Life University, Inc v. Council on Chiroprac, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00004
District Judge Charles A. Moye, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Life University, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Powers Pyles Sutter & Verville PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley A. Freeman +1 202 466 6550
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherry Mastrostefano Gray +1 202 466 6550

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary M. Brockington +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 mmb@sbllaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Bernard Huffman +1 678 347 2200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
v.
No Logo Paul D. Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Sarah Gere

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Paul Galanek +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 chris.galanek@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Eugene Orr +1 202 842 8800

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ledoux +1 202 662 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriela Richeimer +1 202 662 2075 +1 202 662 2190 gricheimer@rdblaw.com
No Logo The Council on Chiropractic Education Commission on Accreditation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Sarah Gere

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Paul Galanek +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 chris.galanek@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Eugene Orr +1 202 842 8800

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ledoux +1 202 662 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriela Richeimer +1 202 662 2075 +1 202 662 2190 gricheimer@rdblaw.com
No Logo The Council on Chiropractic Education, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Sarah Gere

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Paul Galanek +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 chris.galanek@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Eugene Orr +1 202 842 8800

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Dixon & Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ledoux +1 202 662 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriela Richeimer +1 202 662 2075 +1 202 662 2190 gricheimer@rdblaw.com
No Logo Doctors for Excellence in Chiropractic Education, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by SWANKIN & TURNER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S. Turner +1 202 462 8800 +1 202 265 6564 jim@swankin-turner.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 79 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgment Letter received from C. P. Galanek, Powell Goldstein LLP re 77 Letter to Counsel. (Sealed Material picked up on 1/17/06; no S/M to pick up) (epm) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
    Acknowledgment Letter received re 77 Letter to Counsel. (Sealed Material picked up 1/17/06) (epm) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
      LETTER to Counsel requesting that they pick up their Sealed Material. (epm) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that the permanent injunction entered herein on 8/21/03 is hereby dissolved as of today's date, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees, costs and other expenses, consented to by all parties, Approved by Allen Newman, Dep. Clerk by the Direction of Honorable Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. on 11/21/05. (agn) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None
          Certified copy of ORDER of USCA GRANTING joint motion to dismiss [34-1] appeal, with prejudice; with the parties bearing their own fees and costs; USCA dkt no. 03-11020-JJ (kt) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None
            TRANSCRIPT filed RE: for dates of August 19, 20 & 21, 2003 Court Reporter: Andy Ashley **FILED UNDER SEAL*** (kt) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr., the Court Clerk is directed to maintain all sealed documents underseal until 1/6/06; the Clerk will the return all sealed documents back to counsel for the parties. (cc by CRD) (kt) Modified on 08/25/2003 (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a permanent injunction is entered, and shall remain in effect until 30 days after the COA's final decision in the special accreditation process announced by Life and the Defendants on 6/24/03; it is further ORDERED that this Court retain jurisdiction for the specific and limited purpose of enforcing the foregoing injunction; DISMISSING [1-1] complaint with prejudice. Dfts have agreed to dismiss their [34-1] appeal in the USCA immediately upon execution of this ORDER. Once dfts file their agreed upon motion to dismiss their appeal, all of pla's claims in this litigation are DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties are to bear all of their own attyfees, costs and other expenses. (cc by CRD) (kt) Modified on 08/25/2003 (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr.; order by Court for dismissal; order by the court that Clerk of court hold all sealed documents until 1/06/06 and then return them to counsel for the parties. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. continued. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                      SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. statement to the court by all parties. (kt) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Court Reporter with the firm of Strickland Brockington Lewis, LLP be allowed to bring equipment (Pearl/Corder Micro Cassette recorder, Pearl/Corder, Micro Cassette Dictator/Transcript w/Cord) to Courtroom 2306 of the U.S. Courthouse on 8/19/03 at 11:00 a.m. (cc to Adm by CRD) (kt) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                          Response by defendants to proposed orders and mutual releases served by pla on 8/7/3 at the [65-1] settlement conference. (FILE UNDER SEAL) (kt) (Entered: 08/18/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT filed RE: Motion hearing before Judge Charles A. Moye for dates of 7/31/03 Court Reporter: Therese J. Vesel (adg) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. (kt) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr., Confidential issues of agreement by pla filed under seal, the memo by pla in support of its motion to enforce settlement agreement filed under seal; filed cross motion to enforce confidential issues of agreement under seal; all briefs to be filed by 8/4/3. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Motion HEARING held before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. on Emergency Motion on settlement agreement; hearing set for 7/31/03 at 11:30 a.m. of pla motion to enforce settlement agreement. (kt) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    CONSENT ORDER by Judge Beverly B. Martin, extending time until 8/6/03 for dfts response to [58-1] amd/cmp , and extending disc time until 11/13/03 Discovery ends 11/13/03 (cc) (kt) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [59-1] pro hac vice application of Gabriela A. Richeimer. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        CONSENT ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr., extending time until 7/7/03 for CCEC and Paul D. Walker may respond to pla's [58-1] amended complaint . (cc) (kt) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None
                                          Application for admission of Gabriela A. Richeimer pro hac vice for defendants. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff; jury demand. (kt) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. GRANTING [52-1] motion for leave to amd its complaint for declaratory judgment. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. DENYING [54-1] motion for reconsideration of [53-1] order denying dft's mtn for proto staying disc. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Response by defendants to pla's [52-1] motion for leave to amd its complaint for declaratory judgment. (kt) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/1/2003
                                                    MOTION by defendants for reconsideration of [53-1] order denying dft's mtn for proto staying disc. with brief in support. (kt) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. DENYING [44-1] motion staying discovery, and DEFERRING ruling on [52-1] motion for leave to amd its complaint for declaratory judgment pending dft's response to pla's mtn for lvf to amd. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/6/2003
                                                        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to amd its complaint for declaratory judgment with memoranum of law in support. (kt) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Reponse by plaintiff in opposition to [44-1] motion staying discovery. (kt) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [48-1] pro hac vice application of Amy Ledoux. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [47-1] pro hac vice application of Elizabeth Sarah Gere. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 04/04/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Application for admission of Amy Ledoux pro hac vice for defendants. (to CAM) (kt) Modified on 03/31/2003 (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Application for admission of Elizabeth Sarah Gere pro hac vice for defendants. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT filed RE: for dates of 1/9/03 Court Reporter: Therese J. Vesel. (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [43-1] joint preliminary statement. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 03/26/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/15/2003
                                                                        MOTION by defendants for protective order staying discovery with brief in support and proposed order. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 03/20/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule. (to CAM) (kt) Modified on 03/18/2003 (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Attorney appearance for plaintiff by Thomas Bernard Huffman. (kt) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWERS TO INITIAL DISCLOSURES by plaintiff. (kt) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Certificate of interested persons. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of the proceedings filed RE: for dates of 2/10/03 Court Reporter: Donna C. Keeble. (kt) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Appeal information sheet RE: [34-1] appeal - USCA dkt # 03-11020-J COR due 3/17/03 (All necessary transcript(s) on file) (kac) (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Correspondence from Dr. Jeffrey B. Levey in support of plaintiff. (ck) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Acknowledgment by USCA RE: [34-1] appeal. USCA dkt no. 03-11020-J (kac) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by defendants to extend time until 3/7/03 for filing the joint prelstmt., certifintpty and ansdiscl with proposed order. (kt) (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendants from [28-1] Order FILING FEE $105.00 RECEIPT #501840 Transcript Order Form due 3/11/03 (kac) (Entered: 02/26/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [30-1] pro hac vice application of Anthony Eugene Orr. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. GRANTING [31-1] motion to unseal all pleadings, documents and exhibits filed by Life university, and VACATING the Court's [29-1] Order. (cc) (kt) Modified on 09/30/2003 (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/14/2003
                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff to unseal all pledings, documents and exhibits file by Life university (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 02/18/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Application for admission of Anthony Eugene Orr pro hac vice for defendants. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. GRANTING [16-1] motion to seal those documents which have already been filed under seal, and all such documents will remain under seal, and DENIES pla's motion to seal as to those documents which were not filed under seal, and all such documents will remain sealed. (Order VACATED pursuant to [32-1] order of the Court.) (cc) (kt) Modified on 02/18/2003 (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. GRANTING [2-1] motion for preliminary injunction. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of excerpt proceedings before the Honorable Charles A. Moye, Jr., filed RE: for dates of 2/10/03 Court Reporter: Donna C. Keeble. (kt) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Motion HEARING held before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. DENYING [16-1] motion to seal dfts' responses & exhibits in response to pla's mtn for prelstmt. and GRANTING [2-1] motion for preliminary injunction. (kt) (Entered: 02/12/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY by plaintiff to response to [16-1] motion to seal dfts' responses & exhibits in response to pla's mtn for prelstmt. (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Response by plaintiff to [21-1] and [22-1] supplement to dfts' opposition to [18-1] motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY by Doctors for Excellen to dft's opposition to [18-1] motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief. (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Supplement by defendants to [21-1] its opposition to Doctor's for Excellence in Chiropractic Education's motion for leave to file a Brief Amicus Curiae. (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Response by defendants in opposition to [18-1] motion for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief. (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Response by defendants in opposition to [16-1] motion to seal dfts' responses & exhibits in response to pla's mtn for prelstmt. (kt) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Correspondence requesting a hearing date on the emergency motion for prelinj. by plaintiff. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION by Doctors for Excellen for leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief with brief in support. (kt) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY by plaintiff to response to [2-1] emergency motion for preliminary injunction. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/12/2003
                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff to seal dfts' responses & exhibits in response to pla's mtn for prelstmt. with brief in support. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by CCE to response to [2-1] motion for preliminary injunction. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Letter Memo explaning how the Court will handle documents that the filing party deems confidential and contends should be filed under seal. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendants to complaint [1-1], Discovery ends 6/27/03. (kt) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Memorandum of law by plaintiff in support of [2-1] motion for preliminary injunction. ***Pages 35-57, EXHIBITS 1,2,3,4, and EXHIBITS TO SUPPL. AFF. 1,2,3,7,8,9 & 10 FILED UNDER SEAL*** (Seal lifted pursuant to [32-1] order of the Court.) (kt) Modified on 02/19/2003 (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Response by defendants to [2-1] motion for preliminary injunction. (kt) (Entered: 01/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [5-1] pro hac vice application of Stanley A. Freeman for Life University. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. APPROVING [4-1] pro hac vice application of Sherry Mastrostefano Gray for Life University. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Acknowledgmenet of service executed 1/15/03 as to Council on Chiropractic Education, Inc. (kt) Modified on 01/17/2003 (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Acknowledgment of service executed 1/15/03 as to Council Chiropractic Education Commission of Accreditation. (kt) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment of service executed 1/15/03 as to Paul D. Walker on original complaint. (kt) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Application for admission of Stanley A. Freeman pro hac vice for plaintiff. (kt) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Application for admission of Sherry M. Gray pro hac vice for plaintiff. (to CAM) (kt) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Charles A. Moye Jr. (kt) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                            EMERGENCY MOTION by plaintiff for preliminary injunction with brief in support, Exhibits filed [UNDER SEAL], and proposed order. (Seal lifted pursuant to [32-1] order of the Court.) (aet) Modified on 02/19/2003 (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed with Exhibits filed [UNDER SEAL]. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; demand. FILING FEE $ 150.00 # 499371 (Seal lifted pursuant to [31-1] order of the court.) (aet) Modified on 02/19/2003 (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?