United Parcel Service, Inc. et al v. Arrivalstar S.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01206
District Judge Julie E. Carnes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United Parcel Service, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley Cameron Achey +1 404 881 4930 wachey@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick John Flinn +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 patrick.flinn@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Maxwell +1 404 253 6957 dmmaxwell@duanemorris.com
v.
No Logo ArrivalStar, SA, Defendant
No Logo Arrivalstar, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Arrivalstar USA Corp."
No Logo Melvino Technologies, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Melvino Technologies Limited"

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvino Technologies Limited
No Logo Melvino Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss this suit without prejudice. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 05/23/08. (fap) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maxwell, David) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service. Plaintiff is allowed through and including Friday, December 21, 2007 in which to effectuate service of process on defendants. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 12/11/07. (fap) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service with Brief In Support by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion for Enlargement of Time to Effectuate Service# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Achey, Wesley) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
          Return of Service Unexecuted as to Melvino Technologies, Inc. (ryc) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
            Return of Service Unexecuted as to Arrivalstar S.A. (ryc) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Arrivalstar USA Corp. (ryc) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arrivalstar S.A., Melvino Technologies Limited, Melvino Technologies, Inc., filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Achey, Wesley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE to serve the defendant(s) by SATURDAY, 9/22/07 re 1 Complaint. (kb) (Entered: 08/19/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Arrivalstar S.A., Melvino Technologies Limited, Melvino Technologies, Inc. (ddm) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2007 (ryc). Modified on 9/20/2007 to attach correct PDF per phone call from attorney (ryc). (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Summons Issued as to Arrivalstar S.A.. (epm) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 565367.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit A - Part 3# 4 Exhibit A - Part 4# 5 Exhibit B - Part 1# 6 Exhibit B - Part 2# 7 Exhibit B - Part 3# 8 Exhibit B - Part 4# 9 Exhibit C - Part 1# 10 Exhibit C - Part 2# 11 Exhibit C - Part 3# 12 Exhibit C - Part 4# 13 Exhibit D# 14 Civil Cover Sheet)(epm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 204 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?