry_Herr@flsd.uscourts.gov. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Extradition Hearing held on 08/27/10 before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube, 1-114 pages, Court Reporter: Larry Herr, 305-523-5290 / Larry_Herr@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2010. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube: Final Extradition Hearing held on 8/31/2010. Court Reporter: Larry Herr, 305-523-5290 / Larry_Herr@flsd.uscourts.gov (Also recorded: Digital 9:57:28; 11:31:52.) (ks) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                              Exhibit List by Roberto Guillermo Bravo (ks) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Portions of Bravo's Proffered Expert Testimony Supplemental Response Regarding Political Offense Exception filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 08/29/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Portions of Bravo's Proffered Expert Testimony filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of filing original extradition request by USA re 1 Application for Extradition (lk) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 36 Consent Motion for Continuance of Extradition Hearing. Extradition Hearing set for 8/31/2010 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division, 99 N.E. 4th Street, COURTROOM 3, Eleventh Floor, before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 8/16/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Consent MOTION to Continue Final Extradition Hearing Hearing by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. Responses due by 9/2/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Continuance)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                          First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Portions of Bravo's Proffered Expert Testimony by USA. (Wood, Cynthia) Modified on 8/13/2010 (ls). [Text modified by Clerk] (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion for Discovery based upon Roberto Guillermo Bravo's response 32 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 7/6/2010. (lfz) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL EXTRADITION HEARING: The Final Extradition Hearing is reset for 8/18/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 7/6/2010. (gm1) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 29 First MOTION for Discovery /Disclosure of Expert Witness Statements And Disclosure Of Expert Witnesses filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. Replies due by 7/12/2010. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE/REPLY to 27 Trial Brief, Government's Memorandum on Political Offense Exception, Military Exoneration, and Amnesty by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE re 29 First MOTION for Discovery /Disclosure of Expert Witness Statements filed by USA. Roberto Guillermo Bravo shall have until Friday, July 2, 2010 to file and serve a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 6/28/2010. (gm1) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      First MOTION for Discovery /Disclosure of Expert Witness Statements by USA. Responses due by 7/12/2010 (Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must electronically re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 6/24/2010. (pf) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF Memorandum in Opposition to Extradition by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Globat Terrorism Database, # 2 Exhibit B - Media Articles, # 3 Exhibit C - Williams Foreign Service Memoir, # 4 Exhibit D - Auditor General Report, # 5 Exhibit E - Presidential Decree, # 6 Exhibit F - Amnesty Law, # 7 Exhibit G - Bar Association Statement)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum Out of Time by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Permission to File Memorandum Out of Time)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER RESCHEDULING FINAL EXTRADITION HEARING. Final Extradition Hearing set for 7/27/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube. Deadline to file additional pleadings 6/21/2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 5/28/2010. (lbc) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings, Consent MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing ( Responses due by 6/14/2010) by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Pleadings and to Continue Extradition Hearing)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Granting re 19 MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. Additional Pleadings due by 6/2/2010., Responses due by 6/9/2010, Extradition Hearing set for 6/23/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 3/25/2010. (lbc) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing CORRECTED REPLY filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing filed by USA. (Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/25/2010
                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Extradition Hearing by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. Responses due by 4/9/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Extradition Hearing)(Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Bond Hearing held on 03-02-10 before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube, 1-30 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 954-769-5488 / Carl_Schanzleh@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 10:01:47.) Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2010. (cs) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW on Extradition by USA. (Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER (Final Extradition Hearing set for 4/2/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 3/3/2010. (lk) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  PSB BOND in the amount of $250,000.00 10% Nebbia receipt # 233498 posted by Roberto Guillermo Bravo Approved by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube (lk) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    PSB BOND in the amount of $1,000,000.00 posted by Roberto Guillermo Bravo Approved by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube (lk) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER (Final Extradition Hearing set for Friday, 4/2/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube, 99 NE 4th Street, 11th Fl - Courtroom 3, Miami,Florida 33132.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 3/3/2010. (mdc) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube: Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2010 re 11 MOTION for Bond Pending Extradition Hearing filed by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (Digital 10:01:47.) (Tape #10-RLD-6-1795 - end and 10-RLD-7-300.) (ks) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Bond Pending Extradition Hearing by Roberto Guillermo Bravo. Responses due by 3/18/2010 (Sonnett, Neal) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neal Russell Sonnett on behalf of Roberto Guillermo Bravo (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW to Bail by USA. (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                WARRANT Returned executed on Extradition Complaint as to Roberto Guillermo Bravo. (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Order to Unseal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 2/25/2010. (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube: Miscellaneous/Initial Appearance Hearing held on 2/25/2010. (Digital 13:52:09.) (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia R. Wood on behalf of USA (Wood, Cynthia) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Order on Initial Appearance for proceeding held on 2/25/2010. Tape #10-RLD-6 (Digital 13:52:09.) Detention Hearing set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube. All further hearings shall be set by Judge Dube. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube on 2/25/2010. (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Roberto Bravo - DOB: **/**/' 42; Prisoner #: 83579-004 (lk) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Application for Extradition {Argentina} against Roberto Guillermo Bravo.. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required-Waived, filed by USA.(lk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2010: # 1 Appendix Docket Sheet) (lk). (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 827 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?