USA, et al v. City of Atlanta
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-01956
District Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Ann de Grazia +1 404 656 3385

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgia Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda H. Cole +1 404 657 2205

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Bomar +1 404 656 4812 +1 404 656 0667 bbomar@law.ga.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Hennelly +1 404 656 7540 jhennelly@law.ga.gov
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lois J. Schiffer +1 202 514 2445 +5144 514 514 4180

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A. Weinischke +1 202 514 4624 bill.weinischke@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo City Of Atlanta, Georgia, Defendant
Officially listed as "City of Atlanta"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kazmarek Geiger & Laseter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Allen Horder +1 404 815 6500 rhorder@kglattorneys.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Atlanta City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rajan Roger Bhandari +1 404 330 6400 rbhandari@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/25/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Chandler +1 404 330 6400 EBChandler@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008 Linda Katherine DiSantis +1 404 330 6400 lkdisantis@atlantaga.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc P. Goncher +1 404 330 6400 +1 404 658 6894 mgoncher@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Pease Langford +1 404 330 6400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Ingram Mills +1 404 330 6489 smills@atlantaga.gov
No Logo City of College Park, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Fincher Denmark & Williams LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winston A. Denmark +1 770 478 9950 wdenmark@fdwlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Martin Fincher +1 770 478 9950 Sfincher@fdwlaw.com

Represented by The Barnes Firm, PC

No Logo City of Fairburn, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanders Haugen Sears & Meeker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carroll Bradford Sears, Jr. +1 770 253 3880
No Logo City of Palmetto, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net
No Logo CITY OF SANDY SPRINGS, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Wendell K. Willard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendell K. Willard +1 770 481 7100 wkwillard@wendellwillard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo City of Union City, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net
No Logo South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net
No Logo City Of Atlanta, Georgia, Third Party Plaintiff
Officially listed as "City of Atlanta"

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Atlanta City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rajan Roger Bhandari +1 404 330 6400 rbhandari@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/25/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth B. Chandler +1 404 330 6400 EBChandler@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 05/13/2008 Linda Katherine DiSantis +1 404 330 6400 lkdisantis@atlantaga.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc P. Goncher +1 404 330 6400 +1 404 658 6894 mgoncher@atlantaga.gov
TERMINATED: 03/05/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Pease Langford +1 404 330 6400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Ingram Mills +1 404 330 6489 smills@atlantaga.gov
No Logo City of College Park, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fincher Denmark & Williams LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winston A. Denmark +1 770 478 9950 wdenmark@fdwlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Martin Fincher +1 770 478 9950 Sfincher@fdwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emilia C. Walker +1 770 478 9950 ewalker@fdwlaw.com

Represented by The Barnes Firm, PC

No Logo City of Fairburn, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanders Haugen Sears & Meeker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carroll Bradford Sears, Jr. +1 770 253 3880
No Logo City of Palmetto, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo CITY OF SANDY SPRINGS, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Wendell K. Willard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendell K. Willard +1 770 481 7100 wkwillard@wendellwillard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo City of Union City, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo FULTON COUNTY, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Overtis Hicks Brantley +1 404 730 7750 ov.brantley@co.fulton.ga.us
TERMINATED: 12/09/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Vernitia Averett Shannon +1 404 287 2370 vernitia.shannon@co.fulton.ga.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent D. Hyman +1 404 730 7750 vincent.hyman@fultoncountyga.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willie Jake Lovett, Jr. +1 404 612 4407 willie.lovett@fultoncountyga.gov
No Logo South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis A. Davenport +1 770 461 2223 dadaven@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by COOK NOELL TOLLEY & BATES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Donald Tolley +1 706 549 6111 etolley@mindspring.com
No Logo FULTON COUNTY, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Overtis Hicks Brantley +1 404 730 7750 ov.brantley@co.fulton.ga.us
TERMINATED: 12/09/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Vernitia Averett Shannon +1 404 287 2370 vernitia.shannon@co.fulton.ga.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willie Jake Lovett, Jr. +1 404 612 4407 willie.lovett@fultoncountyga.gov
No Logo Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine & Block

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Bertram Levy +1 404 261 6800 blevy@fineandblock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinstock & Scavo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Weinstock +1 404 231 3999 mweinstock@wslaw.net
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1319
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (175) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER granting (295) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (174) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT; the time for Third Party Defendants to answer the City of Atlanta's Amended Third-Party Complaint is extended thru 10 days after the date of the 11th Circuit's final disposition of the pending appeals. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/13/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
      Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/28/10, 6/31-22/10, 7/23-8/2/10, by John E. Hennelly. (ss) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        CONSENT ORDER granting (280) Motion for Extension of Time until 10 days after the date of 11th Circuit's final disposition of the pending appeals, to for the City of Sandy Springs to answer the Amended Third-Party Complaint in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (160) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 5/7/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/19/2010 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting (290) Motion to Amend in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; granting (169) Motion to Amend in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT, nunc pro tunc to 3/22/10. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 4/21/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to Amend 150 Third Party Complaint by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                RESPONSE re 158 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint In Lieu of Filing Answer filed by City of Atlanta, City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order)(Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                  Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 5/12/2010, 6/25-6/28/2010, 7/12-7/30/2010, 10/1-10/6/2010, 10/7-10/11/2010, by Steven Martin Fincher. (Fincher, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 150 Third Party Complaint by City of College Park.(Walker, Emilia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 4/12/2010 (dr). (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                      USCA Acknowledgment of 153 Notice of Appeal filed by City of College Park. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 10-11355-D (Attachments: # 1 USCA correspondence to parties)(fem) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                        STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Emilia C. Walker on behalf of City of College Park (Walker, Emilia) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ltr from City of Atlanta to GA EPD dtd 02 18 2010)(Hennelly, John) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 150 Third Party Complaint,, by City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Stay by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint In Lieu of Filing Answer by City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto. (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on November 13, 2009 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re 136 Notice of Appeal, 153 Notice of Appeal, 137 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Susan Baker. Case Appealed to usca Case Number 10-10709-D. Financial Arrangements due on 4/5/2010 (fem) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE re 148 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Related to Aspects of Litigation on Appeal with Memorandum of Law filed by City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs, City of Sandy Springs. (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                          DOCUMENT #151 REDOCKETED AS Notice of Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta. Rajan Roger Bhandari for City of Atlanta replacing attorney Elizabeth B. Chandler. (pdw) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                            Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 153 Notice of Appeal (fem) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 132 Order, by City of College Park. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (fem) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE Of Filing Transcript order as to City of Atlanta. (fem) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                  DOCUMENT FILING ERROR NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Goncher on behalf of City of Atlanta (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Councel)Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(Goncher, Marc) Modified on 3/29/2010 (pdw). (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of the City of Atlanta against Fulton County, City of Sandy Springs, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of College Park, filed by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Amended Third-Party Complaint of the City of Atlanta, # 2 Exhibit B to Amended Third-Party Complaint of the City of Atlanta)(Richardson, Susan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for proceedings held on 11/13/09 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., re 137 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Susan C. Baker. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 10-10721-D. Financial Arrangements due on 3/26/2010 (fem) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Related to Aspects of Litigation on Appeal with Memorandum of Law by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings)(Richardson, Susan) Modified on 3/16/2010 to remove duplicative filer name(pdw). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                          USCA Acknowledgment of 137 Notice of Appeal, filed by City of Palmetto, City of Union City, City of Fairburn, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 10-10721-D (fem) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 1 USCA Notice to Counsel) (fem). (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                            USCA Acknowledgment of 136 Notice of Appeal filed by City of Sandy Springs. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 10-10718-D (fem) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 1 USCA Notice to Counsel) (fem). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 2 USCA Notice to Counsel) (fem). (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Court Reporter notification that transcript has been filed in district court re 136 Notice of Appeal (fem) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Exhibit)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 133 Third Party Complaint by Fulton County.(Hyman, Vincent) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER GRANTING (255) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:95-cv-02550-TWT; and GRANTING (141) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:98-cv-01956-TWT. The City of Atlanta shall have up to and including 3/15/2010 to respond to Defendants South Fulton Water & Sewer Authority, City of Union City, City of Fairburn, and City of Palmetto's Motion to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 2/26/2010. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(kt) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Dismiss re: 135 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer by City of Atlanta, City of Atlanta. (Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Transcript to be attached to Motion To Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority re 135 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer (Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 137 Notice of Appeal, (fem) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 136 Notice of Appeal (fem) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 132 Order,, by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E0000000002566124. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tolley, Edward) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 132 Order,, by City of Sandy Springs. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 113E0000000002566003. Transcript Order Form due on 2/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Third Party MOTION to Dismiss in Lieu of Answer with Brief In Support by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Tolley, Edward) Modified caps on 2/16/2010 (dr). (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing of Proof of Service by City of Atlanta re 133 Third Party Complaint,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A to Notice of Filing Proof of Service)(Richardson, Susan) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT of The City of Atlanta against Fulton County, City of Sandy Springs, City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority, City of College Park, filed by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A to The City of Atlanta's Third Party Complaint, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B to The City of Atlanta's Third Party Complaint)(Richardson, Susan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting (228 in 1:95-cv-02550-TWT) MOTION for Joinder, (118 in 1:98-cv-01956-TWT) MOTION for Joinder filed by City of Atlanta. Defendant City of Atlanta be permitted to file a Third-Party Complaint; Plaintiff State of Georgia and Intervenor Fulton County be enjoined from applying the Georgia Service Delivery Act procedures to the City of Atlanta and Third-Party Defendants with respect to the provision of water and sewer services. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr on 1/14/10. Associated Cases: 1:95-cv-02550-TWT, 1:98-cv-01956-TWT(dr) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 13, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number (404) 215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of City of Sandy Springs (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Michael J. Williams. Clerk to follow-up by 12/3/2009. (jkm) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 13, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan C. Baker, Telephone number (404) 215-1558. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2009 granting 118 MOTION for Joinder filed by City of Atlanta, and the Court will allow filing of Third Party Complaints against the named parties. The State of Georgia and the County of Fulton are enjoined as to Water and Sewer Services from applying the Services Delivery Act as those issues will continue under the supervision of this Court and enjoined from further proceeding in Fulton County Superior Court as to the Water and Sewer Services for a limited time to allow response by City of Atlanta, Fulton County and State of Georgia to respond to filings made today. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 118 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of College Park. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to 118 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of Fairburn, City of Palmetto, City of Union City, South Fulton Municipal Regional Water and Sewer Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 118 MOTION for Joinder, MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by City of Sandy Springs. (dr) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 118 MOTION for Joinder MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2009 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder of Parties, MOTION to Require Third-Party Defendants to Show Cause and attend an Expedited Hearing by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(dr) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 19, 2009, before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number (404) 215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (fem) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Order for Joinder with Brief In Support by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion, # 3 Exhibit A to Mem in Support of Motion)(Richardson, Susan) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dr). (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 10/19/2009. The Court heard the report from the City of Atlanta and comments from counsel for USA and state of Georgia. Response by the Court. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(dr) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/19/2009 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ss) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 24, 2008 through and including August 5, 2008, by John E. Hennelly. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Elizabeth B. Chandler replacing attorney Linda Katherine DiSantis. (Chandler, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT of defendant by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr: Status Conference held on 11/2/2007 re the status of the City of Atlanta's Consent Decree(s) Compliance and the potential impact of proposed Senate Bill 306. (Court Reporter Susan Baker.)(dr) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Exhibit # 15 Exhibit # 16 Exhibit # 17 Exhibit # 18 Exhibit # 19 Exhibit # 20 Exhibit # 21 Exhibit # 22 Exhibit # 23 Exhibit # 24 Exhibit # 25 Exhibit # 26 Exhibit)(Horder, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/18/07 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.. Court Reporter: Susan Baker. (dr) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing:Hearing set for 11/2/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr., regarding the City's Financial Ability to Comply with the Consent Decrees currently in place. (ss) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.: Status Conference/Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2007. The Court heard from counsel on their concerns related to Senate Bill 306. It was decided that the City would supplement their Status Report and the Court will schedule a public hearing regarding the City's Financial Ability to Comply with the Consent Decrees currently in place. Counsel to confer regarding scheduling and contact Ms. Sewell to set any hearing date. (Court Reporter Susan Baker.)(aaq) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of conference call on May 18, 2007 at 10:00 a.m., regarding status report. Counsel for City of Atlanta to originate call. (ss) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter from City of Atlanta to EPA/EPD re Senate Bill 306 (Greater Fulton Water Authority Act))(Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT City of Atlanta Semi-Annual Status Report by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation by United States of America, State of Georgia and by City of Atlanta. (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by City of Atlanta. (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marc P. Goncher on behalf of City of Atlanta (Goncher, Marc) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by State of Georgia. (Hennelly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta. Susan Richardson substituted in place of Newton Quantz. (dr) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 70 Motion to Intervene . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. on 12/7/04. (dr) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Cahoon on behalf of City of Atlanta (Cahoon, Susan) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by City of Atlanta re 75 Response in Opposition to Motion re Intervening Authority (Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Robert J. Hunter by City of Atlanta (Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Rule 7.1D Certificate for Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Ronald Lee Raider on behalf of City of Atlanta (Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by State of Georgia, USA to 70 MOTION to Intervene. (dr) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by City of Atlanta re 70 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A to Barnes Dec.# 2 Exhibit Ex. B to Barnes Dec.# 3 Exhibit Ex. C to Barnes Dec.)(Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by City of Atlanta re 70 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert J. Hunter# 2 Exhibit Ex. B to Hunter Declaration# 3 Exhibit Ex. C. to Hunter Dec.# 4 Exhibit Ex. D to Hunter Declaration# 5 Exhibit Ex. E to Hunter Declaration# 6 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 1) to Hunter Declaration# 7 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 2) to Hunter Declaration# 8 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 3) to Hunter Declaration# 9 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 4) to Hunter Declaration# 10 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 5) to Hunter Declaration# 11 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 6) to Hunter Declaration# 12 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 7) to Hunter Declaration# 13 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 8) to Hunter Declaration# 14 Exhibit Ex. F (Part 9) to Hunter Declaration# 15 Exhibit Ex. G to Hunter Declaration# 16 Exhibit Ex. H to Hunter Declaration# 17 Exhibit Ex. I to Hunter Declaration# 18 Exhibit Ex. J to Hunter Declaration)(Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by City of Atlanta re 70 MOTION to Intervene. (Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Lee Raider on behalf of City of Atlanta (Raider, Ronald) (Entered: 08/31/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/7/04 to respond to 70 MOTION to Intervene.Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash (dr) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to 70 MOTION to Intervene by City of Atlanta, State of Georgia, USA. (dr) (Entered: 08/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of John Sherman by Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. re 70 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 1a and #(3) Exhibit 2)(dfb) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene by movant Fulton County Taxpayers Association, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B: Part 1 of 3, # 3) Exhibit B: Part 2 of 3, #(4) Exhibit B: Part 3 of 3, #(5) Exhibit C, #(6) Exhibit D, #(7) Memorandum of Points and Authorities and #(8) Certificate of Service for Motion)(dfb) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta (dr) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, City Attorney provided information on financial situation of the City associated with its implementation of terms of Consent Decree (dr) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (dr) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Findings of fact and conclusions of law with respect to the plas' motion to enter amendments to first amended consent decree ( signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Amendments are with pleading 55) (crc) Modified on 06/03/2003 (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (daf) (Entered: 04/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (daf) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash [56-1] motion to file excess pages limitation for brief in support of entry of proposed amendments to first amended consent decree, motion granted, [55-1] motion to enter amendments to first amended [29-1] consent decree, motion granted. Pla's counsel to prepare order (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of change of address by defendant. (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution of Counsel for City of Atlanta . Linda Katherine DiSantis replacing attorney Susan Pease Langford for City of Atlanta . (daf) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice by CRD, motion hearing reset for [55-1] motion to enter amendments to first amended [29-1] consent decree 9:30 3/6/03 . Counsel must notify of any conflicts. (cc by CRD) (crc) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by CRD, motion hearing set for [55-1] motion to enter amendments to first amended [29-1] consent decree 9:30 on 2/19/03 in courtroom 2108. (cc by CRD via fax) (crc) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief by defendant City of Atlanta in support of [55-1] proposed amendments to first amended [29-1] consent decree (crc) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant City of Atlanta to file excess pages limitation for brief in support of entry of proposed amendments to first amended consent decree (to TWT) (crc) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs to enter amendments to first amended [29-1] consent decree with proposed amendments. (crc) (Entered: 01/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (er) (Entered: 11/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta . (crc) (Entered: 11/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs (crc) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of lodging of prposed amendment to first amended consent decree. (crc) (Entered: 07/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta (to TWT) (bsm) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs. . (crc) (Entered: 04/03/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT filed RE: status conference for dates of 09/07/01 Court Reporter: Linda Baggett. Original filed in 1:95-cv-2550 TWT doc no 156 (crc) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by defendant City of Atlanta. (crc) (Entered: 09/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney appearance for defendant City of Atlanta by Susan Pease Langford and Sarah Ingram Mills (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash. Notice of appearance of counsel for City of Atlanta filed. Court heard from counsel concerning mechanism or procedure whereby he will be advised of any significant failure to comply with the schedule of the Remedial Measurers Report and Consent decree. It was agreed that the City would continue to submit quarterly reports and that the EPA/EPD submit status reports on 1/15 and 7/15 annually and that the City would have 15 days to file any response. The City has 15 days to respond to the status report submitted to the Court on 9/6. These semi annual reports and responses will be filed in the Court's record and forwarded to the Judge for review and determination if conference is needed. (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs. (crc) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Settlement agreementi. (First docketed on 9/18/00). (crc) Modified on 02/14/2001 (Entered: 02/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DENYING [31-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty by City of Atlanta. The Court ORDERS the City of Atlanta to pay the sum of $40,000 in stipulated penalties as provided in the Consent Decree. (cc) (fmm) (Entered: 05/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING HELD before Judge Thomas W. Thrash re: issues to be addressed at scheduled evidentiary hearing. Hearings cancelled and court to issue an order. (fmm) (Entered: 05/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's statement concerning procedures for the [37-1] evidentiary hearing set for 9:30 on 5/24/00 and 5/25/00 (crc) (Entered: 05/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Riverkeeper's statement in support of [36-1] U.S. and GA's position. (crc) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by dft City of Atlanta for status conference & direction from the Court . (ck) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice by CRD, evidentiary hearing set for 9:30 on 5/24/00 and 5/25/00 (served by CRD) (bsm) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by State of Georgia and USA in response to [31-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty. (ck) (Entered: 04/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, government plaintiffs directed to file/win 10 days of docketing this order a statement of disputed facts in which they identify each fact set forth in paragraphs 3 thru 19 of [31-1] petition for review, the Court requested that a courtesy copy be provided in chambers [31-1] motion for review to be submitted 4/19/00 (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 03/30/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT filed RE: for dates of December 20, 1999 Court Reporter: Linda W. Baggett (llg) (Entered: 02/24/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant City of Atlanta to response to [31-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty (llg) (Entered: 02/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by plaintiffs State of Georgia and USA to [31-1] motion for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty (llg) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/27/1999, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/30/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PETITION by defendant City of Atlanta for review of the written position of plaintiffs' United States of America and the State of Georgia assessing a stipulated penalty with brief in support. (pdw) (Entered: 12/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, that clerk administratively and statistically terminate the action . The record shall not be archived without direction from the Court. (cc) (llg) (Entered: 12/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT DECREE by the parties approved by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. (see for details; counsel served per CRD; DO NOT ARCHIVE) (llg) (Entered: 12/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash on [24-1] motion to enter consent decree. Consent decree approved and signed. (llg) (Entered: 12/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash [24-1] motion to enter consent decree, motion hearing set for [24-1] motion to enter consent decree on 12/20/99 at 2:00pm . (cc) (llg) (Entered: 12/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice by CRD to counsel regarding motion hearing set for [24-1] motion to enter consent decree at 2:00pm on 12/20/99 (counsel served by fax per CRD) (llg) (Entered: 12/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash directing counsel to submit a written status report the Court in chambers regarding the settlement of this case within 10 days from the docketing of this Order. (cc) (llg) (Entered: 11/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff to enter consent decree with brief in support and proposed first amended consent decree. (llg) (Entered: 11/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of lodging by plaintiff USA . (pdw) (Entered: 07/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash DENYING [11-1] motion to intervene by Fulton County (cc) (djh) (Entered: 03/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by plas to dft's reply brief (to the [11-1] motion to intervene). (djh) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by intervenor-defendant Fulton County to dft City of Atlanta's response in opposition to [11-1] motion to intervene (pdw) (Entered: 02/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Fulton County to response to [11-1] motion to intervene (bsm) (Entered: 01/25/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response brief by defendant in opposition to [11-1] motion to intervene (bsm) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [14-1] joint motion to extend time until 1/11/99 to respond to [11-1] motion to intervene (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by USA to [11-1] motion to intervene (bsm) (Entered: 01/07/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by plaintiff State of Georgia to [11-1] motion to intervene (bsm) (Entered: 01/07/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to extend time until 1/11/99 to respond to [11-1] motion to intervene with proposed consent order (to TWT) (bsm) (Entered: 01/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [12-1] joint motion to extend time until 1/5/99 to respond to [11-1] motion to intervene, [11-1] motion to intervene to be submitted on 1/6/99 (cc) (bsm) Modified on 12/21/1998 (Entered: 12/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to extend time until 1/5/99 to respond to [11-1] motion to intervene with proposed consent order (to TWT) (bsm) (Entered: 12/15/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by intervenor-defendant Fulton County to intervene with brief in support and proposed answer. (djh) (Entered: 11/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT ORDER Regarding Costs of Litigation by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, dft shall pay $489,750.00 as costs of litigation to plas w/in 10 days of entry of [9-1] consent decree. (cc) (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT DECREE filed by parties, signed by Judge Thrash. (cc) (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion HEARING held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash [7-1] motion to enter consent decree. Consent Decree filed, Consent Order Regarding Costs of Litigation filed. (pdw) (Entered: 09/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION by plaintiffs to enter consent decree w/brief in support & consent decree. (to judge) (pdw) Modified on 09/23/1998 (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [5-1] joint motion to stay proceedings, parties to file written status reports every 30 days while stay is in effect (cc) (bsm) (Entered: 08/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/6/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to stay proceedings with proposed order (to TWT) (bsm) (Entered: 08/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Thomas W. Thrash GRANTING [2-1] motion for relief or waiver from mandatory disclosure (cc) (fmr emp) (Entered: 07/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Lodging consolidated (1:95-cv-2550-TWT) consent decree (exh A) by USA. (rh) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST by plaintiffs for relief or waiver from mandatory disclosure . (to TWT) (rh) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed. Consent form to proceed before U.S. magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 426340 (rh) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?