ORDER GRANTING 246 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. The Defendants' request for judicial notice is GRANTED as to Exhibit A and DENIED as to Exhibits B through L. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file a motion to amend the consolidated complaint on or before 3/16/2009, in accordance with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/28/2009. (kt) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Interim Co-Lead Counselby Niagara Frontier Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann in Support of Motion for Substitution of Interim Co-Lead Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
ORDER GRANTING 253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Othni J. Lathram terminated. Mike Freeman Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. will continue to be represented by Whatley Drake & Kallas, LLC and all other counsel of record having appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/10/2008. (kt) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
MOTION to Withdraw Othni J. Lathram as Attorneyby Mike Freeman Chevrolet-Buick, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Lathram, Othni) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
RESPONSE in Support re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint , Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Fedex Freight Corporation, FedEx National LTL, Inc.. (Ellis, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
REPLY to Response to Motion re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Fedex Freight Corporation, FedEx National LTL, Inc.. (Ellis, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
RESPONSE in Opposition re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Gregory K. Arenson filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit C)(Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
RESPONSE in Opposition re 246 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Javillonar on behalf of SAIA, Inc., SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC (Javillonar, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2008. (Court Reporter Nick Marrone.)(jdb) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE. There are fifty-one (51) cases that were filed in the above-captioned multidistrict litigation action (the MDL Action) that is pending before this Court. On May 16, 2008, one of these cases was dismissed, leaving fifty (50) cases remaining. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the fifty (50) individual cases in the MDL Action currently pending before this Court, and which are listed on the Attachment to this Order, shall be consolidated into a single action. The case styled of the action shall be (In Re: Shipping Services Antitrust Litigation), Action No. 1:08-md-1895-WSD. All parties are DIRECTED to file future pleadings in the consolidated MDL Action only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Fifty cases shall be administratively and statistically closed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/24/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(kt) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
STIPULATED ORDER ESTABLISHING PRESERVATION PROTOCOL. The Parties hereby stipulated that they shall observe the following Protocol: 1. ESI refers to any electronically stored information in the possession custody or control of the parties to this action. 2. ESI is to be interpreted broadly. 3. Preservation is to be interpreted broadly to accomplish the goal of preserving, while maintaining the integrity, of all ESI and documents reasonably anticipated to be subject to discovery in this action. 4. The Parties shall take all reasonable steps necessary to preserve throughout the duration of the above-captioned litigation: (a) Excluding ESI addressed in paragraphs 4(b), (c) and (d), all documents and ESI created from 1/1/2001 through 12/31/2007; (b) A single set of transaction-level data for domestic LTL shipments accepted for transportation from 1/1/2001 through 7/31/2009; (c) Georgia ledger data, and such information as each party may maintain in the ordinary course of business that is sufficient to show overhead; (d) Such information as each party may maintain in the ordinary course of business that is sufficient to show total capacity and excess capacity. 5. The Parties agree that they will use good faith efforts to avoid imposing excessive costs and burdens upon each other regarding the preservation of ESI. 6. The Parties shall circulate retention notices designed to ensure the preservation of ESI. 6. The Parties shall circulate retention notices designed to ensure the preservation of information reasonably anticipated to be subject to discovery. 7. Any party will give 30-day advance written notice in the event the party intends not to retain any pertinent current or legacy system software or hardware. 8. The Parties may, without leave of the Court, agree in writing that certain documents, ESI or categories of documents or evidence need not be preserved. 9. Unless the Court orders otherwise, each party shall bear its own costs in preserving and retaining any documents. 10. By agreeing to preserve ESI or documents in accordance with the terms hereof, the Parties are not waiving any objection to the ultimate discoverability or admissibility of such information. 11. By agreed to this Protocol, the Parties are not waiving any rights to object to any claims of spoliation of potentially relevant information. 12. Nothing herein shall be deemed to affect the Parties' obligations to preserve hardcopy documents. 13. This Order may be amended by agreement of counsel for the parties in the form of a written stipulation filed with the Court and subject to the Court's approval, except in accordance with paragraph 8. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 6/17/2008. (kt) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Janecek on behalf of Farm Water Technological Services, Inc., C.B.J.T., Inc., Rocket Motorcycles, Inc. (Janecek, Frank) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 5/30/2008 held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: Discussion re: preservation order issues. Parties will work to iron out remaining issue(s) and report back to the Court by 6/13/2008. Pltfs agree to consolidate all cases into a single consolidated case to remain here under this Court's jurisdiction. (Court Reporter Nicholas Marrone.)(kt) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' contacts with Defendants' current employees and Plaintiffs' contacts with Defendants' former employees. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/27/08. (dfb) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Kaplan, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2008 held before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: First scheduled status conf held with the Court. Pltfs anticipate being able to file the Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before 5/23/2008, if this deadline cannot be met, the Court should be notified immediately. The Parties Joint Document Preservation plan shall be submitted to the Court by 5/23/2008. The Parties intend to file a Joint Proto by 5/16/2008, but no later than 5/23/2008. Regarding the issue of contact with Dfts former employees, the parties shall, by 5/21/2008, provide to the Court a draft of a provision that tracks what the Court proposed, minus any discussion on how to document the interview sheets with Dfts' Cnsl; a decision on those matters will be made by the Court at a later date. In the meantime, Pltfs will consider allowing the interview sheets to be shared with the Court for in camera review prior to the start of discovery. A copy of the joint draft re: Pltf's contact with Dfts former employees shall be sent to the Court for editing and approval before inclusion in the Parties joint stipulation. (Court Reporter Nicholas Marrone.)(kt) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Shelquist on behalf of Lawrence F. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shelquist, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner on behalf of Lawrence F. Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bruckner, W.) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
ORDER re: 221 Pretrial Conference. Based on representations made to the Court at the April 15, 2008 Initial Conference, the Court understands that 53 individual cases in this MDL will be consolidated into a single action in this Court. The Action will center on the Clayton Act and Sherman Act allegations of price fixing for fuel surcharges. A consolidated amended complaint will simplify and focus this case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court sets the following schedule for the initial matters in this case. (1) Plaintiffs shall file and serve their consolidated amended complaint by 5/16/2008; (2) Defendants shall file and serve a single consolidated answer or a single, consolidated motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint by June 18, 2008; (3) If a consolidated motion to dismiss is filed by the Defendants, Plaintiffs shall have until July 23, 2008 to file and serve their response to that motion; (4) Defendants shall file and serve their reply to Plaintiff's response to the motion by August 15, 2008; and (5) All filings shall be served electronically and shall be deemed received on the date of electronic service. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/22/2008. (kt) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
ORDER re 220 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robert G. Abrams as Defendants' Liaison Counsel in the Interim Conference of April 15, 2008, the Court hereby ORDERS that Robert G. Abrams of Howrey LLP is appointed as Liaison Counsel for the Defendants. Mr. Abrams will facilitate and coordinate communications between the Court and the Defendants and will serve as the point of contact for the Court on behalf of Defendants. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/17/2008. (kt) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
ORDER re: 161 Motion to Appoint Counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Rule 23(g)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court APPOINTS as Interim Co-Lead Counsel the law firms Couglin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP; Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C.; Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP; and Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman LLC. Co-Lead Counsel shall be responsible for conducting the prosecution of this litigation on behalf of plaintiffs and the putative class (the Class). Co-Lead Counsel shall have duties and responsibilities commensurate with those set forth in the Manual for Complex Litigation (Fourth) at Section 10.221, (See order for specific duties.) The Court APPOINTS the law firm of Doffermyre Shields Canfield Knowles & Devine as Interim Liaison Counsel. Liaison Counsel shall have duties and responsibilities commensurate with the Manual for Complex Litigation (Fourth) at Section 10.221, including facilitating and expediting communications with and among plaintiffs' counsel and fulfilling such other duties as requested by the Court and/or Co-Lead Counsel. (See order for specific duties.) This Order shall apply to all actions currently included in MDL No. 1895, as well as all subsequent tag-a-long actions related to this action. A copy of this Order shall be served by Co-Lead Counsel on counsel for Plaintiffs in all subsequent related actions. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 4/17/2008. (kt) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
Minute Entry for Preliminary Hearing (Pretrial Conference) held on 4/15/2008 before Judge William S. Duffey, Jr: The Court will consider Pltf's 161 Motion to Appoint Interim and Liaison Counsel by Monday. Dfts shall file a motion to appoint liaison counsel. Pltfs shall inform the Court as soon as possible once they have determined whether all cases will remain here in this district following discovery. Counsel for both sides shall work together in an effort to come to an agreement by April 30 on a document preservation plan. Parties shall submit their joint proposed protective order to the Court by April 30. The Court will conduct monthly teleconferences with counsel to discuss the status of the case and resolve any potential issues that may arise. (Attachments: # 1 Attendance Roster) (Court Reporter Nicholas Marrone.)(kt) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by THE HARMAN PRESS. (1:08-cv-1345-WSD). Originally filed in the Central District of California, Los Angeles Division. (2:07-cv-6792-DSF)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/08/2008)
RESPONSE re 161 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead and Liason Counsel "Plaintiff Pacific Coast Systems, Inc.'s and Plaintiff BB Limited's 'Response' to the So-called 'Vast-Majority' of Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Interim Four-Way Co-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel filed by BB LIMITED, Pacific Coast Systems. (McShane, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by Soup Bases Loaded, Inc. (1:08-cv-1270-WSD). Originally filed on 10/05/2007 in the Central District of California (5:07-cv-1411-VAP-JCR).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/01/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Water Technological Services, Inc. by Farm Water Technological Services, Inc..(Calkins, Mary Lynne) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. SAIA, Inc. served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. United Parcel Service, Inc. served on 11/5/2007, answer due 11/25/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Sun Capital Partners IV, LLC served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Roadway Express, Inc. served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Yellow Transportation, Inc. served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. YRC Worldwide, Inc., served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Jevic Transportation, Inc. served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. R+L Carriers, Inc. served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. ABF Freight System, Inc. served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Arkansas Best Corporation served on 10/31/2007, answer due 11/20/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. FedEx National LTL, Inc. served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Fedex Corporation served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Fedex Freight Corporation served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Watkins Motor Lines served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Return of Service Executed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. Averitt Express, Inc. served on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strates Enterprises, Inc. by Strates Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan A. Sanders on behalf of Casco Bay Imports Inc, Barjan, LLC, Tex-Tech Industries, Inc. (Sanders, Megan) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Paul Hansel on behalf of Casco Bay Imports Inc, Barjan, LLC, Tex-Tech Industries, Inc. (Hansel, Gregory) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Co-Lead and Liason Counsel with Brief In Support by LTL Shipping Services Antitrust Litigation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Lynne Calkins, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Robert N. Kaplan, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of A. Hoyt Rowell III, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Calkins, Mary Lynne) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Motor Freight,Inc. identifying Other Affiliate NEMF World Transport, Inc., Other Affiliate Eastern Freight Ways, Inc., Other Affiliate Carrier Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Apex Logistics, Inc. for New England Motor Freight,Inc. by New England Motor Freight,Inc..(Farrell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by INKJETSINC.COM OF FLORIDA, INC. (1:08-cv-901-WSD). Originally filed in the Middle District of Florida on 8/16/2007 (2:07-cv-518-JES)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by KENNETH FOX SUPPLY CO. (1;08-c-847-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 11/13/2007 (3:07-cv-2166).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by A&A BEAUTY SUPPLY INC. (1:08-cv-846-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 11/19/2007) 3:07-cv-2162-DMS).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by Strates Enterprises, Inc. (1:08-cv-845-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 11/08/2007. (3:07-2161-BEN)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/17/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by Freeman Industries, LLC. (1:08-cv-844-WSD). Originally filed Southern District of California on 11/05/2007. (3:07-cv-2118)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/17/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Weissman on behalf of USF Reddaway, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc.,, Roadway Express, Inc., Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. (Weissman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alternative Rubber & Plastics, Inc. by Alternative Rubber & Plastics, Inc..(Doffermyre, Everette) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
ORDER GRANTING 113 Motion to Modify Setting Initial Conference filed on 3/11/2008, the Court hereby modifies its March 3, 2008 Order Setting Initial Conference as follows: Paragraph 1 - The initial conference will be conducted at 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, 4/15/2008. Paragraph 1(a) - Each party should advise the Court by 3/28/2008, who will represent it at the pretrial conference. Paragraph 2 - Any items proposed to be added to the pretrial conference agenda should be made on or before 3/21/2008. Paragraph 3(c) - Preliminary reports will be submitted to the Court by 4/4/2008. Paragraph 6 - Applications for lead and steering appointments must be filed with the Clerk's office in the MDL Action on or before 4/4/2008. The Order Setting Initial Conference entered March 3, 2008, except as modified herein, remains in full force and effect. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/12/2008. (cc: by lead counsels) (kt) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Meyer on behalf of USF Reddaway, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc.,, Roadway Express, Inc., Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. (Meyer, David) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Barile, III on behalf of USF Reddaway, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc.,, Roadway Express, Inc., Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. (Barile, Peter) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Yanosy, Ryan Sandrock, Steven A. Ellis, and Samuel R. Miller on behalf of Fedex Corporation, Fedex Freight Corporation, and FedEx National LTL, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by WILLIAM R. JAWORSKI, d/b/a GREAT NORTHERN ENGINEERING. (1:08-cv-843-WSD). Originally file in the Southern District of California on 11/07/2008 (3:07-cv-2103).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/12/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by POLYMERICS, INC. (1:08-CV-841-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 9/28/2007 (3:07-cv-1902)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/12/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by HITCH-IT, INC. (1:08-cv-840-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 9/28/2007 (3:07-cv-1901).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/12/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Don Walter Kitchen Distributors, Inc. (1:08-CV-842-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 10/3/2007 (3:07-cv-1939).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/12/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Price on behalf of Averitt Express, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Charles) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Samel on behalf of Averitt Express, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Samel, Charles) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Joint MOTION to Amend 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, re: Setting of Initial Conference with Brief In Support by Brian Barnard's Flooring America, Inc. (Doffermyre, Everette) Modified on 3/19/2008 to remove excess punctuation. (kt). (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by New England Motor Freight, Inc. (See document for affiliated parties). (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01895-WSD et al.(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Selia M. Acevedo on behalf of UPS, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., Overnite Corporation, UPS Freight Inc. (Acevedo, Selia) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Motor Carriers Rate Conference Inc. Southern Motor Carriers Rate Conference Inc. has no parent organization, no subsidiaries, and no affiliated companies. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Con-Way, Inc. and Con-Way Freight, Inc., See document for parties, by Con-Way, Inc. and Con-Way Freight, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by ANDREA MAY (1:08-CV-839-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 9/24/2008 (3:07-cv-1862).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/11/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by SLATER/MARINOFF & CO. (1:08-cv-838-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 9/17/2007 (3:07-1812)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/11/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Quinn, Jr on behalf of Jevic Transportation, Inc. and Sun Capital Partners IV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Edwards on behalf of Jevic Transportation, Inc. and Sun Capital Partners, IV, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Boyd T. Cloern, and Leiv H. Blad, Jr on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. has no parent company, subsidiaries or affiliated companies.(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. by Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc., no parent, subsidiary, or affiliated corporations or entities. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
Certificate of Interested Persons by UPS, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., Overnite Corporation, UPS Freight Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Parcel Service General Services Co., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Co., Other Affiliate FCI Holdings International B.V. in liquidation, Other Affiliate Fritz Trans-Shoes Agenciamento De Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais, Ltda., Other Affiliate Frizante & Partners C.V., Other Affiliate Lynx Holdings. B.V., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Agenciamento de Transportes de Carga E Logistica do Brasil Ltda, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Poland Sp.zo.o. in Liquidation, Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation (P.R.) Inc., Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation Company Inc., Other Affiliate PLD Projekt-Logistik-Dienstleistung GmbH in Liquidation, Other Affiliate St David's Way (Nuneaton) Limited, Other Affiliate Staples UPS Business Services (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Ukraine Parcel Service, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espaa Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Services, Other Affiliate 2091671 Ontario Inc., Other Affiliate 724352 Ontario Limited, Other Affiliate Atlasair Limited, Other Affiliate Border Brokerage Company, Inc., Other Affiliate BSC Footwear Supplies Limited, Other Affiliate BT Property Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Property, LLC, Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate BT-Newyo, LLC, Other Affiliate BT-OH, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Carryfast Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Carryfast Limited, Other Affiliate Condel, LLC, Other Affiliate ConnectShip, Inc., Other Affiliate Crossroads Dist. Ctr. Property Owners Assn. Corp., Other Affiliate Elsil Corporation, Other Affiliate Emery Air Freight Limited, Other Affiliate Emery Transnational Air Cargo Corporation, Other Affiliate Evind Corporation, Other Affiliate FIB Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE SBA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Air Freight (Taiwan) Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Airfreight-Subic, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Botswana (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies India (H.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Israel T. Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Customs Brokers S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz Express Logistica Integrada Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz International Insurance Brokers, Other Affiliate Fritz Logistics Phils., Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Ocean Freight (Bangladesh) Ltd., Other Affiliate Frizante B.V., Other Affiliate FTI (Philippines) Inc., Other Affiliate Glenview Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Mail Boxes Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Great Plains Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate H.A. & J.L. Wood, Inc., Other Affiliate Intertrans Consulting Services Limited, Other Affiliate iShip, Inc., Other Affiliate ITTS GmbH, Other Affiliate J.F.T. Sea-Air Consolidation Limited, Other Affiliate Lacalos Corporation, Other Affiliate Logistics (Holdings) Limited, Other Affiliate Logistics Far East (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Logistics Far East Company Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Euroexpress Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express B.V., Other Affiliate LYNX Express GmbH, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Management Services Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Pension Trustees Limited, Other Affiliate Mail Boxes Etc., Inc., Other Affiliate Mathieu, Other Affiliate Mayberry, LLC, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding (Thailand) Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Korea Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Japan Corporation, Other Affiliate Merchants Parcel Delivery, Other Affiliate Miles Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nevair Corporation, Other Affiliate Overnite Employee Disaster Relief Fund, Other Affiliate Park Freight International Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate Parkprop, Inc., Other Affiliate Project & Contract Logistics GmbH, Other Affiliate PT UPS Cardig International, Other Affiliate Qingdao Fritz Transportation International Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Quota Computer Service GmbH, Other Affiliate RealAmerica Co., Other Affiliate Red Star Limited, Other Affiliate Red Star Parcels Limited, Other Affiliate Saskan Corporation, Other Affiliate SCI Clement Ader, Other Affiliate SCI De La Boule D'or, Other Affiliate SCI De Lesquin, Other Affiliate SCI Du Chateau De L'Isle, Other Affiliate SCI Faraday, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Fontenay, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Marseille, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Nancy, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Strasbourg, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Val D'oise, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Var, Other Affiliate Shanghai Outer Gao Qiao Fritz Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shenzhen Fritz Warehouse Distribution Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Solacal Company, Other Affiliate The Orly Company L.L.C., Other Affiliate The UPS Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Trailer Conditioners, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans-Border Customs Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Transportadora Maritima de Carga S.A., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Bahrain) WLL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (BY), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KAZ) LLP, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KZ) LTD, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (M) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (RUS) o.o.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Transport) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (UAE) LLC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Belgium NV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Cayman Islands Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service CSTC Ireland Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Czech Republic, s.r.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Chile Limitada, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc & Co OHG, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espana Ltd Y Compania SRC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Finland Oy, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service France SNC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Italia SRL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Japan Y.K., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Jersey Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nederland BV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nigeria Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Pty. Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Singapore Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Speditionsgesellschaft m.b.h., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Sweden AB, Other Affiliate Fu Sheng Industrial Development (Shenzhen) Limited, Other Affiliate PT. UPS SCS Indonesia, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. for ; Other Affiliate United Parcel Service General Services Co., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Co., Other Affiliate FCI Holdings International B.V. in liquidation, Other Affiliate Fritz Trans-Shoes Agenciamento De Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais, Ltda., Other Affiliate Frizante & Partners C.V., Other Affiliate Lynx Holdings. B.V., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Agenciamento de Transportes de Carga E Logistica do Brasil Ltda, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Poland Sp.zo.o. in Liquidation, Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation (P.R.) Inc., Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation Company Inc., Other Affiliate PLD Projekt-Logistik-Dienstleistung GmbH in Liquidation, Other Affiliate St David's Way (Nuneaton) Limited, Other Affiliate Staples UPS Business Services (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Ukraine Parcel Service, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espaa Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Services, Other Affiliate 2091671 Ontario Inc., Other Affiliate 724352 Ontario Limited, Other Affiliate Atlasair Limited, Other Affiliate Border Brokerage Company, Inc., Other Affiliate BSC Footwear Supplies Limited, Other Affiliate BT Property Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Property, LLC, Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate BT-Newyo, LLC, Other Affiliate BT-OH, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Carryfast Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Carryfast Limited, Other Affiliate Condel, LLC, Other Affiliate ConnectShip, Inc., Other Affiliate Crossroads Dist. Ctr. Property Owners Assn. Corp., Other Affiliate Elsil Corporation, Other Affiliate Emery Air Freight Limited, Other Affiliate Emery Transnational Air Cargo Corporation, Other Affiliate Evind Corporation, Other Affiliate FIB Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE SBA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Air Freight (Taiwan) Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Airfreight-Subic, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Botswana (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies India (H.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Israel T. Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Customs Brokers S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz Express Logistica Integrada Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz International Insurance Brokers, Other Affiliate Fritz Logistics Phils., Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Ocean Freight (Bangladesh) Ltd., Other Affiliate Frizante B.V., Other Affiliate FTI (Philippines) Inc., Other Affiliate Glenview Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Mail Boxes Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Great Plains Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate H.A. & J.L. Wood, Inc., Other Affiliate Intertrans Consulting Services Limited, Other Affiliate iShip, Inc., Other Affiliate ITTS GmbH, Other Affiliate J.F.T. Sea-Air Consolidation Limited, Other Affiliate Lacalos Corporation, Other Affiliate Logistics (Holdings) Limited, Other Affiliate Logistics Far East (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Logistics Far East Company Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Euroexpress Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express B.V., Other Affiliate LYNX Express GmbH, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Management Services Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Pension Trustees Limited, Other Affiliate Mail Boxes Etc., Inc., Other Affiliate Mathieu, Other Affiliate Mayberry, LLC, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding (Thailand) Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Korea Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Japan Corporation, Other Affiliate Merchants Parcel Delivery, Other Affiliate Miles Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nevair Corporation, Other Affiliate Overnite Employee Disaster Relief Fund, Other Affiliate Park Freight International Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate Parkprop, Inc., Other Affiliate Project & Contract Logistics GmbH, Other Affiliate PT UPS Cardig International, Other Affiliate Qingdao Fritz Transportation International Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Quota Computer Service GmbH, Other Affiliate RealAmerica Co., Other Affiliate Red Star Limited, Other Affiliate Red Star Parcels Limited, Other Affiliate Saskan Corporation, Other Affiliate SCI Clement Ader, Other Affiliate SCI De La Boule D'or, Other Affiliate SCI De Lesquin, Other Affiliate SCI Du Chateau De L'Isle, Other Affiliate SCI Faraday, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Fontenay, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Marseille, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Nancy, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Strasbourg, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Val D'oise, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Var, Other Affiliate Shanghai Outer Gao Qiao Fritz Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shenzhen Fritz Warehouse Distribution Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Solacal Company, Other Affiliate The Orly Company L.L.C., Other Affiliate The UPS Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Trailer Conditioners, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans-Border Customs Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Transportadora Maritima de Carga S.A., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Bahrain) WLL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (BY), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KAZ) LLP, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KZ) LTD, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (M) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (RUS) o.o.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Transport) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (UAE) LLC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Belgium NV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Cayman Islands Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service CSTC Ireland Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Czech Republic, s.r.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Chile Limitada, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc & Co OHG, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espana Ltd Y Compania SRC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Finland Oy, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service France SNC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Italia SRL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Japan Y.K., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Jersey Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nederland BV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nigeria Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Pty. Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Singapore Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Speditionsgesellschaft m.b.h., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Sweden AB, Other Affiliate Fu Sheng Industrial Development (Shenzhen) Limited, Other Affiliate PT. UPS SCS Indonesia, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. for ; Other Affiliate United Parcel Service General Services Co., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Co., Other Affiliate FCI Holdings International B.V. in liquidation, Other Affiliate Fritz Trans-Shoes Agenciamento De Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais, Ltda., Other Affiliate Frizante & Partners C.V., Other Affiliate Lynx Holdings. B.V., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Agenciamento de Transportes de Carga E Logistica do Brasil Ltda, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Poland Sp.zo.o. in Liquidation, Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation (P.R.) Inc., Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation Company Inc., Other Affiliate PLD Projekt-Logistik-Dienstleistung GmbH in Liquidation, Other Affiliate St David's Way (Nuneaton) Limited, Other Affiliate Staples UPS Business Services (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Ukraine Parcel Service, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espaa Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Services, Other Affiliate 2091671 Ontario Inc., Other Affiliate 724352 Ontario Limited, Other Affiliate Atlasair Limited, Other Affiliate Border Brokerage Company, Inc., Other Affiliate BSC Footwear Supplies Limited, Other Affiliate BT Property Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Property, LLC, Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate BT-Newyo, LLC, Other Affiliate BT-OH, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Carryfast Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Carryfast Limited, Other Affiliate Condel, LLC, Other Affiliate ConnectShip, Inc., Other Affiliate Crossroads Dist. Ctr. Property Owners Assn. Corp., Other Affiliate Elsil Corporation, Other Affiliate Emery Air Freight Limited, Other Affiliate Emery Transnational Air Cargo Corporation, Other Affiliate Evind Corporation, Other Affiliate FIB Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE SBA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Air Freight (Taiwan) Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Airfreight-Subic, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Botswana (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies India (H.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Israel T. Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Customs Brokers S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz Express Logistica Integrada Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz International Insurance Brokers, Other Affiliate Fritz Logistics Phils., Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Ocean Freight (Bangladesh) Ltd., Other Affiliate Frizante B.V., Other Affiliate FTI (Philippines) Inc., Other Affiliate Glenview Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Mail Boxes Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Great Plains Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate H.A. & J.L. Wood, Inc., Other Affiliate Intertrans Consulting Services Limited, Other Affiliate iShip, Inc., Other Affiliate ITTS GmbH, Other Affiliate J.F.T. Sea-Air Consolidation Limited, Other Affiliate Lacalos Corporation, Other Affiliate Logistics (Holdings) Limited, Other Affiliate Logistics Far East (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Logistics Far East Company Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Euroexpress Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express B.V., Other Affiliate LYNX Express GmbH, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Management Services Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Pension Trustees Limited, Other Affiliate Mail Boxes Etc., Inc., Other Affiliate Mathieu, Other Affiliate Mayberry, LLC, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding (Thailand) Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Korea Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Japan Corporation, Other Affiliate Merchants Parcel Delivery, Other Affiliate Miles Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nevair Corporation, Other Affiliate Overnite Employee Disaster Relief Fund, Other Affiliate Park Freight International Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate Parkprop, Inc., Other Affiliate Project & Contract Logistics GmbH, Other Affiliate PT UPS Cardig International, Other Affiliate Qingdao Fritz Transportation International Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Quota Computer Service GmbH, Other Affiliate RealAmerica Co., Other Affiliate Red Star Limited, Other Affiliate Red Star Parcels Limited, Other Affiliate Saskan Corporation, Other Affiliate SCI Clement Ader, Other Affiliate SCI De La Boule D'or, Other Affiliate SCI De Lesquin, Other Affiliate SCI Du Chateau De L'Isle, Other Affiliate SCI Faraday, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Fontenay, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Marseille, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Nancy, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Strasbourg, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Val D'oise, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Var, Other Affiliate Shanghai Outer Gao Qiao Fritz Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shenzhen Fritz Warehouse Distribution Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Solacal Company, Other Affiliate The Orly Company L.L.C., Other Affiliate The UPS Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Trailer Conditioners, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans-Border Customs Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Transportadora Maritima de Carga S.A., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Bahrain) WLL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (BY), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KAZ) LLP, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KZ) LTD, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (M) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (RUS) o.o.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Transport) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (UAE) LLC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Belgium NV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Cayman Islands Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service CSTC Ireland Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Czech Republic, s.r.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Chile Limitada, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc & Co OHG, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espana Ltd Y Compania SRC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Finland Oy, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service France SNC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Italia SRL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Japan Y.K., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Jersey Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nederland BV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nigeria Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Pty. Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Singapore Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Speditionsgesellschaft m.b.h., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Sweden AB, Other Affiliate Fu Sheng Industrial Development (Shenzhen) Limited, Other Affiliate PT. UPS SCS Indonesia, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. for ; Other Affiliate United Parcel Service General Services Co., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Co., Other Affiliate FCI Holdings International B.V. in liquidation, Other Affiliate Fritz Trans-Shoes Agenciamento De Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais, Ltda., Other Affiliate Frizante & Partners C.V., Other Affiliate Lynx Holdings. B.V., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Agenciamento de Transportes de Carga E Logistica do Brasil Ltda, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Poland Sp.zo.o. in Liquidation, Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation (P.R.) Inc., Other Affiliate Overnite Transportation Company Inc., Other Affiliate PLD Projekt-Logistik-Dienstleistung GmbH in Liquidation, Other Affiliate St David's Way (Nuneaton) Limited, Other Affiliate Staples UPS Business Services (Beijing) Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Ukraine Parcel Service, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espaa Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Services, Other Affiliate 2091671 Ontario Inc., Other Affiliate 724352 Ontario Limited, Other Affiliate Atlasair Limited, Other Affiliate Border Brokerage Company, Inc., Other Affiliate BSC Footwear Supplies Limited, Other Affiliate BT Property Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Property, LLC, Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty II, Inc., Other Affiliate BT Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate BT-Newyo, LLC, Other Affiliate BT-OH, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate C.C. & E. I, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Carryfast Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Carryfast Limited, Other Affiliate Condel, LLC, Other Affiliate ConnectShip, Inc., Other Affiliate Crossroads Dist. Ctr. Property Owners Assn. Corp., Other Affiliate Elsil Corporation, Other Affiliate Emery Air Freight Limited, Other Affiliate Emery Transnational Air Cargo Corporation, Other Affiliate Evind Corporation, Other Affiliate FIB Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE Business Loans Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate FNBNE SBA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Air Freight (Taiwan) Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Airfreight-Subic, Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Botswana (Proprietary) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies India (H.K.) Limited, Other Affiliate Fritz Companies Israel T. Ltd., Other Affiliate Fritz Customs Brokers S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz Express Logistica Integrada Transportes Nacionais e Internacionais S.A., Other Affiliate Fritz International Insurance Brokers, Other Affiliate Fritz Logistics Phils., Inc., Other Affiliate Fritz Ocean Freight (Bangladesh) Ltd., Other Affiliate Frizante B.V., Other Affiliate FTI (Philippines) Inc., Other Affiliate Glenview Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Global Mail Boxes Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Great Plains Management Services, LLC, Other Affiliate H.A. & J.L. Wood, Inc., Other Affiliate Intertrans Consulting Services Limited, Other Affiliate iShip, Inc., Other Affiliate ITTS GmbH, Other Affiliate J.F.T. Sea-Air Consolidation Limited, Other Affiliate Lacalos Corporation, Other Affiliate Logistics (Holdings) Limited, Other Affiliate Logistics Far East (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Logistics Far East Company Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Euroexpress Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express B.V., Other Affiliate LYNX Express GmbH, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Management Services Limited, Other Affiliate Lynx Express Pension Trustees Limited, Other Affiliate Mail Boxes Etc., Inc., Other Affiliate Mathieu, Other Affiliate Mayberry, LLC, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding (Thailand) Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding India Private Limited, Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Forwarding Korea Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Menlo Worldwide Japan Corporation, Other Affiliate Merchants Parcel Delivery, Other Affiliate Miles Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nevair Corporation, Other Affiliate Overnite Employee Disaster Relief Fund, Other Affiliate Park Freight International Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate Parkprop, Inc., Other Affiliate Project & Contract Logistics GmbH, Other Affiliate PT UPS Cardig International, Other Affiliate Qingdao Fritz Transportation International Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Quota Computer Service GmbH, Other Affiliate RealAmerica Co., Other Affiliate Red Star Limited, Other Affiliate Red Star Parcels Limited, Other Affiliate Saskan Corporation, Other Affiliate SCI Clement Ader, Other Affiliate SCI De La Boule D'or, Other Affiliate SCI De Lesquin, Other Affiliate SCI Du Chateau De L'Isle, Other Affiliate SCI Faraday, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Fontenay, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Marseille, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Nancy, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Strasbourg, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Val D'oise, Other Affiliate SCI Locabat Var, Other Affiliate Shanghai Outer Gao Qiao Fritz Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Shenzhen Fritz Warehouse Distribution Service Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Solacal Company, Other Affiliate The Orly Company L.L.C., Other Affiliate The UPS Foundation, Inc., Other Affiliate Trailer Conditioners, Inc., Other Affiliate Trans-Border Customs Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Transportadora Maritima de Carga S.A., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Bahrain) WLL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (BY), Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KAZ) LLP, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (KZ) LTD, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (M) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate UNITED PARCEL SERVICE (RUS) o.o.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (Transport) Sdn Bhd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service (UAE) LLC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Belgium NV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Cayman Islands Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service CSTC Ireland Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Czech Republic, s.r.o., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Chile Limitada, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc & Co OHG, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Deutschland Inc., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Espana Ltd Y Compania SRC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Finland Oy, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service France SNC, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Italia SRL, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Japan Y.K., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Jersey Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nederland BV, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Nigeria Ltd., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of America, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service of Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Pty. Limited, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Singapore Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Speditionsgesellschaft m.b.h., Other Affiliate United Parcel Service Sweden AB, Other Affiliate Fu Sheng Industrial Development (Shenzhen) Limited, Other Affiliate PT. UPS SCS Indonesia, Other Affiliate United Parcel Service, Inc. for. (Bos, Jacqueline) Modified on 3/11/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brian Barnard's Flooring America, Inc. of List of Affiliated Companies & Counsel (Doffermyre, Everette) Modified on 3/19/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berle Enterprises, Inc. of List of Affiliated Companies & Counsel (Doffermyre, Everette) Modified on 3/19/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berle Manufacturing Company of List of Affiliated Companies & Counsel (Doffermyre, Everette) Modified on 3/19/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR NOTICE by R+L Carriers, Inc. of Addition of Counsel for R&L Carriers, Inc. (Hinton, John). Modified on 3/18/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel Robert S. Brewer, Jr. and Ross H. Hyslop are withdrawn. W. Perry Brandt, of Bryan Cave, LLP is lead counsel for Defendants SAIA, Inc. and SAIS Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fedex Corporation, Fedex Freight Corporation, FedEx National LTL, Inc. by Fedex Corporation, Fedex Freight Corporation, FedEx National LTL, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Affiliated Companies, # 2 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (See list for affiliates) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alum-A-Lift, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bressner Resources, Inc. for Alum-A-Lift, Inc. by Alum-A-Lift, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Certificate of Interested Persons by Averitt Express, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Averitt Incorporated, Other Affiliate Averitt Maintenance, Other Affiliate Averitt Customs Brokers, LLC, Other Affiliate Averitt Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Averitt Aviation Group Inc., Other Affiliate Averitt Air Inc., Other Affiliate FirstExpress, Inc., Other Affiliate FirstLease, Inc., Other Affiliate First Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate FirstFinance & Properties Inc., Other Affiliate FirstFleet, Inc., Other Affiliate AP Investments, LLC for Averitt Express, Inc.. (Jackson, Gregory) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory B. Koltun on behalf of UPS, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., Overnite Corporation, UPS Freight Inc. (Koltun, Gregory) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T. Freidman on behalf of UPS, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., Overnite Corporation, UPS Freight Inc. (Freidman, Paul) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Certificate of Interested Persons by ABF Freight Systems, Inc., Arkansas Best Corporation identifying Other Affiliate ABF Aviation, LLC, Other Affiliate ABF Cartage, Inc., Other Affiliate ABF Farms, Inc., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System (B.C.), Ltd., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System de Mexico, Inc., Other Affiliate Arkansas Best Airplane Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate CaroTrans Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate CaroTrans de Mexico, S.A. DE C.V., Other Affiliate Data-Tronics Corp., Other Affiliate FleetNet America, Inc., Other Affiliate FreightValue, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Supply Chain Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Land-Marine Cargo, Inc., Other Affiliate Motor Carrier Insurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate Transport Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Corporation, Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Real Estate Corporation, Other Affiliate ABF Freight System, Inc. for ; Corporate Parent Arkansas Best Corporation, Other Affiliate ABF Aviation, LLC, Other Affiliate ABF Cartage, Inc., Other Affiliate ABF Farms, Inc., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System (B.C.), Ltd., Other Affiliate ABF Freight System de Mexico, Inc., Other Affiliate Arkansas Best Airplane Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate CaroTrans Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate CaroTrans de Mexico, S.A. DE C.V., Other Affiliate Data-Tronics Corp., Other Affiliate FleetNet America, Inc., Other Affiliate FreightValue, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Supply Chain Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Land-Marine Cargo, Inc., Other Affiliate Motor Carrier Insurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate Transport Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Corporation, Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate Tread-Ark Real Estate Corporation for. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Favretto, Richard) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Seventh Certificate of Interested Persons by Watkins Motor Lines identifying Other Affiliate Watkins Associated Developers, Inc., Other Affiliate Freight Terminals, Inc., Other Affiliate Land Span Motor Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate Navajo Western Land Company, Other Affiliate Provident Broadcasting Company, Other Affiliate Sunco Brokers, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunco Carriers, Inc., Other Affiliate Tampa Maid Foods, Inc. ("TM"), Other Affiliate Metcalf Shell Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Cox's Wholesale Seafood, Inc., Other Affiliate South Beach Seafood, Inc., Other Affiliate Tucker Door & Trim Corp., Other Affiliate Waco Fire & Casualty Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Watkins Associated Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Canada Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Equipment & Terminals Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins International, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Investment L.P., Other Affiliate Watkins Leasing, LLC, Other Affiliate Watkins Motor Equipment, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Payroll Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Retail Development, LLC, Other Affiliate Wilwat Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Wilwat Realty, Inc., Other Affiliate Watkins Motor Lines, Inc., Other Affiliate Land Span, Inc. for. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Subsidiaries)(Digel, Gregory) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by BRIAN BARNARD'S FLOORING AMERICA INC. 1:07-cv-2364-WSD. Filed in NDGa on 9/27/2007.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/10/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Abrams on behalf of YRC Worldwide, Inc.,, Roadway Express, Inc., Yellow Transportation, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. (Abrams, Robert) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Baker on behalf of ABF Freight Systems, Inc., Arkansas Best Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baker, Joseph) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Favretto on behalf of ABF Freight Systems, Inc., Arkansas Best Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Favretto, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay A. Aragon, James N. Knight, Joel S. Sanders, Brian M. Lutz, and Jeffrey Todd Thomas on behalf of Con-Way, Inc. and Con-Way Freight, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) Modified on 3/6/2008 (kt). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Perry Brandt, Seema Chawla, Julie Wescott O'Dell, and Terence J. Thum on behalf of SAIA, Inc. and SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Travis C. Wheeler, Marguerite S. Willis, and David C. Eddy on behalf of Southeastern Freight Lines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Rubenstein on behalf of New England Motor Freight, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Filing)(kt) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott French on behalf of AAA Cooper Transportation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Attorney Service List)(French, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Bos on behalf of UPS, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., Overnite Corporation, UPS Freight Inc. (Bos, Jacqueline) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Farrell, Thomas F. Cullen, Jr, Richard G. Stuhan on behalf of New England Motor Freight, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01895-WSD et al.(kt) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by J. Timothy Hobbs, Brian K. McCalmon, and James R. Weiss on behalf of Southern Motor Carriers Rate Conference Inc. (kt) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Loftin, Douglas M. Garrou, and Ray V. Hartwell, III on behalf of Estes Express Lines, Inc. (kt) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Counsel David P. Silk by SAIA, Inc. Perry Brandt of Bryan Cave, LLP is lead counsel for defendant SAIA. (kt) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by ROCKET MOTORCYCLES, INC. (1:08-CV-664-WSD). Originally filed in the Southern District of California on 9/10/2008. (3:07-cv-1780-BEN-RBB).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/04/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand file by GREENMAN, INC. (1:08-CV-695-WSD). Originally filed in the District of New Jersey on 11/21/2007 (1:07-cv-5611).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/04/2008)
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CONFERENCE: The cases listed on Schedule A to this Court's Pretrial Order No. 1, entered on February 26, 2008 (PTO# 1), and subsequently amended and filed on March 3, 2008, have been included in this MDL Action. To commence management of pretrial discovery and processing of this litigation, the Court hereby orders and Initial Pretrial Conference with the Court shall be conducted on 3/28/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2306 before Judge William S. Duffey Jr. To minimize costs and facilitate a manageable conference, the parties are not all required to attend the conference. Parties with similar interests are encouraged to confer and seek to agree to the extent practicable on one or more attorneys to act in their collective interests at the conference. Attendance at the conference will not waive objections to jurisdiction, venue or service. Each party is directed to advise the Court by 3/21/2008, by email to the Court's Deputy Courtroom Clerk, who will represent it at the pretrial conference. Counsel for Plaintiffs and for Defendants will submit to the Court by 3/22/2008, their joint brief written statement outlining the facts involved in the litigation and identifying critical factual issues. No motion may be filed under Federal Rules 11, 12, or 56 without leave of Court. This order shall apply to related cases later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. Plaintiffs and Defendants are urged to try to seek agreement on who to recommend as their lead counsel, steering committee and liaison counsel in this litigation. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(kt) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by DAD'S PRODUCTS, COMPANY, INC. (1:08-cv-663-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California on 9/7/2007 (3:07-cv-1765).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/29/2008: # 1 Main Document) (kt). (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by C&L TRADING OF MIAMI, INC. (1:08-cv-662-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California (3:07-cv-1764).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Zwisler on behalf of Averitt Express, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 JPML Attorney Service List)(Zwisler, Margaret) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by NIAGARA FRONTIER DISTRIBUTION, INC. (1:08-cv-661-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California (3:07-cv-1728).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by FARM WATER TECHNOLOGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND C.B.J.T., INC. (1:08-cv-660-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California on 7/30/2007 (3:07-cv-1389).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by DOUGLAS & STURGESS, INC. (1:08-cv-637-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California. (3:07-cv-5757).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by FAYUS, INC. (1:08-cv-626-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California on 12/12/2007, (2:07-cv-6276).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by PACIFIC COAST SYSTEMS. (1:08-CV-625-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California on 10/19/2007, (3:07-cv-5369).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/29/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by ALUM-A-LIFT, INC. (1:08-CV-593-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of California on 10/31/2007, 3:07-555-MMC.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/27/2008)
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER. This order shall govern the initial procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL Panel) pursuant to its order of December 20, 2007, and also shall govern all related actions originally filed in this Court, or transfered or removed to this Court (the MDL Action). This Order also governs the procedure in (i) any tag-along actions transferred to this Court by the MDL Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, and (ii) any related actions subsequently filed, removed or transferred (other than by the MDL Panel) to this Court. All counsel who appeared in a transferor district in any case previously or hereafter transferred to this Court by the MDL Panel are deemed to have made their appearance in this Court in the MDL Action. Counsel in any case hereafter filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court (other than a transfer by the MDL Panel) and which becomes a case in the MDL Action are required to enter an appearance in this Court. Non-resident attorneys in any case consolidated into the MDL Action are not required to apply for permission to appear in the MDL action, as is ordinarily required by the Court's Local Rule 83.1B(1). LR 83.1B(1), ND Ga. All attorneys of record must immediately, but no later than the sooner of March 5, 2008 or five (5) calendar days after a case is transferred to the MDL Action, register with the Court's CM/ECF system. All filings in this MDL Action shall be made electronically using this Court's CM/ECF system, subject to the exceptions prescribed in this Court's Administrative Procedures for Filings. Filings in the cases in the MDL Action shall bear the identification (MDL DOCKET NO. 1895). When a filing relates to all cases in the MDL Action, the MDL docket number shall be followed by the notation ALL CASES. If the filing relates to fewer than all cases in the MDL Action, the individual docket numbers for those action to which the filing relates shall be listed in the caption of the filing. Each filing in an MDL Action shall be filed in the MDL Action and in each individual case to which the filing applies. Until an order is entered following the initial pretrial conference, all filings shall be served electronically on each attorney listed as counsel for a party in the MDL Action. (See order for additional details). Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 2/26/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A)(kt) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
COMPLAINT filed with jury demand by MILLENIUM HOMES REALTY, LLC. (1:08-cv-627-WSD). Originally filed in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on 9/19/2007, 2:07-cv-3895.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/26/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by Mike Freeman Chevrolet-Buick, Inc. (1:08-cv-549-WSD). Originally filed in the Northern District of Alabama on 10/03/2007, 6:07-cv-1817-JEO.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/22/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by SHREEJI INTERNATIONAL MARKET (1:08-cv-533-WSD). Originally filed in the MD Tennessee on 11/16/2007 3:07-cv-1123.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/20/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by THE CLASSY COOK. (1:08-cv-532-WSD). Originally filed in the District of New Jersey on 10/02/2007 1:07-cv-4759.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/20/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by CHAMPION PARTS, INC. (1:08-cv-531-WSD). Originally filed 0n 9/28/2007 in the District of New Jersey 1;07-cv-4650.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/20/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by PCM COMPANY. (1:08-cv-530-WSD) Originally filed in the District of New Jersey (Camden) on 09/24/2007. 1:07-cv-4513.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/20/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by D'S PET SUPPLIES, INC. (1:08-cv-517-WSD). Originally filed in the Eastern District of Michigan on 9/24/2007 5:07-cv-14022-JCO.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/20/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand, filed by M & J COMMUNICATIONS INC. (1:08-cv-465-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Maine (Portland) 2:07-cv-201-GZS.(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/13/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by KRAFT CHEMICAL COMPANY. (1:08-CV-464-WSD) Originally filed in the District of Maine on 10/25/2008 (2:07-cv-190-GZS)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/13/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by GLOBAL WIRE INC., WYRE WYND LIFE WIRE, INC. and MONTGOMERY WIRE CORP. (1:08-CV-475-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Connecticut (3:07-cv-1192).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/12/2008)
COMPLAINT, filed by CASCO BAY IMPORTS INC. (1:08-cv-463-WSD) Originally filed in USDC District of Maine (2:07-cv-179).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/12/2008)
COMPLAINT, filed by BREWTON ENTERPRISES, INC. (1:07-CV-0429-WSD). Originally file in the District of Columbia. (1:07-cv-1937). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT, filed by BEN ARCHERY CO INC. (1:08-cv-428-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Columbia (1:07-cv-1927). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT with Jury demand filed by PRECIX, INC. (1:07-cv-427-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Columbia on 10/25/2007. (1:07-cv-1926) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2008: # 2 Main Document) (kt). (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by BB LIMITED. (1:08-cv-426-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Columbia on 10/24/2007. (1:07-cv-1920).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by NUTEX MANUFACTURING COMPANY LLC. (1:08-cv-425-WSD) Originally filed in the District of Columbia. (1:07-cv-1886)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by THOMPSON TRADING COMPANY. (1:08-cv-422-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Columbia on 10/18/2007. (1:07-cv-1885).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT, filed by ALTERNATIVE RUBBER & PLASTICS INC. (1:08-cv-423). Originally filed in District of Columbia on 10/10/2007. (1:07-cv-1827). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT, filed by ZAZA INC. (1:08-cv-422-WSD). Originally filed in the District of Columbia on 10/5/2007 (1:07-cv-1803).(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/07/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by ATLANTIS CARIBBEAN CHEMICAL CORP. (1:08-cv-398). Originally filed in the District of Columbia on 2/6/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/06/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by ISSAC INDUSTRIES, INC. (1:08-cv-387). Originally filed in the District of Columbia (Washington DC) on 9/17/2007. (kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 2/7/2008 (kt). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
ORDER of Multidistrict Litigation re: Transfer of cases (as outlined in this order). (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2008: # 1 Main Document) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2008: # 2 Tag Along Actions) (kt). (Entered: 02/05/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand, filed by COMPUTER MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL. (1:08-cv-278) Originally filed in ND Ohio on 8/30/2007. (kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/28/2008)
COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by ABM INTERNATIONAL (1:08-cv-244). (kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.(kt). (Entered: 01/24/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by LAWRENCE F. THOMPSON. (1:08-cv-208) Originally filed in the District of New Jersey on 9/6/2007. (kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 2/5/2008 (kt). (Entered: 01/22/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by BARJAN, LLC. (1:07-cv-3212) (originally filed in the District of Maine)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (kt). (Entered: 01/08/2008)
COMPLAINT filed by TEX-TECH INDUSTRIES, INC. (1:07-cv-3211) (originally filed in the District of Maine)(kt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (KT) (Entered: 01/07/2008)