Shelby Jean Bell
Bankruptcy Case Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-60022
District Judge C. Ray Mullins, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nancy J. Whaley, Trustee
No Logo Shelby Jean Bell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark & Washington, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. L. Clark +1 404 522 2222 +1 404 220 0685
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/13/2006, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Service of Order Closing Estate Service Date 08/13/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
    Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee and Closing Estate. Service by BNC. (mag, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
      Final Report and Accounting Filed by Nancy J. Whaley on behalf of Nancy J. Whaley. (Whaley, Nancy)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 105 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?