Condatis LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-60540
District Judge Federico A. Moreno, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Federico A. Moreno
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 7:10 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Comnav Marine Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Scott Feller +1 212 918 3567 +1 212 918 3100

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Sobel jmsobel@hhlaw.com
No Logo Navico Holding As, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Matthew Connor +1 704 444 1000 +1 704 444 1936 jeffrey.connor@alston.com
No Logo Navico Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Matthew Connor +1 704 444 1000 +1 704 444 1936 jeffrey.connor@alston.com
No Logo Navico Uk Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Matthew Connor +1 704 444 1000 +1 704 444 1936 jeffrey.connor@alston.com
v.
No Logo Arcturus Marine Systems Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc., Defendant

Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

No Logo Austal Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Austal Limited"
No Logo Austal Ships Pty. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Austal USA, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Camper & Nicholsons International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cheoy Lee Shipyards North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cheoy Lee Shipyards, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Expedition Performance Systems, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Furuno Electric Company Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Furuno Electric Co., Ltd."

Represented by Law Offices of Manuel Farach, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Romance +1 305 373 4000 +3734 373 373 4099 mromance@richmangreer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Wall +1 305 373 4000 +1 305 373 4099 ewall@richmangreer.com
No Logo Furuno U.s.a. Inc., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Manuel Farach, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Romance +1 305 373 4000 +3734 373 373 4099 mromance@richmangreer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan Wall +1 305 373 4000 +1 305 373 4099 ewall@richmangreer.com
No Logo HAL Antillen N.V., Defendant
No Logo Halcyon International Pty. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Holland America Line Inc., Defendant
No Logo Holland America Line, N.V., Defendant
No Logo Intelisea LLC, Defendant
No Logo Myles Marine Electronics Inc., Defendant
No Logo Naiad Dynamics Us, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Naiad Maritime Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nautic Control Solutions LP, Defendant

Represented by The Botros Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul M. Botros +1 305 987 0745 pmb@botroslawfirm.com
No Logo Nexus Marine Ab, Defendant
No Logo Oceanfast LLC, Defendant
No Logo Oceanfast Pty. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Quantum Controls B.v., Defendant
No Logo Quantum Marine Engineering Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantum Stabilizers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodriguez Group S.A., Defendant
No Logo Rolls Royce North America Holdings Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rolls-royce Plc, Defendant
No Logo Samyung Enc Co. Ltd., Defendant
No Logo U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Paul DiMaggio +1 954 763 3303 +1 954 522 6507 dpd@mhdpatents.com
No Logo United Maritime Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Paul DiMaggio +1 954 763 3303 +1 954 522 6507 dpd@mhdpatents.com
No Logo Westport Shipyard, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Herron Jacobs Ortiz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin Patrick Jacobs +1 305 779 8100 +1 305 779 8104 kjacobs@hjo-law.com
Space Priscilla Jimenez pjimenez@hjo-law.com

Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Brian G. Bodine +1 206 342 6244 +1 206 342 6201 bbodine@merchantgould.com
No Logo Yokogawa Corporation Of America, Defendant

Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Paul DiMaggio +1 954 763 3303 +1 954 522 6507 dpd@mhdpatents.com
No Logo Yokogawa Denshikiki Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Yokogawa Denshikiki Co., Ltd."

Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Paul DiMaggio +1 954 763 3303 +1 954 522 6507 dpd@mhdpatents.com
No Logo Yokogawa Electric Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Malin, Haley, Dimaggio & Crosby, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Paul DiMaggio +1 954 763 3303 +1 954 522 6507 dpd@mhdpatents.com
No Logo Condatis LLC, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (184) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SAMYUNG ENC CO., LTD.. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/3/2011. (mmi) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. (Rojas, Jose) Modified on 3/2/2011 (ls). (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER removing Attorney Ethan J. Wall from electronic mailing list. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/11/2011. (mmi) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 175 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and Damage Award Against Defendant Samyung. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/11/2011. (mmi) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Furuno Electric Co., Ltd., Furuno U.S.A., Inc. re 111 Order, Terminate Parties, 112 Order, Terminate Parties of Removal of Ethan Wall from Courts Electronic List (Wall, Ethan) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Ignacio Rojas on behalf of Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. (Rojas, Jose) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 176 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting 177 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/21/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew Choung. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 11100. (ksa) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Adrian M. Pruetz. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 11099. (ksa) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
Joint Stipulated/Motion re 169 Default Judgment to set aside Default Judgment and Award Against Samyung by Condatis LLC, Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. (Rojas, Jose) Modified converted document to motion on 12/9/2010 (tp). (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 172 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Affidavit and Proposed Order; ORDER granting Plaintiff Damages from Defendants Samyung ENC Co. Ltd. and Expedition Performance Systems, Ltd. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/29/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC re 169 Default Judgment of Filing Corrected Affidavit of Michael Connelly and Accompanying Proposed Order (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Connelly (corrected affidavit), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Affidavit of Michael Connelly and Proposed Order by Condatis LLC. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC re 169 Default Judgment of Filing Affidavit of Michael Connelly and Accompanying Proposed Order (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Connelly, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Transmittal Letter Sent With certified copy of Default Judgment To: Director of Patent and Trademark Office (bb) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants Expedition Performance Systems, Ltd. and Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. (Deadline for Plaintiff to file affidavits is 10/20/2010). Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/6/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ATLANTIC RADIO TELEPHONE, INC. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/1/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO COMNAV MARINE LTD. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/1/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NEXUS MARINE AB. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/1/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 153 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Nautical Control Solutions LP. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/29/2010. (mmi) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Nexus Marine AB by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
Transmittal Letter Sent With certified copy of Order granting Motion to Dismiss To: Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (bb) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 153 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/28/2010. (rol) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Atlantic Radio by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Comnav by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re 156 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Expedition Performance Systems, Ltd.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/24/2010. (ail) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re 154 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Samyung Enc Co. Ltd.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/24/2010. (ail) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re 153 Stipulation of Dismissal. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Expedition Performance Systems, Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of S. Wolkov)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed DHL return receipt confirming delivery to Defendant Expedition Acknowledgment filed by Condatis LLC. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) Modified on 9/24/2010 (ls). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Condatis LLC, by Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc., Navico UK Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Navico, Inc. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Navico U.K., Ltd. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Navico Holdings, A.S. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by the Navico Defendants by Condatis LLC.(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 136 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 115 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Fifth Affirmative Defense (Laches) filed by Defendant Comnav filed by Comnav Marine Ltd.. Replies due by 9/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Martin) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
First Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Comnav Marine Ltd..(Berger, Martin) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 143 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Attorney Dale Paul DiMaggio. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/23/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc..(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Notice of Removal from Courts Electronic Service List) by Dale Paul DiMaggio. by U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC, United Maritime Group, Inc., Yokogawa Corporation of America, Yokogawa Denshikiki Co., Ltd., Yokogawa Electric Corporation. Responses due by 9/7/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiMaggio, Dale) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Furuno Electric Co., Ltd., Furuno U.S.A., Inc. of Removal of Mark A. Romance from CM/ECF Electronic List (Romance, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT YOKOGAWA CORPORATION OF AMERICA ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT YOKOGAWA DENSHIKI CO, LTD. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 132 Motion to Continue Certain Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Denying 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Atlantic Radio Telephone, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/17/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike 115 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Fifth Affirmative Defense (Laches) filed by Defendant Comnav by Condatis LLC. Responses due by 9/2/2010 (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to Counterclaim by Condatis LLC.(Wolkov, Sandra) Modified on 8/17/2010 (ls). (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Denying 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims is DENIED. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 115 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim By Defendant Comnav by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION to Continue Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Condatis LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint,,,,,, by Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff shall have up through and including 8/13/2010 to respond to the Counterclaim. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 126 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff shall respond to the Counterclaim by 9/7/2010. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/10/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 118 and 119 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Mitchell S. Feller and Jonathan M. Sobel. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/9/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 115 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Comnav Marine, Ltd. by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/8/2010, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Navico Defendants by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Yokagawa Electric Corporation by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Yokagawa Denshikiki Co., Ltd. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Yokogawa Corporation of America by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/18/2011 before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 1/11/2011 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2010. Discovery due by 11/19/2010. Expert Discovery due by 11/19/2010. Fact Discovery due by 11/19/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 9/1/2010. In Limine Motions due by 12/17/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2010. Motions due by 12/17/2010. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/4/2011. (See Orders for full details.) Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck for Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/30/2010. (wc) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Samyung Enc Co. Ltd. served on 5/27/2010, answer due 6/17/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan M. Sobel. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 323. (cw) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mitchell S. Feller. Filing Fee $ 75. Receipt # 32. (cw) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Condatis LLC's response is now due on 8/8/2010, as requested in the motion. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/19/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comnav Marine Ltd. (Berger, Martin) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Comnav Marine Ltd..(Berger, Martin) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sandra Kaja Wolkov (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT FURUNO U.S.A., INC. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/14/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT FURUNO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/14/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc.'s response is due no later than 8/13/2010. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/15/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE of Interested Party by Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc., Navico UK Ltd. (Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Furuno USA, Inc. by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Furuno Electric Co., Ltd. by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT OCEANFAST LLC ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT OCEANFAST PTY. LTD. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT AUSTAL USA LLC ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT AUSTAL SHIPS PTY LTD. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT AUSTAL LIMITED ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 87 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 86 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,. US Mail returned for: return to sender insufficient address unable to forward. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided.U S MAIL returnedfor Alan Abbot glen (rb) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint,,,,,, by Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meeks, Thomas) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED MARITIME GROUP, INC. ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/28/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT U.S. UNITED OCEAN SERVICES, LLC ONLY. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/28/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Navico UK Ltd., Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc..(Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Oceanfast LLC by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Oceanfast Pty. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Austal USA LLC by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Austal Ships by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Austal Limited by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying 88 Motion to Quash. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/24/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant United Maritime Group, Inc. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by Fred Leidecker. (tb) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/16/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The responsive pleadings from these two defendants shall, however, be filed no later than 6/29/2010. No further extensions will be granted. This is a paperless order. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/15/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Nautic Control Solutions LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Anthony George, # 2 Exhibit B, License and Support Agreement (extract), # 3 Exhibit C, Web Portal Subscription (extract, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Defendants Austal USA LLC and Oceanfast LLC by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint by Fred Leidecker. (ail) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael D. McCoy. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/3/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey Connor. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/3/2010. (ccg) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Navico Inc. served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Yokogawa Corporation of America served on 4/21/2010, answer due 5/12/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc. served on 5/6/2010, answer due 5/27/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting in part 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atlantic Radio Telephone has until 6/30/2010 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2010. (cm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 6/30/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit King Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Wolkov Declaration)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/30/2010. (cm) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint by Atlantic Radio Telephone Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weiss, Aaron) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Michael D. McCoy. Filing Fee $75.00. Receipt # 1-1111 (yc) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Jeffrey Connor. Filing Fee $75.00. Receipt # 1-1112 (yc) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint by U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC, United Maritime Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiMaggio, Dale) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear by Jeffrey Connor Pro Hac Vice with Fee by Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc., Navico UK Ltd.. Responses due by 6/10/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear by Michael D. McCoy Pro Hac Vice with Filing Fee by Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc., Navico UK Ltd.. Responses due by 6/10/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT MYLES MARINE ELECTRONICS INC. Signed by Judge Paul C. Huck on 5/18/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT INTELISEA LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/14/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT HALCYON INTERNATIONAL PTY. LTD. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/14/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT WESTPORT SHIPYARD, INC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/14/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ARCTURUS MARINE SYSTEMS INC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS QUANTUM CONTROLS BV, QUANTUM STABILIZERS, INC., AND QUANTUM MARINE ENGINEERING. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS HOLLAND AMERICA LINE, INC., HAL ANTILLEN N.V. AND HOLLAND AMERICA LINE, N.V. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS CHEOY LEE SHIPYARDS, LTD., AND CHEOY LEE SHIPYARDS NORTH AMERICA, INC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS NAIAD MARITIME GROUP, INC., AND NAIAD DYNAMICS US, INC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS ROLLS ROYCE NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS INC., AND ROLLS ROYCE PLC. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS CAMPER & NICHOLSONS INTERNATIONAL, INC., AND RODRIGUEZ GROUP, S.A. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. (cm) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Westport Shipyard, Inc. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Halcyon International Pty. Ltd. by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filings for Brian G. Bodine. Filing Fee $75.00. Receipt # 0477 (yc) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Myles Marine Electronics Inc. must respond by 6/28/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Yokogawa Corporation of America must respond by 8/5/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010.[This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 8/2/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/12/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, by Nautic Control Solutions LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Anthony George)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, For Insufficient Process or Service of process, and/or Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, ( Responses due by 6/1/2010) by Nautic Control Solutions LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Botros, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re 33 Notice (Other). Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#47]. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#46]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Condatis LLC (ls)(See Image at DE # 33 ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Settlement by Condatis LLC (ls)(See Image at DE # 33 ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan Wall on behalf of Furuno Electric Co., Ltd., Furuno U.S.A., Inc. (Wall, Ethan) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Amended Complaint by Furuno Electric Co., Ltd., Furuno U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit "A")(Romance, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Anthony Romance on behalf of Furuno Electric Co., Ltd., Furuno U.S.A., Inc. (Romance, Mark) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Myles Marine by Condatis LLC (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Myles Marine Electronics Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Myles Marine Electronics Inc.(ts) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting in part 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 6/15/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/10/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 6/1/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/10/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint by Yokogawa Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiMaggio, Dale) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Furuno Electric Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 5/4/2010, answer due 8/2/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Yokogawa Electric Corporation waiver sent on 5/7/2010, answer due 8/5/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Yokogawa Denshikiki Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 5/7/2010, answer due 8/5/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Westport Shipyard, Inc. served on 4/21/2010, answer due 5/12/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Intelisea (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, by Westport Shipyard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Priscilla Jimenez on behalf of Westport Shipyard, Inc. (Jimenez, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC response due 5/25/2010; United Maritime Group, Inc. response due 5/25/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/7/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant Navico Inc., must respond to complaint by 6/28/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/7/2010. [This is a paperless Order.] (cm) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re 23 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint for Austal and Oceanfast Defendants by Condatis LLC. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants NAIAD (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Patrick Jacobs on behalf of Westport Shipyard, Inc. (Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 7 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint,,,,,, by U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC, United Maritime Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiMaggio, Dale) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Navico Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Thomas) link added on 5/7/2010 (ail). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas E Scott, Jr on behalf of Navico Holding A.S., Navico Inc., Navico UK Ltd. (Scott, Thomas) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. U.S. United Ocean Services, LLC served on 4/14/2010, answer due 5/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. United Maritime Group, Inc. served on 4/14/2010, answer due 5/5/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Oceanfast LLC served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Nautic Control Solutions LP served on 4/21/2010, answer due 5/12/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Myles Marine Electronics Inc. served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Intelisea LLC served on 4/22/2010, answer due 5/13/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Furuno U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Austal USA LLC served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Arcturus (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Camper & Nicholsons and Rodriguez Defendants (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Quantum (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Rolls Royce (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Holland America (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE by Condatis LLC of Settlement and Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendants Cheoy Lee (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
First AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Arcturus Marine Systems Inc. et al (jc) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed (Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jc) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case - Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties indicated on docket entry # 1 (complaint). Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. (jc) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Chief Judge Federico A. Moreno (jc) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against CONDATIS LLC. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-2775723, filed by CONDATIS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- '575 Patent, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- '321 Patent, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C -- '926 Patent, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D --'649 Patent, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summon(s) Summons #1, # 7 Summon(s) Summons #2, # 8 Summon(s) Summons #3, # 9 Summon(s) Summons #4, # 10 Summon(s) Summons #5, # 11 Summon(s) Summons# 6, # 12 Summon(s) Summons #7, # 13 Summon(s) Summons #8, # 14 Summon(s) Summons #9, # 15 Summon(s) Summons #10, # 16 Summon(s) Summons #11, # 17 Summon(s) Summons #12, # 18 Summon(s) Summons #13, # 19 Summon(s) Summons #14, # 20 Summon(s) Summons #15, # 21 Summon(s) Summons #16, # 22 Summon(s) Summons #17, # 23 Summon(s) Summons #18, # 24 Summon(s) Summons #19, # 25 Summon(s) Summons #20, # 26 Summon(s) Summons #21, # 27 Summon(s) Summons #22, # 28 Summon(s) Summons #23, # 29 Summon(s) Summons #24, # 30 Summon(s) Summons #25, # 31 Summon(s) Summons #26, # 32 Summon(s) Summons #27, # 33 Summon(s) Summons #28, # 34 Summon(s) Summons #29, # 35 Summon(s) Summons #30, # 36 Summon(s) Summons #31, # 37 Summon(s) Summons #32, # 38 Summon(s) Summons #33, # 39 Summon(s) Summons #34, # 40 Summon(s) Summons #35, # 41 Summon(s) Summons #36, # 42 Summon(s) Summons #37, # 43 Summon(s) Summons #38, # 44 Summon(s) Summons #39, # 45 Summon(s) Summons #40)(Wolkov, Sandra) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 155 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?