Upper Chattahoochee, et al v. City of Atlanta
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-02550
District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Chattahoochee Riverkeeper, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo City of Hogansville, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo City of LaGrange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo City of West Point, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Harris County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Heard County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Jack Baytos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo LaGrange-Troup County Chamber of Commerce, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Lake Harding Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Troup County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo Upper Chattahoochee Riverkeeper Fund, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Upper Chattahoochee Riverkeeper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juliet Cohen +1 404 352 9828 jcohen@ucriverkeeper.org
No Logo W. Robert Hancock, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Pope +1 404 521 9900 dpope@selcga.org
No Logo City Of Atlanta, Georgia, Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "City of Atlanta"
No Logo City of College Park, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fincher Denmark & Williams LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winston A. Denmark +1 770 478 9950 wdenmark@fdwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emilia C. Walker +1 770 478 9950 ewalker@fdwlaw.com

Represented by The Barnes Firm, PC

No Logo City of Fairburn, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo City of Palmetto, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo CITY OF SANDY SPRINGS, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Wendell K. Willard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendell K. Willard +1 770 481 7100 wkwillard@wendellwillard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo City of Union City, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo FULTON COUNTY, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulton County Superior Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Joel Harkins +1 404 612 0229 marvin.harkins@fultoncountyga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent D. Hyman +1 404 730 7750 vincent.hyman@fultoncountyga.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willie Jake Lovett, Jr. +1 404 612 4407 willie.lovett@fultoncountyga.gov
No Logo South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine & Block

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Bertram Levy +1 404 261 6800 blevy@fineandblock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinstock & Scavo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Weinstock +1 404 231 3999 mweinstock@wslaw.net
No Logo Rev Dr James Brooks, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Brooks +1 213 612 3200
No Logo State of Georgia, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Hennelly +1 404 656 7540 jhennelly@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Weinischke +1 202 514 4624 bill.weinischke@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States, ex rel, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Hennelly +1 404 656 7540 jhennelly@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Weinischke +1 202 514 4624 bill.weinischke@usdoj.gov
No Logo Utoy-Clayton Task Force on the Environment, Movant
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1365
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (300) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 264 Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/19/10. (dr) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Leave of Absence by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority For Leave of Absence (Tolley, Edward) Modified on 5/21/2010 to correct docket text (fap). (Entered: 05/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/19/2010. The Court expressed reasons for scheduling the status conference and concerns from the City of Atlanta's report re financial restraints ability to comply with the First Amended Consent Decree. Other counsel given the opportunity to speak, but there were no additional comments. The Court again expressed his concerns, but did accept Mr. Weinischkee's proposal, he and counsel for City of Atlanta to confer and present a Joint Interim Status Report. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(Court Reporter Susan Baker)(dr) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce E. Kitchens on behalf of City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority (Kitchens, Joyce) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 297 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT Memorandum for Conference re 292 Notice of Hearing by City of Atlanta. (Richardson, Susan) Modified on 5/18/2010 to create document link(pdw). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            CONSENT ORDER granting (295) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (174) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT; the time for Third Party Defendants to answer the City of Atlanta's Amended Third-Party Complaint is extended thru 10 days after the date of the 11th Circuit's final disposition of the pending appeals. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/13/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 295 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/28/10, 6/21-22/10, 7/23-8/2/10, by John E. Hennelly. (ss) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 293 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CONSENT ORDER granting (280) Motion for Extension of Time until 10 days after the date of 11th Circuit's final disposition of the pending appeals, to for the City of Sandy Springs to answer the Amended Third-Party Complaint in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (160) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/7/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                    LREF
                    Blank 292 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                      LREF
                      Blank 291 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting (290) Motion to Amend in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (169) Motion to Amend in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT, nunc pro tunc to 3/22/10. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/21/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to Amend 268 Third Party Complaint by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 276 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint In Lieu of Filing Answer filed by City of Atlanta, City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                            Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/12/2010, 6/25-6/28/2010, 7/12-7/30/2010, 10/1-10/6/2010, 10/7-10/10/11/2010, by Steven Martin Fincher. (Fincher, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance at the 11th Circuit Court of Appeals by Marc P. Goncher on behalf of City of Atlanta (Goncher, Marc) Modified on 4/19/2010 to correct text to accurately reflect nature of filing (pdw). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 268 Third Party Complaint by City of College Park.(Walker, Emilia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/12/2010 (dr). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 285 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 268 Third Party Complaint Amended by Fulton County.(Hyman, Vincent) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                    Appeal notice from USCA sent to counsel of record re 251 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10709-DD. (kac) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 283 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 282 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                          STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ltr from City of Atlanta to GA EPD dtd Feb 18 2010)(Hennelly, John) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 268 Third Party Complaint,, by City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marvin Joel Harkins on behalf of Fulton County (Harkins, Marvin) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent D. Hyman on behalf of Fulton County (Hyman, Vincent) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Stay by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 276 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint In Lieu of Filing Answer by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 275 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE re 264 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Related to Aspects of Litigation on Appeal with Memorandum of Law filed by Fulton County. (Hyman, Vincent) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE re 264 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Related to Aspects of Litigation on Appeal with Memorandum of Law filed by City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                          DOCUMENT #272 REDOCKETED AS Notice of Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta. Rajan Roger Bhandari for City of Atlanta replacing attorney Elizabeth B. Chandler. (pdw) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                            DOCUMENT FILING ERROR NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Goncher on behalf of City of Atlanta (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Councel)Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(Goncher, Marc) Modified on 3/29/2010 (pdw). (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Notification that 241 Transcript has been filed in District Court by City of College Park. (kac) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Notification that 241 Transcript has been filed in District Court by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (kac) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on November 13, 2009 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re: 251 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10709-D. Financial Arrangements due on 4/5/2010.(kac) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of the City of Atlanta against Fulton County, City of Sandy Springs, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of College Park, filed by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Amended Third-Party Complaint of the City of Atlanta, # 2 Exhibit B to Amended Third-Party Complaint of the City of Atlanta)(Richardson, Susan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Transcript Order Form by City of Atlanta re: 251 Notice of Appeal, 249 Notice of Appeal and 248 Notice of Appeal. Case appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Nos. 10-10709-D, 10-10710-D, 10-10711-D. (kac) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on November 13, 2009 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re: 249 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10710-D. Financial Arrangements due on 3/26/2010. (kac) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Related to Aspects of Litigation on Appeal with Memorandum of Law by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion To Stay District Court Proceedings)(Richardson, Susan) Modified on 3/16/2010 to remove duplicative filer name (pdw). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            USCA Acknowledgment of 249 Notice of Appeal filed by City of Palmetto, City of Union City, City of Fairburn, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10710-D. (kac) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              USCA Acknowledgment of 251 Notice of Appeal filed by City of College Park. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10709-D. (kac) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                USCA Acknowledgment of 248 Notice of Appeal filed by City of Sandy Springs. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 10-10711-D. (kac) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Notification that 241 Transcript has been filed in District Court by City of Sandy Springs. (kac) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on November 13, 2009 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re: 248 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Financial Arrangements due on 3/12/2010.(kac) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit (Fulton County Petition))(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to 243 Third Party Complaint by City of College Park.(Denmark, Winston) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING (255) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; and GRANTING (141) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT. The City of Atlanta shall have up to and including 3/15/2010 to respond to Defendants South Fulton Water & Sewer Authority, City of Union City, City of Fairburn, and City of Palmetto's Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/26/2010. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(kt) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss re: 247 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer by City of Atlanta, City of Atlanta. (Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Transcript to be attached to Motion To Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority re 247 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 251 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 249 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: # 1 Corrected Appeal Transmittal Letter) (kac). (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 242 Order,, by City of College Park. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E0000000002566749. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (Denmark, Winston) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 248 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 242 Order,, by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E0000000002566061. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 242 Order,, by City of Sandy Springs. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E0000000002565970. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Brief In Support by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) Modified caps on 2/16/2010 (dr). (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to City of Fairburn. (aaq) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Proof of Service by City of Atlanta re 243 Third Party Complaint,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A to Notice of Filing Proof of Service)(Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Summonses Issued as to Fulton County, City of Sandy Springs, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of College Park. (dr) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of The City of Atlanta against Fulton County, City of Sandy Springs, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of College Park, filed by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A to The City of Atlanta's Third Party Complaint, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B to The City of Atlanta's Third Party Complaint)(Richardson, Susan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 242 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting (228 in 1:95-cv-02550-TWT) MOTION for Joinder, (118 in 1:98-cv-01956-TWT) MOTION for Joinder filed by City of Atlanta. Defendant City of Atlanta be permitted to file a Third-Party Complaint; Plaintiff State of Georgia and Intervenor Fulton County be enjoined from applying the Georgia Service Delivery Act procedures to the City of Atlanta and Third-Party Defendants with respect to the provision of water and sewer services. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/14/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on November 13, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (kac) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Michael J. Williams. Clerk to follow-up by 12/3/2009. (jkm) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of The Excerpts of Proceedings held on November 13, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number 404-215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (kac) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2009 granting 228 MOTION for Joinder filed by City of Atlanta, and the Court will allow filing of Third Party Complaints against the named parties. The State of Georgia and the County of Fulton are enjoined as to Water and Sewer Services from applying the Services Delivery Act as those issues will continue under the supervision of this Court and enjoined from further proceeding in Fulton County Superior Court as to the Water and Sewer Services for a limited time to allow response by City of Atlanta, Fulton County and State of Georgia to respond to filings made today. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 228 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of College Park. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to 228 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 228 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of Sandy Springs. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 228 MOTION for Joinder MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2009 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Joinder of Parties, MOTION to Require Third-Party Defendants to Show Cause and attend an Expedited Hearing by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 19, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2010. (fem) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Order for Joinder with Brief In Support by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion for Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Mem in Support of Motion for Order)(Richardson, Susan) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dr). (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/19/2009. The Court heard the report from City of Atlanta and comments from counsel for USA and state of Georgia. Response by the Court. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(dr) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/19/2009 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 04-01 as to Juliet Cohen re 220 Notice of Appearance. (dr) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Juliet Cohen on behalf of Upper Chattahoochee Riverkeeper Fund, Inc. (dr) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 24, 2008 through and including August 5, 2008, by John E. Hennelly. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Elizabeth B. Chandler replacing attorney Linda Katherine DiSantis. (Chandler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT of Defendant by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/2/07 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. Court Reporter: Susan Baker. (dr) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 11/2/2007 re status of City of Atlanta's Consent Decree(s) Compliance and the potention impact of proposed Senate Bill 306. (Court Reporter Susan Baker.)(dr) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to coordinate training with chambers if the parties wish to use the new audio-visual display equipment in the courtroom during the 11/2/07 hearing. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 10/30/07. (dr) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit)(Horder, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing:Hearing set for 11/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., regarding the City's Financial Ability to Comply with the Consent Decrees currently in place. (ss) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Status Conference/Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2007. The Court heard from counsel on their concerns related to Senate Bill 306. It was decided that the City would supplement their Status Report and the Court will schedule a public hearing regarding the City's Financial Ability to Comply with the Consent Decrees currently in place. Counsel to confer regarding scheduling and contact Ms. Sewell to set any hearing date. (Court Reporter Susan Baker.)(aaq) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of conference call on May 18, 2007 at 10:00 a.m., regarding status report. Counsel for City of Atlanta to originate call. (ss) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from City of Atlanta to EPA/EPD re Senate Bill 306 (Greater Fulton Water Authority))(Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT City of Atlanta Semi-Annual Status Report by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Goncher on behalf of City of Atlanta (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (dr) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta. Susan H. Richardson for City of Atlanta replacing attorney Newton G. Quantz, III. (dr) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Overtis Hicks Brantley for Fulton County, Willie Jake Lovett for Fulton County replacing attorneys Susan Barker Forsling and Susan M. Hartwig. (dr) (Entered: 12/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 177 Motion to Intervene . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 12/7/04. (dr) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (dr) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits# 2 Exhibits continued)(dr) (Entered: 11/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Justin H. Wiedeman by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 2-1# 4 2-1 continued# 5 2-2# 6 2-3# 7 2-4# 8 2-5# 9 2-6# 10 2-7# 11 2-8# 12 Exhibit 3# 13 3-1# 14 3-2# 15 3-3# 16 3-4# 17 3-5# 18 3-6# 19 3-7# 20 3-8# 21 3-9# 22 3-10# 23 3-11# 24 3-12# 25 3-13# 26 Exhibit 4# 27 4-1# 28 4-2# 29 4-3# 30 4-4# 31 4-5# 32 4-6# 33 4-7# 34 4-8# 35 4-9# 36 4-10# 37 4-11# 38 4-12# 39 4-13# 40 4-14# 41 4-15# 42 4-16# 43 4-17# 44 4-18# 45 4-19# 46 4-20# 47 4-21# 48 4-22# 49 4-23# 50 4-24# 51 4-25# 52 Exhibit 5# 53 5-1# 54 5-2# 55 5-3# 56 5-4# 57 5-5# 58 5-6# 59 5-7# 60 5-8# 61 5-9# 62 5-10)(dr) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Declaration of John Sherman by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (dr) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Brett A. Mendell by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (dr) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply separate opposition briefs of United States and City of Atlanta to 177 MOTION to Intervene filed by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc.. (dr) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing declarations by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (dr) (Entered: 10/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 181 Motion for Extension of Time to reply to response briefs of United States by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. until 10/5/04. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (dr) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to reply to response briefs of United States by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc.. (dr) (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by State of Georgia, United States to 177 MOTION to Intervene. (dr) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 177 MOTION to Intervene filed by Upper Chattahoochee Riverkeeper Fund, Inc.. (dr) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of John Sherman by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. re 177 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 1a, #(3) Exhibit 2)(dfb) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene by movant Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B: Part 1 of 3, #(3) Exhibit B: Part 2 of 3, #(4) Exhibit B: Part 3 of 3, #(5) Exhibit C, #(6) Exhibit D, #(7) Memorandum of Points and Authorities and #(8) Certificate of Service for Motion)(dfb) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta (dr) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [170-1] motion for termination of Section VII. Remedial actions for dft's Wastewater Treatment Facilities of the first amended consent decree (cc) (dr) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT filed RE: proceedings for dates of 11/25/03 Court Reporter: David Ritchie (dr) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta (dr) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, City Attorney provided information on financial situation of the City associated with its implementation of terms of Consent Decree (dr) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/31/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant City of Atlanta for termination of Section VII. Remedial actions for dft's Wastewater Treatment Facilities of the first amended consent decree (dr) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (daf) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (daf) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing filed for dates of 3/6/03. Court Reporter: Linda W. Baggett - (daf) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash on [56-1] motion to file excess pages and [55-1] motion to amend filed in 1:98-cv-1956, motions granted. Counsel for pla to prepare order (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of change of address by defendant. (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta . Linda Katherine DiSantis replacing attorney Susan Pease Langford for City of Atlanta . (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (er) (Entered: 11/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (crc) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amicus Curiae Brief by movant James Brooks . (crc) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta (to TWT) (bsm) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT filed RE: status conference for dates of 09/07/01 Court Reporter: Linda Baggett - (crc) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (crc) (Entered: 09/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney appearance for defendant City of Atlanta by Susan Pease Langford and Sarah Ingram Mills (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Notice of appearance of counsel for City of Atlanta filed. Court heard from counsel concerning a mechanism or procedure whereby he will be advised of any significant failure to comply with the schedule of the Remedial Measurers Report and Consent decree. It was agreed that City would continue to submit quarterly reports and that the EPA/EPD would submit status reports on 1/15 and 7/15 annually and that City would have 15 days to file any response. The city has 15 days to respond to the status report submitted to the Court on 9/6. These semi-annual reports and responses will be filed in the Court's record and forwarded to the Judge for review and determination if conference is needed. (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash concerning SCO Consent decree time table status. Court heard from counsell. Court request of Ms. Richardson a copy of the draft of the remedial report. Court advised counsel that he very much wanted to keep this case on the prescribed time table and that he was available at any time if the need should arise. (crc) Modified on 05/21/2001 (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice by CRD, status conference set for 9:30 am on 5/18/01 in chambers. (cc via fax by CRD) (crc) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement agreement. (First entered on docket 9/18/00) (crc) Modified on 02/14/2001 (Entered: 02/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DENYING [138-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty by City of Atlanta. The Court ORDERS the City of Atlanta to pay the sum of $40,000 in stipulated penalties as provided in the Consent Decree. (cc) (fmm) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash re: issues to be addressed at the scheduled evidentiary hearing. The hearings are cancelled and court will issue order. (fmm) (Entered: 05/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      US and GA's statement concerning procedures for [143-1] evidentiary hearing set at 9:30 on 5/24/00 and 5/25/00 (crc) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief by plaintiff Chattahoochee River in support of [142-1] U.S. and GA's position. (crc) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dft City of Atlanta for status conference & direction from the court with brief in support. (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by CRD evidentiary hearing set at 9:30 on 5/24/00 and 5/25/00 (served by CRD) (bsm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by The State of Georgia and The United States of America in response to [138-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty . (ck) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, government plaintiffs directed to file w/in 10 days of docketing this order a statement of disputed facts in which they identify each fact set forth in paragraphs 3 thru 19 of [138-1] petition for review , the Court requested that a courtesy copy be provided in chambers, [138-1 petition to be submitted on 4/19/00 (cc) (bsm) Modified on 03/30/2000 (Entered: 03/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by defendant City of Atlanta to response to [138-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty (llg) (Entered: 02/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by the State of Georgia and USA to [138-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty (llg) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION by defendant City of Atlanta for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty with brief in support. (pdw) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, that clerk administratively close the case (cc) (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER Regarding Costs of Litigation by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, dft shall pay $489,750.00 as costs of litigation to plas w/in 10 days of entry of [135-1] consent decree. (cc) (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT DECREE filed by parties, signed by Judge Thrash. (cc) (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash [133-1] motion to enter consent decree. Consent decree filed, Consent Order Regarding Costs of Litigation filed. (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by plaintiffs to enter consent decree w/brief in support & consent decree. (to Judge) (pdw) Modified on 09/23/1998 (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Lodging by USA of copy of consent decree. (fmr emp) (Entered: 07/14/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/23/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash denying as moot the [126-1] motion for reconsideration and clarification of [123-1] order by City of Atlanta, denying as moot the [126-2] motion for modification of order by City of Atlanta, denying as moot the [125-1] motion for reconsideration of [123-1] order by Fulton County, denying as moot the [121-1] motion to supplement record by plaintiff, denying as moot the [117-1] motion for leave to take deposition by plaintiff, denying as moot the [109-1] motion to take depositions by plaintiff (cc) (mmw) (Entered: 04/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Parties announced settlement & advised court of certain time element requirements that would have to be met before the parties could submit settlement agreement for approval of the Court. Attys to advise Court in 30 days in writing of their progress. (pa) (Entered: 04/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS HEARING HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash: Counsel for plas & dft City of Atlanta reported progress, but not ready to announce settlement; parties requested addl 6 wks; court GRANTED the 6 wk extension & scheduled a status conference- status hearing set for 2:00 4/13/98 ; Court alerted the City that if there was no agreement that a Show Cause hearing would be scheduled on that date for the City to Show Cause why the court should not impose civil penalties up to $75,000 per day (fmr emp) (Entered: 03/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of status conference set for 9:30 3/2/98 (counsel faxed by Ct Dep. (fmr emp) (Entered: 02/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS HEARING HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Court granted stay request until 3/1/98. (rh) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/23/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by City of Atlanta for reconsideration and clarification of [123-1] order , or in the alternative, for modification of order with brief in support. (rh) (Entered: 12/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Fulton County for reconsideration of [123-1] order with brief in support. (rh) (Entered: 12/04/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice rescheduling conference for 2:00 12/10/97 (rh) (Entered: 11/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [108-1] motion to supplement record, GRANTING [113-1] motion for leave to file supplemental brief, GRANTING [115-1] motion for leave to file supplemental brief, GRANTING [116-1] motion for leave to file post-hearing briefs, GRANTING [119-1] motion to supplement record; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm by City of Atlanta, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV by plaintiffs; conference set for 9:30 11/26/97 . (cc) (rh) (Entered: 11/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum by defendant in opposition to [119-1] motion to supplement record, or, in the alternative, in support of continuance (rh) (Entered: 11/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIFTH MOTION by plaintiffs to supplement record with brief in support & appendix. (rh) (Entered: 11/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Post-Hearing Reply brief re: [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm, [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV (rh) (Entered: 11/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth MOTION by plaintiff to supplement record with brief in support & appendix of evidence. (rh) (Entered: 11/04/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by plaintiffs to [116-1] motion for leave to file post-hearing briefs (rh) (Entered: 10/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to take deposition (rh) (Entered: 10/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by City of Atlanta for leave to file post-hearing briefs with brief in support and proposed briefs. (rh) (Entered: 10/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file supplemental brief with brief in support and Correlation of Rainfall Data. (rh) (Entered: 10/08/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Correction to plaintiffs' statement of material facts (rh) (Entered: 09/26/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file supplemental brief w/supplemental brief in support of motion for summary judgment and in opposition to dft's motion for partial summary judgment (rh) (Entered: 09/26/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DENYING AS MOOT [81-1] motion for order compelling the filing of depositions by plaintiff, DENYING [84-1] motion requesting that Court view City's sewer areas & treatment facilities by City of Atlanta, GRANTING [94-1] motion for leave to file response to plas' reply brief, GRANTING [102-1] motion to supplement record, GRANTING [104-1] motion for leave to file supplemental brief (cc) (rh) (Entered: 09/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. [94-1] motion for leave to file response to plas' reply brief GRANTED; [81-1] motion for order compelling the filing of depositions DENIED AS MOOT; [102-1] motion to supplement record GRANTED; [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV, [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm, [84-1] motion requesting that Court view City's sewer areas & treatment facilities TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT (rh) (Entered: 09/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply brief by dft in support of [104-1] motion for leave to file supplemental brief (rh) (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to take depositions w/brief in support. (rh) (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 11/17/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD MOTION by plaintiff to supplement record w/3rd supplemental appendix of evidence in support of [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV (rh) (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by plaintiff to dft's response to [102-1] motion to supplement record (rh) (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by plaintiffs to [104-1] City's motion for leave to file supplemental brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment and in response to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (rh) (Entered: 09/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by City of Atlanta to [102-1] motion to supplement record (rh) (Entered: 09/15/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by City of Atlanta for leave to file supplemental brief in support of its motion for partial summary judgment and in response to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment with brief in support. (rh) (Entered: 09/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of hearing set for 9:30 a.m. 9/22/97 on all pending motions (cc via fax by Ct. Dep.) (rh) (Entered: 09/04/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff to supplement record re: [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV with brief in support. (rh) (Entered: 09/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to the Court regarding appeal of permit modifications by plaintiffs. (rag) (Entered: 08/01/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Carl F. Jones (rag) (Entered: 07/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment to [69-1] appendix of evidence in support of motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV by plaintiffs (rag) (Entered: 07/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CHAMBERS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Frank M. Hull with counsel regarding statement of facts in relationship to pending summary judgment motions. (rag) (Entered: 07/17/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation by parties regarding authenticity of photographs. (rag) (Entered: 06/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of address change by Fulton County (Vernitia A. Shannon). (rag) (Entered: 05/31/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Frank M. Hull GRANTING [75-1] motion for leave to file supplement to its motion for partial sum.jgm, GRANTING [89-1] motion for leave to supplement record; dft has 10 days from date of this order to advise court in writing whether it objects to authenticity of the photos (cc) (fmr emp) (Entered: 05/21/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by dft for leave to file response to plas' reply brief in support of their motion for leave to supplement record with exhibit attached in support. (rag) (Entered: 05/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply by plaintiff, defendant to [92-1] response to [89-1] motion for leave to supplement record (pa) (Entered: 04/16/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by defendant City of Atlanta to [89-1] motion for leave to supplement record (pa) (Entered: 04/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Court re: Appeal of permit modifications by plas. (scg) (Entered: 03/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      2nd Supplental Appendix of evidence by plas in support of [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV (scg) (Entered: 03/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plas for leave to supplement record with brief in support. (scg) (Entered: 03/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by dft City of Atlanta to filing of supplemental appendix of Evidence contained in [86-1] response (pa) (Entered: 02/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by plaintiff to [84-1] motion requesting that Court view City's sewer areas & treatment facilities (pa) (Entered: 02/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of filing & Reply by plas to City of Atlanta's [76-1] response to its motion for summary judgment, response to statement of facts, supplemental appendix of evidence in support of its motion for summary judgment & response & objection to affidavit of Tyler Richards. (pa) (Entered: 02/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Appendix by defendant City of Atlanta in support of its [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm & in response to [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV. (pa) (Entered: 02/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant City of Atlanta requesting that Court view City's sewer areas & treatment facilities with brief in support. (pa) Modified on 02/05/1997 (Entered: 01/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of filing original discovery by defendant City of Atlanta . (pa) Modified on 02/14/1997 (Entered: 01/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Frank M. Hull GRANTING [79-1] motion to compel dft City's counsel to file depositions (cc) (pa) Modified on 02/05/1997 (Entered: 01/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/23/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plas' for order compelling the filing of depositions with attached exhibit. (rag) Modified on 09/24/1997 (Entered: 02/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection by plas' to City's submission of materials to Court. (rag) Modified on 02/05/1997 (Entered: 02/05/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/21/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/22/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff to compel dft City's counsel to file depositions with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 01/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by dft City of Atlanta to plas' request to file original discovery contained in [69-1] motion for sum.jgm. (pa) (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Notice of filing discovery by plas. (pa) (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by defendant City of Atlanta to [69-1] motion for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV by dfts, response to pla's statement of facts & pla's statement of facts & affidavit of Tyler Richards. (pa) Modified on 02/10/1997 (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/20/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant City of Atlanta for leave to file supplement to its motion for partial sum.jgm with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice regarding discovery by Proposed Intervenor Fulton County . (pa) (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by plaintiff to [70-1] motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (pa) Modified on 01/14/1997 (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Brief by defendant City of Atlanta in support of [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm (pa) (Entered: 01/14/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Frank M. Hull GRANTING [70-1] motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (cc) (pa) (Entered: 01/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/3/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant City of Atlanta for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 01/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff for summary judgment on counts II, III & IV with statement of facts, statements of fact, brief, appendix & notice of filing & request for filing discovery. (pa) (Entered: 12/31/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/11/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Frank M. Hull GRANTING [26-1] dfts motion for partial summary judgment, DENYING [28-1] pla's motion for partial sum.jgm. , GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [53-1] motion for protective order by Upper Chattahoochee, DENYING [40-1] motion to strike affidavits of Hallum & Kamps by plas, GRANTING [50-1] motion for leave to file supplemental facutal background in support of its motion for partial sum.jgm. Parties to file motions for sum.jgm on remaining issues by 12/16/96. Consolidated PTO due 30 days after Court's ruling on these additional motions (cc) (pa) (Entered: 12/14/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/10/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix by defendant City of Atlanta to [64-1] motion for partial sum.jgm (pa) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of [61-1] motion to compel discovery (pa) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by plaintiffs to [61-1] motion to compel discovery (pa) (Entered: 12/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dft City of Atlanta for partial sum.jgm with statement of facts & brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 12/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER GRANTING joint motion to extend time thru 12/19/96 to file sum.jgm motions & until 30 days after ruling on sum.jgm motions to file PTO [62-1] by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/ (pa) (Entered: 11/22/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION by parties to extend time thru 12/19/96 to file sum.jgm motions & until 30 days after ruling on sum.jgm motions to file PTO with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 11/22/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by dft City of Atlanta to compel discovery with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 11/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of service to dft City of Atlanta of discovery & expected testimony of pla's expert Dr. David R. Bayne. (pa) (Entered: 11/18/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation DISMISSING claims of Jack Baytos by pla Jack Baytos & dft City of Atlanta. Approved by direction of the Court. cc/ (pa) Modified on 11/20/1996 (Entered: 11/18/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by City of Atlanta. (pa) (Entered: 11/13/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply by plas to response by Fulton County [54-1] to motion for protective order by Upper Chattahoochee [53-1] (pa) (Entered: 10/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Certificate of service of brief in support of response to pla's motion for protective order. (pa) (Entered: 10/15/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by dft City of Atlanta to response by plas [52-1] to motion for partial sum.jgm. [28-1] (pa) Modified on 10/09/1996 (Entered: 10/09/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by Proposed Intervenor Fulton County to motion for protective order by Upper Chattahoochee [53-1] (pa) (Entered: 10/09/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by pla Upper Chattahoochee for protective order with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 09/18/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Brief by plas on motions for sum.jgm. [28-1] & [26-1]. (pa) (Entered: 09/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by plas to motion for leave to file supplemental facutal background in support of its motion for partial sum.jgm by City of Atlanta [50-1]. (pa) (Entered: 08/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by dft City of Atlanta for leave to file supplemental facutal background in support of its motion for partial sum.jgm with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 08/27/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by plas to motion to ext time for discovery thru 11/16/96 by City of Atlanta [48-1] (crp) (Entered: 07/18/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dft City of Atlanta to ext time for discovery thru 11/16/96 with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 07/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of motion to defer ruling on cross motions for partial sum.jgm [26-1] & [28-1] by City of Atlanta [41-1] (pa) (Entered: 07/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ext time thru 11/16/96 for discovery by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/ (pa) (Entered: 07/15/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Preliminary Statement and Scheduling Order. (to judge) (crp) (Entered: 07/02/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/18/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplement to motion for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus [28-1] by plas. (crp) (Entered: 07/02/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by plas to motion to defer ruling on cross motions for partial sum.jgm [26-1] & [28-1] by City of Atlanta [41-1] (crp) (Entered: 07/02/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/10/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by dft City of Atlanta to response by plas [40-1], motion to strike affidavits of Hallum & Kamps by plas [40-1] (pa) (Entered: 06/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by dft City of Atlanta to defer ruling on cross motions for partial sum.jgm [26-1] & [28-1] with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 06/11/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ...MOTION by plas to strike affidavits of Hallum & Kamps with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 05/30/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply by dft City of Atlanta in opposition to motion for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus by Chattahoochee River, Upper Chattahoochee [28-1] (pa) (Entered: 05/23/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] w/out prejudice, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART motion to intervene by Fulton County [17-1], GRANTING as to remedial portion of litigation & DENYING as to liability portion of litigation; by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc (scg) Modified on 05/23/1996 (Entered: 05/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of filing Substitute original affidavits by dft City of Atlanta. (pa) Modified on 05/23/1996 (Entered: 05/23/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by plas' to dft's response to motion for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus by dfts [28-1] . (pa) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief by dft City of Atlanta to motion for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus by pltfs [28-1] & response to pla's statement of facts. (pa) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER ext time thru 5/3/96 to respond to motion for partial sum.jgm. by plas [28-1] by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/(pa) Modified on 04/30/1996 (Entered: 04/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by deft to ext time thru 5/3/96 to respond to motion for partial sum.jgm. [28-1] with brief in support. (pa) Modified on 04/30/1996 (Entered: 04/30/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation by dft City of Atlanta in opposition to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] (pa) Modified on 04/30/1996 (Entered: 04/30/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by movant Fulton County to notice to respond to motion for sum.jgm. (pa) (Entered: 04/16/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by City of Atlanta. (pa) (Entered: 04/10/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief w/affidavit by plas in support of its motion for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus [28-1], and BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO motion for partial sum.jgm. by dft [26-1] (fmr emp) (Entered: 04/08/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plas for partial sum.jgm. as to the City's liability for violations relating to phosphorus with appendix in support. (fmr emp) (Entered: 04/08/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Stipulation regarding discharge of phosphorus by parties. (pa) (Entered: 04/04/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/1996, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/11/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by dft City of Atlanta for partial summary judgment and statement of material facts with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 04/03/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Fulton County to response to motion to intervene by Fulton County [17-1]. (pa) (Entered: 03/19/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Fulton County to response to motion to intervene by Fulton County [17-1]. (pa) (Entered: 03/08/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING joint motion to defer discovery until Court rules on the motions to intervene [9-1]. Court willl allow four month discovery period from date Court rules on the motions to intervene, by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/ (pa) Modified on 02/27/1996 (Entered: 02/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by dft City of Atlanta to motion to intervene by Fulton County [17-1] (pa) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Preliminary Statement (Planning Report) and Scheduling Order. (to FMH) (pa) Modified on 02/27/1996 (Entered: 02/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by plas to motion to intervene by Fulton County [17-1] (pa) Modified on 02/27/1996 (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION by parties to extend time for commencement of discovery with brief in support. To:FMH (pa) (Entered: 02/20/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Brief by dft City of Atlanta in opposition to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] (pa) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by movant Fulton County to intervene with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 02/06/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by pla to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] (cb) (Entered: 01/31/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by City of Atlanta (pa) (Entered: 01/22/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by dft to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] (pa) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by plas to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] with appendix. (pa) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of interested persons. (to judge) (dt) (Entered: 01/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by City of Atlanta. (pa) (Entered: 01/05/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation extending time thru 1/12/95 for pltfs & defts to respond to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] Approved by clerk. cc/ (pa) (Entered: 01/05/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/23/1996 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING joint motion to extend time to respond to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] by defendant, plaintiff [8-1]. Pltf & Deft are allowed thru 1/12/96 to respond, by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/ (pa) (Entered: 12/22/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION by pltf & defts to extend time to respond to motion to intervene by Utoy-Clayton [4-1] with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 12/22/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER extending time thru 12/26/95 to answer complaint [1-1] by Judge Frank M. Hull. cc/ (pa) Modified on 12/21/1995 (Entered: 12/15/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Application by pltfs and deft City of Atlanta to extend time thru 12/26/95 to answer complaint with brief in support. (approved by order of 12/12/95) (pa) (Entered: 12/21/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by Utoy-Clayton. (pa) (Entered: 12/21/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/20/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by movant Utoy-Clayton to intervene with brief in support. (pa) (Entered: 12/21/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Atlanta mailed 11/6/95 Answer due by 1/5/96 for City of Atlanta (fmr emp) (Entered: 11/13/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWERS TO MANDATORY INTERROGATORIES by plas. (bsm) Modified on 10/18/1995 (Entered: 10/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney; jury demand. FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 224123 (bsm) (Entered: 10/17/1995)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?