Nugent v. AFC Enterprises, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-00817
District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2018 at 2:59 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alicia Reed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com
TERMINATED: 06/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Henzel +6106608000 888 643 6735 +1 610 660 8080 mhenzel182@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian M. Felgoise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian M Felgoise +1 215 886 1900 felgoiselaw@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Dennis C. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Moskovitz +1 312 521 2000 +6211 621 621 1750

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Carol V. Gilden +1 312 357 0370 +1 312 357 0369 cgilden@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com
No Logo Fred Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maya Saxena +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 msaxena@saxenawhite.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com
No Logo George G. Royal, Plaintiff

Represented by Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Represented by Gardy & Notis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Jr Young +1 330 796 2956

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2003 Christi A. Cannon +1 770 392 0090

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily C. Komlossy +1 954 630 1001 +1 212 818 0477 ekomlossy@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maya Saxena +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 msaxena@saxenawhite.com
No Logo James Nugent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Reise +1 561 750 3000 +7503 750 750 3364 jreise@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLZER HOLZER & FISTEL LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2003 Christi A. Cannon +1 770 392 0090

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R. Adler +1 561 361 5000 radler@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
TERMINATED: 08/19/2003 Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Lynne N. Read, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com
No Logo Mark Rice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com
No Logo Perkins Family Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maya Saxena +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 msaxena@saxenawhite.com
No Logo Thomas Savchick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David A. Bain, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Bain +1 404 724 9990 +1 404 724 9986 dbain@bain-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saxena White, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maya Saxena +1 561 394 3399 +1 561 394 3382 msaxena@saxenawhite.com
No Logo Williams, Mary T., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com
No Logo Yasuo Yaezawa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miller, James D. +1 650 685 7160

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl W. Roper +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MRoper@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evangelista & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/23/2006 David James Worley +1 404 478 7195 +1 404 478 7139 djw@eafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GARDNER MIDDLEBROOKS FLEMING GIBBONS & KITTRELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Landskroner +1 216 522 9000 +1 216 522 9007 jack@lgmlegal.com

Represented by Hoffman & Edelson

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/21/2005 Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 443 5500

Toggle Switch Represented by Pintar, Theodore J

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 818 0477

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert R. Atwood, Jr. +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaun Khojayan & Associates PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Khojayan +1 619 338 9110 +1 619 338 9112 shaun@khojayan.com

Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

v.
No Logo A.f.c. Enterprises Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2004 Lex M. Erwin +1 404 572 4600 lerwin@kslaw.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Pike Tomlinson +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allie Lin +1 212 468 4868 +1 212 468 4800 alin@dglaw.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 jbielema@pogolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Scott Sorrels +1 404 572 6600 ssorrels@pogolaw.com
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank Inc."
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allie Lin +1 212 468 4868 +1 212 468 4800 alin@dglaw.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 jbielema@pogolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Scott Sorrels +1 404 572 6600 ssorrels@pogolaw.com
No Logo Dick R. Holbrook, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2004 Lex M. Erwin +1 404 572 4600 lerwin@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Pike Tomlinson +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536
No Logo Frank Belatti, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Pike Tomlinson +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536
No Logo Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Gerald J. Wilkins, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Pike Tomlinson +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs & Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allie Lin +1 212 468 4868 +1 212 468 4800 alin@dglaw.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Powell Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 6600 +1 404 572 6999 jbielema@pogolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Scott Sorrels +1 404 572 6600 ssorrels@pogolaw.com
No Logo John M. Roth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Kelvin J. Pennington, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Mark J. Doran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Matt L. Figel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Paul Farrar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Peter Starrett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Ronald P. Spogli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
No Logo Samuel N. Frankel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2004 Lex M. Erwin +1 404 572 4600 lerwin@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Pike Tomlinson +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536
No Logo William M. Wardlaw, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WILMER & LEE PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2005 Angela Slate Rawls +1 256 533 0202 +1 256 533 1317 arawls@wilmerlee.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (242) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Martin D. Chitwood replacing attorney Lauren S. Antonino and David James Worley. (Chitwood, Martin) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Ronald P. Spogli, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Penman Private Equity Fund, LP of Removal of Angela S. Rawls as Attorney of Record for Outside Director Defendants (Rainer, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 235 APPLICATION for Admission of S. Gene Cauley Pro Hac Vice filed by George G. Royal, Mark Rice, James Nugent, Fred Cruz,, Yasuo Yaezawa, Alicia Reed,, Dennis C. Smith, Lynne N. Read, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, Perkins Family Trust, Williams, Mary T. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 9/28/05. (dr) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT approving the settlement embodied in the Stipulation in all respects. Plaintiffs' co-lead counsel are awarded $607,115.06 in reimbursement of expenses and 30% of the escrow account maintained by the Class Escrow Agent in fees, with interest at the same net rate that the Settlement Fund earns payable immediately after entry of this Order. Cauley, Bowman, Carney & Williams, P.L.L.C is awarded $113,063.66 in reimbursement of expenses and 30% of the escrow account maintained by the Sub-Class Escrow Agent in fees, with interest at the same net rate that the Settlement Fund earns payable immediately after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 9/28/05. (dr) --Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 09/29/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 9/28/2005, Court heard from counsel and approved proposed settlement of parties and attorneys fees. (Court Reporter Darla Coulter.)(dr) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Albert R. Atwood, Jr, Shaun Khojayan, William S. Lerach, Darren J. Robbins re 236 notice of change of address. (dr) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Address for Albert R. Atwood, Jr, Shaun Khojayan, William S. Lerach, Darren J. Robbins, counsel for plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                APPLICATION for Admission of S. Gene Cauley Pro Hac Viceby Lynne N. Read, Mark Rice, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, Perkins Family Trust, James Nugent, Williams, Mary T, Fred Cruz, George G. Royal, Yasuo Yaezawa, Alicia Reed, Dennis C. Smith.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #542000. (dr) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                  NOTICE Of Filing Additional Exhibits by Perkins Family Trust (Bain, David) Modified text on 9/23/2005 (dr). (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                    NOTICE Of Filing Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds; and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Perkins Family Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 6# 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 6# 3 Exhibit Part 3 of 6# 4 Exhibit Part 4 of 6# 5 Exhibit Part 5 of 6# 6 Exhibit Part 6 of 6)(Bain, David) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                      NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Crystl Hansman in Connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds; and Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Perkins Family Trust (Bain, David) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                        NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Maya Saxena in Support of Proposed Settlement and Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Perkins Family Trust (Bain, David) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                          MOTION for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation of settlement proceeds, and application for an award of attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses with Brief In Support by Perkins Family Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Final Approval# 2 Brief Memorandum in Support of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Bain, David) Modified on 9/22/2005 (dr). (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                            Declaration of S. Gene Cauley in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and 228 MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses Submitted by Counsel for the Sub-Class, by Williams, Mary T. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Fistel, Michael) Modified text on 9/22/2005 (dr). (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Submitted by Counsel for the Sub-Class with Brief In Support. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Fistel, Michael) Modified on 9/22/2005 (dr). (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 160 Motion for Reconsideration, denying as moot 162 Motion for Reconsideration, denying as moot 163 Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 7/11/05. (ss) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins.(Gill, Richard) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING 224 SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE, not later than 7/5/05 Claims Administrator shall cause a copy of Notice and the Proof of Claim to be mailed first class mail to all Settlement Class Members; and Summary Notice to be published once in national edition of Investor's Business Daily; any person of the Class who desires request exclusion from Class shall do so no later than 8/19/05, no Request for Exclusion shall be valid unless made in a manner described in the Notice no later than 8/19/05; Objections shall be filed on or before 8/19/05. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 6/22/05. (dr) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                                      SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Perkins Family Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Order# 2 Exhibit A-1 - Settlement Notice# 3 Exhibit A-2 - Claim Form# 4 Exhibit A-3 - Summary Notice# 5 Exhibit B - Final Judgment)(Bain, David) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against all defendants, filed by Perkins Family Trust.(Bain, David) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/2/05 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Court Reporter: Darla Coulter. (dr) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Settlement Conference held on 6/2/2005. Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Court heard from counsel and accepts the representation of the settlement. Counsel to prepare and present proposed order for the Court consideration. All current deadlines are held and ruling on pending motions deferred pending settlement order. (Court Reporter Darla Coulter.)(ss) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER SUSPENDING all proceedings until 6/2/05. Settlement Approval Material or request for conference will be submited to the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 5/17/05. (ss) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Consent Order. (Bain, David) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Request for and APPROVAL OF leave of absence for D. Russell 6/6-24/05. (ss) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for permission to enter a special, limited appearance to present certain issues in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their second amended class action complaint by Arthur Andersen LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(dr) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Consent ORDER extending time through 5/23/05 for plaintiffs to serve their motion for class certification and for defendant to serve their response to plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File second consolidated amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 4/25/05. (ss) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Consent Scheduling Order. (Bain, David) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 213 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for C. Nelson Gill. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 4/20/05. (dr) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of C. Nelson Gill Pro Hac Viceby Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins.Filing Fee received $150, Receipt #535972. (dr) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 4/12/05. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(dr) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                CONSENT ORDER extending time through 4/25/05 for plaintiff to serve Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 4/13/05. (ss) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Ronald P. Spogli, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Penman Private Equity Fund, LP to Responses to First Request for Production of Documents (Rainer, J.) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION re 92 Order regarding confidential information by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Deutsche Bank Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc.. (Bielema, John) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Worley, David) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/31/05 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Court Reporter: Darla Coulter. (dr) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery by plaintiffs(dr) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Service of Discovery - Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to AFC Enterprises, Inc. and the Officer Defendants by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER re 189 MOTION for Leave to File second consolidated amended class action complaint filed by George G. Royal,, Mark Rice,, James Nugent,, Fred Cruz,, Yasuo Yaezawa,, Alicia Reed,, Dennis C. Smith,, Lynne N. Read,, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan,, Thomas Savchick,, Perkins Family Trust,, APPROVING 201 Stipulation filed by AFC Enterprises, Inc, to extend time through 4/25/05 for defendants to respond to Motion 189 . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 4/6/05. (ss) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Name for Meryl W. Edelstein, counsel for Perkins Family Trust (Edelstein, Meryl) Modified on 4/7/2005 to fix attorneys entry (cdg). (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Service of Discovery - Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to AFC Enterprises, Inc. and the Officer Defendants by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by AFC Enterprises, Inc. (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discover by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, and Perkins Family Trust : Response to defendant AFC Enterprises, Inc.'s first request for production. (er) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          VERBAL ORDER on MOTION HEARING on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order 193 . Court heard from counsel and then GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as detailed on the record. Mr. Bain to prepare order, have reviewed as to form by defense counsel and present to the Court for signature. By Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 3/31/05. (ss) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2005 re 193 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Depositions Notice by Defendants filed by Perkins Family Trust,. (Court Reporter Darla Coulter.)(ss) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 193 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Depositions Notice by Defendants and Defendants' Motion to Compel and For Costs filed by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Deutsche Bank Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc. of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents (Bielema, John) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Approving Parties' Joint Preliminary Report and plaintiffs' proposed schedule.Fact discovery shall close 9/23/05, Expert iscovery ends no later than 12/31/2005. Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due by 2/1/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2006, or 30 days after ruling on summary judgment, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 3/28/05. (ss) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Depositions Notice by Defendants with Brief In Support by Perkins Family Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Bain, David) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins Non-Party Subpoenas and Affidavits of Service (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing exhibits under seal by plaintiffs in support of 189 MOTION for Leave to File second consolidated amended class action complaint, 190 memorandum in suppport --- FILED UNDER SEAL --- (dr) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of 189 MOTION for Leave to File second consolidated amended class action complaint filed by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(dr) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File second consolidated amended class action complaintby plaintiffs. (dr) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Perkins Family Trust re 187 Notice of Substitution of Counsel Corrected Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Worley, David) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. David James Worley replacing attorney Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. (Worley, David) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSNET ORDER Extending time through 4/15/05 for plaintiffs to file motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 3/17/05. (ss) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE of discovery by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed by Perkins Family Trust. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins Notice of Video Deposition - Ellen Hartman; Notice of Video Deposition - Pierre Dait; Notice of Video Deposition - Scott Harris; Notice of Video Deposition - Brian Lacey; Notice of Video Deposition - Kathy King; Certificate of Service of Discovery (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Consent Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Worley, David) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Initial Disclosures by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Deutsche Bank Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc. (Attachments: # 1 continued)(dr) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re initial disclosures by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER on consent of parties ext time through 3/2/05 for defendants Goldman, Sachs & Co., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. and Deutsche Banc Alex Brown to serve their Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 2/24/05. (ss) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Initial Disclosures by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E (1of 3)# 2 Exhibit E (2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit E (3 of 3))(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Initial Disclosures by Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Ronald P. Spogli, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Penman Asset Management, L.P., Penman Private Equity Fund, LP.(Grider, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins re: Deposition of Thomas Savchik; Deposition of Perkins Family Trust; Deposition of Alicia Reed; Deposition of Dennis C. Smith; Deposition of Fred Cruz; Deposition of George Royal; Deposition of James Nugent; Deposition of Lynn Read; Deposition of Mark Rice; Deposition of Yasuo Yaezawa; Defendant AFC Enterprises, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories; and Defendant AFC Enterprises Inc.'s First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Deutsche Bank Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc..(dr) (MANUAL AND DUPLICATE COPY OF 171 Answer) Modified text on 2/15/2005 (dr). (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 162 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Entered December 29, 2004 With Respect to Relation Back of Section 11 Claim filed by William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Ronald P. Spogli, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Penman Asset Management, L.P., Penman Private Equity Fund, LP. (Rainer, J.) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Goldman, Sachs & Co, Deutsche Bank Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc..(Bielema, John) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Penman Asset Management, L.P., Penman Private Equity Fund, LP, Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Ronald P. Spogli, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth.(Rainer, J.) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins. Discovery ends on 11/8/2005.(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Thomas Savchik and Perkins Family Trust for Lack of Standing filed by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address for Marc A. Topaz, counsel for James Nugent (dr) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 163 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Thomas Savchik and Perkins Family Trust for Lack of Standing Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Thomas Savchik and Perkins Family Trust for Lack of Standing filed by Perkins Family Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Worley, David) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 162 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Entered December 29, 2004 With Respect to Relation Back of Section 11 Claim PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Perkins Family Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Worley, David) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 160 MOTION for Reconsideration re 158 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Supplement,, PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FARRAR'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Perkins Family Trust. (Worley, David) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Thomas Savchik and Perkins Family Trust for Lack of Standing with Brief In Support by Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Thomas Savchik and Perkins Family Trust for Lack of Standing# 2 Appendix Addendum of Exhibits to Memorandum in Support of Motion to# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Part 1 of 4# 9 Exhibit Exhibit F (Part 2 of 4)# 10 Exhibit Exhibit F (Part 3 of 4)# 11 Exhibit Exhibit F (Part 4 of 4)# 12 Exhibit Exhibit G# 13 Exhibit Exhbiit H)(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Entered December 29, 2004 With Respect to Relation Back of Section 11 Claim with Brief In Support by Mark J. Doran. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion of Outside Director Defendants to Reconsider Order Entered December 29, 2004 With Respect to Relation Back of Section 11 Claim)(Russell, David) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT ORDER extending time to 2/11/05 for defendants to answer complaint; Discovery begins 2/23/05 for 8 months. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 1/10/05. (dr) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 158 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Supplement,, with Brief In Support by Paul Farrar. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration)(Russell, David) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Notice Regarding Amendment of Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Perkins Family Trust (Worley, David) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss, denying 100 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Dismiss, denying 132 Motion to Supplement, the Court grants the plaintiffs permission to file a second consolidated amended complaint within 30 days from the docketing of this order. no other defendants may be added and no other claims may be added without obtaining permission of the Court. if an amended comlaint is not filed, these state claims are dismissed with prejudice as to these defendants. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 12/28/04. (ss) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/29/04 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Court Reporter: Darla Coulter. (dr) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 154 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack Reise. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 12/6/04. (dr) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Status Conference held on 11/29/2004 re matters raised in letter dated 11/4/04 attached; Court will STAY DISCOVERY in 03cv1584 until the Court has ruled on the motion(s) to dismiss in 03cv817; discovery will begin upon ruling on the motion by Court and proceed simultaneously. (Court Reporter Darla Coulter.)(dr) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Jack Reise Pro Hac Viceby James Nugent.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #530167. (dr) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co in further support of 100 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Hearing (Attachments: # 1 continued)(dr) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Christopher S. Jones, Maya Saxena, counsel for plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 146 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Gill . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 11/2/04. (dr) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 145 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George Walker . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 11/2/04. (dr) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE scheduling Status Conference with Court, in chambers 11/29/04, 2:00 pm (ss) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from C. Neal Pope, counsel for AFC Securities, requesting status conference (conference scheduled) (ss) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Name and Address for John R. Bielema Jr., William Scott Sorrels, counsel for Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co (dr) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Richard H. Gill Pro Hac Viceby AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins.Filing Fee received $150, Receipt #528752. (dr) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of George W. Walker III Pro Hac Viceby AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #528752. (dr) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David James Worley on behalf of all plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 10/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of 132 MOTION to Supplement filed by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(dr) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Supplement the Record SURREPLY filed by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Attachments: # 1 letter to Leon Stafford)(Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 137 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Response to Underwriter Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Thomas Savchick. (Edelstein, Meryl) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery by James Nugent (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Charles Neal Pope for Samuel N. Frankel; Dick R. Holbrook; Gerald J. Wilkins; AFC Enterprises, Inc and Frank Belatti, Michael Lee McGlamry for Samuel N. Frankel; Dick R. Holbrook; Gerald J. Wilkins; AFC Enterprises, Inc and Frank Belatti, Teresa Pike Tomlinson for Samuel N. Frankel; Dick R. Holbrook; Gerald J. Wilkins; AFC Enterprises, Inc and Frank Belatti replacing attorney Michael R. Smith; Martin Robert Thornton; John Patterson Brumbaugh and Lex M. Erwin. (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 132 MOTION to Supplement filed by Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated. (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in further support of their motion to dismiss by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address for Lauren S. Antonino, counsel for plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Supplement the Record filed by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Tomlinson, Teresa) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER extending time through 10/12/04 for defendants to file their responses to 132 MOTION to Supplement filed by George G. Royal, Mark Rice, James Nugent, Fred Cruz, Yasuo Yaezawa, Alicia Reed, Dennis C. Smith, Lynne N. Read, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, Perkins Family Trust Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 10/5/04. (ss) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To Respond To Motion to Supplement the Record. (Brumbaugh, John) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Supplement the record by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Exhibit B part 1# 4 Exhibit B part 2)(dr) (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Oral Argument on their motion to dismiss consolidated amended class action complaint by Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated. (dr) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER defendant's reply briefs to plaintiffs' response to defendants motions to dismiss shall be filed on 8/23/04; AFC, Belatti, Wilkins, Holbrook, and Frankel should be allowed 33 pages for their reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 8/26/04. (dr) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF aupporting 99 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Matt L. Figel, Freeman Spogli & Co. Incorporated, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Ronald P. Spogli, Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw. (dr) (Entered: 08/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Oral Argument re 102 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins. (Erwin, Lex) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF filed by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins re 102 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Erwin, Lex) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm Name for Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, counsel for plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re subpoena by James Nugent (dr) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 119 Motion to Withdraw Trishanda Hinton as Attorney. . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 7/29/04. (dr) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER that plaintiffs shall serve response to defendants' motions to dismiss on or before 7/19/04. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 7/20/04. (dr) (Entered: 07/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OMNIBUS RESPONSE filed by plaintiffs in Opposition to 100 Motion to Dismiss, 102 Motion to Dismiss, 99 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Response Part 2# 2 Response Part 3# 3 Response Part 4# 4 Appendix # 5 Exhibit A# 6 Exhibit B# 7 Exhibit C# 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E (1-25)# 10 Exhibit E (26-53)# 11 Exhibit F (1-25)# 12 Exhibit F (26-50)# 13 Exhibit F (51-76)# 14 Exhibit F (77-101)# 15 Exhibit F (102-126)# 16 Exhibit F (127-167)# 17 Exhibit G)(adg) (Entered: 07/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER approving 120 APPLICATION for Admission of William S. Lerach Pro Hac Vice filed by George G. Royal, Mark Rice, James Nugent, Yasuo Yaezawa, Alicia Reed, Dennis C. Smith, Lynne N. Read, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, Perkins Family Trust Signed by Judge William S. Duffey Jr. on 7/19/04. (dr) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of William S. Lerach Pro Hac Viceby plaintiffs International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, James Nugent, Perkins Family Trust, Lynne N. Read, Alicia Reed, Mark Rice, George G. Royal, Thomas Savchick, Dennis C. Smith, Yasuo Yaezawa. (dr) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Trishanda Hinton as Attorneyby AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins. (dr) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William S. Duffey recused. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas W. Thrash for all further proceedings Signed by Judge William S. Duffey Jr. on 7/20/04. (se) (Entered: 07/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jointg Certificate of interested persons. (to judge) (vs) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [109-1] pro hac vice application, GRANTING [108-1] pro hac vice application for Joseph White and Robert Adler (cc) (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [112-1] pro hac vice application Allie Lin (cc) (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [113-1] pro hac vice application Richard Rosen (cc) (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for admission of Richard A. Rosen pro hac vice for Goldman Sachs & Co, Credit Suisse First, Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for admission of Allie Lin pro hac vice for Goldman Sachs & Co, Credit Suisse First, Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [108-1] pro hac vice application of Robert Adler (cc) (dr) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [109-1] pro hac vice application of Joseph White III (cc) (dr) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for admission of Joseph E. White III pro hac vice for plaintiff James Nugent (dr) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for admission of Robert R. Adler pro hac vice for plaintiff James Nugent (dr) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash that the memoranda in support of motions to dismiss, responses, and reply briefs shall be limited in lenght (cc) (dr) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Certificates of service by Credit Suisse First, Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix Volume III by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins in support of [102-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix Volume II by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins in support of [102-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix Volume I by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins in support of [102-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by AFC Enterprises, Inc, Frank Belatti, Samuel N. Frankel, Dick R. Holbrook, Gerald J. Wilkins to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint with brief in support. (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldman Sachs & Co, Credit Suisse First, Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Goldman Sachs & Co, Credit Suisse First, Deutsche Bank Inc. to dismiss , and for oral argument with brief in support. (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth, Ronald P. Spogli, Peter Starrett, Freeman Spogli & Co. to dismiss with prejudice outside directors, Freeman Spogli, and Penman with brief in support. (dr) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of change of law firm name by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of change of firm affiliation by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 05/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Answer due 5/28/04 for defendants (cc) (dr) (Entered: 05/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Answer due 5/28/04 for defendants; responses to motion(s) to dismiss shall be served 45 days after service; rply briefs due 30 days after service of pla's response(s) (cc) (dr) (Entered: 04/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, extending time for dfts AFC, Belatti and Wilkins to respond to [77-1] CAC (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons issued for defendant Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 02/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Thomas W. Thrash (cc by Mag) (dr) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons issued for defendant Credit Suisse First (dr) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons issued for defendant Deutsche Bank Inc. (dr) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons issued for defendant John M. Roth (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons issued for defendant Kelvin J. Pennington (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons issued for defendant Goldman Sachs & Co (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons issued for defendant Dick R. Holbrook (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons issued for defendant Ronald P. Spogli (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons issued for defendant Samuel N. Frankel (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons issued for defendant Paul Farrar (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons issued for defendant Mark J. Doran (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons issued for defendant Matt L. Figel (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons issued for defendant William M. Wardlaw (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons issued for defendant Peter Starrett (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons issued for defendant Freeman Spogli & Co. (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by plaintiffs adding Freeman Spogli & Co., Peter Starrett, William M. Wardlaw, Matt L. Figel, Mark J. Doran, Paul Farrar, Samuel N. Frankel, Ronald P. Spogli, Dick R. Holbrook, Goldman Sachs & Co, Kelvin J. Pennington, John M. Roth (dr) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of service of discovery as to plaintiff (dr) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery by plaintiffs (cc) (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Meryl W. Edelstein (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney appearance for plaintiffs by Edward H. Nicholson Jr. (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion Hearing HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery by plaintiffs; Mr. Nicholson to prepare order and present to the Court (dr) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, extending time until 40 days after the filing of AFC Enterprise's annual report on Form 10-K for fiscal year 2002 for plaintiffs' to serve their consolidated complaint (cc) (dr) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice by CRD, motion hearing set for [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery 9:30 12/2/03 (dr) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply brief in support of [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery by plaintiff. (dr) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, extending time until 10/22/03 for defendants to respond to [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery (cc) (dr) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, extending time to 12/1/03 for plaintiffs to file consolidated complaint (cc) (dr) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by defendants to [63-1] motion to initiate limited discovery (dr) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT filed RE: motion hearing before Judge Thrash for dates of 8/18/03 Court Reporter: Linda Baggett (dr) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Meryl W. Edelstein (dr) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs to initiate limited discovery with brief in support (dr) (Entered: 10/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [59-1] pro hac vice application (cc) (dr) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [60-1] pro hac vice application (cc) (dr) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for admission of Joseph R. Seidman Jr. pro hac vice for plaintiff Mark Rice (to TWT) (jdb) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for admission of Mel E. Lifshitz pro hac vice for plaintiff Mark Rice (to TWT) (jdb) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [40-1] motion to withdraw as attorney for plaintiffs by Cauley, Geller, Bowman U Rudman, LLP, (cc) (dr) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [24-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel, The International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Pension Plan, Thomas Savchick, and the Perkins Family Trust are appointed lead plaintiff; firms Chitwood & Harley LLP and Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP are appointed co-lead counsel (cc) (dr) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [24-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval lead counsel (dr) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of hearing on 3:30 8/18/03 . (cc by SS) (aet) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DIRECTED the Clerk to remove the name of Richard Lockridge from the docket pursuant to [43-1] order. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [50-1] pro hac vice application as to Shaun Khojayan (cc) (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [49-1] pro hac vice application as Albert Atwood, Jr. (cc) (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [48-1] pro hac vice application as to Darren Robbins (cc) (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for admission of Shuan Khojayan pro hac vice for plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for admission of Albert R. Atwood Jr. pro hac vice for plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for admission of Darren J. Robbins pro hac vice for plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 07/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [46-1] pro hac vice application. (cc) (aet) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for admission of Marc Henzel pro hac vice for Alicia Reed. (to TWT) (kt) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [44-1] pro hac vice application. (cc) (aet) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for admission of Andrei Rado pro hac vice for plaintiffs. (Filed 6/12/03 in 1:03-cv-836) (aet) Modified on 07/03/2003 (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, DIRECTING Richard Lockridge to submit a pro hac vice application or withdrawal . Clerk to remove Mr. Lockridge if he does not comply by 7/17/03 . (cc) (aet) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash approving pro hac vice application of Marc H. Edelson filed in 1:03-cv-944 on 6/19/03. (cc) (aet) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DIRECTING attorneys Brian M. Felgoise and Marc S. Henzel to submit pro hac vice applications by 7/15/03 . If the attorneys fail to comply, the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove these attorneys from the docket. (cc) (aet) Modified on 01/09/2004 (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to withdraw as attorney for plaintiffs by Cauley, Geller, Bowman U Rudman, LLP, with brief in support. (aet) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Loef Family Enterprises' [25-1] motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's selction of lead counsel and liaison counsel (ck) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by defendant to [25-1] motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's selction of lead counsel and liaison counsel and [24-1] motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel. (daf) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [28-1] pro hac vice applications of Michael E. Moskovitz & Carol V. Gilden. (cc) (kt) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [29-1] pro hac vice application of Gregory M. Nespole. (cc) (daf) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [30-1] pro hac vice application of Fred Taylor Isquith. (cc) (daf) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash directing clerk to terminate Marc H. Edelson if he has not filed an application to appear pro hac vice by 6/26/03 [34-1] order to be submitted on 6/30/03 (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash directing clerk to terminate Henry J. Young as counsel if he has not filed an application to appear pro hac vice by 6/26/03 , [33-1] order to be submitted on 6/30/03 (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash directing clerk to terminate Andrei Rado as counsel if he has not filed an application to appear pro hac vice by 6/26/03 [32-1] order to be submitted on 6/30/03 (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, directing clerk to terminate Samuel H. Rudman as counsel if he has not filed an application to appear pro hac vice by 6/26/03 [31-1] order to be submitted on 6/30/03 (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for the admission of Fred Taylor Isquith pro hac vice for plaintiff Alicia Reed. (Civil Action no. changed on application from 1:03-cv-1173-BBM.) (to TWT) (aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for the admission of Gregory M. Nespole pro hac vice for plaintiff Alicia Reed. (Action no. changed on application from 1:03-cv-1173-BBM) (to TWT) (aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for admission of pro hac vice of Michael Moskovitz and Carol Gilden for plaintiff Dennis C. Smith (crc) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [26-1] pro hac vice application as to Scott Shepherd and James Miller. Applications filed in 1:03cv944. (cc) (crc) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for admission of Scott Shepherd and James Miller pro hac vice for plaintiff Yasuo Yaezawa. Filed in 1:03cv-944 on 05/15/03 (crc) Modified on 05/28/2003 (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Loef Family Enterprises, LP to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's selction of lead counsel and liaison counsel with brief in support, affidavit and proposed order. (crc) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Local 132 Plaintiffs for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead counsel with brief in support, affidavit and proposed order. (crc) Modified on 05/28/2003 (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 505706. Filed in 1:03cv1357 on 05/19/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 505584. Filed in 1:03cv1320 on 05/15/03. (crc) Modified on 05/27/2003 (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Class Action COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 505077. Filed in 1:03cv1211 on 05/05/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claas Acttion COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 504825. Filed in 1:03cv1173 on 04/30/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [18-1] pro hac vice application as to Jack Landskroner. Filed and served in 1:03cv944 on 05/05/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for admission of Jack Landskroner pro hac vice for plaintiff Yasuo Yaezawa. Filed in 1:03v944 on 04/28/3 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Class Action COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 503865. Filed in 1:03cv944. (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [14-1] pro hac vice application as Nadeem Faruqi, Nancy Kaboolian and Mark Gardy. Filed and served in 1:03cv857 on 05/05/03` (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [13-1] pro hac vice application as Emily Komlossy. Filed and served in 1:02-cv-857 on 04/22/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for admission of Mark Gardy, Nancy Kaboolian and Nadeem Faruqui pro hac vice for plaintiff George G. Royal. Filed in 1:03cv857 on 4/22/03. (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for admission of Emily Komlossy pro hac vice for plaintiff George G. Royal. Filed in 1:03cv857 on 04/16/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Securities Fraud Class Action COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 503438. Filed in 1:03cv857 on 03/28/3 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [9-1] pro hac vice application as to Evan Smith. Filed and served in 1:03cv836 on 05/13/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [8-1] pro hac vice application as to Steven Shulman. Filed and served in 1:03cv836 on 05/13/03 (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for admission of Evan J Smith pro hac vice for Fred Cruz. Filed in 1:03cv836 on 05/08/03. (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for admission of Steven G. Schulman pro hac vice for plaintiff Fred Cruz. Filed in 1:03cv836 on 5/7/3. (crc) Modified on 05/27/2003 (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [6-1] pro hac vice application as to Maya Saxena. Filed and served in 1:03-cv-836 on 05/05/03 (crc) Modified on 05/27/2003 (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for admission of Maya Saxena pro hac vice for plaintiff Fred Cruz. Filed in 1:03cv836 on 4/28/03 (crc) Modified on 05/27/2003 (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Class action COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 503376. Filed in 1:03cv836 on 3/27/03 (crc) Modified on 05/27/2003 (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT Consolidation and scheduling ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash. See order for details. (cc) (crc) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash APPROVING [2-1] pro hac vice application as to Marc Topaz (cc) (crc) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for admission of Marc Topaz pro hac vice for plaintiff (crc) (Entered: 04/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 # 503264 (aet) (Entered: 03/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 243 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?