Personal Voice Freedom, LLC v. YMAX Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:10-cv-81410-KLR
District Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 7:58 PM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Personal Voice Freedom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Astigarraga Davis Mullins & Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Giuliano +1 305 372 8282 +3728 372 372 8202 dgiuliano@astidavis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Maurice Mullins +1 305 372 8282 +3728 372 372 8202 emullins@astidavis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Morgan & Amerson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Mike Amerson +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 mamerson@wmalaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R. Rodgers +1 713 934 7000 mrodgers@wmalaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danny L. Williams +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 dwilliams@wmalaw.com
v.
No Logo Magicjack LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Johnson +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet T. Munn +1 305 375 7592 +1 305 982 1521

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia K. DeMarchi +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 vdemarchi@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Elzweig +1 650 335 7178 melzweig@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
No Logo TigerJet Network, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Johnson +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet T. Munn +1 305 375 7592 +1 305 982 1521

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia K. DeMarchi +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 vdemarchi@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Elzweig +1 650 335 7178 melzweig@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
No Logo Vocaltec Communications Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Johnson +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet T. Munn +1 305 375 7592 +1 305 982 1521

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia K. DeMarchi +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 vdemarchi@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Elzweig +1 650 335 7178 melzweig@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
No Logo Ymax Communications Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "YMax Communications Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Johnson +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet T. Munn +1 305 375 7592 +1 305 982 1521

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia K. DeMarchi +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 vdemarchi@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Elzweig +1 650 335 7178 melzweig@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
No Logo Ymax Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer J. Johnson +1 949 640 8222 +1 949 640 8294

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet T. Munn +1 305 375 7592 +1 305 982 1521

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia K. DeMarchi +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 vdemarchi@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Elzweig +1 650 335 7178 melzweig@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl Michael Woo +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 dwoo@fenwick.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 0271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER CLOSING CASE granting [97] Motion to Dismiss Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/11/2012. (yha)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 98 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
    Clerks Notice to Filer re [96] Stipulation of Dismissal, [97] MOTION to Dismiss [64] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, [60] Amended Complaint,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (asl)
      LREF
      Blank 97 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/9/2012 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss [64] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, [60] Amended Complaint, by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Responses due by 7/23/2012. See [96] for image. (asl)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION of Dismissal and Motion for Dismissal by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) Modified to add missing event [97] Motion to Dismiss on 7/9/2012 (asl).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 95 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
          Endorsed ORDER granting [94] Motion for Extension of Time. The stay of this action entered in the Courts November 15, 2011 Order (DE 86)is hereby extended through and including July 24, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/15/2012. (kdn)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/14/2012, Terminated: 6/15/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay to July 24, 2012 and NOTICE of Final Settlement Agreement, re [86] Order on Motion to Stay by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Responses due by 7/2/2012 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kruse, Regan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [92] Joint Motion to Extend Stay. The stay of this action entered in the Courts November 15, 2011 Order (DE 86) is hereby extended through and including June 14, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 6/12/2012. (ar2)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012, Terminated: 6/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay to June 14, 2012 re [86] Order on Motion to Stay by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2012 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kruse, Regan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 91 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: 5/7/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                  Endorsed ORDER granting [90] Motion for Extension of Time. The Joint Motion to Extend the Stay is GRANTED for the purpose of allowing the parties to conclude their settlement. The stay of this action entered in the November 15, 2011 Order, is hereby extended through and including May 31, 2012. The parties shall have until May 31, 2012 to comply with the courts Order of November 15, 2011 [DE 86]. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 5/7/2012. (kdn)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012, Terminated: 5/7/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay to May 31, 2012 re [89] Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP. Responses due by 5/21/2012 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting [88] Joint Motion to Extend Stay. The Parties Shall have Until May 3, 2012 to Comply with [86] ORDER Granting Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/3/2012. (ar2)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012, Terminated: 4/4/2012 Motion for Extension of Time
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Stay by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Responses due by 4/19/2012 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel - Douglas J. Giuliano (Mullins, Edward)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Terminate Attorneys
                            Attorney Douglas J. Giuliano terminated. (ls)(per DE #87)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                              ORDER Granting Motion to Stay; re [78] Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/15/2011. (asl)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP of Filing Recent PTO Decision Granting Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Munn, Janet)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Response in Support of Motion
                                  RESPONSE in Support re [78] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte Reexamination of U.S.Patent No. 7,336,544 filed by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Munn, Janet)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [78] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10)(Mullins, Edward)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 82 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                      Endorsed ORDER granting [81] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [78] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law. Response due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/29/2011. (kdn)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: 9/29/2011, Terminated: 9/29/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [78] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [78] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law. Response due by 10/11/2011 (kdn)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 09/15/2011 before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp, 1-10 pages, Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2011. (sf)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 79 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp: Status Conference held on 9/15/2011. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin, 561-514-3768 / Stephen_Franklin@flsd.uscourts.gov (kb)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011, Terminated: 11/15/2011 Motion to Stay
                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Ex Parte ReExamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,336,654 and Memorandum of Law by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP. Responses due by 9/30/2011 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit 2)(Munn, Janet)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Endorsed OrderCourt Filing
                                                  *Endorsed Order: The 10:30 a.m. September 15, 2011 status hearing has been RESET for 11:00 a.m. on September 15, 2011. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 9/8/2011. (kdn)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
                                                    Reset Hearings pre DE [77] Status Conference set for 9/15/2011 11:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (tp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [70] Joint Motion of the Parties to Extend Interim Pretrial Deadlines and Request for Markman Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/25/2011. (wc)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Order Setting Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Resetting Hearing: Status Hearing set for 9/15/2011 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/18/2011. (asl)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Endorsed OrderCourt Filing
                                                          *Endorsed Order: The Court issues this order to clarify the time of the September 15, 2011 status hearing. The hearing will occur at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/16/2011. (kdn)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Order Setting Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/15/2011 08:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/11/2011. (asl)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing ( Status Hearing set for 9/15/2011 11:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp). Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 8/10/2011. (asl)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                NOTICE by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP re [70] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Interim Pretrial Deadlines and Request for Markman Hearing and Memorandum of Law re [50] Scheduling Order,Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Interim Pretrial Deadlines and Request for Markman Hearing and Memorandum of Law re [50] Scheduling Order, Notice of Filing Proposed Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011, Terminated: 8/25/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Interim Pretrial Deadlines and Request for Markman Hearing and Memorandum of Law re [50] Scheduling Order, by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP. Responses due by 8/4/2011 (Munn, Janet)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority re [66] Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) Regarding Defendants' Responsive Brief Regarding Claim Construction by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Munn, Janet)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Mediation report
                                                                      FINAL REPORT of Mediation Disposition: Impasse(Gilchrist, Brian)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                                        RESPONSE/REPLY to [66] Response/Reply (Other), Response/Reply (Other) by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                                          RESPONSE/REPLY to [61] Notice (Other) Defendants' Responsive Brief Regarding Claim Construction by TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., magicJack LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A-Declaration of Forys with Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B-Declaration of Shamilov with Exhibits)(Munn, Janet)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC.(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                              Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Voice Freedom, LLC by YMax Communications Corp., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc..(Munn, Janet)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                Endorsed ORDER granting [62] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants responsive claim construction is now due June 3, 2011, andPlaintiffs reply is now due June 17, 2011. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 5/16/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011, Terminated: 5/16/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Responses due by 6/3/2011 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to May 6, 2011 claim construction brief. Responses due by 6/3/2011. Replies due by 6/17/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC of Filing Opening Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                        Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                          Endorsed ORDER granting [58] Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/29/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011, Terminated: 4/29/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Errata Third Amended Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/27/2011 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Scheduling Mediation. Mediation Hearing set for 6/17/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/25/2011. (asl)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                Joint NOTICE by Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. re [52] Order Referring Case to Mediation of Filing of Proposed Order Setting Mediation (Munn, Janet) Modified on 4/21/2011 (ls).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Endorsed ORDER granting [54] Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have to and including April 21, 2011 to provide the Court with the name of the mediator and the date, time and location of mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/7/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011, Terminated: 4/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Time for the Parties to Comply with the Courts Order of Referral to Mediation re [52] Order Referring Case to Mediation by Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp.. Responses due by 4/25/2011 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011 Notice of trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF TRIAL. Calendar Call set for 10/31/2012 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (asl)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011 Order Referring Case to MediationCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER of Referral to Mediation. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/22/2011. (asl)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/22/2011. (asl)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendants by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC.(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                              STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Magicjack LP, Personal Voice Freedom, LLC, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. (Munn, Janet) Modified on 3/18/2011 (ls).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2011. Discovery due by 1/9/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2011. In Limine Motions due by 9/24/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2012. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/24/2012.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 3/15/2011. (asl)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Voice Freedom, LLC by Magicjack LP, YMax Communications Corp., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, TigerJet Network, Inc..(Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Magicjack LP, Personal Voice Freedom, LLC, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Endorsed ORDER denying as moot [35] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [35] Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/4/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Endorsed ORDER granting [42] Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 2/4/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011, Terminated: 2/4/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Endorsed ORDER granting [40] Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may have until February 8, 2011 to hold a scheduling meeting. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/20/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011, Terminated: 1/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Meeting Report by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Endorsed ORDER granting [38] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/20/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Justin G. Hulse. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 12800. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Endorsed ORDER granting [36] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [35] MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support. Response due by 2/7/2011. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 1/12/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [35] MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support. Responses due by 2/7/2011 (kdn)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [35] MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011, Terminated: 2/4/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss [5] Amended Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law in Support by Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp.. Responses due by 1/24/2011 (Munn, Janet). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 1/6/2011 (tp).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Endorsed ORDER granting [28] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting [29] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting [30] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting [31] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting [32] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting [33] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/17/2010. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/17/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danny L. Williams. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 11290. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Jennifer J. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9426. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION of Virginia K. DeMarchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9423. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION of Darryl M. Woo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9424. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Saina S. Shamilov to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9425. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of Marc S. Elzweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 9427. (ksa)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Endorsed ORDER granting [25] Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting [26] Motion for Leave to Appear, both for pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/6/2010. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Endorsed ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to amended complaint. Responses due by 1/5/2011. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 12/3/2010. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Notice of Unavailability
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. for dates of December 14, 2010 through Janaury 4, 2011 (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by VocalTec Communications, Ltd. (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by TigerJet Network, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent YMAX Corporation for TigerJet Network, Inc. (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magicjack LP identifying Corporate Parent YMAX Corporation, Other Affiliate YMax Holdings Corporation for Magicjack LP (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by YMax Communications Corp. identifying Corporate Parent YMAX Corporation for YMax Communications Corp. (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by YMAX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent VocalTec Communications Ltd. for YMAX Corporation (Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/3/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [5] Amended Complaint Until January 5, 2011 by Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., VocalTec Communications, Ltd., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Munn, Janet)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Magicjack LP response due 1/5/2011; TigerJet Network, Inc. response due 1/5/2011; VocalTec Communications, Ltd. response due 1/5/2011; YMAX Corporation response due 1/5/2011; YMax Communications Corp. response due 1/5/2011. (kdn)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to VocalTec Communications, Ltd. on November 23, 2010 by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Waiver of Service due by 12/23/2010. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Matthew R. Rodgers to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Fee paid: $75.00 Receipt# 9922 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(vp)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for J. Mike Amerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Fee Paid: $75.00 Receipt# 9922 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(vp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/17/2010. (sh)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. TigerJet Network, Inc. served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. Magicjack LP served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. YMax Communications Corp. served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. YMAX Corporation served on 11/15/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Form AO 120/121
                                                                                                                                                                                              FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (gme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to VocalTec Communications, Ltd. (asl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on [5] Amended Complaint filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC into CM/ECF. (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re [5] Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties indicated on [de#]. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC (Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp., filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Mullins, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC re [1] Complaint, of Filing Exhibit "A" to Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Giuliano, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp. (gme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp (gme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/25/2011 Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Magicjack LP, TigerJet Network, Inc., YMAX Corporation, YMax Communications Corp.. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3297868, filed by Personal Voice Freedom, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s))(Mullins, Edward) Modified event for MJSTAR on 8/25/2011 (wc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 289 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?